Bearden v. Adams, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-01686-ZLW
District Judge Zita L. Weinshienk, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Zita L. Weinshienk
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Edmond Bearden, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Angelida Wendler, Defendant
No Logo Anita O'Boyle, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Diehl, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Femrite, Defendant
No Logo Barbara McKenzzie, Defendant
No Logo Ben Mobley, Defendant
No Logo Ben Stevens, Defendant
No Logo Bernice Brister, Defendant
No Logo Better Business of Colorado Springs, Defendant
No Logo Betty Shoaf, Defendant
No Logo Beverly Klein, Defendant
No Logo Beverly Warinske, Defendant
No Logo Beverly Wright, Defendant
No Logo Bill Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Bill McCullom, Defendant
No Logo Bobbi Hofseth, Defendant
No Logo Bobby Washington, Defendant
No Logo Bruce Hinson, Defendant
No Logo Byron Kugler, Defendant
No Logo Candice Archuletta, Defendant
No Logo Carl L. Johnson, Defendant
Officially listed as "Carl Johnson"
No Logo Carol Manion, Defendant
No Logo Cherilyn Waggoner, Defendant
No Logo Christine Brown, Defendant
No Logo Christine Herrick, Defendant
No Logo Christine Kiselich, Defendant
No Logo Chuck Finkerstadt, Defendant
No Logo Clara Chang, Defendant
No Logo Colorado Springs, City of, Defendant
No Logo Colorado, State of, Defendant
No Logo DANIEL HALL, Defendant
No Logo David H. Zook, Defendant
No Logo David Kramer, Defendant
No Logo David Smith, Defendant
No Logo Deb Grohs, Defendant
No Logo Deb Weaver, Defendant
No Logo Deborah Baum, Defendant
No Logo Deborah Dalton, Defendant
No Logo Debra McGuire, Defendant
No Logo Debra Olenyik, Defendant
No Logo Debre Walters, Defendant
No Logo Dena Peck, Defendant
No Logo Denna Tracy, Defendant
No Logo Dennis Beebe, Defendant
No Logo Don Manion, Defendant
No Logo Don Wright, Defendant
No Logo Dorothy March, Defendant
No Logo Edward Tanner, Defendant
No Logo Elanor Behm, Defendant
No Logo Elanor Berquist, Defendant
No Logo Evelyn Perea, Defendant
No Logo Fern Kinion, Defendant
No Logo Fred Schwartz, Defendant
No Logo Gail Hinson, Defendant
No Logo Gary Schroder, Defendant
No Logo George Chang, Defendant
No Logo George Desautels, Defendant
No Logo George Duberstein, Defendant
No Logo Georgeann Duberstein, Defendant
No Logo Georgia Wright, Defendant
No Logo Geri Tierney, Defendant
No Logo Gina Chambers, Defendant
No Logo Glenn Dalton, Defendant
No Logo Glenn McGuire, Defendant
No Logo Guide Travel, Defendant
No Logo Harlan Else, Defendant
No Logo Henry Perea, Defendant
No Logo Ilene Pinney, Defendant
No Logo James, Tracy, Defendant
No Logo James Warinske, Defendant
No Logo Janice Warren, Defendant
No Logo Janie LaChance, Defendant
No Logo Jesse Brown, Defendant
No Logo Jill Bolan, Defendant
No Logo Jill Smith, Defendant
No Logo Jim Baum, Defendant
No Logo Joan Hart, Defendant
No Logo Joan Wiezorek, Defendant
No Logo Joanne Jardine, Defendant
No Logo John March, Defendant
No Logo John Olenyik, Defendant
No Logo John Rice, Defendant
No Logo John Riker, Defendant
No Logo John Soares, Defendant
No Logo John Wendler, Defendant
No Logo Jose Martinez, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Burke, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Petretti, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Wiezorek, Defendant
No Logo Joyce Watson, Defendant
No Logo Karen Else, Defendant
No Logo Karen Highland, Defendant
No Logo Karrell Stevens, Defendant
No Logo Kathy Adams, Defendant
No Logo Kathy Breske, Defendant
No Logo Ken Sauer, Defendant
No Logo Leanna Beebe, Defendant
No Logo Lenord Berquist, Defendant
No Logo Leon Lehman, Defendant
No Logo Lidia Barrera, Defendant
No Logo Linda Schwartz, Defendant
No Logo Lorrain Crow, Defendant
No Logo Lorrie Desautels, Defendant
No Logo Lynn Schroder, Defendant
No Logo Marcia Riker, Defendant
No Logo Margaret A. Cassell, Defendant
No Logo Margaret Forester, Defendant
No Logo Marie McDuff, Defendant
No Logo Marion Fraker, Defendant
No Logo Marsha Dobson, Defendant
No Logo Martha Brown, Defendant
No Logo Exxon Chemical Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mary Allen"
No Logo Mary Jane Porter, Defendant
No Logo Mary Lang, Defendant
No Logo Mary Rodman, Defendant
No Logo Mary Soares, Defendant
No Logo Mary Westlund, Defendant
No Logo Mayre Mobley, Defendant
No Logo Mike Finnerty, Defendant
No Logo Mike Wood, Defendant
No Logo Mila Petretti, Defendant
No Logo Monika Buckley, Defendant
No Logo Mr. Delwart, Defendant
No Logo Mr. Payton, Defendant
No Logo Mr. Ross, Defendant
No Logo Mr. Scott, Defendant
No Logo Mr. Stewart, Defendant
No Logo Mrs. Delwart, Defendant
No Logo Mrs. Ross, Defendant
No Logo Mrs. Scott, Defendant
No Logo Mrs. Stewart, Defendant
No Logo Mrs. Taylor, Defendant
No Logo Mrs. Titcomb, Defendant
No Logo Nicholas Tobias, Defendant
No Logo Norma Martinez, Defendant
No Logo Olive Karraker, Defendant
No Logo Pam Tierney, Defendant
No Logo Pamela Thomas, Defendant
No Logo Patricia Gibson, Defendant
No Logo Paula Rice, Defendant
No Logo Peggy Rose, Defendant
No Logo Phyliss Ray, Defendant
No Logo Ralph Femrite, Defendant
No Logo Ray Hamilton, Defendant
No Logo Rhonda Podmajersky, Defendant
No Logo Richard Baracus, Defendant
No Logo Richard Fraker, Defendant
No Logo Richard Pinney, Defendant
No Logo Richard, Roy, Defendant
No Logo Richard Westlund, Defendant
No Logo Rising Star Marketing, Defendant
No Logo Rita Mortenson, Defendant
No Logo Robert Bennett, Defendant
No Logo Robert Burrington, Defendant
No Logo Robert Crow, Defendant
No Logo Robert Forester, Defendant
No Logo Robert Harano, Defendant
No Logo Robert Karraker, Defendant
No Logo Robert Lang, Defendant
No Logo Robert McDuff, Defendant
No Logo Robert Mortenson, Defendant
No Logo Ron Podmajersky, Defendant
No Logo Ronald Anderson, Defendant
No Logo Rose Sullivan, Defendant
No Logo Roy Chambers, Defendant
No Logo Samuel Grier, Defendant
No Logo Sandre Roy, Defendant
No Logo Sears Warren, Defendant
No Logo Sharon Behm, Defendant
No Logo Sheri Adkins, Defendant
No Logo Shirley Baracus, Defendant
No Logo Shirley Hamilton, Defendant
No Logo Solange Harano, Defendant
No Logo Steve Diehl, Defendant
No Logo Steven Thomas, Defendant
No Logo Suzanne Hanna, Defendant
No Logo Suzanne Mulli, Defendant
No Logo Telford Berrera, Defendant
No Logo Terry Wilson, Defendant
No Logo Theodore Kiselich, Defendant
No Logo Theresa Tobias, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Buckley, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Dowell, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Hanna, Defendant
No Logo Tom Parker, Defendant
No Logo Tom Shoaf, Defendant
No Logo Toni Ray, Defendant
No Logo Trent Mannina, Defendant
No Logo Turn of the Century Adventure, Defendant
No Logo Vacation Trades, Defendant
No Logo Van Hart, Defendant
No Logo Van Klein, Defendant
No Logo Veronica Grier, Defendant
No Logo Virginia Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Virginia Sauer, Defendant
No Logo Walter Gerzevitz, Defendant
No Logo Wayburn Wright, Defendant
No Logo Wayne Waggoner, Defendant
No Logo William G. Edie, Defendant
No Logo WILLIAM ROSE, Defendant
Attributes
Office Denver
Filed 8/24/2000
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County El Paso
Terminated 11/17/2000
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag TERMED
Timeline
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 16 Filed: 11/17/2000, Entered: 11/20/2000 Judgment*Court Filing
JUDGMENT: by Judge Zita L. Weinshienk ORDERED amd cmp dismissed as frivolous; ORDERED motion for appointment of counsel for plaintiff Edmond Bearden [13-1] moot. ORDERED judgment entered in favor of all dfts and against pla. dismissing case (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/20/00 (former empl)
LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 10/16/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT [8-1] by plaintiff (former empl)
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/27/2000 Letter
LETTER to court from plaintiff RE: the proper forms to complete to file the amended complaint and requesting the status of his motion for appointment of counsel. (former empl)
LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000, Terminated: 11/17/2000 Motion to Appoint Counsel
MOTION by plaintiff for appointment of counsel for plaintiff Edmond Bearden (no original signature) (gms)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: 9/18/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER Directing Pltf to File an Amended Complaint w/in 30 days by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter regarding [8-1] complaint (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/18/00 (former empl)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 9/11/2000, Entered: 9/12/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER Granting Pltf Leave to Proceed IFP Without Payment of Initial Partial Filing Fee by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter granting motion to proceed Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 [5-1], denying as moot motion to proceed Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 [6-1] and establishing a monthly payment schedule until the filing fee is paid in full. (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/12/00 (former empl)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION by plaintiff for the USDC to move 99-CR-4622 out of the El Paso Cty Dist Court to the USDC (former empl)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
MOTION by plaintiff for the USDC to move 99-CR-4622 out of the El Paso Cty District Ct to USDC (former empl)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT [4-1] by plaintiff (with four pages of parties to be added as dfts) (former empl)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: 9/6/2000, Terminated: 11/17/2000 Motion to Appoint Counsel
MOTION by plaintiff for appointment of counsel for plaintiff Edmond Bearden (former empl)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: 9/6/2000, Terminated: 9/11/2000 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
MOTION and Affidavit by plaintiff to proceed Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 (former empl) Modified on 09/07/2000
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: 9/6/2000, Terminated: 9/11/2000 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Prisoner's MOTION and Affidavit to proceed Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 (former empl) Modified on 09/07/2000
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 9/6/2000, Entered: 9/7/2000 Complaint
COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) (former empl) Modified on 09/07/2000
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 8/24/2000, Entered: 8/25/2000 Letter
LETTER to court from plaintiff (former empl)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 8/24/2000, Entered: 8/25/2000 Motion to Appoint Counsel
MOTION by plaintiff for appointment of counsel for plaintiff Edmond Bearden (former empl)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 8/24/2000, Entered: 8/25/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter directing clerk to commence civil action and directing plaintiff to cure deficiency (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/25/00 (former empl)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 306 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?