Tajuanya Daniels v. Tishman Speyer Properties Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 06 454180
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Daniels, Tajuanya, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by John A Pettis & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pettis, John Alroy +1 510 229 0900

Toggle Switch Represented by Mitchell Chyette

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chyette, Mitchell +1 415 982 6800

Toggle Switch Represented by Tanner, Rod K.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rod Kenneth Tanner +1 650 341 2123 +1 650 376 3660 rodtanner@comcast.net
v.
No Logo Does 1-20, Defendant
No Logo Otis Elevator Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ericksen, Arbuthnot, Kilduff, Day & Linstrom, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Farrah, Julie Driscoll +1 415 362 7126
Tishman Speyer Properties Tishman Speyer Properties, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ralph Wells Robinson +1 415 433 0990 +1 415 434 1370 Ralph.Robinson@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Tishman Speyer Properties, LP, Defendant
Unknown Role, Speyer, Jerry I.

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ralph Wells Robinson +1 415 433 0990 +1 415 434 1370 Ralph.Robinson@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Moes 1through 20, Inclusive, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Otis Elevator Company, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ericksen, Arbuthnot, Kilduff, Day & Linstrom, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Farrah, Julie Driscoll +1 415 362 7126
No Logo Tishman Speyer Properties, LP, Cross-Defendant
Unknown Role, Speyer, Jerry I.
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007
Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Tishman Speyer Properties Tishman Speyer Properties L. P.
    Legal Document 36 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Otis Elevator
    Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Otis Elevator Company Filed By Otis Elevator Company On April 13, 2007
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Tishman Speyer Properties,
      Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Tishman Speyer Properties L. P. Tishman Speyer Properties, Lp On January 25, 2007
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 34 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007
        Master Jury Calendar Set For Oct-01-2007 Vacated. Dismissals On File. (206)
          Blank 33 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007
          Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Sep-17-2007 - Dismissal Filed.
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Dismissal
            Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007 Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Otis Elevator Company On
              Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Otis Elevator Company Otis Elevator Company On April 13, 2007
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Tishman Speyer Properties,
                Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Tishman Speyer Properties L. P. Tishman Speyer Properties, Lp On January 25, 2007 As To Cross Defendant Otis Elevator Company
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 29 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007
                  Discovery 610, Defendant Tishman Speyer Properties' Motion To Compel Responses To Form Interrogatories Is Taken Off Calendar, At The Request Of The Moving Party. Commissioner: Bruce E. Chan.
                    Blank 28 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007
                    Mini-minutes For Jul-24-2007 9:00 Am For Dept 610
                      Blank 27 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007
                      Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Responses To Form Interrogatories, Set One, And Request For Production Of Documents, Set One, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Tishman Speyer Properties L. P. Hearing Set For Jul-24-2007 At 09:00 Am In Dept 610
                        Blank 26 Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: 6/22/2007
                        Notice Of Lien Filed By Lien Claimant State Of California, Department Of Transportation
                          Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007 Association Of Attorneys
                          Association Of Attorneys, With Proof Of Service By Mail: Chyette Mitchell Added As Attorney For Daniels, Tajuanya
                            Blank 24 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007
                            Order To Show Cause To Plaintiff's Counsel John Pettis And Defendant's Counsel Julie Farrah For Failure To Comply With San Francisco Superior Court Early Settlement Program Policies And Procedures No. 4. (administrative Fee) Is Ordered Off Calendar/fee Paid. Proceedings Reported By: Helen Sorep-matley, Csr#9225. (212)
                              Blank 23 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007
                              Mini-minutes For Jun-14-2007 10:30 Am For Dept 212
                                Blank 22 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007
                                Termination Of Association Of Counsel Filed By Plaintiff Daniels, Tajuanya
                                  Blank 21 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007
                                  Notice Of Payment Of Fees For Early Settlement Program, Response To Order To Show Cause And Declaration Of John A Pettis Filed By Pltf
                                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Notice Of Early Settlement Conference--early Settlement Prgm
                                    Amended Notice Of Early Settlement Conference - Early Settlement Program
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/8/2007 Miscellaneous Order To Show Cause (1)
                                      Order To Show Cause To John A. Pettis, And Julie D. Farrah Set For Jun-14-2007 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212 For Failure To Comply With San Francisco Superior Court Early Settlement Program Policies And Procedures No 4. Notice Sent By Court.
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 18 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007
                                        Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Otis Elevator Company As To Cross Defendant Tishman Speyer Properties L. P. Moes 1through 20, Inclusive
                                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007 Answer
                                          Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Otis Elevator Company
                                            Blank 16 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007
                                            Association Of Attorneys: Tanner, Rod K. Added As Attorney For Daniels, Tajuanya
                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: 3/20/2007 Notice Of Early Settlement Conference--early Settlement Prgm
                                              Notice Of Early Settlement Conference - Early Settlement Program
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Oct-01-2007 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Sep-17-2007 At 3:30 Pm In Department 318. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007
                                                  Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Jul-05-2007 - By Court.
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: 1/25/2007 Cross Complaint
                                                    Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Tishman Speyer Properties L. P. As To Cross Defendant Otis Elevator Company
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: 1/24/2007
                                                      Notice Of Defendant Otis Elevator Company's Objection To Trial Date
                                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                        Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Jul-05-2007 At 3:30 Pm In Department 318. Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Jul-23-2007 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Order To Show Cause On Jan-29-2007 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006
                                                          Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Tishman Speyer Properties L. P. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 Answer
                                                            Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Tishman Speyer Properties L. P.
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006 Order to Show Cause
                                                              Order To Show Cause Set For Jan-29-2007 In Department 212 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) Otis Elevator Company. The Dec-15-2006 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006
                                                                Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Daniels, Tajuanya Estimated Time For Trial: 2.0 Days
                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/19/2006 Answer
                                                                  Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Otis Elevator Company
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/6/2006
                                                                    Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Daniels, Tajuanya Served Aug-23-2006, Personal Service On Defendant Tishman Speyer Properties
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 8/31/2006, Entered: 8/31/2006
                                                                      Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Daniels, Tajuanya Served Aug-22-2006, Personal Service On Defendant Otis Elevator Company
                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                        Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Complaint
                                                                          Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Daniels, Tajuanya As To Defendant Tishman Speyer Properties Otis Elevator Company Does 1-20 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Not Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Dec-15-2006 Proof Of Service Due On Sep-12-2006 Case Management Statement Due On Nov-30-2006

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 106 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?