Pioneer Financial, Llc v. Perri Williams Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 05 441469
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pioneer Financial LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson & Kennard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Scott Kennard , +1 916 920 2295 +1 916 920 0682 rskennard@nelson-kennard.com
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 10, Defendant
No Logo Williams, Perri, Defendant
Cause of Action Common Counts/open Book Account/collections
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: 12/23/2010
Return Of Execution For Money Issued To Sacramento County, Returned And Filed, Partially Satisfied In The Sum Of $622.82 As To Defendant Williams, Perri
    Blank 18 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007
    Execution For Money Issued To Sacramento County As To Defendant Williams, Perri
      Blank 17 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007
      Cost Bill After Judgment, $.00 Credit Acknowledged, $264.48 Interest, $.00 Costs Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
        Blank 16 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007
        Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Kennard, Robert S
          Blank 15 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006
          Abstract Of Judgment Issued To Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/23/2005, Entered: 12/23/2005 Case Ordered Off Calendar
            Order To Show Cause Of Jan-04-2006 Is Off Calendar Judgment Entered. Notice Sent By Court.
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 13 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005
              Under Application To The Clerk For Judgment Under Sec 585(1) C.c.p., It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc Recover From Defendant Williams, Perri $1,093.24 Principal, $325.00 Attorney Fees, $415.73 Interest, $246.30 Costs, Total Judgment $2,080.27, See Scanned Document
                Blank 12 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005
                Declaration Robert Scott Kennard Filed Re: Unavailibilty Of Original Instrument; Computation Of Interest; Notice Pursuant To Ccp 1033(b)(2) And Attorney's Fees Pursuant To Cc 1717 Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
                  Blank 11 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005
                  Account Legder Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc As To Defendant Williams, Perri
                    Blank 10 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005
                    Request To Enter Default Filed/default Entered, Declaration Of Non-military Status, Cost Bill $246.30 Filed, Credit Acknowledged $.00 As To Defendant Williams, Perri
                      Blank 9 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/7/2005
                      Summons Returned Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc On Defendant Williams, Perri
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005 Continued Order To Show Cause
                        Order To Show Cause Set For Nov-02-2005 Continued To Jan-04-2006 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s). Nov-02-2005 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 7 Filed: 10/27/2005, Entered: 10/27/2005
                          Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc Served Oct-15-2005, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Williams, Perri
                            Blank 6 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005
                            Declaration Of Gloria Zarco In Opposition To Order To Show Cause Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/8/2005, Entered: 9/8/2005 Order to Show Cause
                              Order To Show Cause Set For Nov-02-2005 In Department 212 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The Sep-23-2005 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 4 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: 9/2/2005
                                Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc Estimated Time For Trial: 2.0 Hours
                                  Blank 3 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005
                                  Non Service/return Of Summons & Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc As To Defendant Williams, Perri
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Notice To Plaintiff
                                    Notice To Plaintiff
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: 5/23/2005 Complaint
                                      Common Counts/open Book Account/collections, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc As To Defendant Williams, Perri Does 1 To 10 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Sep-23-2005 Proof Of Service Due On Jul-22-2005 Case Management Statement Due On Sep-08-2005
                                        Request RequestSpace

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?