Ana Paula Morales v. Frank Dunlevy Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 04 431879
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Morales, Ana Paula, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Abraham, Diane L.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Abraham, Diane L. +1 415 898 1555
v.
No Logo Dunlevy, Frank, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
No Logo Dunlevy, Susan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
Cause of Action Other Non Exempt Complaints
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 1/21/2005, Entered: 1/21/2005
Removed From Master Court Calendar Set For Jan-24-2005 - Dismissal Of Entire Action Filed.
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 11 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005
    Proof Of Service By Mail (of Request For Dismissal) Filed By Plaintiff Morales, Ana Paula
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Dismissal
      Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint And Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action
        Blank 9 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004
        Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Dunlevy, Frank Dunlevy, Susan Estimated Time For Trial: 1.0 Days
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/15/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
          Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Court Trial Set For Jan-24-2005 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Oct-01-2004 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
            Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004 Answer
            Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Dunlevy, Frank Dunlevy, Susan
              Blank 6 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004
              Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Morales, Ana Paula Served Jun-22-2004, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Dunlevy, Frank
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 5 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004
                Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Morales, Ana Paula Served Jun-22-2004, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Dunlevy, Susan
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 4 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: 7/9/2004
                  Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Morales, Ana Paula Served Jun-03-2004, Personal Service On Defendant Dunlevy, Frank Dunlevy, Susan
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 3 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004
                    Application For Waiver Of 985.(i) Crc Court Fees And Costs (confidential) Filed By Plaintiff Morales, Ana Paula Order Granting Waiver Of 985.(i) Crc Court Fees And Costs
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Notice To Plaintiff
                      Notice To Plaintiff
                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Complaint
                        Other Non Exempt Complaints, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Morales, Ana Paula As To Defendant Dunlevy, Frank Dunlevy, Susan Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Oct-01-2004 Proof Of Service Due On Aug-02-2004 Case Management Statement Due On Sep-16-2004

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 877 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?