Hartle Media Ventures Llc, A Limited Liability Com v. John Doffing Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 05 445667
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hartle Media Ventures Llc, A Limited Liability Com Pany, Aka 7x7 Magazine, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mooney, Michael Arthur

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mooney, Michael Arthur +1 650 401 8286
v.
No Logo Does 1-20, Defendant
No Logo Doffing, John Individually And Dba Startsoma, Defendant
No Logo Star Galeeries, Inc., A Corporation Dba Startsoma, Defendant
No Logo Hartle Media Ventures Llc, A Limited Liability Com Pany, Aka 7x7 Magazine, Creditor
Cause of Action Common Counts/open Book Account/collections
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 23 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 Satisfaction of Judgment
Satisfaction Of Judgment, Fully Satisfied, Filed By Plaintiff Hartle Media Ventures Llc, A Limited Liability Com Pany, Aka 7x7 Magazine As To Defendant Doffing, John Individually And Dba Startsoma
    Blank 22 Filed: 9/21/2006, Entered: 9/21/2006
    Bench Warrant Returned Unserved
      Blank 21 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006
      Warrant Of Attachment Issued, Bail Set At $500.00, As To Defendant Doffing, John Individually And Dba Startsoma
        Blank 20 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006
        Order For Examination Apr-26-2006 As To John Doffing, Ind/dba Startsoma, No Appearance. Order Of Arrest To Issue, Bail $500.00
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/5/2006, Entered: 4/5/2006 Failure To Appear For Order Of Examination
          Order For Examination As To John Doffing, Individually And Dba Startsoma, No Appearance, Continued To Apr-26-2006 At 2:00 Pm In Dept. 612 For Letter.
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
            Pre-trial Calendar Sweep, Case Management Conference Calendar Of Apr-07-2006, Off Calendar, Dismissal Or Judgment On File As To All Defendants
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 17 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006
              Notice Of Entry Of Judgment
                Blank 16 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: 2/14/2006
                Proof Of Personal Service On John Doffing Filed By Plaintiff Hartle Media Ventures Llc, A Limited Liability Com Pany, Aka 7x7 Magazine
                  Blank 15 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006
                  Abstract Of Judgment Issued To Plaintiff Hartle Media Ventures Llc, A Limited Liability Com Pany, Aka 7x7 Magazine
                    Blank 14 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006
                    Order Of Examination Issued Filed By Plaintiff Hartle Media Ventures Llc, A Limited Liability Com Pany, Aka 7x7 Magazine As To Defendant Doffing, John Individually And Dba Startsoma Oex Hearing Set For Apr-05-2006 At 02:00 Pm In Dept 612
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: 1/25/2006 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                      Case Management Conference Of Feb-10-2006 Continued To Apr-07-2006 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212, For Plaintiff To Obtain Default Judgment Against Defendant(s). Notice Sent By Court.
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Clerks Judgment - General
                        Under Application To The Clerk For Judgment Under Sec 585(1) C.c.p., It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff Hartle Media Ventures Llc, A Limited Liability Com Pany, Aka 7x7 Magazine Recover From Defendant Doffing, John Individually And Dba Startsoma Star Galeeries, Inc., A Corporation Dba Startsoma $3,000.00 Principal, $600.00 Attorney Fees, $757.05 Interest, $256.30 Costs, Total Judgment $4,613.35, See Scanned Document
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006 Dismissal
                          Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Does 1-20
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 10 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006
                            Declaration John Verduzco Filed Re: Unavailability Of Original Insrertion Filed By Plaintiff Hartle Media Ventures Llc, A Limited Liability Com Pany, Aka 7x7 Magazine
                              Blank 9 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006
                              Declaration Michael A. Mooney Filed Re: Costs Filed By Plaintiff Hartle Media Ventures Llc, A Limited Liability Com Pany, Aka 7x7 Magazine
                                Blank 8 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006
                                Declaration Michael A. Mooney Filed Re: Interest Filed By Plaintiff Hartle Media Ventures Llc, A Limited Liability Com Pany, Aka 7x7 Magazine
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006
                                  Amended Request To Enter Default Filed/default Entered, Declaration Of Non-military Status, Cost Bill $256.30 Filed, Credit Acknowledged $.00 As To Defendant Doffing, John Individually And Dba Startsoma Star Galeeries, Inc., A Corporation Dba Startsoma
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005
                                    Request To Enter Default Filed/default Entered, Declaration Of Non-military Status As To Defendant Doffing, John Individually And Dba Startsoma Star Galeeries, Inc., A Corporation Dba Startsoma
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005
                                      Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Hartle Media Ventures Llc, A Limited Liability Com Pany, Aka 7x7 Magazine Served Oct-26-2005, Personal Service On Defendant Doffing, John Individually And Dba Startsoma
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005
                                        Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Hartle Media Ventures Llc, A Limited Liability Com Pany, Aka 7x7 Magazine Served Oct-26-2005, Personal Service On Defendant Star Galeeries, Inc., A Corporation Dba Startsoma
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005
                                          Summons Returned Filed By Plaintiff Hartle Media Ventures Llc, A Limited Liability Com Pany, Aka 7x7 Magazine On Defendant Doffing, John Individually And Dba Startsoma
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Notice To Plaintiff
                                            Notice To Plaintiff
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Complaint
                                              Common Counts/open Book Account/collections, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Hartle Media Ventures Llc, A Limited Liability Com Pany, Aka 7x7 Magazine As To Defendant Doffing, John Individually And Dba Startsoma Star Galeeries, Inc., A Corporation Dba Startsoma Does 1-20 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Feb-10-2006 Proof Of Service Due On Dec-12-2005 Case Management Statement Due On Jan-26-2006

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 337 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?