Kalyani Banerjee v. Citibank West Fsb, Also Known As Citibank Or Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 06 457563
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Banerjee, Kalyani, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Stephen J. Gorski

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen J. Gorski +1 415 362 1717
v.
No Logo Citibank (west) F.s.b., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Stephen J. Gorski

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen J. Gorski +1 415 362 1717
No Logo Citibank West Fsb, Also Known As Citibank Or Citicorp, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
No Logo Does 1-20, Inclusive, Defendant
Cause of Action Wrongful Discharge
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
Case Management Conference Of Aug-07-2009 Is Off Calendar Dismissal On File. Notice Sent By Court.
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
    Case Management Conference Of Jun-05-2009 Continued To Aug-07-2009 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212, For Judgment Or Dismissal After Binding Arbitration. Notice Sent By Court.
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009 Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint
      Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: 9/30/2008 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
        Case Management Conference Of Oct-10-2008 Continued To Jun-05-2009 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212, Re: Progress Of Arbitration. Notice Sent By Court.
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 20 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008
          Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Citibank (west) F.s.b.
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 19 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008
            Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Banerjee, Kalyani Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 18 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008
              Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Taylor Julie L
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                Case Management Conference Of Jun-20-2008 Continued To Oct-10-2008 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 16 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008
                  Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Banerjee, Kalyani Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 15 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008
                    Case Management Statement A Non Jury Trial. Filed By Defendant Citibank West Fsb, Also Known As Citibank Or Citicorp, Inc.
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                      Case Management Conference Of Feb-22-2008 Continued To Jun-20-2008 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212, Re Progress Of Arbitration. Notice Sent By Court.
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 13 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008
                        Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Citibank (west) F.s.b.
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 12 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008
                          Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Banerjee, Kalyani Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                            Case Management Conference Of Sep-07-2007 Continued To Feb-22-2008 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212, Re Progress Of Arbitration. Notice Sent By Court.
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 10 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007
                              Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Citibank (west) F.s.b.
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 9 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007
                                Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Banerjee, Kalyani
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                  Case Management Conference Of Apr-06-2007 Continued To Sep-07-2007 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212, For The Submission Of Case Management Statements. Notice Sent By Court.
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007
                                    Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Filed By Defendant Citibank (west) F.s.b.
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007 Order
                                      Order - Stipulation Re Stay Of Proceedings And Referral Of Case To Binding Arbitration And Order Thereon
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: 3/9/2007
                                        Stip Fee Paid Filed By Defendant Citibank West Fsb, Also Known As Citibank Or Citicorp, Inc.
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Answer
                                          Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Citibank (west) F.s.b.
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 3 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006
                                            Notice And Acknowledgment Of Receipt On Citibank West Fsb (ack. Date 11/21/06) Filed By Plaintiff Banerjee, Kalyani
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Notice To Plaintiff
                                              Notice To Plaintiff
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Complaint
                                                Wrongful Discharge, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Banerjee, Kalyani As To Defendant Citibank West Fsb, Also Known As Citibank Or Citicorp, Inc. Does 1-20, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Apr-06-2007 Proof Of Service Due On Jan-02-2007 Case Management Statement Due On Mar-22-2007
                                                  Request RequestSpace

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 21 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?