Bridgeport Financial, Inc., v. Shawman Group,llc Dba Fluid Bar & Lounge Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 05 439462
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bridgeport Financial, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Anthony Lee Head

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Head, Anthony Lee +1 415 421 4825

Toggle Switch Represented by Walker, Lorna

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walker, Lorna +1 415 267 4877
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 10, Defendant
No Logo Shawman Group,llc Dba Fluid Bar & Lounge, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Neville, Dave

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dave Neville +1 415 487 2601
No Logo Does 1-50, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Muratore, Inc., Cross-Defendant

Represented by Willoughby, Stuart and Bening

No Logo Orlando Diaz-azcuy Design Association, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Shawman Group,llc Dba Fluid Bar & Lounge, Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Neville, Dave

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dave Neville +1 415 487 2601

Toggle Switch Represented by Walker, Lorna

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walker, Lorna +1 415 267 4877
Cause of Action Common Counts/open Book Account/collections
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Case Ordered Off Calendar
Order To Show Cause Of Nov-07-2005 Is Off Calendar Dismissal Filed. Notice Sent By Court.
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/11/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Dismissal Of Entire Action With Prejudice
    Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Notice of Settlement
      Notice Of Settlement Filed By Plaintiff Bridgeport Financial, Inc.
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/15/2005, Entered: 9/15/2005 Order to Show Cause
        Order To Show Cause Set For Nov-07-2005 In Department 212 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To Bring Cross Complaint At Issue As To Cross Defendant(s) Orlando Diaz-azcuy Design Association. The Sep-23-2005 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005 Answer
          Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Muratore, Inc.
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/4/2005 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
            Case Management Conference Of Aug-12-2005 Continued To Sep-23-2005 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212,. Notice Sent By Court.
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 12 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005
              Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Shawman Group,llc Dba Fluid Bar & Lounge
                Blank 11 Filed: 7/25/2005, Entered: 7/25/2005
                Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Cross Complainant Shawman Group,llc Dba Fluid Bar & Lounge Served Jul-22-2005, Mail On Cross Defendant Muratore, Inc.
                  Blank 10 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005
                  Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Shawman Group,llc Dba Fluid Bar & Lounge Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                    Blank 9 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005
                    Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Bridgeport Financial, Inc. Estimated Time For Trial: 2.0 Hours
                      Blank 8 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005
                      Substitution Of Attorney: Walker, Lorna Substituted For Head, Anthony Lee As Attorney For Bridgeport Financial, Inc.
                        Blank 7 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005
                        Summons Returned Filed By Cross Complainant Shawman Group,llc Dba Fluid Bar & Lounge On Cross Defendant Orlando Diaz-azcuy Design Association Muratore, Inc. Does 1-50
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/20/2005 Cross Complaint
                          Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Shawman Group,llc Dba Fluid Bar & Lounge As To Cross Defendant Orlando Diaz-azcuy Design Association Muratore, Inc. Does 1-50
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/20/2005 Answer
                            Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Shawman Group,llc Dba Fluid Bar & Lounge
                              Blank 4 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005
                              Summons On Complaint By Mail On Apr. 11, 2005, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Bridgeport Financial, Inc. Served Apr-07-2005, Substitute Service On Corporation On Defendant Shawman Group,llc Dba Fluid Bar & Lounge
                                Blank 3 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005
                                Summons Returned Filed By Plaintiff Bridgeport Financial, Inc.
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005 Notice To Plaintiff
                                  Notice To Plaintiff
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: 3/11/2005 Complaint
                                    Common Counts/open Book Account/collections, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Bridgeport Financial, Inc. As To Defendant Shawman Group,llc Dba Fluid Bar & Lounge Does 1 To 10 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Aug-12-2005 Proof Of Service Due On May-10-2005 Case Management Statement Due On Jul-28-2005
                                      Request RequestSpace

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 17 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?