Wuthrich, et al v. Brooks, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-01056-WYD-MJW
District Judge Wiley Y. Daniel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Andreas Wuthrich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Joseph Schendzielos +1 303 773 6600 +1 303 773 6605 denverdaniel@gmail.com
Space Vincent C. Todd +3 033 980 0922
No Logo Beverly Wuthrich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Joseph Schendzielos +1 303 773 6600 +1 303 773 6605 denverdaniel@gmail.com
Space Vincent C. Todd +3 033 980 0922

Toggle Switch Represented by coloradowrits.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey E. Veigel +1 303 986 3606 +1 303 980 7917 Jeffrey.Veigel@Coloradowrits.com
No Logo Raoul Wuthrich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Joseph Schendzielos +1 303 773 6600 +1 303 773 6605 denverdaniel@gmail.com
Space Vincent C. Todd +3 033 980 0922
No Logo Sabrina Wuthrich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Joseph Schendzielos +1 303 773 6600 +1 303 773 6605 denverdaniel@gmail.com
Space Vincent C. Todd +3 033 980 0922
No Logo Sophia Wuthrich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Joseph Schendzielos +1 303 773 6600 +1 303 773 6605 denverdaniel@gmail.com
Space Vincent C. Todd +3 033 980 0922
No Logo Tatania Wuthrich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Joseph Schendzielos +1 303 773 6600 +1 303 773 6605 denverdaniel@gmail.com
Space Vincent C. Todd +3 033 980 0922
v.
No Logo Chris Mount, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by lhdlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Jay Dawes +1 303 298 1601 +1 303 298 1627 sdawes@lhdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by popp-law.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Seth Popp +1 720 225 9135 +1 303 771 9135 brian.popp@popp-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Colorado

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Friedrick C. Haines +1 303 866 5240 +1 303 866 5443 fred.haines@state.co.us
No Logo David Jonsson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by esquirerealestate.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Clark Harkess +1 303 531 5380 +1 303 991 6240 steve@EsquireRealEstate.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Fowler, Schimberg & Flanagan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Peter Schimberg +1 303 366 6363 +1 303 298 8748 t_schimberg@fsf-law.com
Space Brian Edward Widmann +1 303 298 8603 +1 303 298 8748 b_widmann@fsf-law.com
No Logo Denver Post Corporation,, Defendant
Officially listed as "Denver Post Corporation, The"

Represented by Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP

No Logo Jerry Sandoval, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fowler, Schimberg & Flanagan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Peter Schimberg +1 303 366 6363 +1 303 298 8748 t_schimberg@fsf-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by lhdlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Jay Dawes +1 303 298 1601 +1 303 298 1627 sdawes@lhdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by popp-law.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Seth Popp +1 720 225 9135 +1 303 771 9135 brian.popp@popp-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Colorado

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Friedrick C. Haines +1 303 866 5240 +1 303 866 5443 fred.haines@state.co.us
No Logo Kieran Nicholson, Defendant

Represented by Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP

No Logo Mark, Arnold, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by esquirerealestate.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Clark Harkess +1 303 531 5380 +1 303 991 6240 steve@EsquireRealEstate.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Fowler, Schimberg & Flanagan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Peter Schimberg +1 303 366 6363 +1 303 298 8748 t_schimberg@fsf-law.com
Space Brian Edward Widmann +1 303 298 8603 +1 303 298 8748 b_widmann@fsf-law.com
No Logo Mike Guerra, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by esquirerealestate.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Clark Harkess +1 303 531 5380 +1 303 991 6240 steve@EsquireRealEstate.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Fowler, Schimberg & Flanagan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Peter Schimberg +1 303 366 6363 +1 303 298 8748 t_schimberg@fsf-law.com
Space Brian Edward Widmann +1 303 298 8603 +1 303 298 8748 b_widmann@fsf-law.com
No Logo Mike Harris, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by lhdlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Jay Dawes +1 303 298 1601 +1 303 298 1627 sdawes@lhdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by popp-law.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Seth Popp +1 720 225 9135 +1 303 771 9135 brian.popp@popp-law.com
No Logo Sergei Thomas, Defendant
No Logo Steve Davis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by esquirerealestate.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Clark Harkess +1 303 531 5380 +1 303 991 6240 steve@EsquireRealEstate.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Fowler, Schimberg & Flanagan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Peter Schimberg +1 303 366 6363 +1 303 298 8748 t_schimberg@fsf-law.com
Space Brian Edward Widmann +1 303 298 8603 +1 303 298 8748 b_widmann@fsf-law.com
No Logo LYON & LYON, Defendant
Officially listed as "William Thomas"

Toggle Switch Represented by esquirerealestate.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Clark Harkess +1 303 531 5380 +1 303 991 6240 steve@EsquireRealEstate.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Fowler, Schimberg & Flanagan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Peter Schimberg +1 303 366 6363 +1 303 298 8748 t_schimberg@fsf-law.com
Space Brian Edward Widmann +1 303 298 8603 +1 303 298 8748 b_widmann@fsf-law.com
Office Denver
Filed 5/23/2000
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Lack of Jurisdiction
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 3/18/2003
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 01-1279[], 03-1172[]
Def Custody Status
Flags SuppressAnsRpt, TERMED
  Entries (257) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 245 Filed: 9/18/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 USCA Mandate
MANDATE from the Court of Appeals; CA # 03-1172; Dt issued 9/12/03; ORDER filed 9/12/03 granting appellant's motion to dismiss and dismissing the appeal [236-1] (msn)
    LREF
    Blank 244 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/18/2003 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting motion to withdraw Michelle Carmody as one of the attorneys representing Dft Thomas [243-1] attorney Michelle Carton Carmody for Sergei Thomas (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/18/03 (erv)
      LREF
      Blank 243 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 8/14/2003, Terminated: 8/15/2003 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
      MOTION by defendant Sergei Thomas to withdraw Michelle Carmody as one of the attorneys representing Dft Thomas (erv)
        LREF
        Blank 242 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003 Notice of Change of Address
        NOTICE of Change of address of Faegre & Benson LLP attorneys for dfts Denver Post Inc, The, Kieran Nicholson (pap)
          LREF
          Blank 241 Filed: 5/7/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 Letter re Appeal
          LETTER (Re: [236-1] ) to USCA and all counsel advising that the record is now complete...TOF filed states a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. (msn)
            LREF
            Blank 240 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 Transcript Order Form
            NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by plaintiffs/appellants; TOF filed states...a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. re: appeal [236-1] (msn)
              LREF
              Blank 239 Filed: 4/23/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 USCA Case Number
              NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of assignment of Case No. [236-1] 03-1172 (msn)
                LREF
                Blank 238 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/24/2003 Costs Taxed
                Bill of COSTS taxed judgment [232-2] for Dfts' in the amount of $ 165.50 against Plas' (cc: all counsel) (erv)
                  LREF
                  Blank 235 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Costs Taxed
                  Bill of COSTS taxed judgment [232-2] for Dfts' in the amount of $ 1,149.45 against Plas' (cc: all counsel) (erv)
                    LREF
                    Blank 234 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Costs Taxed
                    Bill of COSTS taxed judgment [232-2] for defendant in the amount of $ 1,796.69 against Beverly Wuthrich, Tatania Wuthrich, Raoul Wuthrich, Sophia Wuthrich, Sabrina Wuthrich (cc: all counsel) (erv)
                      LREF
                      Blank 237 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 Stipulation
                      STIPULATION re: Award of Costs to State Dfts by plaintiff Beverly Wuthrich, plaintiff Andreas Wuthrich, plaintiff Tatania Wuthrich, plaintiff Raoul Wuthrich, plaintiff Sophia Wuthrich, plaintiff Sabrina Wuthrich, defendant Chris Mount, defendant Jerry Sandova, agree and stipulate that State Dfts shall be awarded costs related to the deposaition of Magistrate Marilyn Leonard in the amt of $165.50, Plas' and State Dfts stipulate that such amt shall be taxed as costs on the Bill of Costs filed by the state Dfts on 3/31/03 (erv)
                        LREF
                        Blank 236 Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003, Terminated: 9/18/2003 Notice of Appeal
                        NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiffs re: judgment [232-2], order [177-2] and order [101-1]; Notice of transcript order form due 5/1/03; Notice mailed to all counsel on 4/22/03 (msn)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 4/21/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003 USCA Appeal Fees
                          $100.00 fee and $5.00 fee paid. Receipt No 242880. re: appeal [236-1] (msn) Modified on 04/22/2003
                            LREF
                            Blank 233 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003 Certificate of Mailing/Service
                            CERTIFICATE OF MAILING regarding The Denver Post, Inc's Bill of Costs (erv)
                              LREF
                              Blank 232 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Judgment*Court Filing
                              JUDGMENT: by Clerk James R. Manspeaker Pursuant to and in accordance with the [231-3] ORDER filed 2/26/03 by the Honorable Wiley Y. Daniel, United States District Court Judge, and incorporated herein by reference as if fully set forth, it is ORDERED that Dist Atty Dfts dismissing case motion to dismiss Amended Complaint and in the Alternative for Sum Jgm , is GRANTED [149-1] all claims asserted against the Dist Atty Dfts are Dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay its own atty fees and costs, GRANTING motion for summary judgment filed by Dfts Brooks, Robirds, Black and Dan Harris filed 9/21/01, and all claims asserted against these Dfts are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay its own costs and Atty fees [150-1], GRANTING State Dfts Renewed motion for Sum Jgm on grounds of absolute Quasi-Judiciary Immunity and all claims asserted against State Officials, each party to pay their own costs and Atty Fees; It is Further ORDERED that Dft Thomas Acierno's Motion to Dismiss Pla's remaining claims from this action is GRANTED [191-1] Pursuant to and in accordance with the Order of Partial Dismissal filed 3/10/03 by the Honorable Wiley Y. Daniel, United States District Court Judge and incorporated herein by reference as if fully set forth, it is ORDERED that the Stipulated Motion for Dismissal is GRANTED, and the claims and causes of action asserted against Dfts Peter Boyles and Jacor Broadcasting, Inc., are Dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own costs and atty fees; Pursuant to and in accordance with the Order file 3/18/03, it is ORDERED that Pla Andreas Wuthrich's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, and all claims filed by Andreas Wuthrich are dismissed with prejudice. It is ORDERED that jgm is hereby entered in favor of Dfts the Denver Post, Kieran Nicholson and Dist Atty Sergi Thomas, and against Pla's Beverly Wuthrich, Tatania Wuthrich, Raoul Wuthrich, Sophia Wuthrich, and Sabrina Wuthrich, on Dfts The Denver Post, Kieran Nicholson's Motioin for Sum Jgm and Dft Dist Atty Sergi Thomas renewed motion to Dismiss Amd Cmp or in the alternative for Sum Jgm, it is ORDERED that Pla's Cmp and action are dismissed with prejudice. It is Further ORDERED that Dfts shall have their costs by the filing of the Bill of costs with the clerk of this Ct with 10 days of the entry of jgm (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/24/03 (erv)
                                LREF
                                Blank 231 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/20/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting pla's motion to dismiss all claims for relief against the two named Dfts with prejudice [228-1] dismissing party Jacor Broadcast CO party Peter Boyles granting motion for summary judgment [200-1], Dfts' req for sanctions is denied; in light of the fact that this order disposes of all remaining claims in this case; trial date vacated and trial prep conf vacated terminating case (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/20/03 (dlb)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 230 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting motion to dismiss all claims for relief against the two named Dfts with prejudice [228-1] dismissing party Jacor Broadcast CO, party Peter Boyles Each party to pay their oown costs and Atty Fees (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/12/03 (erv)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 229 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe; the final pretrial conference is VACATED ; pretrial conf VACATED 3/6/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date 3/7/03 (erv)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 228 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003, Terminated: 3/10/2003 Motion to Dismiss
                                      Stipulated MOTION by Pla's Beverly Wuthrich, Andreas Wuthrich, Tatania Wuthrich, Raoul Wuthrich, Sophia Wuthrich, Sabrina; Dfts' Peter Boyles, Jacor Broadcast CO to dismiss all claims for relief against the two named Dfts with prejudice (erv)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 227 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/5/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                        COURTROOM MINUTES of Hrg on Pending Motions by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel, GRANTING Dfts motion to exceed page limitation re: Brief in support of Motion for Sum Jgm [214-1], Ruling on Pla Raoul Wuthrich's motion to dismiss his remaining claims from this action [191-1] is deferred, GRANTING Dfts motion for summary judgment [200-1], GRANTING Dfts summary Motion for summary judgment [216-2] ; entry date : Court Reporter: Therese Lindblom (erv)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 226 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                                          NOTICE of Change of Phone Number of Daniel Schendzielos (erv)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 225 Filed: 1/8/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 Notice of Change of Address
                                            NOTICE of Change of address of Frank Kennedy (erv)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 224 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/8/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe ; pretrial conf Reset for 8:30 3/10/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/8/03 (erv)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 223 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel setting hearing on Dft Sergei Thomas' Renewed motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint [216-1] 3:30 3/4/03; It is ORDERED that Dft Sergei Thomas' Motion to dismiss shall be treated by the Ct as a motion for Sum Jgm; the parties are directed to D.C.COLOLCivR. 7.1 of the Colorado Local Rules of Practice relating to the filing of the response and reply brief to Dft Sergei Thomas' motion (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/27/02 (erv)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 222 Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: 12/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting Dfts motion for continuance of final PTC set 1/23/03, final trial preparation conference set 3/4/03 and trial set 3/17/03 [221-1] ; jury trial Reset for 9:00 8/18/03 ; Trial prep conference Reset for 4:30 8/7/03 A Hrg on pending motions is set for 3/4/03 at 3:30; The parties shall contact Magistrate Watanabe's chambers to rescfedule the Final Pre-Trial Conf (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/27/02 (erv)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 221 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/24/2002, Terminated: 12/26/2002 Motion to Continue
                                                    MOTION by dfts Denver Post Inc, Kieran Nicholson for continuance of final PTC set 1/23/03, final trial preparation conference set 3/4/03 and trial set 3/17/03 (gms)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 219 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Trial Exhibit
                                                      EXHIBITS by defendant Peter Boyles, defendant Jacor Broadcast CO to motion for summary judgment [218-1](Oversized) (erv)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 218 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                        MOTION by defendant Peter Boyles, defendant Jacor Broadcast CO for summary judgment (erv)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 217 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                          BRIEF by defendant Sergei Thomas in support of motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint [216-1], motion for summary judgment [216-2] (erv)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 216 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                            Renewed MOTION by defendant Sergei Thomas to dismiss the Amended Complaint , or in the Alternative for summary judgment (erv)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 215 Filed: 12/17/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                              ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Sergei Thomas by Michelle Carton Carmody (erv)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 220 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: 12/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel regarding Dfts Boyle's and Jacor's [218-1] motion for summary judgment is accepted for filing, the hrg set for 1/13/03 at 1:30 is RESET to 3/4/03 at 3:30(cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/20/02 (erv)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 213 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe granting Dfts the Denver Post Corporation and Kiernan Nicholson's motion for Discovery Order or protective order under FRCP 26(c)&(d) Prohibiting Pla from deposing Newsperson Dfts until after the Ct rules upon these Dfts' Motions for Sum Jgmmm or, in the Alternative, until Pla demonstrates that she can overcome these Dfts' Privilege under Colorado's Press Shield Statute [198-1] A protective Order is entered prohibiting the Pla from taking deposition of Kiernan Nicholson or the Rule 36(b)(6) witness designat5ed by Dft the Denver Post Corporation until further Order of the Ct. If the Pla prevails on the Dfts the Denver Post Corp and Kiernan Nicholson's Motion for Sum Jgm which is pending before Judge Daniel and which is set for hrg on 1/13/03, then this Ct would consider expanding the time to complete discovery as outlined in this motion. If Pla does not prevail, then the need for additional time to complete such discovery will be moot (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/9/02 (erv)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 212 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                    REPLY Brief in Support by Dfts' Kieran Nicholson, Denver Post Inc, The to Pla's response to Dfts' motion for Discovery Order or protective order under FRCP 26(c)&(d) Prohibiting Pla from deposing Newsperson Dfts until after the Ct rules upon Dfts' Motions for Sum Jgmmm or, in the Alternative, until Pla demonstrates that she can overcome these Dfts' under Colorado's Press Shield Statute [198-1] (erv)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 211 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                      REPLY Brief in Support by DFts' Denver Post Inc, The, Kieran Nicholson to Pla's response to DFts' motion for summary judgment [200-1] (erv)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 210 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition by Plas' to Dfts motion for Discovery Order or protective order under FRCP 26(c)&(d) Prohibiting Pla from deposing Newsperson Dfts until after the Ct rules upon Dfts' Motions for Sum Jgm or, in the Alternative, until Pla demonstrates that she can overcome these Dfts' under Colorado's Press Shield Statute [198-1] (erv)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 209 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                          RESPONSE in Oposition by Plas' to Dfts Denver Post and Kieran Nicholson's motion for summary judgment [200-1] (erv)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 208 Filed: 9/17/2002, Entered: 9/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting Pla's Second motion to extend time to Respond to Denver Post Dfts Motions for Sum Jgm and for Protective Order to and incl 9/17/02 [207-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/18/02 (erv)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 207 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: 9/17/2002, Terminated: 9/17/2002 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                              Second Unopposed MOTION by Plas' to extend time to Respond to Denver Post Dfts Motions for Sum Jgm and for Protective Order to and incl 9/17/02 (erv)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 206 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe; It is ORDERED that the final Pretrial Conf and PTO ddl is reset ; pto ddl set for 1/18/03 ; pretrial conf set for 9:00 1/23/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/28/02 (erv)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 205 Filed: 8/21/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                  NOTICE of Scheduling Conflict by Csl for the Dfts Sergei Thomas, Mike Harris, Cassandra Harris, David J. Thomas re: the Final Pretrial Conf now set for 2/25/03 at 9:00 (erv)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 204 Filed: 8/20/2002, Entered: 8/20/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe; due to a conflict on the court's calendar, the Final Pre-Trial Conf has been reset ; pretrial conf set for 9:00 2/25/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/20/02 (erv)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 203 Filed: 8/13/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel setting hearing on Pending motions for summary judgment [200-1] 1:30 1/13/03, and [198-1] motion for Discovery Order or protective order FRCP 26(c)&(d) Prohibiting Pla from deposing Newsperson Dfts until after the Ct rules upon these Dfts' Motions for Sum Jgm or, in the Alternative, until Pla demonstrates that she can overcome these Dfts' Privilege under Colorado's Press Shield Statute, and [191-1] motion to dismiss his remaining claims from this action Five Day jury trial set for 9:00 3/17/03 ; Trial prep conference set for 3:30 3/4/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/14/02 (erv)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 202 Filed: 8/13/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel referring to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe the Dfts the Denver Post and Kiernan Nicholson's motion for Discovery Order or protective order under FRCP 26(c)&(d) Prohibiting Pla from deposing Newsperson Dfts until after the Ct rules upon these Dfts' Motions for Sum Jgm or, in the Alternative, until Pla demonstrates that she can overcome these Dfts' Privilege under Colorado's Press Statute [198-1] (erv)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 201 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                          Memorandum BRIEF by Dfts Kieran Nicholson, Denver Post Inc, The in support of motion for summary judgment [200-1](Placed in exhibit room as oversized) (erv)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 200 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                            MOTION by Dfts Kieran Nicholson, Denver Post Inc, The for summary judgment (erv)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 199 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                              RESPONSE by Dfts Dave Brooks, William Robirds, Kelly Black, Robert Baker, Thomas Acierno, Dan Harris to Pla's motion to dismiss his remaining claims from this action [191-1] (erv)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 198 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002, Terminated: 10/8/2002 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                MOTION by Dfts' Kieran Nicholson, Denver Post Inc, The for Discovery Order or protective order under FRCP 26(c)&(d) Prohibiting Pla from deposing Newsperson Dfts until after the Ct rules upon these Dfts' Motions for Sum Jgmmm or, in the Alternative, until Pla demonstrates that she can overcome these Dfts' Privilege under Colorado's Press Shield Statute (erv)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 197 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/13/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Dfts Denver Post Inc, The, Kieran Nicholson to Pla's Andreas Wuthrich's motion to dismiss his remaining claims from this action [191-1] (erv)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 196 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/12/2002 Response to Motion
                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Dfts District Attorney David J. Thomas, Chief Deputy District Attoreny Laura Dunbar, Deputy Attorney Nancy Hooper, Mike Harris, Cassandra Harris, Deputy District Attorney Sergei Thomas to Pla's motion to dismiss his remaining claims from this action [191-1] (erv)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 195 Filed: 7/24/2002, Entered: 7/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe DENYING as MOOT Denver Post and Kiernan Nicholson's motion to compel Discovery from the Pla Andreas Wutrich [188-1] based upon Andreas Wuthrich's motion to Dismiss his remaining Claims from this action, which is pending before Judge Daniel. he Dfts are Granted leave to request sanctions against Pla Andreas Wuthrich in their response to Pla Andreas Wuthrich's Motion to Dismiss his remaining claims from this action (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/24/02 (erv)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 194 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: 7/23/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                        COURTROOM MINUTES of Status Conf by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe; It is ORDERED that the Deposition of Beverly Wuthrich shall be rest to 8/12/02 at 8:30 at Mr Todd's office. Beverly Wuthrich shall appear at that location on that date and time; entry date : 7/23/02 Court Reporter: MJW 2002-51 (erv)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 193 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/23/2002 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Change of Telephone and Facsimile Number of Steven Zansberg (erv)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 192 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/23/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel regarding Pla Andreas Wuthrich's [191-1] motion to dismiss his remaining claims from this action; The parties shall rsspond by 8/12/02 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/23/02 (erv)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 191 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: 7/23/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                              MOTION by plaintiff Andreas Wuthrich to dismiss his remaining claims from this action (erv)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 190 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Firm Name of Light, Harrington & Dawes, P.C (erv)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 189 Filed: 6/27/2002, Entered: 6/28/2002 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel referring to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe the Dfts Denver Post and Kiernan Nicholson motion to compel Discovery from the Pla Andreas Wutrich [188-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 188 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: 6/27/2002, Terminated: 7/24/2002 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                    MOTION by Dfts Denver Post Inc, The, Kieran Nicholson to compel Discovery from the Pla Andreas Wutrich (erv)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 187 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: 6/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe Re: the Deposition of Andreas Wuthrich and continuation of Status Conf; It is hereby ORDERED that the Deposition of the Pla Andreas Wuthrich, shall proceed on 7/22/02 at 8:30 at the office of Csl for the Dfts ; status conf set for 8:30 7/23/02 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date 6/27/02 (erv)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 186 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Amended MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe It is hereby ORDERED that a Status Conf is set ; status conf set for 8:30 7/23/02 (cc: all counsel) ; date : 6/26/02 (erv)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 185 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe ; status conf set for 8:30 6/23/02 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/25/02 (erv)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 184 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            COURTROOM MINUTES of Status Conf by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe ; status conf set for 8:30 7/23/02 ; status conf held 6/24/02 The Deposition of Pla Andreas Wuthrich shall take place in Denver, Co at Mr Kelly's office on 7/22/02 at 8:30. Dfts shall prepare a joint notice and order setting deposition. Mr Todd shall advise his client of the deposition date. A Further Status Conf has been set and Pla Andreas Wuthrich shall be present for that hrg ; entry date : 6/25/02 Court Reporter: MJW Civil Tape 2002-45 (erv)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 183 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, Pursuant to Scheduling Conf, it is Hereby ORDERED that ; status conf set for 8:30 6/24/02 ; pto ddl set for 2/14/03 pretrial conf set for 8:30 2/20/03 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/21/02 (erv)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 182 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/21/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe ; rule 16 conf held on 3/20/02 ; discovery ddl set ; disp mtn ddl set 12/20/02 ; pto ddl set for 2/14/03 ; entry date : 3/21/02 Court Reporter: MJW Civil Tape 2002-22 & 23 (erv)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 181 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe ; Discovery cutoff 11/20/02 ;dispositive motions due 12/20/02 ;status conference 8:30 6/24/02 ;pretrial conference set 8:30 2/20/03 (cc: all counsel) (erv)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 180 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: 3/7/2002 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Hrg on Pending Motions on 2/13/02 before Honorable Wiley Y. Daniel; United States District Court Judge ( pages: 1-71) Prepared By: Kara Spitler (certified copy) (erv)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 179 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                      MANDATE from the Court of Appeals; CA # 01-1279; Dt issued 3/6/02; dismissing the appeal [117-1] by granting appellants' Motion to Dismiss (former empl)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 178 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe ; rule 16 conference reset for 9:00 3/20/02 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/28/02 (erv)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 177 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting District Atty Dfts' motion to dismiss Amended Complaint and in the Alternative for Sum Jgm filed 9/21/01 [149-1] and all claims asserted against the Dist Attty Dfts are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own atty fees and costs, granting Dfts Brooks, Robirds, Black Baker and Dan Harris's motion for summary judgment filed 9/21/01 [150-1] and all claims against these Dfts are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay its own atty fees and costs. It is Further Ordered that State Dfts Renewed motion for sum jgm on grounds of absolute quasi-judicial immunity, qualified immunity of state officials,& on state law claim under the Colorado Govt immunity act (incorporating authority) filed 9/21/02 is Granted and all claims against these Dfts are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay its own atty fees and costs [143-1], It is Further ORDERED that Dft Thomas Acierno's motion to dismiss Pla's redrafted first amended complaint is Granted and all claims asserted against this Dft are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay to pay its own atty fees and costs [110-1]; It is Further ORDERED that with respect to the claims and parties remaining in the case, the final trial prep conf and trial date set 4/4/02 and 4/22/02 are vacated and the Magistrate Judge is directed to meet with the parties and enter appropriate scheduling order in the case dismissing party Thomas Acierno, party Dave party William Robirds, party Kelly Black, party Robert Baker, party Dan Harris, party David J. Thomas (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/27/02 (erv)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 176 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe granting Pla's Unopposed motion to continue Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/02 [174-1] ; rule 16 conference reset for 8:00 3/29/02 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/25/02 (erv)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 175 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel referring to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe the Pla's Unopposed motion to continue Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/02 [174-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 174 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002, Terminated: 2/22/2002 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION by Plas' to continue Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/02 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 173 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  COURTROOM MINUTES by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel, It is ORDERED that Dft Thomas Acierno's motion to dismiss Pla's redrafted first amended complaint is GRANTED [110-1], granting State Dfts Renewed motion for sum jgm on grounds of quasi-judicial immunity, qualified immunity of state officials,& on state law claim under the Colorado Govt immunity act (incorporating authority) [143-1], granting Dfts David Thomas,Mike Harris, Cazssandra Harris, Laura Dunbar and Nancy Hooper's motion to dismiss Amended Complaint and in the Alternative for Sum Jgm [149-1], granting motion for summary judgment Dfts Dave Brooks, Willaim Robirds, Kelly lack, Robert Baker and Dan Harris' Motion for Sum Jgm [150-1] ; jury trial vacated 2/13/02 ; Trial prep conference vacated on 2/13/02 ; in court hrg held 2/13/02 ; entry date : 2/19/02 Court Reporter: Kara Spitler (erv)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 172 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe granting Pla's unopposed motion to cont Scheduling Conf set for 1/30/02 [170-1] ; rule 16 conference reset for 9:30 2/25/02 The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order 5 days prior to the hrg date (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/24/02 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 171 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel referring to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe the Pla's unopposed motion to cont Scheduling Conf set for 1/30/02 [170-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 170 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002, Terminated: 1/24/2002 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Plas' to cont Scheduling Conf set for 1/30/02 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 169 Filed: 12/31/2001, Entered: 12/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel ; in court hrg on pending motions reset for 1:30 2/13/02 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/31/01 (gms)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 168 Filed: 12/27/2001, Entered: 12/28/2001 Notice of Change of Address
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address of Kennedy & Christopher,P.C. (erv)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 167 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/20/2001 Notice of Consent of Electronic Service
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CONSENT OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Plas' csl Vincent Todd (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 214 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: 12/13/2002 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION by dfts Peter Boyles, Jacor Broadcast CO to exceed page limitation re: Brief in support of Motion for Sum Jgm attached is unsigned copy of Dfts Boyles' and Jacor's Motion for Sum Jgm (pap)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 166 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by Dfts' Dave Brooks, William Robirds, Kelly Black, Mike Harris, Robert Baker to Pla's response to Dfts' motion for summary judgment [150-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 165 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe ; rule 16 conference reset for 9:00 1/30/02 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/2/01 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 164 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe rule 16 conf vacated on 10/31/01 , rule 16 conference reset for 9:00 1/30/02 ; entry date : 11/1/01 Court Reporter: MJW Civil Tape 2001-83 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 163 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY by Dfts' to Pla's response to Dfts' motion to dismiss Amended Complaint and in the Alternative for Sum Jgm [149-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 162 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by plaintiff to Sheriff's Dfts renewed motion for summary judgment [150-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 161 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: 10/22/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by Plas' to Dfts' renewed motion for sum jgm on grounds of absolute quasi-judicial immunity, qualified immunity of state officials,& on state law claim under the Colorado immunity act (incorporating authority) [143-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 160 Filed: 10/16/2001, Entered: 10/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting Pla's motion to extend time to respond to Sheriff and District Attorney Motions [159-1] up to and incl 10/19/01. Dfts may. if they wish, submit a Reply in support of their motions within eleven days of the date on which the responses are served. (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/17/01 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 159 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: 10/16/2001, Terminated: 10/16/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Plas' to extend time to respond to Sheriff and District Attorney Dfts Motions (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 158 Filed: 10/10/2001, Entered: 10/11/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY by Dfts Dave Brooks, William Robirds, Kelly Black, David Jonsson, William Thomas, Mark Arnold, Mike Guerra, Steve Davis, David J. Thomas, Sergei Thomas, Mike Harris, Cassandra Harris, Chris Mount, Jerry Sandoval, Kieran Nicholson, Peter Boyles, Jacor Broadcast CO, Denver Post Inc, The, Robert Baker, Thomas Acierno, Dan Harris to Pla's response to Dfts renewed motion for summary judgment [150-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 157 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting Dfts motion to reset the motions hrg currently set for 11/2/01 [156-1] in court hrg reset for 3:00 1/8/02 on pending motions (cc: all counsel) ; date : 10/5/01 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 156 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001, Terminated: 10/5/2001 Motion to Reset
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Dfts Jerry Sandoval, Penny Brown, Chris Mount to reset the motions hrg currently set for 11/2/01 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 155 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: 10/2/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by plaintiff to motion for sum jgm on grounds of absolute quasi-judicial immunity, qualified immunity of state officials,& on state law claim under the Colorado Govt immunity act (incorporating authority) [143-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 154 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 9/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting Pla's` motion to extend time to respond to renewed motion for sum jgm, to 10/1/01. Dfts shall have up to and incl 10/10/01 to file a reply.The hrg on pending motions has been reset to 11/2/01 at 9:00 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/28/01 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 153 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting Dfts unopposed motion to exceed page limitation [151-1], granting the Sheriff Dept's motion for leave to file Memorandum Brief in excess of page limitation [148-1] ; in court hrg reset on pending motions for 9:00 11/2/01 Pla's shall respond by 10/12/01 to the Sheriff Dept's motion for sum jgm filed 9/21/01, and the Dist Atty Dfts motion. Dfts may, if they wish, submit a reply in support of their motions by 10/19/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/27/01 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 152 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Plas' to extend time to respond to renewed motion for sum jgm (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 151 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001, Terminated: 9/27/2001 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Sheriff's Dept Dfts' Dave Brooks, William Robirds, Kelly Black, Robert Baker, Dan Harris to exceed page limitation (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 150 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Dfts' Dave Brooks, William Robirds, Kelly Black, Robert Baker, Dan Harris for summary judgment (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 149 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001, Terminated: 2/26/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Dfts David J. Thomas, Mike Harris, Cassandra Harris, Laura Dunbar, and Nancy Hooper to dismiss Amended Complaint and in the Alternative for Sum Jgm (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 148 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION by Dfts', David Thomas,Laura Dunbar,Nancy Hooper, Mike Harris and Cassandra Harris for leave to file Memorandum Brief in excess of page limitation (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Tendered Brief in support of Motion for Summary Jgm submitted by Dfts' Dave Brooks, William Robirds, Kelly Black, Robert Baker, Dan Harris re: motion for summary judgment [150-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Tendered Memorandum Brief in support submitted by Dfts' d Thomas,Laura Dunbar, Nancy Hooper, Mike Harris and Cassandra Harris re: motion to dismiss Amended Complaint and in the Alternative for Sum Jgm [149-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 147 Filed: 9/14/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by defendant Thomas Acierno to motion to dismiss Pla's redrafted first amended complaint [110-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 146 Filed: 9/14/2001, Entered: 9/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel regarding Dfts renewed [143-1] motion for sum jgm on grounds of absolute quasi-judicial immunity, qualified immunity of state officials,& on state law claim under the Colorado Govt immunity act (incorporating authority;) Pla shall respond by 9/26/01, granting Dfts Acierno's unopposed motion for leave to file reply in support of motion to dismiss [142-1] ; jury trial set for 9:00 4/22/02 ; Trial prep conference set for 4:00 4/4/02 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/18/01 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 145 Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: 9/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting motion to extend time to file Governmental Immunity motions [139-1] up to and incl 9/21/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/14/01 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 144 Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: 9/14/2001 Certificate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE of mailing by Dfts of DFts motion for extension of time to file Governmental Immunity (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 143 Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: 9/14/2001, Terminated: 9/14/2001 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Renewed MOTION by State Dfts' for sum jgm on grounds of absolute quasi-judicial immunity, qualified immunity of state officials,& on state law claim under the Colorado Govt immunity act (incorporating authority) (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 142 Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: 9/12/2001, Terminated: 9/14/2001 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION by defendant Thomas Acierno for leave to file reply in support of motion to dismiss (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: 9/12/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Tendered Dft Acierno's Reply in support re: motion to dismiss Pla's redrafted first amended complaint [110-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 140 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 9/10/2001 Certificate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE of service by csl for State Dfts on Clients of Dfts' Unopposed Joint Motion for extension of time (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 139 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 9/10/2001, Terminated: 9/6/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed Joint MOTION by Dfts to extend time to file Governmental Immunity motions (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 141 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: 9/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting Dfts motion to extend time to file Governmental Immunity motions [139-1] for 3 days up to and incl 9/7/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/10/01 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 138 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: 9/7/2001 Supplement/Amendment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENT by Dfts to status report [132-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 137 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: 9/4/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Plas' to Dft Acierno's motion to dismiss Pla's redrafted first amended complaint [110-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 136 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe granting unopposed motion to continue scheduling conf set for 9/5/2001 [134-1] ; rule 16 conference reset for 9:30 10/31/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/31/01 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel referring to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe the Pla's unopposed motion to scheduling conf set for 9/5/2001 [134-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 134 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001, Terminated: 8/30/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION by Plas' to continue scheduling conf set for 9/5/2001 (erv) Modified on 08/31/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 133 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER by defendant Robert Baker to re-drafted 1st amd complaint [1-1]; jury demand (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 132 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by Plas' pursuant to Court's Order of 8/1/01 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 131 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe granting motion to substitute Captain Dan Harris for Captain John Doe Number 1 as a party Dft in the complaint [128-1] substituting defendant Captain Dan Harris (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/16/01 (erv) Modified on 08/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 130 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel regarding [110-1] motion to dismiss Pla's redrafted first amended complaint status conf vacated 8/14/01 ; court hrg set for 1:30 10/17/01 on the motion to dismiss (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/16/01 (erv) Modified on 08/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 129 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel referring to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe the Pla's motion to substitute Captain Dan Harris for Captain John Doe Number 1 as a party Dft in the complaint [128-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 128 Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001, Terminated: 8/14/2001 Motion to Substitute Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Plas' to substitute Captain Dan Harris for Captain John Doe Number 1 as a party Dft in the complaint (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 127 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe granting motion to substitute attorney Vincent C. Todd as csl for Plas and withdraw Jeffrey E. Veigel [125-1] and substituting attorney (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/9/01 (erv) Modified on 08/10/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 126 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/7/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel referring to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe the motion to substitute attorney Vincent C. Todd as csl for Plas and withdraw Jeffrey E. Veigel [126-1] (erv) Modified on 08/07/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 125 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/7/2001, Terminated: 8/6/2001 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Plas' to substitute attorney Vincent C. Todd as csl for Plas and withdraw Jeffrey E. Veigel (erv) Modified on 08/07/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 124 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel pursuant to [123-1] appeal order, the parties shall file a ; status report ddl set for 8/17/01 re: the issues raised therein , ; status conf set for 1:30 8/23/01 (cc: all counsel) ; date : 8/2/01 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 123 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Copy of ORDER from Court of Appeals [117-1] dated 7/27/01 abating the appeal by granting appellants Unopoosed Mtn to Stay and Remand for Further Proceedings, construed as a Mtn to Abate the Appeal and Partially Reamand for Further Proceedings in the USDC. Partially remanded on the issue of qualified immunity as to appellants and as to the addt'l party dfts named in appellees' amended complaint. W/in 60 days and every 60 days thereafter during the abatement, appellants shall file a report in the USCA on the current status of the qualified immunity issues before the USDC. (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 122 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: 7/2/2001 Letter re Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER to USCA and cnsl advising that the record on appeal is complete (Re: [117-1] ) (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 121 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: 7/2/2001 Transcript Order Form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed Dfts by Dave Brooks, William Robirds, Kelly Black ; Necessary Transcript Already on File in USDC appeal [117-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 120 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: 6/15/2001 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of change of firm name (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 119 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: 6/14/2001 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of assignment of Case No. [117-1] 01-1279 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 118 Filed: 6/12/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 USCA Appeal Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        $100.00 fee and $5.00 fee paid. Receipt No 226513. Court of Appeals Notified. appeal [117-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 117 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL by Dfts Dave Brooks, William Robirds, Kelly Black of 5/14/01 order [101-1] (filed 5/15/01); Notice of transcript order form due 6/21/01 ; Notice mailed to all counsel on 6/12/01 Fee Status: Not Paid (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 116 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendant Thomas Acierno on 5/29/01 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 115 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Penny Brown on 6/4/01 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 114 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by blank (space) Brent Buford on 6/4/01 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 113 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by Nancy Hooper on 5/25/01 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 112 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendant Laura Dunbar on 5/25/01 (erv) Modified on 06/12/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 111 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/12/2001 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint by defendant Robert Baker on 5/29/01 (erv) Modified on 06/12/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 110 Filed: 6/8/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001, Terminated: 2/13/2002 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by defendant Thomas Acierno to dismiss Pla's redrafted first amended complaint (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 109 Filed: 6/8/2001, Entered: 6/11/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER by Dft Robert Baker to Pla's Redrafted First Amended complaint [1-1]; jury demand (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 108 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 6/8/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER by defendant Kieran Nicholson, defendant Denver Post Inc,to the First Amended complaint [1-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 107 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER by Dfts' Sandoval, Mount, Buford [1-1] to Amended Complaint (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 106 Filed: 6/4/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER by Dfts' to Pla's First Amended complaint [1-1]; jury demand (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 105 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/24/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COURTROOM MINUTES (Deposition of Magistrate Leonard) by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe entry date : 5/24/01 Court Reporter: Tape 01-43 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 104 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/24/2001 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe ; purs to the scheduling conf held 5/21/01, dfts' oral mtn that potential witnesses be sequestered from Magistate Leonard's depo, including Mr. Todd, is granted; that the Rule 16 conference is reset for 9:00 9/5/01, an updated proposed scheduling order should be submitted by 8/31/01 (cc: all counsel) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 103 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe ; rule 16 conf vacated on 5/21/01 ; rule 16 conference reset 9:00 9/5/01 ; Dfts oral motion that potebtial witnesses be sequestered from the Magistrate Judge Leonard's deposition incl Mr. Todd is granted. ; entry date : 5/23/01 Court Reporter: MJW Civil Tape 2001-43 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 5/17/2001, Entered: 5/21/2001 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for Dfts Brooks, Robirds and Black (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: 5/17/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel; Dfts Mount and Sandoval's motion to supplement motion for for sum jgm on state law claim [35-1]immunity act, is DENIED without PREJUDICE [100-1],and the motion for judgment on the pleadings or for summary judgment DENIED without PREJUDICE [31-1], It is Further Ordered that Dfts David Thomas,Sergi Thomas,Mike Harris and Cassandra Harris's motion to dismiss and motion for sum jgm is Granted in part and Denied in part; the motion is DENIED as to the state defamation calim against Deputy District Atty Sergi Thomas, and Granted as to all other claims against Dfts David Thomas, Sergi Thomas,Mike Harris and Cassandra Harris.[28-1], It is Further ordered that Sheriff's Dept Dfts motion to dismiss under Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1) or in the alternative for summary jgm filed 10/16/00, is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is GRANTED as to the dismissal of the 1983 unlawful search claim against Dfts Jonsson,Arnold,Guerra and Willaim Thomas, and as to the dismissal of the defamation claim against Dft Steve Davis. The motion is DENIED as to the 1983 unlawful arrest claim against Dft Brooks, Robirds and Black. [40-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/17/01 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 99 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel referring to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe the Unopposed motion to extend time to answer to redrafted first amended complaint thru 6/4/01 [96-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 98 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel referring to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe the Dfts' motion to extend time to answer the amd cmp until responses are due from newly named dfts [94-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 97 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER by Dfts' to Pla's redrafted first amended complaint [1-1]; jury demand (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 96 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION by Dfts' to extend time to answerto redrafted first amended comnplaint thru 6/4/01 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 95 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: 5/15/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER by defendants Peter Boyles, Jacor Broadcast CO to first amended complaint [1-1]; jury demand (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 94 Filed: 5/11/2001, Entered: 5/15/2001 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unoppposed MOTION by Chris Mount, Jerry Sandoval to extend time to answer the amd cmp until responses are due from newly named dfts , on or about 6/4/01 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 92 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel denying motion to stay entry of order regarding mtns for sum jgm [74-1], granting motion for lv to file redrafted first amended complaint [1-1] [72-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/3/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 5/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe GRANTING motion for hearing re depositions be held at the U.S. District courthouse [90-1] conducted 5-22-01 at 3:30 under the supervision of Magistrate Judge Watanabe (cc: all counsel) ; entry 5/4/01 date : 5/4/01 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 91 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: 4/23/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel referring to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe the motion for Hrg re depositions be held at the U.S. Distrcit courthouse [90-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 90 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: 4/23/2001, Terminated: 4/27/2001 Motion for Hearing/Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Colorado State Court Magistrate Marilyn Leonard for hearing re depositions be held at the U.S. Distrcit courthouse (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 89 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe ; Rule 16 conference reset for 10:00 5/21/01; if the motion to amd the cmp is granted, then csl shall tender to Magistrate Judge Watanabe, an updated proposed scheduling order 5 days prior to the scheduling conf (cc: all counsel) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe ; rule 16 conference reset for 10:00 5/21/01 , as the motion to amd cmp has not been ruled on at this time [72-1], [1-1]; if the motion to amd the cmp is granted, then csl shall tender an updated proposed scheduling order 5 business days prior to the scheduling conf ; entry date : 4/20/01 Court Reporter: Tape 01-38 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 4/13/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JT REPLY by dfts Dave Brooks, William Robirds, Kelly Black, David Jonsson, William Thomas, Mark Arnold, Mike Guerra, Steve Davis, David J. Thomas, Sergei Thomas, Mike Harris, Cassandra Harris to plas' response to obj to proposed order and motion to stay entry of order [74-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 86 Filed: 4/13/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting dfts' motion for leave to file joint reply to plas' response to objection to proposed order and motion to stay entry of order [85-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 4/18/01 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 85 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/10/2001, Terminated: 4/13/2001 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Dfts' for leave to file joint reply to Plas' response to objection to proposed order and motion to stay entry of order (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 84 Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/10/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe denying Magistrate Judge Marilyn Leonard's motion to quash subpoena [73-1] Magistrate Leonard is to give a short deposition and that her files ought to be subpoenaed, and that she ought to be asked to answer questions related to the chronology of what happened and regarding her handwritten entry on the certified record. The privilege Magistrate Leonard asserts is not absolute. The testimony needed in this case does not concern her mental processes but rather concerns whether she entered the order on which Mount Sandoval relied. The parties and csl for Magistrate Leonard shall forthwith confer and set a new date and time for Magistrate Leonard's deposition. Pla's request for sanctions is denied. (cc: all counsel) entry date : 4/10/01 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/6/2001, Entered: 4/10/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Tendered Joint reply to Plas' response submitted by Dfts' re: motion for leave to file joint reply to Plas' response to objection to proposed order and motion to stay entry of order [85-1] (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by plaintiffs to jt obj to plas' form of order and motion to stay entry of order regarding mtns for sum jgm [74-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: 4/3/2001 Response to MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by Pla to motion to quash subpoena [73-1]and certificate of complaince with D.C. COLO.LR.7.1 filed by Magistrate Judge Marilyn Leonard with request for Sanctions (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: 3/30/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by Sheriff Dept. defendants Brooks, Robirds, Black, Jonsson, Thomas, Arnold, Guerra, Davis to plas' motion for lv to file redrafted first amended complaint [1-1] [72-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: 3/30/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Sheriff's Dept. defendants Brooks, Robirds, Black, Jonsson, Thomas, Arnold, Guerra, Davis to Magistrate Marily Leonard's motion to quash subpoena [73-1] (lam) Modified on 03/30/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection (RESPONSE) by dfts Jacor Broadcast CO, Peter Boyles to plas' motion for lv to file redrafted first amended complaint [1-1] [72-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 76 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe regarding [73-1] motion to quash subpoena, the parties shall file a response on or before 3-30-01 (cc: all ; entry date : 3/23/01 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: 3/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel regarding [74-1] motion to stay entry of order regarding mtns for sum jgm, regarding [72-1] motion for lv to file redrafted first amended complaint [1-1] Plas' shall respond by 4-2-01 Dfts' shall respond to Pla's Motion by 4-2-01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/22/01 (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 78 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by defendant Chris Mount, defendant Jerry Sandoval to motion to quash subpoena [73-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 77 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel referring to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe the motion to quash subpoena [73-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001, Terminated: 5/1/2001 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Jt Objection to proposed order and MOTION by Sheriff dfts Dave Brooks, William Robirds, Kelly Black, David Jonsson, William Thomas, Mark Arnold, Mike Guerra, Steve Davis; District Atty dfts David J. Thomas, Sergei Thomas, Mike Harris, Cassandra Harris; and State dfts Chris Mount, Jerry Sandoval to stay entry of order regarding mtns for sum jgm (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001, Terminated: 4/6/2001 Motion to QuashCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by deponent Magistrate Judge Marilyn Leonard to quash subpoena and subpoena duces tecum and certificate of compliance with Local Rule 7.1 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: 3/16/2001 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by plaintiffs for lv to file redrafted first amended complaint [1-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 3/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting joint motion for a 7-day enlargement of time to file order [69-1] until 3/1/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/1/01 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Pending Motions on 2/12/01 before Judge Daniel ( pages: 1-91) Prepared By: Kara Spitler (certified copy) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001, Terminated: 2/27/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION by dfts David J. Thomas, Sergei Thomas, Mike Harris, Cassandra Harris for a 7-day enlargement of time to file order (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 2/13/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe ; Rule 16 conference set for 9:00 4/17/01 (cc: all counsel) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/15/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COURTROOM MINUTES by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel : in court hrging on pending mtns held 2/12/01 ; denying dfts' motion for judgment on the pleadings or for summary judgment [31-1]; granting in part and denied in part dfts' motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or for summary judgment [40-1], the motion is denied as to the defamation claim and granted as to all other claims; granting in part and denied in part dfts' motion for summary judgment [28-1], the motion is granted as to the defamation claim against Deputy Steve Davis and denied as to the remainder of the claims; plas' motion for leave to file first amended complaint is denied [19-1], plas to file revised mtn to amd cmp w/in 30 days, dfts shall file any answers w/in 10 days ; entry date : 2/15/01 Court Reporter: Kara Spitler (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: 2/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting motion to substitute in attorney Daniel J. Schednzielos [64-1] for Vincen C. Todd as counsel for plaintiffs (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/4/01 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 2/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel ; in court hrging on pending motions is reset for 10:30 2/12/01 (regarding [64-1] motion to substitute in attorney Vincent C. Todd, [40-1] motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or for summary judgment, [31-1] motion for judgment on the pleadings or for summary judgment, [28-1] motion to dismiss or for summary judgment, [19-1] motion for leave to file first amended complaint) (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/2/01 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001, Terminated: 2/1/2001 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Daniel J. Schednzielos, csl for plaintiff to substitute in attorney Vincent C. Todd (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by Sheriff's Dept dfts Dave Brooks, William Robirds, Kelly Black, David Jonsson, William Thomas, Mark Arnold, Mike Guerra, Steve Davis to plas' combined response to Government dfts' motions to dismiss and for summary judgment [40-1], [28-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 1/5/2001, Entered: 1/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting motion to exceed page limitation [61-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/9/01 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000, Terminated: 1/5/2001 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION by Sheriff's Dept dfts Dave Brooks, William Robirds, David Jonsson, William Thomas, Mark Arnold, Mike Guerra, Steve Davis, Kelly Black to exceed page limitation (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY by dfts William Thomas, Sergei Thomas, Mike Harris, Cassandra Harris in support of motion to dismiss or for summary judgment [28-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by dfts Chris Mount, Jerry Sandoval in support of immunity motions regarding [31-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Tendered reply to plas' combined response to dfts' mtns to dismiss and for summary judgment submitted by Sheriff Dept dfts Dave Brooks, William Robirds, Kelly Black, David Jonsson, William Thomas, Mark Arnold, Mike Guerra, Steve Davis re: motion to exceed page limitation [61-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 58 Filed: 12/8/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting dfts' unopposed motion to extend time to 12/18/00 to file reply to response to mtns to dismiss & for sum jgm [56-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/11/00 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting Sheriff's Department dfts motion to extend time to file reply brief in support of immunity mtn to 12/18/00 [55-1]; granting dfts Mount and Sandoval's motion to extend time to 12/18/00 to file reply brf in support of immunity mtn [54-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/11/00 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 12/7/2000, Entered: 12/11/2000, Terminated: 12/8/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION by defendants David Thomas, Sergei Thomas, Mike Harris and Cassandra Harris to extend time to 12/18/00 to file reply to response to mtns to dismiss & for sum jgm (qualified immunity) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 55 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/6/2000, Terminated: 12/7/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Sheriff Dept dfts, Dave Brooks, William Robirds, David Jonsson, William Thomas, Mark Arnold, Mike Guerra, Steve Davis, Kelly Black to extend time to file reply brief in support of immunity mtn to 12/18/00 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 54 Filed: 12/4/2000, Entered: 12/6/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by dfts Chris Mount, Gerry Sandoval to extend time to 12/18/00 to file reply brf in support of immunity mtn (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: 11/27/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Combined RESPONSES by plaintiffs to dfts Mount and Sandoval's motion for judgment on the pleadings or for summary judgment [31-1], Distict Attorneys' motion to dismiss or for summary judgment [28-1] and Sheriff's Dept. dfts' motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or for summary judgment [40-1] (Placed in Exhibit Room) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 11/24/2000, Entered: 11/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel: granting plas' motion to extend time to 11/27/00 to respond to qualified immunity motions [51-1] regarding [31-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/27/00 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 11/24/2000, Entered: 11/27/2000, Terminated: 11/24/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by plaintiffs to extend time to 11/27/00 to respond to qualified immunity motions (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 50 Filed: 11/8/2000, Entered: 11/9/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting pla's motion to extend time to 11/24/00 to respond to mtns for sum jgm & to dismiss [49-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/9/00 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 49 Filed: 11/1/2000, Entered: 11/2/2000, Terminated: 11/8/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by plaintiffs to extend time to 11/24/00 to respond to mtns for sum jgm & to dismiss (qualified immuity) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe Status conf set 2/12/01 at 9:00 a.m.(cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/19/00 (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting motion to substitute as counsel Jeffrey E. Veigel and withdraw Vincent C. Todd [33-1] attorney Vincent C. Todd for Sabrina Wuthrich, attorney Vincent C. Todd for Sophia Wuthrich, attorney Vincent C. Todd for Raoul Wuthrich, attorney Vincent C. Todd for Tatania Wuthrich, attorney Vincent C. Todd for Andreas Wuthrich, attorney Vincent C. Todd for Beverly Wuthrich and substituting attorney (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/19/00 (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 100 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: 5/17/2001 Motion to Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Dfts Mount and Sandoval to supplement motion for for sum jgm on state law claim [35-1]immunity act (erv)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting dfts Mount & Sandoval's motion for leave to file suppl mtn for sum jgm on state law claim [35-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/19/00 (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 10/17/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel regarding [44-2] minute order ; in court hrg on pending motions set for 9:00 2/2/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/19/00 (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 10/16/2000, Entered: 10/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel ; in court hrg on pending motions set for 9:00 2/2/00 (sic-01); plas to respond w/in 20 days to dfts Chris Mount and Gerry Sandoval's motion for judgment on the pleadings or for summary judgment [31-1], reply ddl w/in 11 days of the date on which the response is served (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/18/00 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 10/16/2000, Entered: 10/18/2000 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memornadum BRIEF by dfts David J. Thomas, Sergei Thomas, Mike Harris, Cassandra Harris in support of motion to dismiss or for summary judgment [28-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 10/16/2000, Entered: 10/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel ;in court hrg on motions currently set for 9:00 2/2/00 (sic-01); plas to respond w/in 20 days to dfts motion to dismiss or for summary judgment [28-1], reply ddl w/in 11 days of the on which the response was served; the motino will be heard at the hearing on pending mtns currently set for 9:00 2/2/00 (sic-01); granting dfts' unopposed motion to exceed page limitation re: memorandum brf in support of mtn to dismiss/sum judgment [29-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/18/00 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 10/16/2000, Entered: 10/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel: granting Sheriff Dept dfts' motion to exceed page limitation re: mtn to dismiss or for sum jgm [30-1]; regarding Sheriff Dept dfts motion to dismiss [40-1]; plas to respond w/in 20 days, reply ddl w/in 11 days of the date on which the response is served; and this motion will be heard at the hearing currently set for 9:00 2/2/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/18/00 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 10/16/2000, Entered: 10/18/2000 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by dfts Dave Brooks, William Robirds, Kelly Black, David Jonsson, William Thomas, Mark Arnold, Mike Guerra, Steve Davis to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction or for summary judgment (copy) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 10/16/2000, Entered: 10/18/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe ; rule 16 conf/motion hearing held on 10/16/00 ; status conf set for 9:00 2/12/01 ; granting dft's motion to stay discovery [27-1]; granting dfts' joinder in mtns to stay discovery and disclosures pending mtns to dismiss and for sum jgm [36-1]; granting dfts' motion to stay discovery [16-1] ; entry date : 10/18/00 Court Reporter: Tape 00-93 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Certificate of Mailing/Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF MAILING BY dfts David J. Thomas, Sergei Thomas, Mike Harris and Cassandra Harris of motion to exceed page limitation re: memorandu brf in support of mtn to dismiss/sum judgment [29-1], motion to dismiss or for summary judgment [28-1], motion to stay discovery [27-1], document tendered [0-0] by US mail on 10/11/00 (lam) Modified on 10/17/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe setting hearing on dfts David J. Thomas, Sergel Thomas, Mike Harris, and Sassandra Haris' motion to stay discovery [27-1] 1:00 10/17/00 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/16/00 (lam) Modified on 10/17/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINDER by defendants Chris Mount, Jerry Sandoval in motions to stay discovery and disclosures [16-1], [28-1] pending mtns to dismiss and for sum jgm [28-1], [27-1], [31-1] (lam) Modified on 10/17/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000, Terminated: 10/17/2000 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by dfts Chris Mount, Jerry Sandoval for leave to file suppl mtn for sum jgm on state law claim (lam) Modified on 10/17/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Patricia Boone filed by dft's Mount and Sandoval re: in support of their motion for judgment on the pleadings or for summary judgment [31-1] (former empl) Modified on 10/17/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/12/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Tendered supplemental motion submitted by dfts defendant Chris Mount, Jerry Sandoval re: motion for leave to file suppl mtn for sum jgm on state law claim [35-1] (incorporating authorities) (lam) Modified on 10/17/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 10/11/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiffs by Jeffrey E. Veigel (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 10/11/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000, Terminated: 10/18/2000 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by plaintiffs counsel to substitute as counsel Jeffrey E. Veigel and withdraw Vincent C. Todd (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/11/2000 MemorandumCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Chambers referring to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe the motion to stay discovery [27-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by dfts Chris Mount, Jerry Sandoval for judgment on the pleadings or for summary judgment on grounds of absolute quasi-judicial immunity and qualified immunity of state officials (incorporating authorities) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000, Terminated: 10/16/2000 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Sheriff Dept. dfts Dave Brooks, William Robirds, Kelly Black, David Jonsson, William Thomas, Mark Arnold, Mike Guerra, Steve Davis to exceed page limitation re: mtn to dismiss or for sum jgm (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION by dfts David J. Thomas, Sergei Thomas, Mike Harris, Cassandra Harris to exceed page limitation re: memorandum brf in support of mtn to dismiss/sum judgment (lam) Modified on 10/18/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000, Terminated: 10/16/2000 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by dfts David J. Thomas, Sergei Thomas, Mike Harris, Cassandra Harris to dismiss or for summary judgment (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by defendants David J. Thomas, Sergei Thomas, Mike Harris, Cassandra Harris to stay discovery (lam) Modified on 07/23/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Tendered motion to dismiss or for sum jgm submitted by Sheriff's Department defendants Brooks, Robirds, Black, Jonsson, Thomas, Arnold, Guerra and Davis re: motion to exceed page limitation re: mtn to dismiss or for sum jgm [30-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Tendered memorandum brief submitted by dfts David J. Thomas, Sergei Thomas, Mike Harris, Cassandra Harris re: motion to exceed page limitation re: memorandu brf in support of mtn to dismiss/sum judgment [29-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 10/3/2000, Entered: 10/4/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE by dfts Dave Brooks, William Robirds, Kelly Black, David Jonsson, William Thomas, Mark Arnold, Mike Guerra, Steve Davis to motion for leave to file first amended complaint [19-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 10/2/2000, Entered: 10/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting dfts David J. Thomas, Sergei Thomas, Mike Harris, Cassandra Harris, Chris Mount & Gerry Sandoval's unopposed motion to extend time 7 days to file substantive motions to 10/6/00 [24-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/3/00 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/2/2000, Terminated: 10/2/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION by dfts David J. Thomas, Sergei Thomas, Mike Harris, Cassandra Harris, Chris Mount, Jerry Sandoval to extend time 7 days to file substantive motions (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/2/2000 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by defendants Chris Mount, Jerry Sandoval to motion for leave to file first amended complaint [19-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 10/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED MINUTE ORDER by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel regarding [20-1] minute order: regarding [19-1] motion for leave to file first amended complaint, response ddl 10/6/00; granting Sheriff's Dept. dfts' unopposed motion to extend time to 10/6/00 file brf re: qualified immunity [21-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/2/00 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION by dfts Dave Brooks, William Robirds, David Jonsson, Kelly Black, William Thomas, Mark Arnold, Mike Guerra, Steve Davis to extend time to 10/6/00 file brf re: qualified immunity (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000, Terminated: 9/29/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel regarding [19-1] motion for leave to file first amended complaint, response ddl 10/2/00 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/29/00 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 Motion for Leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by plas Beverly Wuthrich, Andreas Wuthrich, Tatania Wuthrich, Raoul Wuthrich, Sophia Wuthrich, Sabrina Wuthrich for leave to file first amended complaint (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 9/13/2000, Entered: 9/14/2000 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Tendered First Amended Complaint submitted by plas Beverly Wuthrich, Andreas Wuthrich, Tatania Wuthrich, Raoul Wuthrich, Sophia Wuthrich, Sabrina Wuthrich re: motion for leave to file first amended complaint [19-1] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 9/12/2000, Entered: 9/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe ; rule 16 conference resetting for 1:00 10/17/00 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/13/00 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Bruce D. Pringle for Magistrate Judge Watanabe: denying without prejudice motion to stay disclosures and discovery [16-1]; if the issue of government immunity or qualified immunity is to be raised by mtn, it to be filed or before 9/29/00, pla to respond by 11/9/00, dft shall respond by 12/1/00; ; rule 16 conference set continued to 1:00 10/17/00 ; no discovery will take place until 10/17/00; pla will file the amended complaint by 9/13/00; entry date : 9/11/00 Court Reporter: Tape 2000-82/83 (lam) Modified on 10/04/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/11/2000 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by defendants David J. Thomas, Sergei Thomas, Mike Harris, Cassandra Harris to stay disclosures and discovery (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 8/22/2000, Entered: 8/23/2000 Jury Demand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DEMAND for jury trial by plaintiffs (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 8/16/2000, Entered: 8/17/2000 Rule 16 ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute ORDER FOR RULE 16 CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe ; Rule 16 conference set for 2:00 9/8/00 (cc: all counsel) (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 8/15/2000, Entered: 8/16/2000 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER R16,stat,stlmt,pt,pto referring to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel (cc: to counsel) (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 8/10/2000, Entered: 8/11/2000 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER by defendants Dave Brooks, Kelly Black, William Robirds, David Jonsson, William Thomas, Mark Arnold, Mike Guerra, Steve Davis to complaint [1-1]; jury demand (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 7/31/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER by David J. Thomas, Sergei Thomas, Mike Harris, Cassandra Harris to complaint [1-1]; jury demand (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 7/31/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER by Defts Chris Mount, Jerry Sandoval to complaint [1-1] (gms)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 7/28/2000, Entered: 8/1/2000 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER by defendants Denver Post Inc, The, Kieran Nicholson to complaint [1-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 7/27/2000, Entered: 7/28/2000 Certificate of Mailing/Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF entry of appearance and uncontested motion to extend time to move or otherwise respond to complaint on 7/26/00 [6-1] (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 7/26/2000, Entered: 7/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel granting dfts Brooks, Robirds, Black, Johsson, Thomas, Arnold, Guerra and Davis's motion to extend time to answer to 8/10/00 [6-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/28/00 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 7/26/2000, Entered: 7/28/2000, Terminated: 7/26/2000 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Entry of Appearance and Uncontested MOTION by dfts Dave Brooks, William Robirds, Kelly Black, David Jonsson, William Thomas, Mike Guerra, Mark Arnold, Steve Davis to extend time to answer to 8/10/00 (lam)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 7/18/2000, Entered: 7/19/2000 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER by defendant Peter Boyles, defendant Jacor Broadcast CO to complaint [1-1]; jury demand (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER of Recusal by Judge Walker D. Miller directs case be returned to clk for reassignment by random draw Case reassigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/10/00 (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 7/6/2000, Entered: 7/10/2000 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER from court to counsel re case reassigned to Judge Daniel re: order [3-2] (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 6/30/2000, Entered: 7/3/2000 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Entry of ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant Peter Boyles, defendant Jacor Broadcast CO by Frank R. Kennedy, John R. Mann (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 5/23/2000, Entered: 5/24/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 5/23/2000, Entered: 5/24/2000 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FILING FEE PAID: on 5/23/00 in the amount of $ 150, receipt # 216420. (former empl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 211 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?