Samuel Panzer v. Asbestos Defendants (b/p)as Reflected On Exhibits
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 04 430286
Superior Court Judge Donna J. Hitchens, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Don Panzer, As Legal Heir Of Samuel Panzer, Deceased, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ezrin, Joshua C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID R. DONADIO +1 415 898 1555 +1 415 898 1247 ddonadio@braytonlaw.com
No Logo Joel Panzer, As Wrongful Death Heir, And As Succesor-in-interest To Samuel Panzer, Deceased, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ezrin, Joshua C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID R. DONADIO +1 415 898 1555 +1 415 898 1247 ddonadio@braytonlaw.com
No Logo Panzer, Samuel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ezrin, Joshua C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID R. DONADIO +1 415 898 1555 +1 415 898 1247 ddonadio@braytonlaw.com
v.
No Logo Acf Industries LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Berry & Berry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evanthia M Spanos +1 510 835 8330

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ralph Angelo Zappala +1 415 438 6627 +1 415 434 0882 ralph.zappala@lewisbrisbois.com
No Logo Allen Test Products, Defendant
No Logo Allis-chalmers, Defendant
No Logo Allis-chalmers Corporation Product Liability Trust A Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sekelick, Peter W.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth J. McCarthy +1 510 285 2500 kjm@knoxricksen.com
Alstom Power, Inc. Alstom Power, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Barg Coffin Lewis & Trapp, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Craig Coffin +1 415 228 5400 +1 415 228 5450 RCC@BCLTLAW.COM
No Logo Asarco, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Asarco Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles F Preuss +1 415 591 7500 +1 415 591 7510 charles.preuss@dbr.com
No Logo Asbestos Corporation Ltd, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by ADAMS NYE SINUNU WALKER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sinunu, James Najeeb +1 415 982 8955

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Randall K Bernard +1 415 433 0990
No Logo Asbestos Defendants (b P) As Reflected On Exhibits B, B-1, C, H, I, Defendant
No Logo Asbestos Defendants (b/p)as Reflected On Exhibits B, C, H, I, Defendant
No Logo Aurora Company, Defendant
No Logo Aurora Pump Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Aker, Christophe Ray

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Goldberg, Scott A +1 310 445 0800
No Logo Aurora Pump Division Of General Signal Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Avalon Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bishop Barry Howe Haney & Ryder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas Garth Wah +1 415 956 8000
No Logo Bear Automotive Service Equipment Company, Defendant
No Logo Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Jackson and Wallace

No Logo Cal-val Co., Defendant

Represented by East Twr

No Logo Carrier Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Copeland Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Mansfield, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Drew A Burford +1 925 930 2866
No Logo Crane Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Crane Co."

Represented by Jackson and Wallace

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gill, Raymond Lawrence +1 415 986 5900
No Logo Crane Environmental, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gill, Raymond Lawrence +1 415 986 5900
No Logo Cutler-hammer Inc. Now Known As Eaton Electrical Inc., Defendant

Represented by Howard Rome Martin & Ridley, LLP

No Logo DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thelen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kuenster, Jennifer A.
No Logo Does 1-8500, Defendant
No Logo Dover Resources, Defendant

Represented by Carroll, Burdick & McDonough LLP

No Logo Dravo Constructors,inc., Defendant

Represented by Jackson and Wallace

No Logo Durabla Manufacturing Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo EATON HYDRAULICS INC., Defendant
No Logo Electrical Insulation Suppliers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Elliott Turbomachinery Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Imai, Tadlock, Keeney & Cordery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theodore Thomas Cordery +1 415 675 7000 +1 415 675 7008 tcordery@itkc.com
No Logo Emerson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Mansfield, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tsun-chi Eric Sun +1 925 930 2866
No Logo Emerson Electric Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Emerson Electric Co."
No Logo FMC Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Fmc Corporation - Turbo Pump Operation Erroneously Named Herein As Fmc Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McNamara Dodge Ney Beatty Slattery Pfalzer Borges & Brothers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E Pfalzer +1 415 939 5330
No Logo Foster Wheeler LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bassi Martini Edlin & Blum, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J Ryan +1 415 362 5116

Represented by Jackson and Wallace

No Logo Foster Wheeler Llc (survivor To A Merger With Foster Wheeler Corporation), Defendant
No Logo Gardner Denver, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Poole & Shaffery LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John H Shaffery +1 213 439 5390 +1 213 439 0183 jshaffery@pooleshaffery.com
No Logo Gardner-denver Mining & Const. Division, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Berry & Berry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evanthia M Spanos +1 510 835 8330

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ralph Angelo Zappala +1 415 438 6627 +1 415 434 0882 ralph.zappala@lewisbrisbois.com
No Logo Garlock Sealing Technologies, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Gatke Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bennett Samuelsen Reynolds & Allard PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reynolds, Richard Leroy +1 510 444 7688 +1 510 444 5849
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Defendant
Unknown Role, Genpact Ltd.
Unknown Role, Gei, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sportstech, Inc.
Unknown Role, Superior Essex Inc.
Unknown Role, Genicom Corp
Unknown Role, Imatron Inc.
Unknown Role, Regal Beloit Corp
Unknown Role, Lockheed Martin Corp
Unknown Role, Lunar Corp
Unknown Role, Mecon Inc
Unknown Role, Positron Corp
Unknown Role, GE India Ventures LLC
Unknown Role, Townsquare Media, LLC
Unknown Role, Antares Capital Corp
Unknown Role, Bear Newco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.
Unknown Role, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Unknown Role, Xoom, Inc.
Unknown Role, Plug Power, Inc.
Unknown Role, Hpsc, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ionics, Inc.
Unknown Role, Idx Systems Corp
Unknown Role, iVillage, Inc.
General Motors Corporation General Motors Corporation, Defendant
Unknown Role, General Motors Co
Unknown Role, Panamsat Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Filice Brown Eassa & McLeod LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene Brown +1 510 444 3131
No Logo Hopeman Brothers, Defendant
No Logo Imo Industries, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "I.m.o. Industries, Inc Formerly Known As Delaval Steam Turbine, Only."
Ingersoll-Rand Company Ingersoll-Rand Company, Defendant

Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

No Logo J.t. Thorpe & Son Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bassi Martini Edlin & Blum, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffery John Fadeff +1 510 596 0888
No Logo Lac D'amiante Du Quebec, Ltee, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles F Preuss +1 415 591 7500 +1 415 591 7510 charles.preuss@dbr.com
No Logo Nash Engineering Company,, Defendant
Owens-Illinois, Inc. Owens-Illinois, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pacific Marine Schwabacher, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Low Ball & Lynch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sonja E. Blomquist +1 415 981 6630 +1 415 982 1634 sblomquist@lowball.com
No Logo Pacific Marine Schwabacher,incorporated, Defendant
No Logo Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bassi Martini Edlin & Blum, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martini, Steven Dominic +1 415 488 5046
No Logo Plant Insulation Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Oberg, Lisa L +1 415 267 4000
No Logo Pneumo Abex, Llc Successor-in-interest To Abex Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brydon Hugo and Parker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward R Hugo +1 415 388 9762
No Logo Quintec Industries, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Walsworth Franklin Bevins & McCall

No Logo Reliance Electric Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Booth Beers +1 202 346 4000 +1 202 346 4444 dbeers@goodwinprocter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keele, Christopher A. +1 415 617 8900
No Logo Rockwell Automation, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Booth Beers +1 202 346 4000 +1 202 346 4444 dbeers@goodwinprocter.com
No Logo Schlage Lock Company, Defendant
No Logo Schutte & Koerting, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Oberg, Lisa L +1 415 267 4000
No Logo Singer Sewing Company, Defendant

Represented by Poeschl Kohn & Epstein LLP

No Logo Slakey Brothers, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Bennett Samuelsen Reynolds & Allard PC

No Logo Spx Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Spx Corp."
No Logo Spx Corporation Solely As It Relates To Allegations Concerning Copes-vulcan, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Walsworth Franklin Bevins & McCall

No Logo Square D Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bassi Martini Edlin & Blum, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J Ryan +1 415 362 5116
No Logo Sterling Fluid Systems (usa) Inc., Defendant
No Logo Sterling Fluid Systems (usa) LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McNamara Dodge Ney Beatty Slattery Pfalzer Borges & Brothers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E Pfalzer +1 415 939 5330
No Logo Superior-lidgerwood-mundy Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Terry Corporation Of Connecticut, Defendant
No Logo Terry Steam Turbine Co., Defendant
Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company"

Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

No Logo The Nash Engineering Company, Defendant

Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

No Logo Thomas Dee Engineering Company Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Thomas Dee Engineering Co"

Represented by Walsworth Franklin Bevins & McCall

No Logo Thorpe Insulation Company, Defendant
Tyco International, Ltd. Tyco International, Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tyco International (u.s.) Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hartwell, Mortimer H +1 415 442 1666
Viacom, Inc. Viacom, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Blockbuster, Inc.
Unknown Role, New Viacom Corp.
Unknown Role, Redstone Sumner M

Toggle Switch Represented by Pond North LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pond, Frank D +1 213 617 6170
No Logo Viking Pump, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Jackson and Wallace

No Logo Walter Kidde & Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Warren Pumps, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Carroll, Burdick & McDonough LLP

Represented by Jackson and Wallace

No Logo Wenco Pumps, Defendant
No Logo White Consolidated Industries, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Walsworth Franklin Bevins & McCall

No Logo Yarway Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bishop Barry Howe Haney & Ryder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Nowlin Haney +1 510 596 0888

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hartwell, Mortimer H +1 415 442 1666
No Logo York International Corporation Which Will Do Business In California As York Heating And Air Conditioning, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burnham Brown

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dean Pollack +1 510 444 6800 +1 510 835 6739 dpollack@burnhambrown.com
No Logo Asarco, Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Asbestos Corp Ltd, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Atlas Turner Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Bell Asbestos Mines, Ltd., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Thomas Dee Engineering Company Inc., Cross-Complainant
Officially listed as "Thomas Dee Engineering Co"

Represented by Walsworth Franklin Bevins & McCall

No Logo White Consolidated Industries, Inc., Cross-Complainant

Represented by Walsworth Franklin Bevins & McCall

Cause of Action Asbestos
  Entries (351) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (80) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 351 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: 4/24/2009 Answer
Answer To 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 24870002) Filed By Defendant Plant Insulation Company
    Legal Document 350 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Request For Dismissal
    Dismissal With Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 18114310) As To Defendant Ingersoll-rand Company Terry Corporation Of Connecticut Terry Steam Turbine Co. Schlage Lock Company
      Blank 349 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007
      Removed From Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Sep-28-2007 - Off Calendar. Matter Settled At Settlement Conference In Dept. 503. (206)
        Blank 348 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007
        Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Sep-28-2007 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos (continued) On Sep-28-2007 At 9:30 Am In 206
          Blank 347 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007
          Master Calendar Jury Asbestos, Advanced From Oct-09-2007 To Master Asbestos Jury Calendar At Sep-28-2007 9:30am In Dept. 206 For Trial Assignment. (206)
            Blank 346 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Court Filing
            Asbestos Settlement Conference Held On Sep-26-2007 In Department 503 - Case Did Not Settled. Matter Remains On Calendar For Jury Trial. Judge Feinstein, Clerk Carla Amador, Not Reported. (503)
              Blank 345 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007
              Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Sep-17-2007 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Oct-09-2007 At 11:15 Am In 206 Due To Unavailability Of Courtroom.
                Blank 344 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Court Filing
                Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Sep-19-2007 Continued To Sep-26-2007 At 10:00 Am In 503. Judge Feinstein, Clerk Carla Amador, Not Reported. (503)
                  Blank 343 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Court Filing
                  Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Sep-18-2007 Continued To Sep-19-2007 At 1:30 Pm In 503. Judge Feinstein, Clerk Carla Amador, Not Reported. (503)
                    Blank 342 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Court Filing
                    Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Sep-17-2007 Continued To Sep-18-2007 At 9:00 Am In 503. Judge Feinstein, Clerk Carla Amador, Not Reported.
                      Blank 341 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Court Filing
                      Asbestos Mandatory Settlement Conference Set For Sep-17-2007 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 503. Judge: Mary E. Wiss; Clerk: Dlok; Reporter: Susan Lee, Csr #4280 (206)
                        Legal Document 340 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: 8/13/2007 Request For Dismissal
                        Dismissal With Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 15926543) As To Defendant General Motors Corporation
                          Blank 339 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007
                          Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Jul-02-2007 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Sep-17-2007 At 11:15 Am In 206 Due To Unavailability Of Courtroom.
                            Blank 338 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007 Court Filing
                            Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Jun-04-2007 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Jul-02-2007 At 11:15 Am In 206. The Court Granted The Parties Stipulation For Continuance. Brayton Group 395 Wd/meso, Lead Case #413073 Hoeffer Vs. Asbestos Defendants. Judge: A. James Robertson, Ii; Clerk: Jiroque/d. Lok; Reporter: Susan Lee Csr #4280 (206)
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/18/2007 Request For Dismissal
                              Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 14928581) As To Defendant Sterling Fluid Systems (usa), Llc
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document 336 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 14671383) As To Defendant Sterling Fluid Systems (usa), Inc.
                                  Blank 335 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007 Court Filing
                                  Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Apr-30-2007 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Jun-04-2007 At 11:15 Am In 206 On The Court's Own Motion. Judge: A. James Robertson, Ii; Clerk: D. Lok; Reporter: Susan Lee Csr #4280 (206)
                                    Blank 334 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 Court Filing
                                    Not Reported. Asbestos Mandatory Settlement Conference Held On Apr-20-2007 In Dept. 304 -all Parties Are Present. No Settlement Is Reached; Trial Date Maintained. Judge Richard A. Kramer, Clerk Felicia Green, Dept. 304.
                                      Legal Document 333 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/20/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                      Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 14558774) As To Defendant Gatke Corporation
                                        Blank 332 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007
                                        Law And Motion, 302, Motion For Summary Judgment, Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party Schutte & Koerting, Inc.
                                          Blank 331 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007
                                          Law And Motion, 302, Motion For Summary Judgment, Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party Avalon Systems, Inc.
                                            Blank 330 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: 3/21/2007
                                            Law And Motion, 302, Motion For Summary Judgment, Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party Pacific Marine Schwabacher, Inc.
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                              Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 14180064) As To Defendant Crane Environmental, Inc.
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007 Request For Dismissal Of Complaint Without Prejudice As To Defendants
                                                Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 14170913) As To Defendant Schutte & Koerting, Inc.
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document 327 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                                  Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 14155411) As To Defendant Avalon Systems, Inc.
                                                    Legal Document 326 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/5/2007 Dismissal As To Daimlerchrysler Corp.
                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 14001519) As To Defendant Daimlerchrysler Corporation
                                                      Blank 325 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007
                                                      Law And Motion, 302, Motion For Summary Judgment, Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party, Defendant Warren Pumps, Inc.
                                                        Legal Document 324 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 Defendant Yarway Corporations Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof O
                                                        Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 13703214) Filed By Defendant Yarway Corporation
                                                          Legal Document 323 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                                          Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 13690902) As To Defendant Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc.
                                                            Legal Document 322 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal As To Defendant Asbestos Corporation, Ltd
                                                            Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 13635591) Filed By Defendant Asbestos Corporation Ltd
                                                              Legal Document 321 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007 Panzer Dismissal Of Slakey Brothers, Inc.
                                                              Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 13611993) As To Defendant Slakey Brothers, Inc.
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                                                Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 13558219) As To Defendant Asbestos Corporation Ltd
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document 319 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: 1/23/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                                                  Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 13555018) As To Defendant Pacific Marine Schwabacher,incorporated
                                                                    Legal Document 318 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 13541459) As To Defendant Reliance Electric Company
                                                                      Blank 317 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007
                                                                      Law And Motion, 302, Motion For Summary Judgment, Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party, Defendant Elliott Turbomachinery Company, Inc.
                                                                        Legal Document 316 Filed: 1/18/2007, Entered: 1/18/2007 Defendant Yarway Corporations Request For Disissal; Plaintiffs Joel Pa
                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 13506565) As To Defendant Yarway Corporation
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                                                          Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 13455144) As To Defendant Pneumo Abex, Llc Successor-in-interest To Abex Corporation
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Legal Document 314 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                                                            Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 13453165) As To Defendant Acf Industries,llc
                                                                              Legal Document 313 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                              Proof Of Service Of Notice Of Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment, Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication; Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment; Separate Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts In Support Of Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 13449095) Filed By Defendant Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc.
                                                                                Legal Document 312 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Declaration
                                                                                Declaration Of Layla I. Labagh In Support Of Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment, Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 13449095) Filed By Defendant Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc.
                                                                                  Legal Document 311 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Separate Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts In Support Of Elliott
                                                                                  Separate Statement Of Facts In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment(transaction Id # 13449095) Filed By Defendant Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc.
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Elliott Turbomachin
                                                                                    Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment(transaction Id # 13449095) Filed By Defendant Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc.
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Legal Document 309 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: 1/12/2007 Notice Of Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc.????????s Motion For Summary
                                                                                      Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 13449095) Filed By Defendant Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc. Hearing Set For Apr-02-2007 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Proof Of Service Of Defendant Pacific Marine Schwabacher, Inc.s Motion
                                                                                        Proof Of Service Of Defendant Pacific Marine Schwabacher, Inc.s Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 13435059) Filed By Defendant Pacific Marine Schwabacher, Inc.
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Defendant Pacific Marine Schwabacher, Inc.s Index Of Exhibits In Suppo
                                                                                          Defendant Pacific Marine Schwabacher, Inc.s Index Of Exhibits In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment, Exhibits F-k (transaction Id # 13435059) Filed By Defendant Pacific Marine Schwabacher, Inc.
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Defendant Pacific Marine Schwabacher, Inc.s Index Of Exhibits Support
                                                                                            Defendant Pacific Marine Schwabacher, Inc.s Index Of Exhibits Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment, Exhibits A-e (transaction Id # 13435059) Filed By Defendant Pacific Marine Schwabacher, Inc.
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Declaration
                                                                                              Declaration Of Kathy M. Huynh In Support Of Pacific Marine Schwabacher, Inc.s Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 13434426) Filed By Defendant Pacific Marine Schwabacher, Inc.
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                Legal Document 304 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Defendant Pacific Marine Schwabacher, Inc.s Separate Statement Of Undi
                                                                                                Separate Statement Of Facts (transaction Id # 13434426) Filed By Defendant Pacific Marine Schwabacher, Inc.
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Defendant Pacific Marine Schwabacher, Inc.s Memorandum Of Points And A
                                                                                                  Memorandum Of Points And Authorities (transaction Id # 13434426) Filed By Defendant Pacific Marine Schwabacher, Inc.
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Defendant Pacific Marine Schwabacher, Inc.s Notice Of Motion And Motio
                                                                                                    Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 13434426) Filed By Defendant Pacific Marine Schwabacher, Inc. Hearing Set For Mar-29-2007 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                      Legal Document 301 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                      Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 13416101) As To Defendant Dravo Constructors,inc.
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 13415819) As To Defendant Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                          Legal Document 299 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007 Request-for-dismissal As To Defendant Crane Co. Only
                                                                                                          Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 13411343) As To Defendant Crane Co.
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                            Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 13410805) As To Defendant Copeland Corporation
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                              Legal Document 297 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Exhibit
                                                                                                              Exhibits E H In Support Of The Declaration Of Rebecca L Woodson In Support Of Schutte Koerting Incs Motion For Summary Judgment Or In The Alternative Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 13363562) Filed By Defendant Schutte & Koerting, Inc.
                                                                                                                Legal Document 296 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                Proof Of Service Of Schutte Koerting Incs Motion For Summary Judgment Or In The Alternative Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 13363562) Filed By Defendant Schutte & Koerting, Inc.
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 295 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Exhibit
                                                                                                                  Exhibits C D In Support Of The Declaration Of Rebecca L Woodson In Support Of Schutte Koerting Incs Motion For Summary Judgment Or In The Alternative Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 13363562) Filed By Defendant Schutte & Koerting, Inc.
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 294 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                    Declaration Of Rebecca L Woodson In Support Of Schutte Koerting Incs Motion For Summary Judgment Or In The Alternative Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 13363562) Filed By Defendant Schutte & Koerting, Inc.
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Schutte & Koerting Incs Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Suppor
                                                                                                                      Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment, Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication(transaction Id # 13363562) Filed By Defendant Schutte & Koerting, Inc.
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 292 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Schutte & Koerting Incs Separate Statement Of Undisputed Material Fact
                                                                                                                        Separate Statement Of Facts In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment, Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication(transaction Id # 13363562) Filed By Defendant Schutte & Koerting, Inc.
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                          Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 13363562) Filed By Defendant Schutte & Koerting, Inc. Hearing Set For Mar-29-2007 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: 1/4/2007 Notice Of Change Of Firm Name
                                                                                                                            Notice Of Change Of Firm Name (transaction Id # 13344457) Filed By Attorney Gill, Raymond Lawrence
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 13330265) Filed By Defendant Avalon Systems, Inc.
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Jane B. Yee, In Support Of Defendant Avalon Systems, Inc.s Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 13330265) Filed By Defendant Avalon Systems, Inc.
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 287 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 Defendant Avalon Systems, Inc.s Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts
                                                                                                                                  Separate Statement Of Facts (transaction Id # 13330265) In Supp Of Mo For Sum Judgt Filed By Defendant Avalon Systems, Inc.
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                    Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 13330265) Filed By Defendant Avalon Systems, Inc. Hearing Set For Mar-29-2007 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                      Blank 285 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007
                                                                                                                                      Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Dover Resources Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings Pursuant To Ccp Section 438(b) Is Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party.
                                                                                                                                        Blank 284 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007
                                                                                                                                        Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Warren Pumps, Inc. Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings Pursuant To Ccp Section 438(b) Is Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party.
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Lance Wilson In Support Of Defendant Dover Resources Inc.???s Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings [ccp ??437c] (transaction Id # 13190550) Filed By Defendant Dover Resources
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 282 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 Notice Of Motion And Defendant Dover Resources Inc.???s Motion For Jud
                                                                                                                                            Motion Defendant Dover Resources Inc.???s Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings Pursuant To Ccp Section 438(b); Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support; Declaration Of Lance Wilson In Support [ccp ??437c], Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 13190550) Filed By Defendant Dover Resources Hearing Set For Jan-10-2007 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 281 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                              Declaration Of Lance Wilson In Support Of Defendant Warren Pumps Inc.???s Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings [ccp ??437c] (transaction Id # 13190402) Filed By Defendant Viking Pump, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 Notice Of Motion And Defendant Warren Pumps Inc.???s Motion For Judgme
                                                                                                                                                Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings Pursuant To Ccp Section 438(b); Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support; Declaration Of Lance Wilson In Support [ccp ??437c], Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities (transaction Id # 13190402) Filed By Defendant Warren Pumps, Inc. Hearing Set For Jan-10-2007 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 279 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Lance Wilson In Support Of Defendant Warren Pumps Inc.s Motion For Summary Judgment Or In The Alternative Summary Adjudication Of Issues [ccp ??437c] (transaction Id # 13185918) Filed By Defendant Warren Pumps, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Defendant Warren Pu
                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum Of Points And Authorities (transaction Id # 13185918) Filed By Defendant Warren Pumps, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 Separate Statement In Support Of Defendant Warren Pumps, Inc.???s Moti
                                                                                                                                                      Separate Statement Of Facts (transaction Id # 13185918) Filed By Defendant Warren Pumps, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 276 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: 12/13/2006 Defendant Warren Pumps, Inc.???s Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summa
                                                                                                                                                        Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 13185918) Filed By Defendant Warren Pumps, Inc. Hearing Set For Mar-02-2007 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 275 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: 12/8/2006 Dismissal Request
                                                                                                                                                          Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 13143270) As To Defendant Nash Engineering Company
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 274 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: 11/17/2006 Dismissal As To Defendant Aurora Pump
                                                                                                                                                            Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 12951589) As To Defendant Aurora Company
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 11/16/2006, Entered: 11/16/2006 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                              Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 12936039) As To Defendant Carrier Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 272 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 12903057) As To Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 271 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 Tyco International (us) Inc.s Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof O
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 12797021) Filed By Defendant Tyco International (u.s.) Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 270 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 12688045) As To Defendant Viking Pump, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 269 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                      Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 12681481) As To Defendant Tyco International (u.s.) Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 268 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: 10/10/2006 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 12580109) As To Defendant Spx Corporation Solely As It Relates To Allegations Concerning Copes-vulcan, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 267 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                          Removed From Asbestos Case Management Conference Calendar On Aug-17-2006. Assigned To Dept. 206 On Apr-30-2007 At 11:15 Am For Trial. Assigned For Mandatory Settlement In Dept. 304 On Apr-20-2007 At 9:30 Am. Brayton Group 395, Wd/meso.
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 266 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                            Request To Enter Default Filed/default Entered ( Placed In Pick-up Box ) As To Defendant Walter Kidde & Company,inc.
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 265 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                              Statement Of Damages Filed By Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel As To Defendant Walter Kidde & Company,inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 264 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                Summons On Complaint Statement Of Damages, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Joel Panzer, As Wrongful Death Heir, And As Succesor-in-interest To Samuel Panzer, Deceased Don Panzer, As Legal Heir Of Samuel Panzer, Deceased Served Mar-27-2006, Personal Service On Defendant Walter Kidde & Company,inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 263 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: 7/11/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                  Original Summons To The 2nd Amended Complaint Returned ( 12/6/05 ) Filed By Plaintiff Joel Panzer, As Wrongful Death Heir, And As Succesor-in-interest To Samuel Panzer, Deceased Don Panzer, As Legal Heir Of Samuel Panzer, Deceased
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: 6/27/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To 2nd Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Avalon Systems, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To 2nd Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Gatke Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 260 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: 6/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 259 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                          Added To Calendar For Asbestos Status Calendar Hearing Set For Aug-17-2006 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 206
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 258 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Asbestos Motion Calendar On May-25-2006 In 206 - Court Granted Plaintiffs' Motion For Order Adding Case To August 17, 2006 Status Conference. Order Signed. Judge David L. Ballati; Clerk: Linda Espy/ Jhulie Roque; Reporter: Susan Lee Csr #4280 (206)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 257 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Adding Case To August 17, 2006 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 256 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc.'s Motion For Order To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint On The Grounds Of Forum Non Conveniens, Or In The Alternative, Motion For Order To Stay Pltfs' Complaint On The Grounds Of Forum Non Conveniens, Off Calendar Per May 4, 2006 Dismissal. Judge: Ronald E. Quidachay. Reporter: Beldon Yee, Csr #2647
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 255 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dismissal With Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint As To Defendant Viacom, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 254 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mini-minutes For May-19-2006 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 253 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Substitution Of Attorney: Cunningham, James Patrick Substituted For Dumont, Richard Dana As Attorney For Warren Pumps, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 252 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint With A Mutual Waiver Of Costs. As To Defendant Bear Automotive Service Equipment Company Allen Test Products
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 251 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Conditional Non-opposition To Pltfs' Motion For Order Adding Case To August 17, 2006 Status Conference Filed By Defendant Acf Industries,llc Gardner-denver Mining & Const. Division
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 250 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 249 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint As To Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 248 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Association Of Attorneys: Cunningham, James Patrick Added As Attorney For Warren Pumps, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 247 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint As To Defendant Pneumo Abex, Llc Successor-in-interest To Abex Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 246 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Adding Case To August 17, 2006 Status Conference Filed By Plaintiff Joel Panzer, As Wrongful Death Heir, And As Succesor-in-interest To Samuel Panzer, Deceased Don Panzer, As Legal Heir Of Samuel Panzer, Deceased Hearing Set For May-25-2006 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 245 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Singer Sewing Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To 2nd Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Pneumo Abex, Llc Successor-in-interest To Abex Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 243 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection To Hearing By Commissioner/pro Tem Acting As Judge Filed By Defendant Pneumo Abex, Llc Successor-in-interest To Abex Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 242 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection To Stipulation Of Hearing By Commissioner Everett A. Hewlett Filed By Defendant Pneumo Abex, Llc Successor-in-interest To Abex Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 241 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order To Dismiss Pltfs' Complaint On The Grounds Of Forum Non Conveniens, Or In The Alternative, Motion For Order To Stay Pltfs' Complaint On The Gorunds Of Form Non Conveniens Filed By Defendant Gardner Denver, Inc. Hearing Set For May-19-2006 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 240 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Demand For Jury Trial Filed By Defendant Crane Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 239 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Answer To 2nd Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To 2nd Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Crane Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To 2nd Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Crane Environmental, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 237 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Demand For Jury Filed By Defendant Crane Environmental, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 236 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Demand For Jury Trial Filed By Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To 2nd Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Slakey Brothers, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 234 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To 2nd Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 233 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Jury Fees Of 150.00 For Transaction W1904806j016 Transferred Into Jplus
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 232 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint With A Mutual Waiver Of Costs As To Defendant Singer Sewing Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 231 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Demand For Jury Filed By Defendant Aurora Pump Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To 2nd Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Aurora Pump Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 229 Filed: 4/3/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Substitution Of Attorney: Gill, Raymond Lawrence Substituted For Jackson, Gabriel Anne As Attorney For Crane Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 228 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: 3/29/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To 2nd Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant General Motors Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 227 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Substitution Of Attorney: Hartwell Mortimer H Substituted For Haney, Jeffrey Nowlin As Attorney For Yarway Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 226 Filed: 3/21/2006, Entered: 3/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Substitution Of Attorney: Keele, Christopher A. Substituted For Beers, David Booth As Attorney For Reliance Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 225 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Alstom Power Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 224 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Dismissal With Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint As To Defendant Alstom Power Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 223 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dismissal With Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint As To Defendant J.t. Thorpe & Son, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 222 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Randall K Bernard
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 221 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Mccall, Michael T
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 220 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 2nd Amended Complaint As To Defendant Eaton Hydraulics, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 1/6/2006, Entered: 1/6/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To 2nd Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Tyco International (u.s.) Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 218 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Substitution Of Attorney: Randall K Bernard Substituted For Sinunu, James Najeeb As Attorney For Asbestos Corporation Ltd
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To 2nd Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Singer Sewing Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 216 Filed: 12/15/2005, Entered: 12/15/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To 2nd Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Pacific Marine Schwabacher, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 215 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Joel Panzer Under Ccp 377.32 Filed By Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel Joel Panzer, As Wrongful Death Heir, And As Succesor-in-interest To Samuel Panzer, Deceased Don Panzer, As Legal Heir Of Samuel Panzer, Deceased
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 214 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Appointing Joel Panzer As Successor-in-interest To, And Substitute Successor-in-interest For, Deceased Plaintiff And Granting Leave To File Second Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 213 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff Samuel Panzer Motion To Appoint Joel Apnzer As Successor-in-interest To, And Substitite Successor-in-interest For, Deceased Plntf And For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint. No Argument On This Matter Counsel For Opposing Party Agreed To The Tentative Ruling Hence, Tentative Ruling.grant-no Opposition Filed. Order Signed In Open Court.(302/req/ju)beldon Yee # 2647
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 212 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        2nd Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Joel Panzer, As Wrongful Death Heir, And As Succesor-in-interest To Samuel Panzer, Deceased Don Panzer, As Legal Heir Of Samuel Panzer, Deceased As To Defendant Asbestos Defendants (b P) As Reflected On Exhibits B, B-1, C, H, I Does 1-8500
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 211 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mini-minutes For Dec-06-2005 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 210 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mini-minutes For Nov-08-2005 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 209 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Law And Motion 302, Defendant Superior-lidgerwood-mundy Corporation's Motion To Quash Service Of Summons. Ruling: Counsel Contacted The Law Firm And Represented To The Court That Plaintiff Has Passed Away; Counsel Had No Authority From Plaintiff To Stay The Matter. The Court Adopts Its Tentative Ruling -- Grant-no Opposition Filed By Stipulated Deadline.302/req). Prevailing Party To Prepare Order. Hon. Ronald E. Quidachay. Reporter: Beldon Yee, Csr #2647
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 208 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Joel Panzer Filed By Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 207 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion To Appoint Joel Apnzer As Successor-in-interest To, And Substitite Successor-in-interest For, Deceased Plntf And For Leave To File Second Amended Complaint, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel Hearing Set For Dec-06-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 206 Filed: 10/24/2005, Entered: 10/24/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint As To Deft Idex Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 205 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: 9/28/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Plaintiff's Request For Continuance Of Specially Appearing Defendant Superior-lidgerwood-mundy Corp.'s Motion To Quash Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 204 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal With Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint As To Defendant Foster Wheeler Llc (survivor To A Merger With Foster Wheeler Corporation)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005 Unknown document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request For Default Rejected, Placed In Pickup Box, As To Defendant Crane Environmental, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 202 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Returned Filed By Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 201 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/9/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Removed From Asbestos Status Conference Calendar On Oct-20-2005. Plaintiff Passed Away. (206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 200 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/9/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Master Calendar Motion Calendar On Sep-20-2005 In Dept. 206, Plaintiff's Motion For Preferential Setting Off Calendar Per Moving Party - Plaintiff Passed Away. (206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 199 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition To Motion For An Order Granting Preference In Setting Case For Trial Filed By Defendant General Motors Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 198 Filed: 9/1/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint As To Defendant Superior-lidgerwood-mundy Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 197 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Law And Motion, 302, Defendant General Motors Corp., Demurrer. Matter Taken Off Calendar Per Moving Party. Judge: Ronald E. Quidachay; Reporter: Diana Chen #11312
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 196 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/30/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mini-minutes For Aug-30-2005 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 195 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Acf Industries,llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 194 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Conditional Non-opposition To Pltf's Motion To Specially Set Trial Date Filed By Defendant Ingersoll-rand Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 193 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Conditional Non-opposition To Pltf's Motion To Specially Set Trial Date Filed By Defendant The Nash Engineering Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 8/26/2005, Entered: 8/26/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Reliance Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Schutte & Koerting, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 190 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion For Preference / Preferential Setting, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Case For Trial,and Extending Discovery Cutoff Date Filed By Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel Hearing Set For Sep-20-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Crane Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 188 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Objection To Hearing By Commissioner/pro Tem Acting As Judge Filed By Defendant Pacific Marine Schwabacher, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 187 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Pacific Marine Schwabacher, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 186 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection To Hearing By Commissioner/pro Tem Acting As Judge Filed By Defendant Sterling Fluid Systems (usa), Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Sterling Fluid Systems (usa), Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 184 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection To Hearing By Commissioner/pro Tem Acting As Judge Filed By Defendant Crane Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 183 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Demand For Trial By Jury And Estimate Of Length Of Trial 8 Weeks Filed By Defendant Crane Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 182 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply To Plaintiff's Opposition To General Motors Corporation's Demurrer Filed By Defendant General Motors Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 181 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition To Demurrer; Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Cal-val Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 179 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Continued From Asbestos Status Conference Calendar On Aug-18-2005 To Asbestos Case Management Conference Calendar On Oct-20-2005 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 206.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 178 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Law And Motion 302, Defendant Superior-lidgerwood-mundy Corp., Motion To Quash Service Of Summons Continued From Aug-18-2005 To Law And Motion At Nov-08-2005, 9:30 Am In Dept. 302, Supplemental Opposition Due 10-27-05, Supplemental Reply To 11-3-05. Judge: Ronald E. Quidachay. Reporter: Beldon Yee, Csr #2647
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 177 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Pos Via Hand Delivery Of Pltf's Opposition To Deft General Motors Corporation's Demurrer; Declaration Of Oren P. Noah Filed By Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 176 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mini-minutes For Aug-18-2005 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 175 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Viking Pump, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 174 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection To Hearing By Commissioner/pro Tem Acting As Judge Filed By Defendant Viking Pump, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 173 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Demand For Jury Trial And Estimate Of Length Of Trial Filed By Defendant Viking Pump, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 172 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Demand For Jury Trial Filed By Defendant The Nash Engineering Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 171 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/16/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant The Nash Engineering Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 170 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: 8/12/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Personal Service Request For Continuance Of Uperior-lidgerwood-mundy Corporation's Motion To Quash Summons; Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 169 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposition To Plaintiff's Request For Continuance Of Superior -lidgerwood-mundy Corp's Motion To Quash Service Of Summons Filed By Defendant Superior-lidgerwood-mundy Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Daimlerchrysler Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Tyco International (u.s.) Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Copeland Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 165 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection To Hearing By Commissioner/pro Tem Acting As Judge For Trial Filed By Defendant Dover Resources
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 164 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Demand For Jury Trial Filed By Defendant Dover Resources
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 163 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Dover Resources
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Alstom Power Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 161 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request For Continuance Of Deft Superior-lidgerwood's Mtn To Quash Summons Filed By Pltf
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 160 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 Unknown document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request For Default Rejected, Placed In Pickup Box, As To Defendant Superior-lidgerwood-mundy Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Yarway Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 158 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Alstom Power Inc. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 20.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 157 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Dravo Constructors,inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 156 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Demurrer To Complaint; Request For Judicial Notice Filed By Defendant General Motors Corporation Hearing Set For Aug-30-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 155 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection To Stip Of Hearing By Commissioner Filed By Defendant Dravo Constructors,inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 154 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant York International Corporation Which Will Do Business In California As York Heating And Air Conditioning
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 153 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 152 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: 7/21/2005 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amendment To 1st Amended Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 23 To Be Reliance Electric Company Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 24 To Be Acf Industries,llc Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 25 To Be Pacific Marine Schwabacher,incorporated Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 26 To Be Walter Kidde & Company,inc. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 27 To Be Aurora Pump Division Of General Signal Corporation Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 28 To Be Electrical Insulation Suppliers Inc. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 29 To Be Gardner-denver Mining & Const. Division
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 151 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mtn To Quash Service Of Summons Filed By Defendant Superior-lidgerwood-mundy Corporation Hearing Set For Aug-18-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 150 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint With A Mutual Waiver Of Costs As To Defendant York International Corporation Which Will Do Business In California As York Heating And Air Conditioning
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 149 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued To Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        1st Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel As To Defendant Asbestos Defendants (b/p)as Reflected On Exhibits B, C, H, I
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 147 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Leave To File First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 146 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff Samuel Panzer; Motion For Order Granting Leave To File First Amended Complaint. No Appearances On This Matter. The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling- Grant-no Opposition Filed Prevailing Party To Prepare Order. (302/req)beldon Yee # 2647
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 145 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/16/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mini-minutes For Jun-16-2005 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 144 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Granting Leave To File First Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel Hearing Set For Jun-16-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 143 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Thomas Dee Engineering Co
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 142 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defts' Notice Of Filing Of Chapter 11 Petition And Imposition Of Automatic Stay Filed By Defendant Lac D'amiante Du Quebec, Ltee
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Spx Corporation Solely As It Relates To Allegations Concerning Copes-vulcan, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 140 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Substitution Of Attorney: Mcneil, Constance Substituted For Jackson, Gabriel A. As Attorney For Spx Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 139 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Asbestos Expedited Summary Judgment Calendar On Apr-15-2005 In Dept. 608, Motion For Summary Judgment By Fmc Corporation - Turbo Pump Operation Off Calendar By The Moving Party. (not Reported)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 138 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant J.t. Thorpe & Son, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 137 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: 3/30/2005 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 21 To Be Superior-lidgerwood-mundy Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 136 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Spx Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 135 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection To Hearing By Commissioner/pro Tem Acting As Judge Filed By Defendant Spx Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 134 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Demand For Jury And Estimate Of Length Of Trial Filed By Defendant Spx Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 133 Filed: 3/24/2005, Entered: 3/24/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dismissal Without Prejudice Complaint. As To Defendant Fmc Corporation - Turbo Pump Operation Erroneously Named Herein As Fmc Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 132 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: 3/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Objections To Pltf's Ccp 998 Offer To Compromise Filed By Defendant York International Corporation Which Will Do Business In California As York Heating And Air Conditioning
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 131 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Asbestos Expedited Summary Judgment Calendar On Apr-15-2005 In Dept. 608, Motion For Summary Judgment Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party Asbestos Corporation Limited.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 130 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 20 And 1001 To Be J.t. Thorpe & Son, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 129 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Demand For Jury Trial Filed By Defendant Ingersoll-rand Company As To Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Ingersoll-rand Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 127 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc.'s Motion To Sever This Case From Brayton Group 312
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 126 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Removed From Asbestos Mandatory Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Apr-15-2005 - Case Set For A Status Conference Per Master Calendar Motion 2/10/05. (d206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 125 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Removed From Asbestos Master Jury Calendar On Apr-25-2005. Assigned To Dept. 206 On Aug-18-2005 At 1:30 Pm For Case Management Conference.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 124 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Asbestos Motion Calendar On Feb-10-2005 In Dept. 206, Defendant Crane Co. And Warren Pumps, Inc.'s Joinders' Motion To Sever This Case From Brayton Group 312 Or/to Continue The Trial Is Granted With Modification. Hon. Robert Dondero; Clerks: D. Hakewill/d. Okazaki Reporter: Noreen Ikeuye (206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 123 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Asbestos Motion Calendar On Feb-10-2005 In Dept. 206, Added To Asbestos Motion Calendar For Singer Sewing Company's Joinder In Motion To Sever This Case From Brayton Group 312, Or In The Alternative, To Continue Trial Date Is Granted With Modification. Hon. Robert Dondero; Clerks: D. Hakewill/d. Okazaki Reporter: Noreen Ikeuye (206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 122 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Asbestos Motion Calendar On Feb-10-2005 In Dept. 206, Defendant York International Corporation's Motion To Sever/vacate The Trial Date Is Granted With Modification. See Disposition The Same Day. Hon. Robert Dondero; Clerks: D. Hakewill/d. Okazaki Reporter: Noreen Ikeuye (206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 121 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Asbestos Motion Calendar On Feb-10-2005 In Dept. 206, Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc.'s Motion To Sever This Case From Brayton Group 312,or In The Alternative,to Continue Trial Date Is Granted With Modification. See Disposition The Same Day. Hon. Robert Dondero; Clerks: D. Hakewill/d. Okazaki Reporter: Noreen Ikeuye (206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 120 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Asbestos Motion Calendar On Feb-10-2005 In Dept. 206, Fmc Corporation And Turbo Pump Operation's Motion To Sever This Case From Brayton Group 312 Or To Continue Trial Is Granted With Modification. The Case Is Severed From Brayton Group 312 And Set For An Asbestos Status Conference On 8/18/05 @ 1:30pm In Dept. 206 As To All Defendants. Order Signed. Hon. Robert Dondero; Clerks: D. Hakewill/d. Okazaki Reporter: Noreen Ikeuye (206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 119 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Demand For Jury Filed By Defendant Buffalo Pumps, Inc. As To Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 118 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection To Hearing By Commissioner/pro Tem Acting As Judge Filed By Defendant Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 117 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 116 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joinders' Motion To Sever This Case From Brayton Groujp 312 Or/to Continue The Trial Filed By Defendant Warren Pumps, Inc. Crane Co. Hearing Set For Feb-10-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 115 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Asbestos Corporation Ltd Hearing Set For Apr-15-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 608
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 114 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service By Mail Of Joinder In Deft's Mtn To Sever This Case From Brayton Group 312 Filed By Defendant Fmc Corporation - Turbo Pump Operation Erroneously Named Herein As Fmc Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 113 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration Of Dornine R. Kohn In Support Of Deft's Joinder In Deft's Motion To Sever This Case From Brayton Group 312, Or In The Alternative, To Continue Trial Date; Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Singer Sewing Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 112 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Added To Asbestos Motion Calendar For Joinder In Motion To Sever This Case From Brayton Group 312, Or In The Alternative, To Continie Trial Date Filed By Defendant Singer Sewing Company Hearing Set For Feb-10-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 111 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Joinder In Motion To Sever This Case From Brayton Group 312, Or In The Alternative, To Continue Trial Date Filed By Defendant Singer Sewing Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 110 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service Of Of Order Shortening Time Re Mtn To Sever & Continue Trial Filed By Defendant Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc. Served Jan-27-2005, Fax Or Facsimile On Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 109 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion To Sever/vacate The Trial Date Filed By Defendant York International Corporation Which Will Do Business In California As York Heating And Air Conditioning Hearing Set For Feb-10-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 108 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Motion And Motion To Sever This Case From Brayton Group 312,or In The Alternative,to Continue Trial Date Filed By Defendant Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc. Hearing Set For Feb-10-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Shortening Time Re: Motion To Sever And Continue Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 106 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion To Sever This Case From Brayton Group 312 Or To Continue Trial Filed By Defendant Fmc Corporation - Turbo Pump Operation Erroneously Named Herein As Fmc Corporation Hearing Set For Feb-10-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 105 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time For Notice And Hearing Of Motion To Sever Case From Brayton Group 312or To Continue Trial, Declarations, Points And Authorities Filed By Defendant Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 104 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Substitution Of Attorney: Ryan, Robert Joseph Substituted For Torres, Julie Ann As Attorney For Foster Wheeler L.l.c.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 103 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Fmc Corporation - Turbo Pump Operation Erroneously Named Herein As Fmc Corporation Hearing Set For Apr-15-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 608
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 102 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Warren Pumps, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 101 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Demand For Jury ; 8 Weeks Filed By Defendant Warren Pumps, Inc. As To Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 100 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Objection To Hearing By Commissioner/pro Tem Acting As Judge Filed By Defendant Warren Pumps, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 99 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declination Of Stipulation For Commissioner At Trial Filed By Defendant York International Corporation Which Will Do Business In California As York Heating And Air Conditioning
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 98 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant York International Corporation Which Will Do Business In California As York Heating And Air Conditioning
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 97 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Crane Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 96 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection To Hearing By Commissioner/pro Tem Acting As Judge Filed By Defendant Crane Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 95 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Demand For Jury Filed By Defendant Crane Co. As To Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 94 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 93 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection To Court Commissioner Acting As Judge Pro Tempore At Trial Filed By Defendant Viacom, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 92 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Demand For Jury Filed By Defendant Viacom, Inc. As To Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: 12/21/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Viacom, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Carrier Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 89 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection To Stipulation Of Hearing By Court Commissioner Filed By Defendant Fmc Corporation - Turbo Pump Operation Erroneously Named Herein As Fmc Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Fmc Corporation - Turbo Pump Operation Erroneously Named Herein As Fmc Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 87 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Singer Sewing Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: 12/14/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant General Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 17 To Be Singer Sewing Company Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 18 To Be Carrier Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Dec-01-2004 Vacated. Set For Case Managment Conf On 4/21/05
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 16 To Be Spx Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/17/2004, Entered: 11/17/2004 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 2 To Be York International Corporation Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 3 To Be Warren Pumps, Inc. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 4 To Be Wenco Pumps Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 5 To Be Fmc Corporation Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 6 To Be Ingersoll-rand Company Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 7 To Be Buffalo Pumps, Inc. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 8 To Be Crane Co. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 9 To Be The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 10 To Be Carrier Corporation Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 11 To Be Superior-lidgerwood-mundy Corporation Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 12 To Be Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 13 To Be Durabla Manufacturing Company, Inc. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 14 To Be Spx Corp. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 15 To Be Viacom, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 81 Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004 Notice Of Continued Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Judge Chaitin, Reptr: B. Fields, Clerk: J. Willis-mcghee, Dept #220; All Counsel Present; Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Nov-03-2004 Continued To Dec-01-2004 At 1:30 Pm In 220
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 80 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/21/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 79 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/21/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Removed From Asbestos Case Management Conference Calendar On Oct-21-2004. Assigned To Dept. 206 On Apr-25-2005 At 11:15 Am For Trial. Assigned For Mandatory Settlement In Dept. 304 On Apr-15-2005 At 9:30 Am. All Expedited Summary Judgment Motions Will Be Heard At That Time. Brayton Group 312 Liv/meso
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 78 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant Hopeman Brothers
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 77 Filed: 10/13/2004, Entered: 10/13/2004 Notice Of Continued Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Oct-13-2004 Continued To Nov-03-2004 At 1:30 Pm In 220
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Allis-chalmers Corporation Product Liability Trust A Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant I.m.o. Industries, Inc Formerly Known As Delaval Steam Turbine, Only.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 74 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Notice Of Continued Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Oct-06-2004 Continued To Oct-13-2004 At 1:30 Pm In 220
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Thomas Dee Engineering Co
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 72 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Square D Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004 Notice Of Continued Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Sep-08-2004 Continued To Oct-06-2004 At 1:30 Pm In 220
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Removed From Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Sep-07-2004 - Matter Set For Asbestos Settlement Conference In Dept. 220 For 9/8/04 At 1:30 P.m. Pref. Ccp 36(d), Last Day 10/15/04 (brayton). Matter To Remain In Dept. 220 Until All Settlement Discussions Have Been Exhausted. Hon. Robert Dondero; Clerks: V. Mu/a. Huie Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce, #3321 (206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Sep-08-2004 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 220 From 9/7/04 Trial Calendar. Pref. Ccp 36(d), Last Day 10/15/04 (brayton). Matter To Remain In Dept. 220 Until All Settlement Discussions Have Been Exhausted. Hon. Robert Dondero; Clerks: V. Mu/a. Huie Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce, #3321 (206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/1/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant White Consolidated Industries, Inc. Only. As To Defendant White Consolidated Industries Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Asbestos Expedited Summary Judgment Calendar On Aug-27-2004 In Dept. 608, Motion For Summary Judgment Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party Thoams Dee Engineering Company.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/27/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Emerson
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/27/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Asbestos Mandatory Settlement Conference Held On Aug-27-2004 In Dept. 304 - This Case Did Not Settle. Judge Richard Kramer, Clerk Andrea Carney, Not Reported
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/27/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint Each Party To Bear Its Own Costs As To Defendant Square D Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of And Index To Motions In Limine Filed By Defendant Foster Wheeler L.l.c.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 8/24/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's Designation Of Motions In Limine; Supplemental Trial Briefs; Opposition To Defendants' Motions In Limine Or Briefs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Emerson Motion For Summary Judgment, Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party. Hon. Paul H. Alvarado. Reporter: Robert Balian, Csr #5220
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mini-minutes For Aug-23-2004 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: 8/20/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Emerson Electric Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 8/18/2004, Entered: 8/18/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Cutler-hammer Inc. Now Known As Eaton Electrical Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 8/17/2004, Entered: 8/17/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Case Status Report Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Cutler-hammer Inc. Motion For Summary Judgment, Set For 08-23-04, Is Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Added To Calendar For Asbestos Status Conference As To Asbestos Corporation Limited Only Hearing Set For Oct-21-2004 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 206
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Granting Defendant Asbestos Corporation Limited's Motion To Sever The Case Against Acl From The Current Action
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Asbestos Motion Calendar On Aug-10-2004 In Dept. 206, Defendant Asbestos Corporation's Motion To Vacate Trial Date Or To Sever Case Against Asbestos Corp From Current Action Is Granted. The Case Is Severed As To Asbestos Corporation Limited Only And Set For An Asbestos Status Conference On 10/21/04 @ 1:30pm In Dept. 206. The Trial Date Of 9/7/04 And Settlement Conference Of 8/27/04 Remain As To The Rest Of The Case. Order Signed. Judge Donna Hitchens, Clerk: Dianne Boffi, Reporter: Ann Mendoza.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Thorpe Insulation Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Dismissal Without Prejudice Compalint As Ot Defendant Cutler-hammer, Inc. Only Iwth A Mutual Waiver Of Costs.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Jury Fees, Tran # W1904806j016, Tag # 009868, Receipt Number 023334, Deposited By Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 8/5/2004, Entered: 8/5/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Emerson Hearing Set For Aug-23-2004 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/3/2004, Entered: 8/3/2004 Proof Of Service By Mail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service By Mail An Fax On Aug 03, 04 Of Conditional Opposition Of Motion To Vacate Trial Date **e-filing, Fid #3991604** Filed By Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Conditional Non Opposition To Defendant Asbestos Corporation Limited's Motion To Vacate Trial Date;sever Acl From Current Action Filed By Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion For Summary Judgment ,intent To Request Expedited Filed By Defendant Thomas Dee Engineering Co Hearing Set For Aug-27-2004 At 09:30 Am In Dept 608
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 7/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint Only, With A Mutual Waiver Of Costs. As To Defendant Quintec Industries, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Association Of Attorneys: Beers, David Booth Added As Attorney For Rockwell Automation, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Parker Hannifin Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration Of Elisabeth H. Baum In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Cutler-hammer Inc. Now Known As Eaton Electrical Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Cutler-hammer Inc. Now Known As Eaton Electrical Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 7/20/2004, Entered: 7/20/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Cutler-hammer Inc. Now Known As Eaton Electrical Inc. Hearing Set For Aug-23-2004 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion To Vacate Trial Date Or To Sever Case Against Acl From Current Action; Declaration Filed By Defendant Asbestos Corporation Ltd Hearing Set For Aug-10-2004 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Deft Oceanic Steamship Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Motion For Preference And Extending Discovery Cut-off
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge John Munter, Clerk: Dianne Boffi, Reporter: Rhonda Aquilina. Asbestos Motion Calendar On Jun-17-2004 In Dept. 206, Plaintiff Samuel Panzer's Motion For Order Granting Preference Trial Setting Pursuant To Ccp 36(d) Is Granted. The 4/21/05 Case Management Conference Is Vacated. The Case Is Set For Trial On 9/7/04 @ 11:15am In Dept. 206; Settlement Conference Set For 8/27/04 @ 9:30am In Dept. 304. Parties Stipulate To G.o. 140 Re: Motions For Summary Judgment. Discovery Open Until The Case Is Assigned Out To Trial. Written Order Pending.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/17/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge John Munter, Clerk: Dianne Boffi, Reporter: Rhonda Aquilina. Removed From Asbestos Case Management Conference Calendar On Apr-21-2005. Assigned To Dept. 206 On Sep-07-2004 At 11:15 Am For Trial. Assigned For Mandatory Settlement In Dept. 304 On Aug-27-2004 At 9:30 Am. All Expedited Summary Judgment Motions Will Be Heard At That Time.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/15/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Conditional Non-oppos To Pltfs' Motion To Advance Filed By Defendant Cutler-hammer Inc. Now Known As Eaton Electrical Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/11/2004, Entered: 6/11/2004 Stip And Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulation And Order Re: Release Of Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Garlock Sealing Technologies. Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof Of Service Via Facsimile Of: Order Shortening Time Re: Motion For Preference; Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time To Notice Pltfs' Motion; And Supporting Documentation; Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Granting Preference In Case Setting For Trial And Extending Discovery Cut-off; And Supporting Documentation Filed By Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Shortening Time Re: Motion For Preference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Granting Preference In Setting Case For Trial And Extending Discovery Cutoff Filed By Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel Hearing Set For Jun-17-2004 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time To Notice Plaintiffs' Motion For Order Granting Preference In Setting Case For Trial And Extending Discovery Cutoff Filed By Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Service Filed By Plaintiff(s), Samuel Panzer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Service Filed By Plaintiff(s), Samuel Panzer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Quintec Industries, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Thomas Dee Engineering Co As To Cross Defendant Atlas Turner Inc Asarco Inc Asbestos Corp Ltd Bell Asbestos Mines Ltd
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Thomas Dee Engineering Co
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant White Consolidated Industries Inc As To Cross Defendant Atlas Turner Inc Asarco Inc Asbestos Corp Ltd Atlas Turner Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant White Consolidated Industries Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/24/2004, Entered: 5/24/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Allis-chalmers Corporation Product Liability Trust A Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Asbestos Corporation Ltd
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Owens-illinois, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Demand For Jury Filed By Defendant Parker Hannifin Corporation As To Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Parker Hannifin Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection To Hearing By Commissioner/pro Tem Acting As Judge Filed By Defendant Parker Hannifin Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Lac D'amiante Du Quebec, Ltee
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Asarco Incorporated
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Foster Wheeler L.l.c.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Demand For Trial By Jury And Estimate Of Length Of Trial Filed By Defendant Foster Wheeler L.l.c.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 5/6/2004, Entered: 5/6/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection To Stip Of Hearing By Commissioner Filed By Defendant Foster Wheeler L.l.c.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection To Judge Pro Tem And/or Commissioner Assignment Filed By Defendant Cutler-hammer Inc. Now Known As Eaton Electrical Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: 5/4/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Cutler-hammer Inc. Now Known As Eaton Electrical Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/3/2004, Entered: 5/3/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Emerson
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 4/27/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Shortening Time For Noticing & Taking Pltf's Videotaped Trial Preservation Testimony Filed By Pltf
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 4/27/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time For Noticing And Taking Plaintiff's Videotaped Trial Preservation Tetimony Filed By Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1 To Be Allis-chalmers
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Asbestos, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Panzer, Samuel As To Defendant Asbestos Defendants (b/p)as Reflected On Exhibits B, C, H, I Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Apr-21-2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 171 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?