Romona Gabriel v. June Armstead Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 06 454190
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Gabriel, Romona, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurlander & Burton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Glen Burton +1 415 777 8682
v.
No Logo Armstead, June Individually And Dba Body Soul & Spirit Salon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Does 1 To 50, Defendant
No Logo Armstead, June Individually And Dba Body Soul & Spirit Salon, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Banks, Stephanie Aka Dartania Banks, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Dartagne Banks Aka Dartane Banks, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Mi Amor Hair Salon, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Robinson, Mia Dba Mi Amor Hair Designs, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Roes 1 To 50, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Mi Amor Hair Salon,  
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (5) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 49 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Order Dismissing Case Pursuant To Crc 3.1385
Case Dismissed By Court At Order To Show Cause Hearing May-13-2008 At 10:00am Pursuant To Crc 3.1385. This Dismissal Pertains To The Remaining Cross Complaint(s). Notice Sent By Court.
    Blank 48 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008
    Mini-minutes For May-13-2008 10:00 Am For Dept 212
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008 Dismissal
      Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint And Entire Action
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
        Removed From Master Jury Calendar Set For Mar-10-2008. Case Settled Per Plaintiff And Cross Complainant's Counsel. Notice Assigned To Pretrial Dept. 212 On May-13-2008 At 10:00 Am For Dismissal Per Crc 3.1385. (206)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document 45 Filed: 3/7/2008, Entered: 3/7/2008 Notice of Settlement
          Notice Of Settlement Filed By Plaintiff Gabriel, Romona
            Blank 44 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008
            Jury Fees, Tran # W2108213j016, Tag # 020239 Trust Receipt No. 20239 Deposited By Defendant Armstead, June Individually And Dba Body Soul & Spirit Salon
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
              Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Mar-10-2008 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Notice Sent By Court.
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 42 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007
                Objection Hearing Nov-09-2007 (212)
                  Blank 41 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007
                  Objection To Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial Filed By Plaintiff Gabriel, Romona
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial After Trial De Novo Request
                    Case Removed From Pending Trial De Novo Calendar - Set For Trial If Objection: Hearing Set For Nov-09-2007 At 09:30 Am In Dept 212 Jury Trial Set For Feb-19-2008 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 39 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007
                      Trial De Novo Filed By Plaintiff Gabriel, Romona Case Management Conference Of Nov-30-2007 Is Off Calendar
                        Blank 38 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                        Amended Award Filed By Arbitrator
                          Legal Document 37 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Order Setting Case Management Conference
                          Case Management Conference On Nov-30-2007 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. For Judgment, Dismissal Or Trial De Novo. Sep-24-2007 Arbitration Osc Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                            Blank 36 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007
                            Arbitrator's Fee Statement Sent To Accounting For Shapson, Mitchell Alan
                              Blank 35 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007
                              Award Filed By Arbitrator
                                Blank 34 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007
                                Response To Order To Show Cause Re Arbitration Filed By Plaintiff Gabriel, Romona
                                  Blank 33 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007
                                  Response To Order To Show Cause Hearing Re: Arbitration Filed By Defendant Armstead, June Individually And Dba Body Soul & Spirit Salon
                                    Blank 32 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007
                                    Notice Of Intent To Introduce Documents At Arbitration Hearing Filed By Defendant Armstead, June Individually And Dba Body Soul & Spirit Salon
                                      Blank 31 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: 6/18/2007
                                      Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Jun-18-2007 After Hearing; No Settlement Reached.
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Order To Show Cause Re: Arbitration (c)
                                        Arbitration Order To Show Cause Set For Sep-24-2007 At 3:30 Pm In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator (crc 3.815)
                                          Arbitrator Mitchell Alan Shapson Appointed. Arbitrator's Jurisdiction May-25-2007 Through Aug-23-2007.
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 28 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/22/2007
                                            Defendant(s)-j. Armstead And Body, Soul, & Spirit Salon Rejects Proposed Arbitrator, Susan A. Ogdie
                                              Blank 27 Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007
                                              Plaintiff(s) Rejected Proposed Arbitrator Susan A. Ogdie.
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/14/2007 Notice Of Random Selection From Panel Of Arbitrators
                                                Panel Of Arbitrators Assigned. Rejection Date May-24-2007.
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 4/30/2007
                                                  Objection To Arbitration And Pre-arbitration Settlement Conference Filed By Defendant Armstead, June Individually And Dba Body Soul & Spirit Salon
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007 Order To Arbitration And Pre-arbitration Settlement Conference
                                                    Assigned To Arbitration For May-14-2007. Pre-arbitration Settlement Conference Set For Jun-18-2007 At 11:00 Am In Dept. 212. Apr-23-2007 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007
                                                      Response To Order To Show Cause Re Filure To Bring Cross Complaint Against Mi Amore Hair Salon At Issue Filed By Defendant Armstead, June Individually And Dba Body Soul & Spirit Salon
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/28/2007, Entered: 2/28/2007 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                        Order To Show Cause Set For Mar-12-2007 Continued To Apr-23-2007 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Bring Cross Complaint(s) At Issue. Mar-12-2007 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/26/2007, Entered: 1/26/2007 Answer
                                                          Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Robinson, Mia Dba Mi Amor Hair Designs
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007
                                                            Response To Order To Show Cause Filed By Cross Defendant Armstead, June Individually And Dba Body Soul & Spirit Salon
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                              Order To Show Cause Set For Mar-12-2007 In Department 212 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To Bring Cross Complaint At Issue As To Cross Defendant(s) Mi Amor Hair Salon. The Jan-26-2007 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007 Answer
                                                                Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Banks, Stephanie Aka Dartania Banks
                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/16/2007
                                                                  Application For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To G.c. 68511.3 (confidential) Filed By Cross Defendant Banks, Stephanie Aka Dartania Banks Order Granting Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To Crc 3.50 - 3.63
                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007
                                                                    Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Cross Complainant Armstead, June Individually And Dba Body Soul & Spirit Salon Served Dec-29-2006, Personal Service On Cross Defendant Dartagne Banks Aka Dartane Banks
                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007
                                                                      Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Cross Complainant Armstead, June Individually And Dba Body Soul & Spirit Salon Served Dec-27-2006, Personal Service On Cross Defendant Mi Amor Hair Salon
                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: 1/5/2007
                                                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Gabriel, Romona Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006
                                                                          Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Armstead, June Individually And Dba Body Soul & Spirit Salon Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 12/26/2006, Entered: 12/26/2006
                                                                            Summons Issued To Cross Complainant Armstead, June Individually And Dba Body Soul & Spirit Salon
                                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/26/2006, Entered: 12/26/2006 Cross Complaint
                                                                              Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Armstead, June Individually And Dba Body Soul & Spirit Salon As To Cross Defendant Dartagne Banks Aka Dartane Banks Roes 1 To 50 Mi Amor Hair Salon
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                Case Management Conference Of Dec-15-2006 Continued To Jan-26-2007 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006
                                                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Gabriel, Romona Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: 11/20/2006
                                                                                    Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Armstead, June Individually And Dba Body Soul & Spirit Salon Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
                                                                                      Order To Show Cause Re Proof Of Service On Nov-07-2006 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006 Answer
                                                                                        Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Armstead, June Individually And Dba Body Soul & Spirit Salon
                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006 Order To Show Cause Re: Proof Of Service
                                                                                          Added To Proof Of Service Order To Show Cause Calendar Hearing Set For Nov-07-2006 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006
                                                                                            Summons On Complaint (deft Served As Dba Body Soul & Spirit Salon), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Gabriel, Romona Served Sep-28-2006, Personal Service On Defendant Armstead, June Individually And Dba Body Soul & Spirit Salon
                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: 10/3/2006
                                                                                              Summons On Complaint (deft Served As An Individual), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Gabriel, Romona Served Sep-28-2006, Personal Service On Defendant Armstead, June Individually And Dba Body Soul & Spirit Salon
                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: 7/14/2006 Complaint
                                                                                                  Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Gabriel, Romona As To Defendant Armstead, June Individually And Dba Body Soul & Spirit Salon Does 1 To 50 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Dec-15-2006 Proof Of Service Due On Sep-12-2006 Case Management Statement Due On Nov-30-2006

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 230 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?