Horolsuren Escobar v. Citigroup Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 05 444611
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Escobar, Horolsuren, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Marchant, John Bertrand

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarro, Frank Paul +1 415 781 7900
v.
No Logo Citibank(west),fsb, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
Citigroup, Inc. Citigroup, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Court Square Capital Ltd.
Officer/Director, Chippac, Inc.
Officer/Director, Amis Holdings, Inc.
Citibank, NA Officer/Director, Citibank, NA
Officer/Director, Keane, Inc.
Officer/Director, Macdermid Inc.
Officer/Director, Travelers Insurance Co
Officer/Director, CITICORP
Officer/Director, Imc Mortgage Co
Officer/Director, Fashion Dynamics Corp
Officer/Director, Pfs Services Inc
Officer/Director, Citicorp Banking Corp
Officer/Director, Intersil Holding Co
Officer/Director, Citigroup Holdings Co
Officer/Director, Cvc Partners LLC
Officer/Director, Ness Technologies Inc
Officer/Director, Primerica, Inc.
Officer/Director, Student Loan Corp
Officer/Director, Mfs Municipal Income Trust
Officer/Director, Pilgrim Prime Rate Trust
Officer/Director, Pimco Corporate Income Fund
Officer/Director, Pimco High Income Fund
Officer/Director, Pacholder Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Pennsylvania Fund
Officer/Director, Municipal Partners Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Michigan Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Gabelli Equity Trust Inc
Officer/Director, Nuveen Senior Income Fund
Officer/Director, Muniyield Insured Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Florida Fund
Officer/Director, Salomon Inc
Officer/Director, Jones Energy, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cryomedical Sciences, Inc.
Officer/Director, S Y Bancorp Inc
Officer/Director, Scholastic Corp
Officer/Director, Corvel Corp
Officer/Director, Buckle, Inc.,
Officer/Director, Avid Technology, Inc.
Officer/Director, O'reilly Automotive, Inc.
Officer/Director, Healthrite, Inc.
Officer/Director, Smith Midland Corp
Officer/Director, Mitcham Industries Inc
Officer/Director, Tc Group L.l.c.
Darden Restaurants, Inc. Officer/Director, Darden Restaurants, Inc.
Officer/Director, American Tire Corp
Officer/Director, Synalloy Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
No Logo Does 1 Through 200,inclusive, Defendant
Cause of Action Wrongful Discharge
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006
Master Jury Calendar Set For Jul-31-2006 Vacated. (mellon-514)
    Blank 13 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006
    Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Jul-12-2006 - Dismissal Of Entire Action Filed Apr-25-2006. (mellon-514)
      Blank 12 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006
      Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Citibank(west),fsb
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 Dismissal Of Entire Action
        Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: 2/24/2006 Notice Of Early Settlement Conference--early Settlement Prgm
          Notice Of Early Settlement Conference - Early Settlement Program
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 9 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006
            Notice Of Objection To Trial Setting And Notice Of Court-ordered Hearing Filed By Defendant Citigroup, Inc. Citibank(west),fsb
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
              Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Jul-12-2006 At 3:30 Pm In Department 514. Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Jul-31-2006 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Feb-03-2006 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 7 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006
                Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Citigroup, Inc. Citibank(west),fsb
                  Blank 6 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006
                  Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Escobar, Horolsuren Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                    Blank 5 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005
                    Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Escobar, Horolsuren Served Oct-24-2005, Personal Service On Defendant Citigroup, Inc.
                      Blank 4 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005
                      Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Escobar, Horolsuren Served Oct-21-2005, Personal Service On Defendant Citibank(west),fsb
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005 Answer
                        Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Citigroup, Inc. Citibank(west),fsb
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Notice To Plaintiff
                          Notice To Plaintiff
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005 Complaint
                            Wrongful Discharge, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Escobar, Horolsuren As To Defendant Citigroup, Inc. Citibank(west),fsb Does 1 Through 200,inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Feb-03-2006 Proof Of Service Due On Nov-07-2005 Case Management Statement Due On Jan-19-2006
                              Request RequestSpace

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 13 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?