Russell Brimer v. Thinkgeek,inc., et al

State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 05 447209
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Brimer, Russell, Plaintiff

Represented by Hirst & Chanler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chanler, Clifford A +1 203 984 2156
v.
No Logo Does 1 Through 150,inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Ostig,inc., Defendant

Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rodney G Strickland, Jr +1 650 320 4857 +1 650 565 5100 rstrickland@wsgr.com
No Logo Thinkgeek, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rodney G Strickland, Jr +1 650 320 4857 +1 650 565 5100 rstrickland@wsgr.com
No Logo Va Software Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rodney G Strickland, Jr +1 650 320 4857 +1 650 565 5100 rstrickland@wsgr.com
Attributes
Cause of Action Injunctive Relief
Timeline
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
Case Management Conference Of May-05-2006 Is Off Calendar Dismissal Filed. Notice Sent By Court.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/22/2006, Entered: 3/22/2006 Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action
Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action Without Prejudice
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Answer
Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Ostig,inc.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Answer
Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Thinkgeek,inc.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/4/2006, Entered: 1/4/2006 Answer
Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Va Software Corporation
Request RequestSpace
Blank 4 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005
Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Brimer, Russell Served Dec-05-2005, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Thinkgeek,inc. Va Software Corporation
Request RequestSpace
Blank 3 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005
Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Brimer, Russell Served Dec-05-2005, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Ostig,inc.
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Notice To Plaintiff
Notice To Plaintiff
Request RequestSpace
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005 Complaint
Injunctive Relief, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Brimer, Russell As To Defendant Thinkgeek,inc. Ostig,inc. Va Software Corporation Does 1 Through 150,inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For May-05-2006 Proof Of Service Due On Jan-30-2006 Case Management Statement Due On Apr-20-2006
Request RequestSpace

Statistics

This case has been viewed 27 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?