Milton Lipman Et Al v. Asbestos Defendants (b*p)as Reflected On Exhibits Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 05 445903
Superior Court Judge James L. Warren, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lipman, Milton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ezrin, Joshua C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID R. DONADIO +1 415 898 1555 +1 415 898 1247 ddonadio@braytonlaw.com
No Logo Lipman, Norma, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ezrin, Joshua C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID R. DONADIO +1 415 898 1555 +1 415 898 1247 ddonadio@braytonlaw.com
v.
No Logo Asbestos Defendants (b*p)as Reflected On Exhibits B,b-i,c,h,i, Defendant
No Logo Bayside Electrical Distributors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cahill Contractors, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Archer Norris, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene C Blackard, Jr. +1 925 930 6600 +1 925 930 6620 eblackard@archernorris.com
No Logo City Electric, Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Electrical Disribution, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Prindle Decker & Amaro LLP

No Logo Does 1-8500, Defendant
No Logo Dome Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Douglass Insulation Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Selman Breitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARK A. LOVE +1 415 979 0400 +1 415 979 2099 mlove@selmanbreitman.com
No Logo EATON ELECTRICAL, INC., Defendant

Represented by Howard Rome Martin & Ridley, LLP

No Logo Fdcc California, Inc. (formerly Known As Dinwiddie Construction Company), Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Berry & Berry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vacchina, Leonardo J +1 510 250 0200

Toggle Switch Represented by Vasquez & Estrada

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia Kantor Conway +1 415 453 0555
No Logo Fdcc California, Inc., Sii To Dinwiddie Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Federal Pacific Electric Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keele, Christopher A. +1 415 617 8900

Toggle Switch Represented by Tucker Ellis & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Craig Nelson +1 415 617 2400 +1 415 617 2409 evan.nelson@tuckerellis.com
No Logo Foster Wheeler LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brydon Hugo and Parker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward R Hugo +1 415 388 9762
No Logo Frank Portman Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropers Majeski Kohn & Bentley, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John A. Rowland +1 415 543 4800 +1 415 274 6301 jrowland@ropers.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro, Galvin, Shapiro, Piasta & Moran

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Anthony Piasta +1 707 544 5858
No Logo Garlock Sealing Technologies, LLC, Defendant
No Logo General Cable Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hassard Bonnington LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Mitchell Hamblett +1 415 288 9800 rmh@hassard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Klimenko, Andrew Martin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Colombatto, Paul Richard +1 415 391 6182
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Defendant
Unknown Role, Genpact Ltd.
Unknown Role, Gei, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sportstech, Inc.
Unknown Role, Superior Essex Inc.
Unknown Role, Genicom Corp
Unknown Role, Imatron Inc.
Unknown Role, Regal Beloit Corp
Unknown Role, Lockheed Martin Corp
Unknown Role, Lunar Corp
Unknown Role, Mecon Inc
Unknown Role, Positron Corp
Unknown Role, GE India Ventures LLC
Unknown Role, Townsquare Media, LLC
Unknown Role, Antares Capital Corp
Unknown Role, Bear Newco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.
Unknown Role, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Unknown Role, Xoom, Inc.
Unknown Role, Plug Power, Inc.
Unknown Role, Hpsc, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ionics, Inc.
Unknown Role, Idx Systems Corp
Unknown Role, iVillage, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Sedgwick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHARLES T. SHELDON +1 415 781 7900 +1 415 781 2635 charles.sheldon@sedgwicklaw.com
No Logo GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Archer Norris, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene C Blackard, Jr. +1 925 930 6600 +1 925 930 6620 eblackard@archernorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Berry & Berry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vacchina, Leonardo J +1 510 250 0200
Honeywell International, Inc. Honeywell International, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Honeywell International, Inc., Fka Alliedsignal, Inc., Successor-in-interest To The Bendix Corporation ("honeywell")"

Toggle Switch Represented by Biderman, David T

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David T Biderman +1 213 824 9981

Toggle Switch Represented by Hassard Bonnington LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Mitchell Hamblett +1 415 288 9800 rmh@hassard.com
No Logo J.s. Guerin & Company, Defendant
No Logo J.t. Thorpe & Son Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bassi Martini Edlin & Blum, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffery John Fadeff +1 510 596 0888
No Logo Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bassi Martini Edlin & Blum, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marte J. Bassi +1 415 397 9006 mbassi@behblaw.com

Represented by Jackson and Wallace

No Logo Marconi Platering Co., Inc, Defendant
No Logo Mayta & Jensen, Defendant

Represented by Prindle Decker & Amaro LLP

No Logo National Electric Supply, Defendant
No Logo National Electric Supply Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Nevada Lumber Company Of Tahoe Valley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Rahbeck, Jeffrey K.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rahbeck, Jeffrey K.
No Logo Osram Sylvania, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hassard Bonnington LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Mitchell Hamblett +1 415 288 9800 rmh@hassard.com
PG&E Corporation PG&E Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Pacific Gas And Electric Company"

Represented by Sedgwick LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Storm, Lucinda L

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lucinda L Storm +1 415 777 6990 +1 415 777 6992 lstorm@storm-law.com
No Logo Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Pearson & Johnson General Contractors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Plant Insulation Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Oberg, Lisa L +1 415 267 4000
No Logo Potter Electric, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adams, Barbara Rose

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adams, Barbara Rose +1 415 982 8955
No Logo Quintec Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rapid American Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samson, Ivor Elias +1 415 882 5000
No Logo Reliance Electric Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keele, Christopher A. +1 415 617 8900
No Logo Rockwell Automation Inc., Served As Allen Bradley Co., Defendant
No Logo Rockwell Automation, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Booth Beers +1 202 346 4000 +1 202 346 4444 dbeers@goodwinprocter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keele, Christopher A. +1 415 617 8900
No Logo S. J. Amoroso Construction Co., Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buty & Curliano LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Madeline L Buty +1 510 654 6600
No Logo S.j. Amoroso Construction, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Buty & Curliano LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Madeline L Buty +1 510 654 6600

Represented by Prindle Decker & Amaro LLP

No Logo San Francisco Gravel Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Imai, Tadlock, Keeney & Cordery, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Keeney +1 415 537 3930

Toggle Switch Represented by Krinsky, Mark Peter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark P. Krinsky +1 415 217 0060
No Logo San Francisco Gravel Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Square D Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by K&L Gates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gill, Raymond Lawrence +1 415 986 5900
No Logo Swinerton Builders Fka Swinerton & Walberg Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Berry & Berry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vacchina, Leonardo J +1 510 250 0200

Toggle Switch Represented by Lynch Gilardi & Grummer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Duane William Grummer +1 415 397 2800
No Logo The Okonite Company, Defendant

Represented by Prindle Decker & Amaro LLP

No Logo Thomas Dee Engineering Company Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Thomas Dee Engineering Company"

Represented by Walsworth Franklin Bevins & McCall

No Logo Thorpe Insulation Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bishop Barry Howe Haney & Ryder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas Garth Wah +1 415 956 8000

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Mansfield, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY D. SHARP +1 248 721 4200 +MDL TER MINATED gsharp@foleymansfield.com
No Logo Tutor-saliba Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Archer Norris, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Krause, Nandor Burton +1 925 930 6600
Union Carbide Corporation Union Carbide Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brydon Hugo and Parker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Rohan Brydon +1 415 248 0360
No Logo Viacom Corp. Sbm To Cbs Corp, Fka Westinghouse Electric Corp., Defendant
No Logo Viacom Inc Successor By Merger To Cbs Corporation Fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pond North LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pond, Frank D +1 213 617 6170
No Logo Webcor Builders Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ackley, Lisa R.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ackley, Lisa R. +1 415 781 7072
No Logo Webcor Builders, Inc., Defendant
Cause of Action Asbestos
  Entries (485) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (63) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 485 Filed: 8/25/2010, Entered: 8/25/2010
Removed From Asbestos Order To Show Cause Calendar On Aug-26-2010. Off Calendar - Dismissal On File. (206)
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: 8/11/2010 Request For Dismissal
    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 32622486)
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 483 Filed: 6/24/2010, Entered: 6/24/2010
      Refund/reimbursement Of $150.00 Re 20052 For Transaction W2108122j005 (jury Fees), Payable To Brayton, Doc #1902952798, Warrant #38004177, Dated Jun-24-2010
        Blank 482 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 5/27/2010 Court Filing
        Continued From Asbestos Order To Show Cause Calendar On May-27-2010 To Asbestos Order To Show Cause Calendar On Aug-26-2010 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk: D. Lok; Matter Not Reported (206)
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 5/27/2010 Request For Dismissal
          Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 31349917)
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 480 Filed: 4/23/2010, Entered: 4/23/2010
            Asbestos Settlement Calendar Of Apr-01-2010 Is Off Calendar - Settled.
              Blank 479 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: 4/13/2010
              Asbestos Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Mar-01-2010 Continued To Apr-20-2010 At 1:30 Pm In 603
                Blank 478 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010
                Removed From Master Calendar Jury Asbestos Of Mar-01-2010 And Set For Order To Show Cause For Dismissal Of Entire Action On May-27-2010 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Matter Reported To Dept. 603 That The Case Settled. (206)
                  Blank 477 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: 3/2/2010 Court Filing
                  Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Mar-02-2010: Br423 Settlement Conference Held. No Future Settlement Conference Dates Calendared In D502 Per Counsel For Plaintiff. Judge Robertson; Clerk: L. Fiscella; Not Reported (502)
                    Blank 476 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: 3/1/2010 Court Filing
                    Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Mar-01-2010 Continued To Mar-02-2010 At 10:30 Am In 502. Br423 Settlement Conference Held. [trial Date Mar-01-2010] Matter Continued For Further Settlement Discussions. Judge Robertson; Clerk: L. Fiscella; Not Reported (502)
                      Blank 475 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: 3/1/2010
                      Referred To Asbestos Settlement Manager In Rm. 603 At 3:00pm On 3/1/10. (206)
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010 Request For Dismissal
                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 29085647) As To Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 473 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010
                          Mini-minutes For Jan-13-2010 9:30 Am For Dept 220
                            Blank 472 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010 Court Filing
                            Asbestos Law And Motion 220, Defendant Federal Pacific ElectricÂ’s Motion For Summary Judgment Is Granted. The Affidavit Of Robert Steel Shifted The Burden To Plaintiffs To Demonstrate A Triable Issue Whether Any Of DefendantÂ’s Products Contained Asbestos. PlaintiffsÂ’ Objections To SteelÂ’s Affidavit Are Overruled. PlaintiffsÂ’ Evidence Fails To Demonstrate A Triable Issue Because It Only Bears On The Issue Of Exposure To Federal Pacific ElectricÂ’s Products, Not Whether Those Products Contained Asbestos. Judge: Harold Kahn, Reporter: Lavena Ward, Csr # 7077
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 471 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: 1/6/2010 Federal Pacific Electric CompanyÂ’s Reply To PlaintiffsÂ’ Opposition To
                              Federal Pacific Electric Companys Reply To Plaintiffs Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 28823232) Filed By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 Proof Of Service By Lexisnexis E-service
                                Proof Of Service By Lexis Nexis E-service On Memo Of P & A In Opposition To Deft Federal Pacific Electric Co.'s Motion For Summary Judgment And Supporting Docs. (transaction Id # 28730546) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 469 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 PlaintiffsÂ’ Response To Defendant Federal Pacific Electric CompanyÂ’s S
                                  Response To Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Co.'s Separate Statement Of Undisputed Facts (transaction Id # 28730546) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 468 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 PlaintiffsÂ’ Separate Statement Of Disputed Material Facts In Oppositio
                                    Separate Statement Of Disputed Material Facts In Opposition To Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company's Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 28730546) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 467 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 PlaintiffsÂ’s Objections To Evidence Submitted By Defendant Federal Pac
                                      Objections To Evidence Submitted By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company In Support Of Its Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 28730546) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 Declaration
                                        Declaration Of John B. Goldstein In Support Of Opposition To Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Co.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 28730546) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009 Plaintiff`s Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Defe
                                          Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Co.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 28730546) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: 10/27/2009 Declaration
                                            Declaration Of Nicole E. Gage In Support Of Federal Pacific Electric Company's Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 27751660) Filed By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: 10/27/2009 Separate Statement In Support Of Federal Pacific Electric CompanyÂ’s Mo
                                              Separate Statement In Support Of Federal Pacific Electric Company's Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 27751660) Filed By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: 10/27/2009 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Federal Pacific Ele
                                                Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Mosum (transaction Id # 27751660) Filed By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: 10/27/2009 Federal Pacific Electric Company Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summa
                                                  Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 27751660) (cases Consolidated For Trial Purposes Within Brayton Group 423: Sub-group 1 Includes Siefken, Springstead, Stubblefield, Thomas And Transue; Sub-group 2 Includes Robertson And Pitts; Sub-group 3 Incl Filed By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company Hearing Set For Jan-13-2010 At 09:30 Am In Dept 220
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Blank 460 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009
                                                    Asbestos Settlement Conference Off Calendar. Br423 Settlement Conference Not Held. Br423 Settlement Conference Is Set For Mar-01-2010 [trial Date Mar-01-2010] (502).
                                                      Blank 459 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: 10/23/2009
                                                      After Being Placed On 1/2 Day Telephone Standby, Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Oct-19-2009 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Mar-01-2010 At 11:15 Am In 206 Due To Unavailability Of Courtroom. (206)
                                                        Blank 458 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: 10/22/2009 Court Filing
                                                        Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Oct-22-2009 Continued To Oct-26-2009 At 10:30 Am In 502. Br423 Settlement Conference Held. [trial Date Oct-19-09] Matter Continued For Further Settlement Discussions. Judge Robertson; Clerk: L. Fiscella; Not Reported (502)
                                                          Blank 457 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: 10/20/2009 Court Filing
                                                          Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Oct-20-2009 Continued To Oct-22-2009 At 10:30 Am In 502. Br423 Settlement Conference Held. [trial Date: 10/19/09] Matter Continued For Further Settlement Discussions. Judge Robertson; Clerk: L. Fiscella; Not Reported (502)
                                                            Blank 456 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: 10/19/2009 Court Filing
                                                            Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Oct-19-2009 Continued To Oct-20-2009 At 10:30 Am In 502. Br423 Settlement Conference Held. [trial Date 10/19/09] Matter Continued For Further Settlement Discussions. Judge Robertson; Clerk: L. Fiscella; Not Reported (502)
                                                              Blank 455 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: 10/16/2009
                                                              Added To Calendar For Br423 Asbestos Settlement Conference (trial Date 10/19/09) Hearing Set For Oct-19-2009 At 10:30 Am In Dept 502
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 454 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: 7/23/2009 Request For Dismissal
                                                                Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint With A Mutual Waiver Of Costs, Filed (transaction Id # 26242579) As To Defendant Rapid-american Corporation
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: 7/20/2009 Request For Dismissal
                                                                  Dismissal With Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 26184899) As To Defendant J.s. Guerin & Company San Francisco Gravel Company, Inc.
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Blank 452 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: 7/10/2009
                                                                    Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Jul-06-2009 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Oct-19-2009 At 11:15 Am In 206 Due To Unavailability Of Courtroom. (206)
                                                                      Blank 451 Filed: 7/6/2009, Entered: 7/6/2009
                                                                      Removed From Asbestos Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Jul-06-2009 - Br423 Settlement Conference Not Held. New Trial Date Of 10/19/09. Not Reported (502)
                                                                        Blank 450 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Court Filing
                                                                        Asbestos Motion Calendar On Apr-14-2009 In Dept. 206, Defendant Plant Insulation Company's Motion To Continue Jury Trial And/or Settlement Conference Is Heard. Dismissal Filed On Defendant Plant Insulation Company. Judge: James J. Mcbride; Clerk: R. Veluz; Reporter: Scott Hughes, Csr #12365 (206)
                                                                          Blank 449 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: 4/10/2009
                                                                          ***bp423*** Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Apr-10-2009 Continued To Jul-06-2009 At 10:30 Am In 502 - (d502)
                                                                            Blank 448 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: 4/10/2009 Court Filing
                                                                            Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Apr-06-2009 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Jul-06-2009 At 11:15 Am In 206 After Being Placed On Telephone Standby And Due To Unavailability Of Courtroom. (206) On Apr-6-2009, The Court Set The Following Matters On Jun-4-2009 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 For An Osc Re: Dismissal Of Doe Defendants And Entire Action: 445387, 453401, 440228, 445596, 423416, 453506. Judge: James J. Mcbride; Clerk: E. Bura; Reporter: Sara Lerschen Csr# 6213 (206)
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: 4/9/2009 Request For Dismissal Of Complaint Without Prejudice As To Defendant P
                                                                              Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 24607143) As To Defendant Plant Insulation Company
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Blank 446 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: 4/9/2009
                                                                                Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Apr-09-2009 Held And Continued To Apr-10-2009 At 10:30 Am In 502. (d502)
                                                                                  Blank 445 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009
                                                                                  Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Apr-08-2009 Held And Continued To Apr-09-2009 At 10:30 Am In 502. (d502)
                                                                                    Blank 444 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                    Asbestos Motion In Dept. 206, Defendant Plant Insulation Company's Motion To Continue Trial Date Continued From Apr-08-2009 To Asbestos Motion At Apr-14-2009, 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 For Further Status Of Each Case. Judge: James J. Mcbride; Clerk: E. Bura; Reporter: Wendy Pun Csr# 12891 (206)
                                                                                      Blank 443 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: 4/7/2009
                                                                                      Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Apr-07-2009 Held And Continued To Apr-08-2009 At 10:30 Am In 502. (d502)
                                                                                        Blank 442 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: 4/7/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                        Asbestos Motion In Dept. 206, Defendant Plant Insulation Company's Motion To Continue Jury Trial And/or Settlement Conference Continued From Apr-07-2009 To Asbestos Motion At Apr-08-2009, 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 For Parties To Report The Status Of The Case. The Court Ordered Parties To Meet And Confer On The Status Of Active Cases And Dismissals. Judge: James J. Mcbride; Clerk: E. Bura; Reporter: Sara Lerschen Csr# 6213 (206)
                                                                                          Blank 441 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: 4/6/2009
                                                                                          Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Apr-06-2009 Held And Continued To Apr-07-2009 At 10:30 Am In 502. (d502)
                                                                                            Blank 440 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009
                                                                                            Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Apr-03-2009 Held And Continued To Apr-06-2009 At 10:30 Am In 502. (d502)
                                                                                              Blank 439 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: 4/2/2009
                                                                                              Settlement Conference Set For Apr-02-2009 Continued To Apr-03-2009 At 10:30 Am In 502
                                                                                                Blank 438 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: 4/2/2009
                                                                                                Asbestos Mandatory Settlement Conference Set For Apr-02-2009 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 502. (206)
                                                                                                  Blank 437 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: 4/2/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                  Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Apr-02-2009 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Apr-06-2009 At 11:15 Am In 206. Judge: James J. Mcbride; Clerk: R. Veluz; Reporter: Helen A. Sorep-matley, Csr #9225 (206)
                                                                                                    Blank 436 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                    Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Apr-01-2009 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos (continued) On Apr-02-2009 At 9:30 Am In 206. Judge: James J. Mcbride; Clerk: R. Veluz; Reporter: Nici Rodich, Csr #11604 (206)
                                                                                                      Blank 435 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: 3/30/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                      Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Mar-30-2009 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos (continued) On Apr-01-2009 At 9:30 Am In 206. Judge: James J. Mcbride; Clerk: R. Veluz; Reporter: Nici Rodich, Csr #11604 (206)
                                                                                                        Blank 434 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: 3/23/2009
                                                                                                        Mini-minutes For Mar-23-2009 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                          Blank 433 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: 3/23/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                          Law And Motion, 301, Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company's Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication Is Off Calendar At The Request Of The Moving Party. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Carol Karen, Csr# 8189
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Answer
                                                                                                            Answer To 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 24279908) Filed By Defendant Rapid-american Corporation
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: 3/10/2009 Proof Of Service Vialexisnexis File And Serve
                                                                                                              Proof Of Service Via Lexisnexis File & Serve (transaction Id # 24148625) Filed By Defendant Plant Insulation Company
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: 3/10/2009 ExhibitCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Exhibits G-n In Support Of Decl Of Lynne P. Blair In Support Of Mo To Continue The Trial Date And Or Sever Deft, And Refer Case To Specially Assigned Judge Or Master To Determine If Pltf Has A Prima Facie Claim Against Deft (transaction Id # 24148625) Filed By Defendant Plant Insulation Company
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: 3/10/2009 DeclarationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Lynne P. Blair In Support Of Mo To Continue The Trial Date And/or Sever Deft, And Refer Case To Specially Assigned Judge Or Master To Determine If Pltf Has A Prima Facie Claim Against Deft [exhibits A - F] (transaction Id # 24148625) Filed By Defendant Plant Insulation Company
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: 3/10/2009 Defendant Plant Insulation CompanyÂ’s Memorandum Of Points And AuthoritCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Mo To Continue The Trial Date And/or Sever Deft, And Refer Case To Specially Assigned Judge Or Master To Determine If Pltf Has A Prima Facie Claim Against Deft (transaction Id # 24148625) Filed By Defendant Plant Insulation Company
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: 3/10/2009 Notice Of Defendant Plant Insulation CompanyÂ’s Motion To Continue TheCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      Motion To Continue Jury Trial And/or Settlement Conference / Motion To Continue The Trial Date And/or Sever Deft, And Refer Case To Specially Assigned Judge Or Master To Determine If Pltf Has A Prima Facie Claim Against Deft (transaction Id # 24148625) Filed By Defendant Plant Insulation Company Hearing Set For Apr-07-2009 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                        Declaration Of Nancy T. Williams In Opposition To Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company's Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 24116896) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 PlaintiffsÂ’ Objection To Defendant Federal Pacific Electric CompanyÂ’s
                                                                                                                          Plaintiffs Objection To Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company's Untimely Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 24116896) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                            Answer To 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 23777366) Filed By Defendant Plant Insulation Company
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                              Blank 423 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: 1/29/2009
                                                                                                                              Mini-minutes For Jan-29-2009 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                Blank 422 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: 1/29/2009
                                                                                                                                Mini-minutes For Jan-29-2009 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: 1/29/2009 Order Denying Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company's Motion For
                                                                                                                                  Order Denying Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company's Motion For Order Allowing Hearing On Motion For Summary Judgment Fewer Than 30 Days Before Trial
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                    Blank 420 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: 1/29/2009
                                                                                                                                    Law And Motion 301, Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company's Amended Motion For Order Allowing Hearing On Federal Pacific Electric Company's Motion For Summary Judgment Fewer Than 30 Days Before Trial Is A Duplicate Entry.
                                                                                                                                      Blank 419 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: 1/29/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Law And Motion 301, Ruling - The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling As Follows: Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company's Motion For Order Allowing Hearing On Federal Pacific Electric Company's Motion For Summary Judgment Fewer Than 30 Days Before Trial Is Denied; Defendant Has Not Shown Sufficient Reason To Allow Motion For Summary Judgment One Week Before Trial. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Carol Karen Csr# 8189 301/pjb
                                                                                                                                        Blank 418 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: 1/28/2009
                                                                                                                                        Issuing Commission To Take Deposition Out Of State Under Ccp 2026 Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 1/21/2009, Entered: 1/21/2009 Federal Pacific Electric CompanyÂ’s Reply To PlaintiffsÂ’ Opposition To
                                                                                                                                          Reply To Pltfs' Opposition To Mo For Order Allowing Hearing On Mo For Summary Judgment Fewer Than 30 Days Before Trial (transaction Id # 23399276) Filed By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: 1/15/2009 PlaintiffsÂ’ Opposition To Defendant Federal Pacific Electric CompanyÂ’s
                                                                                                                                            Opposition To Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company's Motion For Order Allowing Hearing On Motion For Summary Judgment Fewer Than 30 Days Before Trial (transaction Id # 23337397) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009 Amended Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Allowing Hearing On Fede
                                                                                                                                              Amended Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Allowing Hearing On Federal Pacific Electric Company¿s Motion For Summary Judgment Fewer Than 30 Days Before Trial (transaction Id # 23181567) Filed By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company Hearing Set For Jan-29-2009 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 23169060) Filed By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Nicole E. Gage In Support Of Federal Pacific Electric Company's Motion For Order Allowing Hearing On Federal Pacific Electric Company's Motion For Summary Judgment Fewer Than 30 Days Before Trial (exhibits A Through E) (transaction Id # 23169060) Filed By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Federal Pacific Ele
                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Federal Motion For Order Allowing Hearing On Federal Pacific Electric Company¿s Motion For Summary Judgment Fewer Than 30 Days Before Trial (transaction Id # 23169060) Filed By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009 Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Allowing Hearing On Federal Paci
                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Allowing Hearing On Federal Pacific Electric Company¿s Motion For Summary Judgment Fewer Than 30 Days Before Trial (transaction Id # 23169060) Filed By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company Hearing Set For Jan-29-2009 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                        Declaration Of Lance Wilson In Support Of Federal Pacific Electric Company's Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 23159080) Filed By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009 Separate Statement In Support Of Federal Pacific Electric CompanyÂ’s Mo
                                                                                                                                                          Separate Statement Of Facts In Support Of Mtn For Summary Judgment Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 23159080) Filed By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009 Federal Pacific Electric Company Memorandum Of Points And Authorities
                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Mtn For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 23159080) Filed By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009 Federal Pacific Electric Company Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summa
                                                                                                                                                              Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 23159080) Filed By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company Hearing Set For Mar-23-2009 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 406 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008 Substitution Of Attorney - Civil (as To Federal Pacific Electric Compa
                                                                                                                                                                Substitution Of Attorney, (transaction Id # 23029822): Nelson, Evan Craig Substituted For Keele, Christopher A. As Attorney For Federal Pacific Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 405 Filed: 12/19/2008, Entered: 12/19/2008
                                                                                                                                                                  Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Dec-15-2008 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Mar-30-2009 At 11:15 Am In 206 After Being Placed On Telephone Standby And Due To Unavailability Of Courtroom. (206)
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 404 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Nov-17-2008 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Dec-15-2008 At 11:15 Am In 206 On The Court's Own Motion. Judge: David L. Ballati; Clerk: Donna Lok; Reporter: Susan Lee Csr# 4280 (d206)
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 403 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: 11/7/2008
                                                                                                                                                                      Settlement Conference Held. Case Did Not Settle. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 402 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: 11/4/2008
                                                                                                                                                                        Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Nov-04-2008 Held And Continued To Nov-07-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 401 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: 11/3/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Nov-03-2008 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Nov-17-2008 At 11:15 Am In 206 On The Court's Own Motion. Judge: David L. Ballati; Clerk: Donna Lok; Reporter: Susan Lee Csr# 4280 (d206)
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 400 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008
                                                                                                                                                                            Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Oct-31-2008 Held And Continued To Nov-04-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: 10/30/2008 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                              Dismissal With Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 22263232) As To Defendant General Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 398 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: 10/29/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Oct-29-2008 Held And Continued To Oct-31-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 397 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: 10/27/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                  Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Oct-27-2008 Held And Continued To Oct-29-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 396 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                    Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Oct-24-2008 Held And Continued To Oct-27-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 395 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: 10/23/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                      Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Oct-23-2008 Held And Continued To Oct-24-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 394 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: 10/22/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                        Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Oct-22-2008 Held And Continued To Oct-23-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 393 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: 10/21/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                          Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Oct-21-2008 Held And Continued To Oct-22-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 392 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: 10/20/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                            Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Oct-20-2008 Held And Continued To Oct-21-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 391 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: 10/17/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                              Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Oct-17-2008 Held And Continued To Oct-20-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 390 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: 10/16/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Oct-16-2008 Held And Continued To Oct-17-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 389 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: 10/16/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Duplicated, Error. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: 10/16/2008 Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Companys Opposition To Tentative Ru
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition To Tentative Ruling That All Cases In Brayton Group 423 Be Tried Before A Single Jury (transaction Id # 21998588) Filed By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: 10/16/2008 Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Companys Objections To Proposed Ord
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objections To Proposed Order Re Plaintiffs Motion To Consolidate Cases In Brayton Group 423 (transaction Id # 21998267) Filed By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 386 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: 10/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Oct-15-2008 Held And Continued To Oct-16-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 385 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: 10/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Oct-15-2008 Held And Continued To Oct-16-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 384 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: 10/14/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Oct-14-2008 Held And Continued To Oct-15-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 383 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: 10/14/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Oct-14-2008 Held And Continued To Oct-15-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 382 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: 10/14/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Oct-14-2008 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Nov-03-2008 At 11:15 Am In 206 On Court's Own Motion. Judge: Suzanne R. Bolanos; Clerk: E. Bura; Reporter: Susan Lee Csr# 4280 (d206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 381 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: 10/6/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Oct-06-2008 Held And Continued To Oct-14-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: 9/24/2008 Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Companys Opposition To Plaintiffs S
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition To Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief Re Motion To Consolidate (transaction Id # 21668377) Filed By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 379 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Sep-18-2008 Held And Continued To Oct-14-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 378 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: 9/17/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Sep-17-2008 Held And Continued To Sep-18-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 377 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: 9/16/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Sep-16-2008 Held And Continued To Sep-17-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 376 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Sep-15-2008 Held And Continued To Sep-16-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 375 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Sep-15-2008 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Oct-14-2008 At 11:15 Am In 206 On Court's Own Motion. Judge: A. J. Robertson; Clerk: E. Bura; Reporter: Susan Lee Csr# 4280 (d206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 374 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Asbestos Mandatory Settlement Conference Set For Oct-06-2008 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 220. (206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 373 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Sep-12-2008 Held And Continued To Sep-15-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 372 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mini-minutes For Sep-12-2008 10:00 Am For Dept 220
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 371 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: 9/11/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Sep-11-2008 Held And Continued To Sep-12-2008 At 10:00 Am In 220 For Status Conference And Settlement Conference. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 370 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Sep-10-2008 Held And Continued To Sep-11-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 21436079) As To Defendant Foster Wheeler, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 368 Filed: 9/9/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Sep-09-2008 Held And Continued To Sep-10-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 367 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Sep-08-2008 Held And Continued To Sep-09-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 366 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Sep-05-2008 Held And Continued To Sep-08-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 365 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Sep-04-2008 Held And Continued To Sep-05-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 364 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Sep-03-2008 Held And Continued To Sep-04-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 363 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mini-minutes For Sep-03-2008 10:30 Am For Dept 220
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 362 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Sep-02-2008 Continued To Sep-03-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Supplemental Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Consolidate Certain Ca
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Consolidate Certain Cases In Brayton Group 423 (transaction Id # 21300048) Filed By Defendant J.s. Guerin & Company San Francisco Gravel Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Companys Supplemental Briefing Re P
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Supplemental Briefing Re Plaintiffs Motion To Consolidate Cases In Brayton Group 423 (transaction Id # 21281641) Filed By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 359 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Aug-26-2008 Held And Continued To Sep-02-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 358 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Aug-25-2008 Held And Continued To Aug-26-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 357 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Aug-22-2008 Held And Continued To Aug-25-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal As To Reliance Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 21192732) Filed By Defendant Reliance Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 355 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Brayton Group 423, Liv/asb, Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Aug-22-2008 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Sep-15-2008 At 11:15 Am In 206 On Court's Own Motion. Motion To Consolidate Held. A Briefing Schedule Regarding Case Comparison Chart Was Given. No Objections Were Made For Judge Robertson To Be The Settlement Judge And The Judge To Hear Motion To Consolidate. Certain Parties Were Ordered Forthwith For Settlement Discussions. The Court Ordered Status Conference In This Group For 9/3/08 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 220. Judge: A.j. Robertson; Clerk: E. Bura; Reporter: Denise L. Doucette Csr# 5963 (d206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 354 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Aug-21-2008 Held And Continued To Aug-22-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 353 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Aug-20-2008 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos (continued) On Aug-22-2008 At 9:30 Am In 206 After Being Placed On Telephone Standby. (206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 352 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Aug-20-2008 Held And Continued To Aug-21-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 351 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Asbestos Jury Trial Set On Sep-08-2008 For Status, Continued To Aug-20-2008 At 9:30 Am In 206 For Trial Call. Judge Curtis E.a. Karnow, Clerk Dennis D. Vegas, Csr Carlito Mandia (608)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 350 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Aug-19-2008 Held And Continued To Aug-20-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 San Francisco Gravel Company’s And J.s. Guerin & Company’s Opposit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Consolidate Certain Cases In Brayton Group 423 For Trial (transaction Id # 21121733) Filed By Defendant J.s. Guerin & Company San Francisco Gravel Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 348 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Aug-18-2008 Held And Continued To Aug-19-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 347 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Aug-15-2008 Held And Continued To Aug-18-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 21100121) As To Defendant Reliance Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Companys Opposition To Plaintiffs M
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion To Consolidate (transaction Id # 21099522) Filed By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 344 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Aug-14-2008 Held And Continued To Aug-15-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 343 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Aug-13-2008 Held And Continued To Aug-14-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 342 Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: 8/13/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Asbestos Jury Trial Set For Aug-01-2008 Continued To Sep-08-2008 At 9:00 Am In 608. All Matters In Braton Group 423 Are In On Going Settlement Discussions With Judge Robertson Trailing The Pelz Matter Which Is The Current Trial In 608. This Date Is Set Only As A Status Date Of The Traliling Matters. This Entry Is Not An Indication Of A Future Date In Dept 608.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 341 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Aug-12-2008 Held And Continued To Aug-13-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 21016818) As To Defendant Honeywell International, Inc., Fka Alliedsignal, Inc., Successor-in-interest To The Bendix Corporation ("honeywell")
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 339 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Aug-11-2008 Held And Continued To Aug-12-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 338 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Aug-08-2008 Held And Continued To Aug-11-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 337 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Aug-07-2008 Held And Continued To Aug-08-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 336 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Aug-06-2008, Held And Continued To Aug-07-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 335 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Aug-05-2008 Held And Continued To Aug-06-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 334 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Aug-04-2008 Held And Continued To Aug-05-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 333 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Aug-01-2008 Held And Continued To Aug-04-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 332 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Asbestos Jury Trial Set For Jul-30-2008 Continued To Aug-01-2008 At 2:30 Pm In 608. Judge Curtis E.a. Karnow, Clerk: Dennis D. Vegas, Csr Carlito Mandia
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 331 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Asbestos Jury Trial Set For Sep-15-2008 Continued To Jul-30-2008 At 9:00 Am In 608. Trial And Group Status.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 330 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Jul-31-2008 Held And Continued To Aug-01-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 329 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Jul-30-2008 Held And Continued To Jul-31-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Dismissal With Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 20841208) As To Defendant Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 327 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Jul-29-2008 Held And Continued To Jul-30-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 326 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Jul-28-2008 Held And Continued To Jul-29-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 325 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Jul-25-2008 Held And Continued To Jul-28-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008 Notice Of Entry Of Order Granting San Francisco Jazz Organization Dba
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Granting Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Defendant Foster Wheeler Llc To Produce Documents (transaction Id # 20784596) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 323 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Asbestos Jury Trial Set For Jul-22-2008 Continued To Sep-15-2008 At 9:30 Am In 608 As A Monitoring Date Only To Keep Track Of The Cases But No Actual Court Date Is Scheduled For September 15. Asbestos Jury Trial, Bp 423 Boughman (preference Case),held On 7/22/08 In Dept 608 For Pretrial. See Minutes Under Preference Case Boughman. The David Schneider Case #423416 Is The Lead Case In The Group. All Other Cases Besides The Baughman Matter Were Sent Back To Dept 220 To Continue Settlement Discussions.judge Curtis E.a. Karnow, Clerk Dennis D. Vegas, Csr Carlito Mandia
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 322 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Jul-22-2008 Held And Continued To Jul-25-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 321 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Of Jul-22-2008 Assigned To Asbestos Jury Trial Calendar On Jul-22-2008 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 608, Curtis Karnow. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Clerk: E. Bura; Reporter: Susan Lee Csr# 4280 (d206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 320 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Jul-21-2008 Held And Continued To Jul-22-2008 At 10:30 Am In 220. (d220)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 319 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Jul-21-2008 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos (continued) On Jul-22-2008 At 9:30 Am In 206 After Being Placed On Telephone. Plaintiff Counsel's 170.6 Peremptory Challenge As To Judge Wick Accepted. (206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 318 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Asbestos Mandatory Settlement Conference Set For Jul-21-2008 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 220 (brayton Group 423)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Defendant Foster Wheeler Llc To Produce Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion In Limine To Exclude Any Evidence Of Defendants Conduct Occurring After Plaintiffs Last Exposure To Asbestos (transaction Id # 20623108) Filed By Defendant J.s. Guerin & Company San Francisco Gravel Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Defendants San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Mot
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendants San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine Regarding Apportionment Of Damages Between Cigarette Smoking And Asbestos Exposure (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Motion In Limi
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine To Require Plaintiffs To Provide Page Line Designation(s) Of Testimony And Designation For Any Video Used At Trial (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Motion In Limi
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine To Exclude Testimony Of Unidentified Percipient Witnesses (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Defendants San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Mot
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendants San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine Regarding Loss Of Life Expectancy And Loss Of Enjoyment Of Life (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Defendants San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Mot
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendants San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine To Exclude Use Of Defendants Discovery Responses Produced In Any Other Action Or Jurisdiction (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Defendants San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Mot
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendants San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine For Disclosure Of Claims Against Asbestos Product Liability Trusts And Production Of Trust Claim Documentation (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Motion In Limi
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine To Disclose Amounts, Sources, And Dates Of All Previous Settlements (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Motion In Limi
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine To Exclude The Testimony, Asbestos Samples, And Videotapes Of Charles Ay (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Motion In Limi
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine To Exclude Testimony Of Witnesses Or Co-workers Who Were Not Present At Plaintiffs Worksites At The Same Time As Plaintiff (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Motion In Limi
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine To Exclude Evidence Of Punitive Damages And To Strike Prayer For Punitive Damages (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Motion In Limi
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine To Exclude Evidence Of Concert Of Action Among Defendants (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Motion In Limi
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine And Trial Brief On Evidence Of Breach Of Implied Or Express Warranty (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Motion In Limi
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine To Limit Special Damages For Medical Expenses To Those Actually Paid (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Motion In Limi
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine To Exclude Evidence Supporting Consumer Expectation Theory Of Liability (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Motion In Limi
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine To Exclude Plaintiffs Scientific Causation Evidence To The Extent It Does Not Demonstrate Relative Risk Greater Than 2.0 (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Motion In Limi
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine To Exclude Statements By Osha Or Public Health Agencies (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Motion In Limi
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine For The Application Of Proposition 51 [c.c. Section 1431.1] (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Defendants San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Mot
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendants San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine To Exclude Use Of Depositions Taken In Other Actions (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Motion In Limi
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine To Exclude Physical Asbestos Samples From Evidence (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Motion In Limi
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine Re The Admissibility Of Evidence Of Other Asbestos Lawsuits (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Motion In Limi
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine Re: Plaintiff Leaving The Courtroom During Portions Of The Trial (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Motion In Limi
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine To Preclude The Introduction Of Evidence Concerning The Bankruptcy Of Absent Defendants (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Defendants San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Mot
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendants San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine To Exclude Evidence Of Defendants Attendance At Or Absence From Trial (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Defendants San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Mot
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendants San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine To Preclude Reference To Defendants As The Industry Or The Asbestos Industry (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Defendant San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Moti
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine To Preclude Undisclosed Physical Or Medical Examinations Of Plaintiffs (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Motion In Limi
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine To Request 48 Hour Disclosure (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Defendants San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Mot
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendants San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Motion In Limine To Exclude Percipient Witnesses From Courtroom (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Joinder To Oth
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Joinder To Other Defendants Opposition To Plaintiffs Motion In Limine (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin & Companys Joinder In Co-
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              San Francisco Gravel Company And J.s. Guerin Companys Joinder In Co-defendants Motions In Limine (transaction Id # 20623108)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 DefendantsÂ’ Index Of Motions In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendants Index Of Motions In Limine (transaction Id # 20623108) Filed By Defendant J.s. Guerin & Company San Francisco Gravel Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dismissal With Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 20577049) As To Defendant Rockwell Automation Inc., Served As Allen Bradley Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal With Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 20555689)each Party To Bear Its Own Costs As To Defendant Cahill Contractors, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Substitutionof Attorney -civil
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Substitution Of Attorney, (transaction Id # 20473229): Keeney, Robert Charles Substituted For Krinsky, Mark Peter As Attorney For J.s. Guerin & Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Substitutionof Attorney -civil
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Substitution Of Attorney, (transaction Id # 20473229): Keeney, Robert Charles Substituted For Krinsky, Mark Peter As Attorney For San Francisco Gravel Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 281 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Plaintiffs Supplemental Reply To PlaintiffsÂ’ Motion To Compel Foster W
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Reply To Plaintiffs¿ Motion To Compel Foster Wheeler Llc's Person Most Knowledgeable And Custodian(s) Of Records And Production Of Documents (transaction Id # 20349736) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 280 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Discovery 610, Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Defendant's Foster Wheeler Llc's Person Most Knowledgeable And Custodian Of Records For Deposition Is Granted, Compliace By August 15, 2008. Commissioner Bruce Chan, Court Reporter: Early K. Langley, Csr # 3537
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 279 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mini-minutes For Jun-18-2008 9:00 Am For Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 278 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Discovery 610, Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Defendant Foster Wheeler Llc To Produce Its Custodian Of Records And Person Most Knowledgeable For Deposition And To Produce Documents At Deposition Continued From Jun-03-2008 To Discovery At Jun-18-2008, 9:00 Am In Dept. 610, For Further Hearing. Commissioner: Bruce Chan. Not Reported.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 277 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mini-minutes For Jun-03-2008 9:00 Am For Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 Swinerton Builders Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 19896880) Filed By Defendant Swinerton Builders Fka Swinerton & Walberg Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 275 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For May-19-2008 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Jul-21-2008 At 11:15 Am In 206 On The Court's Own Motion. Judge: James J. Mcbride; Clerk: E. Bura; Reporter: Susan Lee, #4280 (d206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 274 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Discovery 610, After Hearing, Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Defendant Foster Wheeler Llc's Pmk- Cor For Deposition Is Continued To June 3, 2008 At 9:00 A.m. In Department 610. Commissioner Bruce Chan, Not Reported.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 273 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mini-minutes For May-09-2008 9:00 Am For Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 272 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Discovery 610, After Hearing, Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Defendant's Foster Wheeler Llc's Pmk-cor For Deposition Is Continued To May 9, 2008 At 9:00 A.m. In Department 610. Commissioner Bruce Chan. Not Reported.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 271 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mini-minutes For May-08-2008 9:00 Am For Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 270 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Jury Fees, Tran # W2208505j020, Tag # 020808 Trust Receipt No. 20808 Deposited By Defendant Honeywell International, Inc., Fka Alliedsignal, Inc., Successor-in-interest To The Bendix Corporation ("honeywell")
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 269 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Settlement Conference Heard In Dept. 303 - Hon. Julie Tang Presiding. Brayton Group 423 Is On Calendar In Dept. 206 For Trial Call On May 19, 2008.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 268 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Discovery 610, Plaintiff Milton Lipman And Norma Lipman's Motion To Compel Defendant's Foster Wheeler Llc's Pmk-cor For Deposition Is Continued To May 8, 2008 At 9:00 A.m. Parties To Appear By Teleconference. Commissioner Bruce Chan. Not Reported.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 267 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mini-minutes For May-02-2008 9:00 Am For Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 19405144) As To Defendant Swinerton Builders
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 265 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Discovery 610, Plaintiff Milton Lipman And Norma Lipman's Motion To Compel Defendant Foster Wheeler Llc's Pmk-cor For Deposition Is Continued To May 2, 2008 At 9:00 A.m. In Department 610, Progress Report By April 17, 2008. Commissioner Bruce Chan. Not Reported.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 264 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mini-minutes For Apr-10-2008 9:00 Am For Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 263 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Apr-07-2008 Continued To May-05-2008 At 9:30 Am In 303 - Judge Julie Tang, Clerk I. Hammer And Counsel Present. Settlement Conf. Held, Case Not Settled. D 303
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 262 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Apr-04-2008 Is Held In Dept. 303, Hon. Julie Tang Presiding. Continued To Apr-07-2008 At 9:30 Am In 303. Plaintiff's Counsel To Give Notice.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 261 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Apr-02-2008 Is Held In Dept. 303 Hon. Julie Tang Presiding. Continued To Apr-04-2008 At 9:30 Am In 303
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 260 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Mar-25-2008 Is Held In Dept. 303, Hon. Julie Tang Presiding. Continued To Apr-02-2008 At 9:30 Am In 303. Plaintiff Counsel To Give Notice.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 259 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Mar-19-2008 Is Held In Dept. 303, Hon. Julie Tang Presiding. Continued To Mar-25-2008 At 9:30 Am In 303. Plaintiff's Counsel To Give Notice.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 258 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Discovery 610, Plaintiff Milton Lipman And Norma Lipman's Motion To Compel Defendant Foster Wheeler Llc's Pmk-cor For Deposition Is Continued To April 10, 2008 At 9:00 A.m. In Department 610. Commissioner Bruce Chan. Not Reported.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 257 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mini-minutes For Mar-17-2008 9:00 Am For Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 256 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Mar-12-2008 Is Hled In Dept.303 Hon. Julie Tang Prersiding. Continued To Mar-19-2008 At 9:30 Am In 303 For Futher Mandatory Settlement Conferences. Plaintiff's Counsel To Give Notice. Courtroom Clerk: Don Feinberg 551-3726
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 255 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mini-minutes For Mar-10-2008 9:00 Am For Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 254 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Discovery 610, Plaintiff Milton Lipman And Norma Lipman's Motion To Compel Defendant Foster Wheeler Llc's Pmk-cor For Deposition Is Continued To March 17, 2008 At 9:00 A.m. In Dept. 610. Commissioner: Bruce E. Chan. Not Reported.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service (as To Defendant S.j
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 18868208) Filed By Defendant S. J. Amoroso Construction Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal With Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 18834696) As To Defendant S. J. Amoroso Construction Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dismissal With Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 18758575) As To Defendant Dome Construction Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 250 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Feb-19-2008 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On May-19-2008 At 11:15 Am In 206 On The Court's Own Motion. Judge: A. James Robertson, Ii; Clerk: D. Lok; Reporter: Susan Lee, Csr #4280 (206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 249 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Asbestos Mandatory Settlement Conference Set For Mar-12-2008 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 303
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Notice Of Entry Of Order Granting San Francisco Jazz Organization Dba
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Granting Mtn For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 18618597) Filed By Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 247 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Removed From Asbestos Mandatory Settlement Conference Calendar On Feb-14-2008 In Dept. 501. Did Not Settle. Judge R. Quidachay, Clerk R. Pascual, Dpet. 501
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 246 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mini-minutes For Feb-13-2008 9:00 Am For Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 245 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Discovery 610, Plaintiff Milton Lipman's Motion To Compel Defendant Foster Wheeler Llc To Produce Its Custodian Of Records And Person Most Knowledgeable For Deposition And To Produce Documents At Deposition. Hearing Held. Matter Was Ordered Continued From Feb-13-2008 To Mar-10-2008, 9:00 Am In Dept. 610. Commissioner: Bruce E. Chan. Not Reported.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Request For Dismissal With Prejudice As To Garlock Sealing Technologie
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal With Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 18576715) As To Defendant Garlock Sealing Technologies, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Defendant Graybar Electric Company's Inc. Motion For Summary Judgment (atty. Alvarado To Serve Opposing Party)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 242 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/8/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Law And Motion 301, Previously Submitted On January 16, 2008, Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Is Granted. Judge: Peter J. Busch
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 2/6/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Request For Dismissal With Prejudice As To Complaint As To Defendant M
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Dismissal With Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 18476824) As To Defendant Mayta & Jensen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 240 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Asbestos Mandatory Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Jan-31-2008 Continued To Feb-14-2008 At 3:00 Pm In 501
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008 Graybar Electric Company, Inc.s General Order No. 154 Asbestos Case St
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Graybar Electric Company, Inc.s General Order No. 154 Asbestos Case Status Report (transaction Id # 18411576)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 238 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Report / General Order 154 Asbestos Case Status Report (transaction Id # 18389862) Filed By Defendant Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 237 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Discovery 610, Plaintiff Milton Lipman's Motion To Compel The Deposition Of The Person Most Knowledgeable Of Defendant Foster Wheeler Is Continued To February 13, 2008 At 9:00 A.m. Commissioner: Bruce E. Chan. Not Reported.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 236 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mini-minutes For Jan-29-2008 9:00 Am For Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Association of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Association Of Attorneys, / Association Of Counsel (transaction Id # 18258159): Vacchina, Leonardo J Added As Attorney For Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.s Notice Of Posting Jury Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Jury Fees, Tran # B7408125j004, Tag # 020111 (transaction Id # 18258144) Deposited By Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Defendant Reliance Electric Companys Notice Of Posting Jury Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Jury Fees, Tran # B7408125j003, Tag # 020110 (transaction Id # 18257880) Deposited By Defendant Reliance Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Companys Notice Of Posting Jury Fee
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Jury Fees, Tran # B7408125j002, Tag # 020109 (transaction Id # 18257522) Deposited By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 18229522) As To Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 230 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mini-minutes For Jan-23-2008 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 229 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Law And Motion 301, Defendant Square D Company's Motion For Summary Judgment. Matter Was Argued. Tentative Ruling Was Adopted As Follows: Granted. Defendant Has Shown That Plaintiff Lacks Evidence Of Exposure To Asbestos For Which Defendant Is Responsible And Plaintiff Has Not Raised A Triable Issue Of Material Fact On That Issue. Defendant's Objection To Plaintiff's Declaration Is Overruled. Defendant's Objections To The Cohen Declaration Are Sustained For Lack Of Foundation To The Extent He Testifies As To Either Plaintiff's Creating Dust On The Job Or The Asbestos Content Of Materials With Which Plaintiff Worked. Prevailing Party Is To Prepare A Form Of Order. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Carol Karen, Csr #8189
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 228 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Jury Fees, Tran # W2108122j005, Tag # 020052 Trust Tag#20052 Deposited By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant G
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 18140290) As To Defendant General Cable Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 226 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Law And Motion, 301, Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Is Off Calendar Per Moving Party. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Carol Karen, Csr #8189
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 225 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Law And Motion, 301, Defendant S.j. Amoroso Construction, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Is Off Calendar Per Moving Party. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Carol Karen, Csr #8189
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 224 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Law And Motion, 301, Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Is Off Calendar Per Moving Party. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Carol Karen, Csr #8189
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 223 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Law And Motion, 301, Defendant General Cable Corporation's Motion For Summary Judgment Is Off Calendar Per Moving Party. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Carol Karen, Csr #8189
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 222 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mini-minutes For Jan-18-2008 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 221 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mini-minutes For Jan-18-2008 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 220 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mini-minutes For Jan-18-2008 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 219 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mini-minutes For Jan-18-2008 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 218 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Asbestos Mandatory Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Jan-16-2008 Continued To Jan-31-2008 At 3:00 Pm In 501
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 217 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mini-minutes For Jan-16-2008 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 216 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Law And Motion, 301, Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.'s Motion For Summary, Submitted On Jan-16-2008 By Peter J. Busch. Matter Was Argued. Taken Under Submission. Each Side Is To Submit An Order In Compliance With Ccp Section 437c(g) For The Court's Consideration. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Carol Karen, Csr #8189
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 18079506) Filed By Defendant Square D Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Reply Brief In Support Of Defendant Square D Companys Motion For Summa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply Brief In Support Of Deft Square D Company's Mo For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 18079506) Filed By Defendant Square D Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Defendant Square D Company???s Objections To Plaintiffs??? Evidence Of
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objections To Pltfs' Evidence Offered In Opposition To Mo For Summary Judgment, Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 18079506) Filed By Defendant Square D Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Supplemental Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Declaration Of Johnny D. Knadler In Support Of Deft Square D Company's Mo For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 18079506) Filed By Defendant Square D Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Proof Of Service By Lexis Nexis E-service Of Stipulation And Order ReCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service By Lexis Nexis E-service Of Stip & Order Re Shortening Briefing Schedule On Deft Square D Company's Mo For Summary Judgement And/or Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 18077965) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 210 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Law And Motion, 301, Defendant Cahill Contractors, Inc. Motion For Summary Judgment, Set For 01/23/08, Is Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 209 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Law And Motion, 301, Defendant Sj Amoroso Construction, Inc's Motion For Summary Judgment, Off Calendar At The Request Of The Moving Party
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 208 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Law And Motion 301, Motion For Summary Judgment Continued From Jan-18-2008 To Law And Motion At Jan-23-2008, 9:30 Am In Dept. 301 Pursuant To January 9, 2008 Ex Parte Order(moving Party: Square D Company).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order --- Stipulation And Order Re Shortening Briefing Schedule On Defendant Square D Company's Motion For Summary Judgment And/or Summary Adjudication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Proof Of Service By Lexis-nexis E-service Of Plaintiffs??? Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service By Lexis-nexis E-service Of Plaintiffs Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Defendant Square D Companys Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication; Declaration Of John B. Goldstein In Support Of Plaintiffs Opposition; Plaintiffs Separate Statement Of Disputed Material Facts In Opposition; Plaintiffs Response To Defendant Square (transaction Id # 17970304) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Plaintiffs Response To Defendant Square D Company???s Separate Stateme
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiffs Response To Defendant Square D Company's Separate Statement Of Undisputed Facts (transaction Id # 17970304) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Plaintiffs Separate Statement Of Disputed Material Facts In Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Separate Statement Of Facts (transaction Id # 17970304) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration Of John B. Goldstein In Support Of Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendant Square D Companys Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 17970304) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Plaintiffs’ Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To De
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum Of Points And Authorities (transaction Id # 17970304) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 201 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Report / General Order 154 Asbestos Case Status Report (transaction Id # 17962783) Filed By Defendant General Cable Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Graybar Electric Company, Inc.s Evidentiary Objections, Responses To P
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Evidentiary Objections, Responses To Plaintiffs Separate Statement Of Alleged Disputed Facts (transaction Id # 17962547) Filed By Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Reply To Plaintiffs Opposition To Graybar Electric Company, Inc.s Moti
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply To Pltfs' Opposition To Mo For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 17962547) Filed By Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 198 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Discovery 612, Plaintiff Milton Lipman's Motion To Compel Deft Foster Wheeler Llc, To Produce Its Custodian Of Records And Person Most Knowledgeable For Deposition, & To Produce Documents At Deposition Continued From Jan-17-2008 To Discovery At Jan-29-2008, 9:00 Am In Dept. 610, To Be Heard By Commissioner Chan With Related Cases.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Stipulation And Order Re Shortening Briefing Schedule On Defendant SquCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Filing Fee Paid On Stipulation And Order Re Shortening Briefing Schedule On Defendant Square D Company???s Motion For Summary Judgement And Or Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 17959823) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Joinder In Motions In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joinder In Motions In Limine (transaction Id # 17951445) Filed By Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Joinder In Motions In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Joinder In Motions In Limine (transaction Id # 17951141) Filed By Defendant Cahill Contractors, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 194 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Law And Motion 301, Motion For Summary Judgment Continued From Jan-18-2008 To Law And Motion At Jan-23-2008, 9:30 Am In Dept. 301 Pursuant To January 3, 2008 Ex Parte Order(moving Party: Cahill Contractors, Inc.).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order --- Stipulation And Order Granting Plaintiff An Extension Of Time To File And Serve The Opposition To Cahill Contractors, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008 Stipulation And Order Granting Plaintiff???s An Extension Of Time To F
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Fee Paid On Stipulation And Order Granting Plaintiff's An Extension Of Time To File And Serve The Opposition To Cahill Contractors Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 17870628) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008 Plaintiffs’ Separate Statement Of Disputed Material Facts In Opposit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Separate Statement Of Facts (transaction Id # 17868870) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008 Plaintiffs Response To Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.???s Se
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiffs Response To Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.s Separate Statement Of Undisputed Facts (transaction Id # 17868870) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Juliet K. Nguyen In Support Of Plaintiffs??? Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.???s Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 17868870) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008 Plaintiffs’ Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To De
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum Of Points And Authorities (transaction Id # 17868870) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service On Notice Of Motion To Compel Deft Foster Wheeler Llc To Produce Its Custodian Of Recoreds; Memo Of P & A & Decl In Support Thereof; Separate Statement Of Disputed Issues (transaction Id # 17726540) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Separate Statement Of Disputed Issues Re: Production Of Foster Wheeler
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Separate Statement Of Disputed Issues Re: Production Of Foster Wheeler Llc's Custodian(s) Of Records & Person(s) Most Knowledgeable For Deposition (transaction Id # 17726540) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration Of John B. Goldstein In Support Of Motion To Compel Deft Foster Wheeler Llc To Produce Its Custodian(s) Of Records And Person(s) Most Knowledgeable For Deposition, & To Produce Documents At Deposition (transaction Id # 17726540) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Plaintiffs’ Motio
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities (transaction Id # 17726540) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Defendant Foster Wheeler, Llc To
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Motion & Motion To Compel Deft Foster Wheeler Llc, To Produce Its Custodian Of Records And Person Most Knowledgeable For Deposition, & To Produce Documents At Deposition (transaction Id # 17726540) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma Hearing Set For Jan-17-2008 At 09:00 Am In Dept 612
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 17031679) As To Defendant Pacific Gas And Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dismissal With Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 17023474) As To Defendant J.t. Thorpe & Son, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 16978386) As To Defendant Tutor-saliba Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 179 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration Of Jeremy D. Huie In Support F Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.s Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 16962549) Filed By Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.???s Separate Statement Of Undisp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.???s Separate Statement Of Undisputed Facts (transaction Id # 16962549) Filed By Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.???s Memorandum Of Points And Aut
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.???s Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 16962549) Filed By Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.???s Notice Of Motion And Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 16962549) Filed By Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. Hearing Set For Jan-18-2008 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007 Notice Of Errata (by S.j. Amoroso Construction, Inc.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Errata (by S.j. Amoroso Construction, Inc.) (transaction Id # 16941665) Filed By Defendant S.j. Amoroso Construction, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Defendant S. J. Amoroso Construction, Inc.???s Amended Notice Of Motio
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 16924358) Filed By Defendant S.j. Amoroso Construction, Inc. Hearing Set For Jan-18-2008 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof Of Service Of Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 16922178) Filed By Defendant S.j. Amoroso Construction, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Defendant S. J. Amoroso Construction, Inc.???s Memorandum Of Points An
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 16922178) Filed By Defendant S.j. Amoroso Construction, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration Of Drexwell M. Jones In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 16922178) Filed By Defendant S.j. Amoroso Construction, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Separate Statement Of Undisputed Facts In Support Of Defendant S. J. A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Separate Statement Of Undisputed Facts In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 16922178) Filed By Defendant S.j. Amoroso Construction, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 16922178) Filed By Defendant S.j. Amoroso Construction, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Defendant S. J. Amoroso Construction, Inc.???s Notice Of Motion For Su
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 16922178) Filed By Defendant S.j. Amoroso Construction, Inc. Hearing Set For Jan-18-2008 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 16905883) Filed By Defendant Cahill Contractors, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Exhibits F G To The Index Of Exhibits (transaction Id # 16905883) Filed By Defendant Cahill Contractors, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Index Of Exhibits In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Index Of Exhibits In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 16905883) Filed By Defendant Cahill Contractors, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration Of Cesar A. Alvarado (transaction Id # 16905883) Filed By Defendant Cahill Contractors, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Separate Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Separate Statement Of Facts In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment(transaction Id # 16905883) Filed By Defendant Cahill Contractors, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment(transaction Id # 16905883) Filed By Defendant Cahill Contractors, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 16905883) Filed By Defendant Cahill Contractors, Inc. Hearing Set For Jan-18-2008 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration Of Jeremy D. Huie In Support Of Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.s Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 16898195) Filed By Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.???s Separate Statement Of Undisp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Separate Statement Of Facts (transaction Id # 16898195) Filed By Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.???s Memorandum Of Points And Aut
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum Of Points And Authorities (transaction Id # 16898195) In Supp Of Mo For Sum Judgt Filed By Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.???s Notice Of Motion And Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 16898195) Filed By Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. Hearing Set For Jan-18-2008 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Proof Of Service-msj
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service - Msj (transaction Id # 16893011) Filed By Defendant Square D Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Exhibits E Through I To Declaration Of Johnny D. Knadler In Support Of Defendant Square D Company???s Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 16893011) Filed By Defendant Square D Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibits A Through D To Declaration Of Johnny D. Knadler In Support Of Defendant Square D Company???s Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 16893011) Filed By Defendant Square D Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Johnny D. Knadler In Support Of Defendant Square D Companys Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 16893011) Filed By Defendant Square D Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Separate Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts And Supporting Evidenc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Separate Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts And Supporting Evidence In Support Of Defendant Square D Company???s Motion For Summary Judgment, Or, In The Alternative, For Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 16893011) Filed By Defendant Square D Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Defendant Square D?
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Defendant Square D Company???s Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication (transaction Id # 16893011) Filed By Defendant Square D Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 16893011) Filed By Defendant Square D Company Hearing Set For Jan-18-2008 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Susan E. Klinepier In Support Of Defendant General Cable Corporations Motion For Summary Judgment (exhibits A Through F) (transaction Id # 16886243) Filed By Defendant General Cable Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Separate Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts And Evidence In Suppor
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Separate Statement Of Facts In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment(transaction Id # 16886243) Filed By Defendant General Cable Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Defendant General C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment(transaction Id # 16886243) Filed By Defendant General Cable Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Defendant General Cable Corporations Notice Of Motion And Motion For S
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 16886243) Filed By Defendant General Cable Corporation Hearing Set For Jan-18-2008 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal Of Frank Portman Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 16876859) Filed By Defendant Frank Portman Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 16856952) Filed By Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Exhibits F G To The Index Of Exhibits (transaction Id # 16856952) Filed By Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Index Of Exhibits In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Index Of Exhibits In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 16856952) Filed By Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Jocelyn M. Soriano In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 16856952) Filed By Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Separate Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Separate Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts (transaction Id # 16856952) Filed By Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum Of Points And Authorities (transaction Id # 16856952) Filed By Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion For Summary Judgment (transaction Id # 16856952) Filed By Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc. Hearing Set For Jan-16-2008 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Request For Dimissal (frank Portman Co.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 16846868) As To Defendant Frank Portman Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Dismissal As To Defendant Eaton Electrical Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 16844978) As To Defendant Eaton Electrical Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 16839577) As To Defendant Fdcc California, Inc., Sii To Dinwiddie Construction Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 Request For Dismssal As To Defendant Union Carbide Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 16818955) As To Defendant Union Carbide Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 16815489) As To Defendant The Okonite Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 16784594) As To Defendant Osram Sylvania Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Companys Answer To First Amended Co
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 16395216) Filed By Defendant Federal Pacific Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal With Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 15997302) As To Defendant Thomas Dee Engineering Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service (transaction Id # 15831347) Filed By Defendant Douglass Insulation Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 Douglass Insulation Company, Inc.s Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 15831347) Filed By Defendant Douglass Insulation Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Substitution Of Attorney On Behalf Of Sj Amoroso Construction, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Substitution Of Attorney, (transaction Id # 15672002): Buty, Madeline L Substituted For Prindle, Kenneth B As Attorney For S.j. Amoroso Construction, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 126 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Removed From Asbestos Case Management Conference Calendar On Jun-21-2007. Assigned To Dept. 206 On Feb-19-2008 At 11:15 Am For Trial. Assigned For Mandatory Settlement In Dept. 501 On Jan-16-2008 At 1:30 Pm. Brayton Group 423 Liv/asb. Plaintiff(s) Offer/demand Due 2 Weeks Before Settlement Conference. Defendant(s) Counter Offer/demand Due 1 Week Before Settlement Conference. G.o. 154 Applies. Statement Timeline Pursuant To Provisions Of G.o. 154. A Copy Shall Be Given To Settlement Judge The Same Day Of Exchange With Opposing Party.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amendment To 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 15282846) Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 9 To Be Federal Pacific Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 15237415) As To Defendant Quintec Industries, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Substitution Of Attorney, (transaction Id # 15146213): Rowland, John Arthur Substituted For Piasta Joseph A As Attorney For Frank Portman Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Substitution Of Attorney, (transaction Id # 14857645): Keele, Christopher A. Substituted For Keele, Christopher A. As Attorney For Reliance Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Tic-sub. Of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Substitution Of Attorney, (transaction Id # 14525824): Sharp, Gary D Substituted For Wah, Douglas Garth As Attorney For Thorpe Insulation Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007 Proof Of Service By Electronic Means
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service By Electronic Transmission Re: Ntc Of And Objections To Pltfs' Ntc Of Taking Deposition Of Deft The Okonite Co, Inc. And Req For Production Of Docs (transaction Id # 14311565) Filed By Defendant The Okonite Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/2/2007 Notice Of Objections And Objections To Plaintiffs Notice Of Taking Dep
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Objections And Objections To Pltfs' Ntc Of Taking Deposition Of Deft The Okonite Co, Inc. And Req For Production Of Docs (transaction Id # 14311565) Filed By Defendant The Okonite Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007 Defendant Thorpe Insulation Companys Objections To Plaintiffs Notice O
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant Thorpe Insulation Companys Objections To Plaintiffs Notice Of Taking Deposition And Request For Production Of Documents Of Person(s) Most Knowledgeable And Custodian(s) Of Records (transaction Id # 14273387)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007 Substitutionof Attorney -civil
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Substitution Of Attorney, (transaction Id # 14247478): Keele, Christopher A. Substituted For Keele, Christopher A. As Attorney For Rockwell Automation, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: 2/27/2007 Notice Of Change Of Address & Phone Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Change Of Address (transaction Id # 13948425) Filed By Attorney Gill, Raymond Lawrence
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Memorandum Of Costs (summary) Re Nevada Lumber Company Of Tahoe Valley
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum Of Costs And Disbursements, $3,156.81 Total Costs, Mature Date Mar-12-2007,, (transaction Id # 13913307) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/16/2007, Entered: 2/16/2007 Notice Of Entry Of Clerks Judgment Pursuant To Ccp Section 998
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Entry Of Clerks Judgment Pursuant To Ccp Section 998 (transaction Id # 13844593)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 113 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Discovery, 612, Notice Of Motion To Compel Further Responses To Requests For Admission And Corresponding Form Interrogatories And For Reimbursement Of Reasonable Attorneys Fees And Costs Off Calendar Per The Moving Party.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007 Compromise Of Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Pursuant To C.c.p. 998 Offer And Acceptance Entered: It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma Recover From Defendant Nevada Lumber Company Of Tahoe Valley $29,998.00 Principal, Total Judgment $29,998.00, $19,999.00 As To Milton Lipman And $9,999.00 As To Norma Lipman; See Scanned Document, (transaction Id # 13830156)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 13829348) As To Defendant Potter Electric, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 110 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: 2/15/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Continued From Asbestos Status Conference Calendar On Feb-15-2007 To Asbestos Case Management Conference Calendar On Jun-21-2007 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 206.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 Notice Of Acceptance By Defendant Nevada Lumber Of Offer To Compromise
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Acceptance Of Offer To Compromise Judgment Ccp 998 (transaction Id # 13699911) Filed By Defendant Nevada Lumber Company Of Tahoe Valley
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 Plaintiffs Offer To Compromise Pursuant To Ccp 998 Re Nevada Lumber
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Offer To Compromise Pursuant To Ccp 998 Re Nevada Lumber (transaction Id # 13699911) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Request for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request To Enter Default Filed/default Entered (transaction Id # 13672223) As To Defendant City Electric
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Statement Of Damages For Norma Lipman
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statement Of Damages For Norma Lipman (transaction Id # 13672223) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Norma As To Defendant City Electric
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Statement Of Damages For Milton Lipman
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statement Of Damages For Milton Lipman (transaction Id # 13672223) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton As To Defendant City Electric
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/1/2007 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service Of Proof Of Service Of Summons, 1st Amended Complaint, Statement Of Damages And Amendment To Complaint (transaction Id # 13672223) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Served Oct-18-2006, Personal Service On Defendant City Electric
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/30/2007 Portman Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case Management Statement (transaction Id # 13641979) Filed By Defendant Frank Portman Co. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 60.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: 1/29/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Dismissal With Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 13620293) As To Defendant Viacom Corp. Sbm To Cbs Corp, Fka Westinghouse Electric Corp.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dismissal With Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 13599559) As To Defendant Marconi Platering Co., Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Defendant Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.???s Answer To Fir
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 13525377) Filed By Defendant Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Defendant J.s. Guerin And Cos Objection To Plaintiffs Offer To Comprom
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection To Plaintiffs Offer To Compromise (transaction Id # 13427949) Filed By Defendant J.s. Guerin & Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Defendant S.f. Gravel Cos Objection To Plaintiffs Offer To Compromise
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Objection To Plaintiffs Offer To Compromise (transaction Id # 13427949) Filed By Defendant San Francisco Gravel Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: 1/11/2007 Reliance Electric Companys Answer To First Amended Complaint For Perso
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 13426287) Filed By Defendant Reliance Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Notice Of Change Of Firm Name
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Change Of Firm Name (transaction Id # 13376036) Filed By Attorney Gill, Raymond Lawrence
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 Request for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request To Enter Default Filed/default Entered (transaction Id # 13337768) As To Defendant Pearson & Johnson General Contractors, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 Statement Of Damages For Norma Lipman
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statement Of Damages For Norma Lipman (transaction Id # 13337768) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Norma As To Defendant Pearson & Johnson General Contractors, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 Statement Of Damages For Milton Lipman
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statement Of Damages For Milton Lipman (transaction Id # 13337768) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton As To Defendant Pearson & Johnson General Contractors, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons On Complaint On 1st Amended Complaint , Statement Of Damages, Amendment To Complaint (transaction Id # 13337768), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma Served Oct-17-2006, Personal Service On Defendant Pearson & Johnson General Contractors, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 Request for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request To Enter Default Filed/default Entered (transaction Id # 13337041) As To Defendant Bayside Electrical Distributors, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 Statement Of Damages For Norma Lipman
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statement Of Damages For Norma Lipman (transaction Id # 13337041) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Norma As To Defendant Bayside Electrical Distributors, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 Satement Of Damages For Milton Lipman
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Satement Of Damages For Milton Lipman (transaction Id # 13337041) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton As To Defendant Bayside Electrical Distributors, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: 1/3/2007 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service Of Proof Of Service Of Summons, 1st Amended Complaint/summons, Statement Of Damages And Amendment To Complaint (transaction Id # 13337041) Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Served Oct-17-2006, Personal Service On Defendant Bayside Electrical Distributors, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/2/2007, Entered: 1/2/2007 Amendment To Complaint - Doe 8
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amendment To 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 13318929) Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 8 To Be National Electric Supply Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Molly A. Gilardi In Support Of Motion To Compel Further Responses To Requests For Admission And Corresponding Form Interrogatories And For Reimbursement Of Reasonable Attorneys Fees And Costs (transaction Id # 13280405) Filed By Defendant Swinerton Builders Fka Swinerton & Walberg Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006 Separate Statement Of Facts In Support Of Motion To Compel Further Res
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Separate Statement Of Facts (transaction Id # 13280405) In Support Of Mtn To Compel Further Responses To Req. For Admission And Corresponding Form Interrogatories And For Reimbursement Of Reasonable Attorneys Fees & Costs Filed By Defendant Swinerton Builders Fka Swinerton & Walberg Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion To Compel Fu
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum Of Points And Authorities (transaction Id # 13280405) In Support Of Mtn To Compel Further Responses To Req. For Admission And Corresponding Form Interrogatories And For Reimbursement Of Reasonable Attorneys Fees & Costs Filed By Defendant Swinerton Builders Fka Swinerton & Walberg Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006 Notice Of Motion To Compel Further Responses To Requests For Admission
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Motion To Compel Further Responses To Requests For Admission And Corresponding Form Interrogatories And For Reimbursement Of Reasonable Attorneys Fees And Costs (transaction Id # 13280405) Filed By Defendant Swinerton Builders Fka Swinerton & Walberg Co. Hearing Set For Feb-23-2007 At 10:30 Am In Dept 612
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: 12/4/2006 Amendment To Complaint - Doe 6-7
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amendment To 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 13082915) Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 6 To Be Consolidated Electrical Disribution, Inc. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 7 To Be Reliance Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 Request For Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Dismissal With Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 13072002) As To Defendant Webcor Builders, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: 11/8/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To Complaint (transaction Id # 12865025) Filed By Defendant Cahill Contractors, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: 11/7/2006 Association Of Counsel For Defendant Honeywell International Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Association Of Attorneys, (transaction Id # 12844362): Hamblett, Robert Mitchell Added As Attorney For Honeywell International, Inc., Fka Alliedsignal, Inc., Successor-in-interest To The Bendix Corporation ("honeywell")
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 78 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Continued From Asbestos Status Conference Calendar On Oct-19-2006 To Asbestos Case Management Conference Calendar On Feb-15-2007 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 206.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 Amendment To Complaint - Doe 1-5, 1001-1003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amendment To 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 12612646) Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1 And 1001 To Be Pearson & Johnson General Contractors, Inc. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 2 To Be Bayside Electrical Distributors, Inc. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 3 And 1002 To Be Cahill Contractors, Inc. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 4 And 1003 To Be City Electric Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 5 To Be National Electric Supply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: 10/6/2006 Partial Request For Dismissal As To Defendant Foster Wheeler, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice From The Third Cause Of Action (false Representation) And For All Punitive Damages Only.(transaction Id # 12569237) As To Defendant Foster Wheeler, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Case Management Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Management Statement (transaction Id # 12514127) Filed By Defendant Frank Portman Co. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 60.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: 9/29/2006 Case Management Statement Of Nevada Lumber Company Of Tahoe Valley
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Management Statement (transaction Id # 12502310) Filed By Defendant Nevada Lumber Company Of Tahoe Valley Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/14/2006, Entered: 9/14/2006 Lipman - Change Of Address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Change Of Address (transaction Id # 12366456) Filed By Attorney Conway, Patricia Kantor
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 Objection To Stipulation Of Hearing By Commissioner Everett A. Hewlett
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection To Stipulation Of Hearing By Commissioner Everett A. Hewlett (transaction Id # 12280293) Filed By Defendant Foster Wheeler, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 Objection To Court Commissioner Acting As Judge Pro Tempore At Trial;Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection To Court Commissioner Acting As Judge Pro Tempore At Trial (transaction Id # 12280293) Filed By Defendant Foster Wheeler, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 12280293) Filed By Defendant Foster Wheeler, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 69 Filed: 8/1/2006, Entered: 8/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Association Of Attorneys: Vacchina, Leonardo J Added As Attorney For Fdcc California, Inc. (formerly Known As Dinwiddie Construction Company)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 68 Filed: 7/26/2006, Entered: 7/26/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Substitution Of Attorney: Bassi, Marte Joseph Substituted For Wallace, John Robert As Attorney For Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 67 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: 7/20/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Association Of Attorneys: Vacchina, Leonardo J Added As Attorney For Swinerton Builders Fka Swinerton & Walberg Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: 7/19/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant General Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Nevada Lumber Company Of Tahoe Valley
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Webcor Builders Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To 1st Amended Complaint (transaction Id # 11796232) Filed By Defendant Frank Portman Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: 7/12/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Mayta & Jensen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: 7/10/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant S.j. Amoroso Construction, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: 7/7/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Tutor-saliba Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection To Stipulating To Jurisdiction Of Commissioners In All Matters Filed By Defendant Swinerton Builders Fka Swinerton & Walberg Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Swinerton Builders Fka Swinerton & Walberg Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: 6/30/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Fdcc California, Inc. (formerly Known As Dinwiddie Construction Company)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant General Cable Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006 Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Osram Sylvania Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 54 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection To Hearing By Commissioner/pro Tem Acting As Judge Filed By Defendant General Cable Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 53 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: 6/29/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Demand For Jury Filed By Defendant General Cable Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 52 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Continued From Asbestos Status Conference Calendar On Oct-18-2006 To Asbestos Case Management Conference Calendar On Oct-19-2006 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 206. Calendared In Error. Status Conference Should Be Heard On Brayton Day. (206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Eaton Electrical Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 Summons Issued To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued To Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: 5/31/2006 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          1st Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma As To Defendant Asbestos Defendants (b*p)as Reflected On Exhibits B,b-i,c,h,i Does 1-8500
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Leave To File First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Law And Motion 301, The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling As Follows: Plaintiffs Milton Lipman And Norma Lipman's Motion For Order Granting Leave To File First Amended Complaint Was Granted. No Opposition Filed. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: James L. Warren, Reporter: Christina Paxton, Csr #1558
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mini-minutes For May-30-2006 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Substitution Of Attorney: Storm, Lucinda L Substituted For Burke Steven P As Attorney For Pacific Gas And Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn For Order Granting Leave To File First Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma Hearing Set For May-30-2006 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 43 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Parker-hannifin Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/22/2006, Entered: 2/22/2006 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Thorpe Insulation Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order On Stipulation Re: Release Of Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 2/7/2006, Entered: 2/7/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Substitution Of Attorney: Keele, Christopher A. Substituted For Beers, David Booth As Attorney For Rockwell Automation, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection To Hearing By Commissioner/pro Tem Acting As Judge Filed By Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Demand For Jury And Estimate Length Of Trial Filed By Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Thomas Dee Engineering Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection To Judge Pro Tem And/or Commissioner Assignment Filed By Defendant Eaton Electrical Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Eaton Electrical Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Demand For Trial By Jury And Estmate Of Length Of Trial Filed By Defendant General Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: 12/16/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant General Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: 12/9/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant J.t. Thorpe & Son, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 12/8/2005, Entered: 12/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Substitution Of Attorney: Hamblett, Robert Mitchell Substituted For Colombatto, Paul Richard As Attorney For General Cable Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection To Stipulation Of Hrg By Commissioner Hewlett Filed By Defendant Viacom Inc Successor By Merger To Cbs Corporation Fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection To Hearing By Commissioner/pro Tem Acting As Judge Filed By Defendant Viacom Inc Successor By Merger To Cbs Corporation Fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Demand For Jury & Estimate Of Length Of Trial Filed By Defendant Viacom Inc Successor By Merger To Cbs Corporation Fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Viacom Inc Successor By Merger To Cbs Corporation Fka Westinghouse Electric Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Union Carbide Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection To Stip Of Hrg By Court Commissioner Filed By Defendant San Francisco Gravel Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant San Francisco Gravel Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection To Stip Of Hrg By Court Commissioner Filed By Defendant J.s. Guerin & Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection To Stip Of Hrg By Court Commissioner Filed By Defendant J.s. Guerin & Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant J.s. Guerin & Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection To Hearing By Commissioner/pro Tem Acting As Judge Filed By Defendant Union Carbide Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection To Stipulation Of Hearing By Commissioner Everett A. Hewlett Filed By Defendant Union Carbide Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection To Hearing By Commissioner/pro Tem Acting As Judge At Trial Filed By Defendant Osram Sylvania Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Demand For Jury Trial Filed By Defendant Osram Sylvania Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Pacific Gas And Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Osram Sylvania Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Graybar Electric Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Demand For Jury Trial Filed By Defendant Square D Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service By Mail Of Answer To Complaint; Demand For Jury Trial Filed By Defendant Square D Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: 11/30/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Square D Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Honeywell International, Inc., Fka Alliedsignal, Inc., Successor-in-interest To The Bendix Corporation ("honeywell")
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant The Okonite Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant General Cable Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Potter Electric, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Asbestos, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma As To Defendant Asbestos Defendants (b*p)as Reflected On Exhibits B,b-i,c,h,i Does 1-8500 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Oct-18-2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 10/20/2005, Entered: 10/20/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Preliminary Fact Sheet/new Filing/asbestos Litigation Filed By Plaintiff Lipman, Milton Lipman, Norma

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 154 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?