People Of The State Of California By And Through v. Norteno A Criminal Street Gang Sued As An Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 07 464492
Superior Court Judge Patrick J. Mahoney, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco, Plaintiff

Represented by Mere, Yvonne

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mere, Yvonne +1 415 974 6541

Represented by Weiss, Michael S.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael S Weiss +1 415 252 9800
v.
No Logo Amador, Jose, Defendant
No Logo Arguello, Noel, Defendant
No Logo Arroyo, Ernesto, Defendant
No Logo Barrera, Hector, Defendant
No Logo Barrera, Juan, Defendant
No Logo Cano, Victor, Defendant
No Logo Cestoni, Giancarlo, Defendant
No Logo Chavez, Kevin, Defendant
No Logo Deleon, Joshua, Defendant
No Logo Deleon, Rocky, Defendant
No Logo Doe One Through Doe Five Hundred Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Garcia, Antonio Joseph, Defendant

Represented by Larson & Weinberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nina Wilder +1 415 431 3472 +1 415 552 2703 ninawilder@aol.com
No Logo Garcia, Hector, Defendant
No Logo Gonzalez, Daniel, Defendant
No Logo Hernandez, Henry, Defendant
No Logo Jimenez, Ruben, Defendant
No Logo Juarez, Pedro, Defendant
No Logo Martinez, Elvis, Defendant
No Logo Napolean, Antonio, Defendant
No Logo Norteno A Criminal Street Gang Sued As An Unincorporated Association, Defendant
No Logo Perez, Leo, Defendant

Represented by Adachi, Jeffrey Gordon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adachi, Jeffrey Gordon +1 415 553 1671
No Logo Reyes, Alex, Defendant
No Logo Reynoso-jimenez, Ruben, Defendant

Represented by Larson & Weinberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nina Wilder +1 415 431 3472 +1 415 552 2703 ninawilder@aol.com
No Logo Sanchez, Alfred, Defendant
No Logo Sanchez, Miguel, Defendant
No Logo Sanchez, Rodrigo, Defendant

Represented by Adachi, Jeffrey Gordon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adachi, Jeffrey Gordon +1 415 553 1671
No Logo Santiago, Daniel, Defendant
No Logo Urbina, Anthony, Defendant
No Logo Varela, Omar, Defendant
No Logo Whitebone, William, Defendant
No Logo Arroyo, Ernesto, Intervenor

Represented by Amparan, Robert M.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amparan, Robert M. +1 415 541 9159
No Logo Barrera, Hector, Intervenor

Represented by Krooth, Karl William

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Krooth, Karl William +1 415 981 1616
No Logo Buitrago, Antonio, Intervenor

Represented by Adachi, Jeffrey Gordon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adachi, Jeffrey Gordon +1 415 553 1671
No Logo Chavez, Kevin, Intervenor

Represented by Amparan, Robert M.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amparan, Robert M. +1 415 541 9159
No Logo Garcia, Antonio Joseph, Intervenor

Represented by Larson & Weinberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nina Wilder +1 415 431 3472 +1 415 552 2703 ninawilder@aol.com
No Logo Guerrero, Jesus, Intervenor

Represented by Amparan, Robert M.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amparan, Robert M. +1 415 541 9159
No Logo Hernandez, Henry, Intervenor

Represented by Amparan, Robert M.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amparan, Robert M. +1 415 541 9159
No Logo Reynoso-jimenez, Ruben, Intervenor

Represented by Larson & Weinberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nina Wilder +1 415 431 3472 +1 415 552 2703 ninawilder@aol.com
No Logo Buitrago, Antonio, Other Party
No Logo Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights Of The San Francisco Bay Area, Other Party

Represented by Schlosser, Alan Lawrence

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Schlosser, Alan Lawrence +1 510 625 2493
No Logo The American Civil Liberties Union Of Northern California, Other Party

Represented by Schlosser, Alan Lawrence

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Schlosser, Alan Lawrence +1 510 625 2493
Cause of Action Injunctive Relief
  Entries (225) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (20) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 225 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013
Mini Minutes For Nov-04-2013 03:00 Pm For Dept 302
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 224 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 Court Filing
    Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff People Of The State Of California's Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Gang Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members Is Continued To February 26, 2014 At 3:00 Pm. In Dept. 302 Because Of Mr. Pedro Juarez's Inability To Be In Court Today Due To Another Federal Court Hearing. Plaintiff's Counsel To Give Notice Of The New Hearing Date To Mr. Juarez And His Counsel In The Federal Court. Plaintiff Will Also Inform The Court If A Court Call Appearance Needs To Be Set Up On That Date. Judge: Marla J. Miller, Clerk: Cynthia Herbert; Court Reporter: Anthony C. Vaughn, Csr # 6185 (302/mjm)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document 223 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Order
      Order Granting Permission For Pedro Juarez To Appear Telephonically
        Blank 222 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013
        Mini Minutes For Oct-02-2013 09:30 Am For Dept 302
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 221 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013 Court Filing
          Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff People Of The State Of California's Motion To Modify Permanant Injunction To Add Four Additonal Gang Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members Is Continued To November 4, 2013 At 3:00 P.m. To Give Mr. Juarez An Opportunity To Hire Counsel. Judge: Marla J. Miller, Clerk: Cynthia Herbert; Court Reporter: Anthony C. Vaughn, Csr # 6185 =(302/mjm)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document 220 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013 Order
            Order Granting Permission For Pedro Juarez To Appear Telephonically
              Blank 219 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: 9/12/2013 Court Filing
              Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco's Motion To Modify Permanant Injunction To Add Four Additional Gang Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members - Mr. Pedro Juarez Did Not Make An Appearance Despite An Order To Appear Through Telephone Was Faxed Over To The Federal Prison. Mr. Juarez Hearing Is Continued To October 2, 2013 At 3:00 P.m. In Dept. 302. Ms. Mere Will Find Out Whether Mr. Juarez Is Being Represented By An Attorney In The Federal Court. She Will Inform The Court By Way Of A Letter If He Does Not Have Any Legal Representation. As To Mr. Leo Perez The Hearing Is Continued To February 26, 2014 At 3:00 P.m. In Dept. 302. Judge: Marla J. Miller, Clerk: Cynthia Herbert; Court Reporter: Anthony C. Vaughn, Csr # 6185 (302)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document 218 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: 9/12/2013 Order
                Order Continuing Plaintiff's Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction As To Rodrigo Sanchez Only
                  Blank 217 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: 9/12/2013
                  Mini Minutes For Sep-12-2013 02:45 Pm For Dept 302
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document 216 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: 9/10/2013 Order
                    Amended Order Granting Permission For Pedro Juarez To Appear Telephonically (on September 12, 2013 In Dept. 302)
                      Legal Document 215 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Order
                      Order Granting Permission For Pedro Juarez To Appear Telephonically On September 12. 2013 At 2:45 Pm In Dept. 302
                        Blank 214 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013
                        Proof Of Service; Supplemental Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Pltf's Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 213 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013
                          Proof Of Service: Supplemental Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Pltf's Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 212 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: 8/29/2013
                            Added To Calendar For Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco's Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Gang Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members (as To Mr. Sanchez) Hearing Set For Feb-26-2014 At 03:00 Pm In Dept 302
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 211 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013 Court Filing
                              Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera's (re-noticed) Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Gang Members For Enforcement (cc 3424, Ccp 533) Is Off Calendar. Duplicate Entry. Judge: Marla J. Miller; Clerk: Gina Gonzales; Not Reported. (302)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 210 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013 Court Filing
                                Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco's Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Gang Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members - As To Mr. Juarez And Mr. Perez, The Matter Is Continued To September 12, 2013 At 2:45 Pm In Dept. 302. As To Mr. Sanchez, The Hearing Is Continued To February 26, 2014 At 3:00 Pm In Dept. 302. Judge: Marla J. Miller; Clerk: Gina Gonzales; Court Reporter: Anthony C. Vaughn, Csr # 6185 (302)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 209 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013
                                  Mini Minutes For Aug-28-2013 03:00 Pm For Dept 302
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 208 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013
                                    Mini Minutes For Aug-28-2013 03:00 Pm For Dept 302
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Blank 207 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: 8/28/2013
                                      Supplemental Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Pltf's Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Members For Enforcement Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 206 Filed: 8/27/2013, Entered: 8/27/2013
                                        Declaration Of Deputy City Attorney Yvonne Mere Re: Sanchez And Perez's Ex Parte Applicaiton Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 205 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: 8/26/2013
                                          Ex Parte Application For Order Motiont O Strike Improper Declarations Filed By City Attorney In Its Reply To Respondents Oppos To Modify Permanent Injunction Filed By Defendant Sanchez, Rodrigo Perez, Leo
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 204 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: 8/14/2013
                                            Declaration Of Ten Sfpd Officers And Sergeants In Support Of Reply To Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Blank 203 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: 8/14/2013
                                              Supplemental Expert Declaration Of Sergeant Mario Molina In Support Of Reply To Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Blank 202 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: 8/14/2013
                                                Reply To Opposition To Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 201 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: 8/8/2013
                                                  Opposition To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Addl Members; Exhibits Filed By Defendant Sanchez, Rodrigo Perez, Leo
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document 200 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: 8/8/2013 Order
                                                    Order (ex Parte) Granting Permission To File Longer Opposition Brief Pursuant To Ca Rules Of Court 3.1113 (f)
                                                      Blank 199 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: 8/8/2013
                                                      Ex Parte Application For Order Granting Permission To File Longer Oppos Brief Pursuant To Crc 3.1113f Filed By Defendant Sanchez, Rodrigo Perez, Leo
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Blank 198 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: 8/7/2013
                                                        Ex Parte Application For Order To File Longer Reply Brief Filed By Defendant Sanchez, Rodrigo Perez, Leo
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document 197 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: 7/15/2013 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                          Proof Of Service By Mail On7-12-13 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                            Blank 196 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013
                                                            Law And Motion 302, (re-notice) Of Motion And Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Gang Members For Enforcement (ca Civil Code 3424, Ca Code Of Civil Procedure 533) Continued From Jul-24-2013 To Law And Motion At Aug-28-2013, 3:00 Pm In Dept. 302 Per The Ex Parte Order Filed On 7/12/13.
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Blank 195 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013
                                                              Law And Motion 302, Notice Of Motion And Otion To Modify Permanant Injunction To Add Four Additonal Gang Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members Continued From Jul-24-2013 To Law And Motion At Aug-28-2013, 3:00 Pm In Dept. 302 Per The Ex Parte Order Filed On 7/12/13.
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Blank 194 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013
                                                                Law And Motion, 302, Plaintiff's Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction As To Giancarlo Cestoni Per 6/10/13 Ex Parte Order (oppos Due 7/11; Reply Due 7/17), Is Off Calendar Per The Ex Parte Order Filed On 7/12/13.
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013 Order
                                                                  Order Granting Ex Parte Application Re: Service, Briefing Schedule And Continuance Of Hearing Date On Plaintiff's Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction As To Pedro Juarez, Leo Perez, And Rodrigo Sanchez Only
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Blank 192 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013
                                                                    Declaration In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Order Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Blank 191 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: 7/12/2013
                                                                      Ex Parte Application For Order Re: Service, Briefing Schedule And Continuance Of Hearing Date On Pltf's Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 6/20/2013 Order
                                                                        Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Remove Six Members
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 6/20/2013 Proof of Service
                                                                          Proof Of Service Of Motion Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Legal Document 188 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 6/20/2013 Motion (civil Generic)
                                                                            (re-notice) Of Motion And Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Gang Members For Enforcement (ca Civil Code 3424, Ca Code Of Civil Procedure 533) Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Hearing Set For Jul-24-2013 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                              Blank 187 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 6/20/2013
                                                                              Mini Minutes For Jun-20-2013 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Blank 186 Filed: 6/20/2013, Entered: 6/20/2013 Court Filing
                                                                                Law And Motion 302, Ruling - The Matter Was Discussed. Plaintiff People Of The State Of California's Motion To Modify Permanant Injunction To Add Four Additional Gang Members For Enforcement Is Continued To July 24, 2013 At 9:30 A.m. In Dept. 302 To Be Heard Concurrently With Another Motion Regarding Mr. Cestoni. Notice Was Waived As To Mr. Perez, Mr. Juarez And Mr. Sanchez. Opposition To Be Filed By July 11, 2013; Reply To Be Filed By July 17; Opposition To Be Filed And Delivered To The City Attorney's Office At 1390 Market Street, 7th Floor. Courtesy Copies To Be Delivered To Dept. 302. The City To Give Notice To The Other 5 Members By Mail. Plaintiff's Motion To Modify And Remove Six Members ( Elvis Martinez And Michael Sanchez, Deceased; Samuel Duenas; Hector Garcia, Carlos Morales And Ruben Jimenez) Is Granted. The June 17, 2008 Permanent Injunction Remains In Full Force And Effect Except To Remove Six Gang Members. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Marla J. Miller; Clerk: Cynthia Herbert; Court Reporter: Anthony Vaughn, Csr # 6185
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Blank 185 Filed: 6/11/2013, Entered: 6/11/2013
                                                                                  Proof Of Service Of Ex Parte Application For Order Re: Service Briefing Schedule And Continuance Of Hearing Date On Pltfs Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction; Stipulation ; Declaration; Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Jun-10-2011, Mail On Defendant Cestoni, Giancarlo
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Blank 184 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: 6/10/2013
                                                                                    Added To Calendar For Plaintiff's Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction As To Giancarlo Cestoni Per 6/10/13 Ex Parte Order (oppos Due 7/11; Reply Due 7/17) Hearing Set For Jul-24-2013 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Legal Document 183 Filed: 6/10/2013, Entered: 6/10/2013 Order
                                                                                      Order Granting Ex Parte Application Re Service, Briefing Schedule & Continuance Of Hearing Date On Plaintiff's Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction As To Giancarlo Cestoni Only
                                                                                        Blank 182 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: 6/7/2013
                                                                                        Stipulation Re Service, Briefing Schedule And Continuance Of Hearing Date On Plaintiff's Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction As To Giancarlo Cestoni Only Filed By People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Blank 181 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: 6/7/2013
                                                                                          Declaration In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Order Re Service, Briefing Schedule And Continuance Of Hearing Date On Plaintiff's Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction As To Giancarlo Cestoni Only Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Blank 180 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: 6/7/2013
                                                                                            Ex Parte Application For Order Re Service, Briefing Schedule And Continuance Of Hearing Date On Plaintiff's Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction As To Giancarlo Cestoni Only Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Blank 179 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: 6/7/2013
                                                                                              Declaration Of Carolina Reyes-out Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                Blank 178 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: 6/7/2013
                                                                                                Proof Of Service Of Rpely Brief Ins Upprot Of Motion To Modify Permanent Injcuintion Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                  Blank 177 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: 6/7/2013
                                                                                                  Reply Brief In Support Of Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additinoaln Gang Members Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 Proof Of Service Of (generic)
                                                                                                    Proof Of Service Of Ex Parte Application For Order Re: Service, Briefing Schedule And Hearing Date Of Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Sewven Declaration Re: Notice Of Pltf's Ex Parte; Amended Seven Declaration's; Declaration Of Dwight Moore In Support Of Pltf's Ex Parte Application; Order Granting Ptlfs' Ex Parte Application; Notice Of Motion And Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Gang Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Memo Of P&a; Request For Judicial Notice; Seventy-five Declarations Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served May-01-2013, Personal Service On Defendant Garcia, Hector
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 Proof Of Service Of (generic)
                                                                                                      Proof Of Service Of Ex Parte Application For Order Re: Service, Briefing Schedule And Hearing Date Of Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Sewven Declaration Re: Notice Of Pltf's Ex Parte; Amended Seven Declaration's; Declaration Of Dwight Moore In Support Of Pltf's Ex Parte Application; Order Granting Ptlfs' Ex Parte Application; Notice Of Motion And Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Gang Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Memo Of P&a; Request For Judicial Notice; Seventy-five Declarations Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served May-01-2013, Personal Service On Defendant Barrera, Hector
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                        Legal Document 174 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 Proof Of Service Of (generic)
                                                                                                        Proof Of Service Of Ex Parte Application For Order Re: Service, Briefing Schedule And Hearing Date Of Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Sewven Declaration Re: Notice Of Pltf's Ex Parte; Amended Seven Declaration's; Declaration Of Dwight Moore In Support Of Pltf's Ex Parte Application; Order Granting Ptlfs' Ex Parte Application; Notice Of Motion And Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Gang Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Memo Of P&a; Request For Judicial Notice; Seventy-five Declarations Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served May-09-2013, Personal Service On Defendant Cano, Victor
                                                                                                          Legal Document 173 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 Proof Of Service Of (generic)
                                                                                                          Proof Of Service Of Ex Parte Application For Order Re: Service, Briefing Schedule And Hearing Date Of Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Sewven Declaration Re: Notice Of Pltf's Ex Parte; Amended Seven Declaration's; Declaration Of Dwight Moore In Support Of Pltf's Ex Parte Application; Order Granting Ptlfs' Ex Parte Application; Notice Of Motion And Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Gang Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Memo Of P&a; Request For Judicial Notice; Seventy-five Declarations Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Apr-30-2013, Personal Service On Defendant Cestoni, Giancarlo
                                                                                                            Legal Document 172 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 Proof Of Service Of (generic)
                                                                                                            Proof Of Service Of Ex Parte Application For Order Re: Service, Briefing Schedule And Hearing Date Of Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Sewven Declaration Re: Notice Of Pltf's Ex Parte; Amended Seven Declaration's; Declaration Of Dwight Moore In Support Of Pltf's Ex Parte Application; Order Granting Ptlfs' Ex Parte Application; Notice Of Motion And Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Gang Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Memo Of P&a; Request For Judicial Notice; Seventy-five Declarations Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served May-08-2013, Personal Service On Defendant Chavez, Kevin
                                                                                                              Legal Document 171 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 Proof Of Service Of (generic)
                                                                                                              Proof Of Service Of Ex Parte Application For Order Re: Service, Briefing Schedule And Hearing Date Of Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Sewven Declaration Re: Notice Of Pltf's Ex Parte; Amended Seven Declaration's; Declaration Of Dwight Moore In Support Of Pltf's Ex Parte Application; Order Granting Ptlfs' Ex Parte Application; Notice Of Motion And Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Gang Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Memo Of P&a; Request For Judicial Notice; Seventy-five Declarations Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served May-08-2013, Personal Service On Defendant Deleon, Rocky
                                                                                                                Legal Document 170 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 Proof Of Service Of (generic)
                                                                                                                Proof Of Service Of Ex Parte Application For Order Re: Service, Briefing Schedule And Hearing Date Of Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Sewven Declaration Re: Notice Of Pltf's Ex Parte; Amended Seven Declaration's; Declaration Of Dwight Moore In Support Of Pltf's Ex Parte Application; Order Granting Ptlfs' Ex Parte Application; Notice Of Motion And Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Gang Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Memo Of P&a; Request For Judicial Notice; Seventy-five Declarations Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served May-08-2013, Personal Service On Defendant Hernandez, Henry
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 169 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 Proof Of Service Of (generic)
                                                                                                                  Proof Of Service Of Ex Parte Application For Order Re: Service, Briefing Schedule And Hearing Date Of Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Sewven Declaration Re: Notice Of Pltf's Ex Parte; Amended Seven Declaration's; Declaration Of Dwight Moore In Support Of Pltf's Ex Parte Application; Order Granting Ptlfs' Ex Parte Application; Notice Of Motion And Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Gang Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Memo Of P&a; Request For Judicial Notice; Seventy-five Declarations Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served May-02-2013, Personal Service On Defendant Juarez, Pedro
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 168 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 Proof Of Service Of (generic)
                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service Of Ex Parte Application For Order Re: Service, Briefing Schedule And Hearing Date Of Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Sewven Declaration Re: Notice Of Pltf's Ex Parte; Amended Seven Declaration's; Declaration Of Dwight Moore In Support Of Pltf's Ex Parte Application; Order Granting Ptlfs' Ex Parte Application; Notice Of Motion And Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Gang Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Memo Of P&a; Request For Judicial Notice; Seventy-five Declarations Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Apr-26-2013, Personal Service On Defendant Perez, Leo
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 Proof Of Service Of (generic)
                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service Of Ex Parte Application For Order Re: Service, Briefing Schedule And Hearing Date Of Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Sewven Declaration Re: Notice Of Pltf's Ex Parte; Amended Seven Declaration's; Declaration Of Dwight Moore In Support Of Pltf's Ex Parte Application; Order Granting Ptlfs' Ex Parte Application; Notice Of Motion And Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Gang Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Memo Of P&a; Request For Judicial Notice; Seventy-five Declarations Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served May-03-2013, Personal Service On Defendant Jimenez, Ruben
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 166 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 Proof Of Service Of (generic)
                                                                                                                        Proof Of Service Of Ex Parte Application For Order Re: Service, Briefing Schedule And Hearing Date Of Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Sewven Declaration Re: Notice Of Pltf's Ex Parte; Amended Seven Declaration's; Declaration Of Dwight Moore In Support Of Pltf's Ex Parte Application; Order Granting Ptlfs' Ex Parte Application; Notice Of Motion And Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Gang Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Memo Of P&a; Request For Judicial Notice; Seventy-five Declarations Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served May-09-2013, Personal Service On Defendant Sanchez, Rodrigo
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 Proof Of Service Of (generic)
                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service Of Ex Parte Application For Order Re: Service, Briefing Schedule And Hearing Date Of Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Sewven Declaration Re: Notice Of Pltf's Ex Parte; Amended Seven Declaration's; Declaration Of Dwight Moore In Support Of Pltf's Ex Parte Application; Order Granting Ptlfs' Ex Parte Application; Notice Of Motion And Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Gang Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Memo Of P&a; Request For Judicial Notice; Seventy-five Declarations Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served May-02-2013, Personal Service On Defendant Santiago, Daniel
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 164 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 Proof Of Service Of (generic)
                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service Of Ex Parte Application For Order Re: Service, Briefing Schedule And Hearing Date Of Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Sewven Declaration Re: Notice Of Pltf's Ex Parte; Amended Seven Declaration's; Declaration Of Dwight Moore In Support Of Pltf's Ex Parte Application; Order Granting Ptlfs' Ex Parte Application; Notice Of Motion And Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Gang Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members; Memo Of P&a; Request For Judicial Notice; Seventy-five Declarations Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served May-09-2013, Personal Service On Defendant Whitebone, William
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013 Order
                                                                                                                              Order Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application Fro Order Re: Service, Briefing Schedule And Hearing Date Of Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six; (hearing 6/20/13; Oppo Due 6/3/13; Reply Due 6/7/13)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                Blank 162 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013
                                                                                                                                Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                  Blank 161 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013
                                                                                                                                  Declaration In Support Of Motion Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                    Blank 160 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013
                                                                                                                                    Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                      Blank 159 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013
                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Motion And Otion To Modify Permanant Injunction To Add Four Additonal Gang Members For Enforcement And To Remove Six Members Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Hearing Set For Jun-20-2013 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                        Blank 158 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013
                                                                                                                                        Of Sergeant Mario Molina In Support Of Pltf's Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Members For Enforcement And Remove Six Members (3 Of 3) Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                          Blank 157 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013
                                                                                                                                          Of Sergeant Mario Molina In Support Of Pltf's Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Members For Enforcement And Remove Six Members (2 Of 3) Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                            Blank 156 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013
                                                                                                                                            Declaration Of Sergeant Mario Molina In Support Of Pltf's Motion To Modify Permanent Injunction To Add Four Additional Members For Enforcement And Remove Six Members (1 Of 3) Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                              Blank 155 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013
                                                                                                                                              Amended Seven Dec.'s Re: Ntc Of Exparte Application For Order Re: Service, Briefing Schedule And Hearing Date Of Mtn To Modify Permanent Injunction To Ad Four Addition Members And To Remove Six Members Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                Blank 154 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: 4/25/2013
                                                                                                                                                Declaration In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Order Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 153 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: 4/25/2013
                                                                                                                                                  Ex Parte Application For Order Re: Servie, Briefing Schedule And Hearing Date Of Motion To Modify Permananet Injunction To Add Four Additonal Members Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 152 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011
                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Default Judgment In Form Of Permanent Injunctioin Dated June 17, 2008 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Sep-14-2011, Personal Service On Intervenor Guerrero, Jesus
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 151 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009
                                                                                                                                                      Pos Of Order Granting Default Judgment In Form Of Permanent Injunction Dated June 17, 2008 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 150 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009
                                                                                                                                                        Proof Of Service Of On Order Granting Default Judgment In For Of Permanent Injunction Dated June 17, 2008 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Jan-06-2009, Personal Service On Defendant Sanchez, Alfred
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 149 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: 12/11/2008
                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service Of Order Granding Default Judgment In Form Of Permanent Injunction Dated June 17, 2008 On Joseph Fuimano Nov. 25, 2008 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 148 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008
                                                                                                                                                            Pos-by Personal Service On Salvador Rodriguez, Re: Order Granting Default Judmgment In Form Of Permanent Injunction Dated June 17, 2008. Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 147 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: 10/6/2008
                                                                                                                                                              Pos Of Order Granting Default Judgment In Form Of Permanent In Juntion Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 146 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: 9/24/2008
                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Default Judgment In Form Of Permant Injunctin Dated June 17, 2008 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Sep-04-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Amador, Jose
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 145 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: 9/16/2008
                                                                                                                                                                  Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Default Judgment In Form Of Permanent Injunction Dated June 17, 2008 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Sep-09-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Arroyo, Ernesto
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 144 Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: 9/16/2008
                                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Default Judgment In Form Of Permanent Injunction Dated June 17, 2008 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Aug-14-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Whitebone, William
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 143 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008
                                                                                                                                                                      Pos On Order Granting Default Judgment In Form Of Permanent Injunction Dated Jun 17, 08 For (juan Barrera) Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 142 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008
                                                                                                                                                                        Pos On Order Garnting Default Judgment In Form Of Permanent Injunction Dated Jun 17, 08 (miguel Sanchez) Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 141 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008
                                                                                                                                                                          Pos By Personal Service Of Order Granting Default Judgment In Form Of Permanent Injunction Dated Jun 17, 07 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 140 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Default Judgemnt In Form Of Permanent Injunction Dated Jun-17-08 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Jul-15-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Deleon, Joshua
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 139 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Default Judgemnt In Form Of Permanent Injunction Dated Jun-17-08 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Jul-15-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Reyes, Alex
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 138 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Default Judgemnt In Form Of Permanent Injunction Dated Jun-17-08 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Jul-17-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Napolean, Antonio
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 137 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Default Judgemtn In Form Of Permanent Injunction Dated Jun-17-08 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Jul-08-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Varela, Omar
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 136 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Default Judgment In Form Of Permanent Injunction Dated Jun-17-08 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Jul-21-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Cano, Victor
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Default Judgment In Form Of Permanent Injunction Dated June 17, 2008 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Jun-26-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Hernandez, Henry
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 134 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                        Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Default Judgment In Form Of Permanent Injunction Dated June 17, 2008 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Jun-26-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Chavez, Kevin
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 133 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Default Judgment In Form Of Permanent Injunction Dated June 17, 2008 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Jul-03-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Urbina, Anthony
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 132 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Default Judgment In Form Of Permanent Injunction Dated June 17, 2008 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Jul-03-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Barrera, Juan
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 131 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Default Judgment In Form Of Permanent Injunction Dated June 17, 2008 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Jun-26-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Santiago, Daniel
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 130 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
                                                                                                                                                                                                Case Management Conference Of Jul-18-2008 Is Off Calendar. Judgment On File. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 129 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 128 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Default Court Judgment - General
                                                                                                                                                                                                    The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Recover From Defendant Norteno A Criminal Street Gang Sued As An Unincorporated Association Default Judgment In Form Of Permanent Injunction, See Scanned Document For Details.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 127 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Uncontested Calendar Of Jun-17-2008, Default Prove-up Hearing. Granted Per Written Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 126 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mini-minutes For Jun-17-2008 9:00 Am For Dept 218
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 125 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Waiving The Appearance Of Witnesses For Default Judgment Prove-up Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 124 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Request To Enter Default Filed/default Entered, Declaration Of Non-military Status As To Defendant Norteno A Criminal Street Gang Sued As An Unincorporated Association
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 123 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Defualt Judgemnt Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 122 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Deputy City Attorney Michael Weiss In Support Of Ex Parte Request For Order Waiving The Appearance Of Witnesses For Default Judgment Prove U[p Hearing Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 121 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Deputy City Attorney Michael Weiss In Support Of Default Jdugemnt Adn Permanant Injunction Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 120 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Doe One Through Doe Five Hundred Inclusive
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 119 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ex Parte Application For Order For Order Waiving The Appearance Of Witnesses For Default Judgment Prove Up Heatring, Points And Authorities Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 118 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Management Conference Of Apr-25-2008 Continued To Jul-18-2008 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 117 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Added To Calendar For Default Prove-up Hearing. Hearing Set For Jun-17-2008 At 09:00 Am In Dept 218
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 116 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request To Enter Default Filed/default Entered As To Defendant Norteno A Criminal Street Gang Sued As An Unincorporated Association
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 115 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 114 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Intervenor Barrera, Hector
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint In Intervention Filed By
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint In Intervention Filed By Hector Barrera On Sep 5, 2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 112 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Intervenor Arroyo, Ernesto
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 111 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Intervenor Hernandez, Henry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 110 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Intervenor Guerrero, Jesus
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 109 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Intervenor Chavez, Kevin
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 108 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint In Intervention
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint In Intervention As To Intervenor Chavez, Kevin
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint In Intervention
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint In Intervention As To Intervenor Guerrero, Jesus
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 106 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint In Intervention
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint In Intervention As To Intervenor Hernandez, Henry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 105 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint In Intervention
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint In Intervention As To Intervenor Arroyo, Ernesto
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 104 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Garcia, Antonio Joseph Reynoso-jimenez, Ruben
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint In Intervention Filed By
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint In Intervention Filed By Ruben Reynoso-jimenez On Sep 6, 2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 102 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/26/2008 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint In Intervention Filed By
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint In Intervention Filed By Antonio Joseph Garcia On Sep 6, 2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminary Injunction Dated Oct. 12, 2007 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Mar-07-2008, Personal Service On Intervenor Chavez, Kevin
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Prelim Injunction Dated Oct-12-07 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Jan-07-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Deleon, Joshua
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminary Injunctgion Dated Oct. 12, 2007 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Jan-28-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Garcia, Antonio Joseph
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 98 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case Management Conference Of Feb-01-2008 Continued To Apr-25-2008 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212, To Bring Case At Issue. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Intervenor Guerrero, Jesus Chavez, Kevin Hernandez, Henry Arroyo, Ernesto Estimated Time For Trial: 25.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Management Statement Filed By Intervenor Garcia, Antonio Joseph Reynoso-jimenez, Ruben Estimated Time For Trial: 25.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Management Statement Filed By Intervenor Barrera, Hector Estimated Time For Trial: 25.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Estimated Time For Trial: 25.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminar4y Injunction Dated Oct. 12, 2007 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Dec-15-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Barrera, Hector
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminar4y Injunction Dated Oct. 12, 2007 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Dec-22-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Jimenez, Ruben
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminar4y Injunction Dated Oct. 12, 2007 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Nov-21-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Martinez, Elvis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 90 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminar4y Injunction Dated Oct. 12, 2007 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Nov-27-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Reyes, Alex
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminary Injunction Dated Oct. 12, 2007 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Dec-01-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Gonzalez, Daniel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminary Injunction Dated Oct. 12, 2007 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Dec-17-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Cano, Victor
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Prelim Injunction Dated Oct-12-07 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Dec-12-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Amador, Jose
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminary Injunction Dated Oct-12-07 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Nov-16-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Hernandez, Henry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: 11/21/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminary Injunction Dated Oct-12-07 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Nov-20-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Sanchez, Miguel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminary Injunction Dated October 12, 2007 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Oct-17-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Deleon, Rocky
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminary Injunction Dated October 12, 2007 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Oct-17-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Garcia, Hector
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminary Injunction Dated October 12, 2007 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Oct-18-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Napolean, Antonio
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminary Injunction Dated October 12, 2007 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Oct-18-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Barrera, Juan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminary Injunction Dated October 12, 2007 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Nov-07-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Santiago, Daniel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminary Injunction Dated October 12, 2007 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Oct-17-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Sanchez, Alfred
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminary Injunction Dated October 12, 2007 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Oct-17-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Whitebone, William
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminary Injunction Dated October 12, 2007 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Oct-23-2007, Personal Service On Intervenor Arroyo, Ernesto
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminary Injunction Dated October 12, 2007 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Oct-23-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Sanchez, Miguel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminary Injunction Dated October 12, 2007 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Oct-23-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Urbina, Anthony
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminary Injunction Dated Oct. 12, 2007 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Oct-17-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Arguello, Noel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminary Injunction Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Oct-17-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Garcia, Antonio Joseph
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminary Injunction Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Oct-18-2007, Personal Service On Intervenor Barrera, Hector
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminary Injunction Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Oct-17-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Reynoso-jimenez, Ruben
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Management Conference Of Nov-21-2007 Continued To Feb-01-2008 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Other Buitrago, Antonio
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 68 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint (intervenor Status Of Antonio
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint (intervenor Status Of Antonio Buitrago) As To Other Buitrago, Antonio
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Unavailability Of Weiss, Michael S On Nov-26-2007 Through Nov-30-2007 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Unavailability Of Mere, Yvonne On Nov-17-2007 Through Nov-30-2007 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Estimated Time For Trial: 20.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Preliminary Injunction Dated Oct-12-07 Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Oct-23-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Santiago, Daniel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff People Of The State Of California's Order To Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction, Previously Submitted On Sep-18-2007, Is Granted. (exhibits Returned To Mr. Adachi Per Stipulation Of Counsel Pursuant To Minutes Of Sep-18-2007.) Hon. Patrick J. Mahoney.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 62 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Supplemental Brief In Response To Courtorder Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Preliminary Gang Injunction Filed By Intervenor Buitrago, Antonio
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: 9/19/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order For Further Briefing On The Motion For Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certified Copy Of Santa Barbara County Superior Court's Statement Of Decision. Case #1148758 - People V Varrio Lamparas Primerz. Counsel Provided For Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 57 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Exhibit List Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mini-minutes For Sep-18-2007 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mini-minutes For Sep-18-2007 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Law And Motion 302, Intervenor Hector Barrera's Motion For Intervenor To File Brief One Day Late. Court Adopts Its Tentative Ruling: The Brief May Be Filed. The Request For A Continuance Is Denied For Lack Of Good Cause. Judge: Patrick J. Mahoney, Reporter: Helen Sorep-matley, Csr #9225
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Law And Motion, 302, Plaintiff People Of The State Of California's Order To Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction, Submitted On Sep-18-2007 By Patrick J. Mahoney. Argued And The Court Takes The Matter Under Submission. Court Takes Judicial Notice Of "statement Of Decision On Motion For Preliminary Injunctions". The Following Intervenor's Exhibits Are Marked For Identification And Received In Evidence. Exhibit A - "proposed Injunction Area Where 55.9% (109/195 Incidents) Of The Alleged Gang Contacts Occurred" And Exhibit B - "plaintiff Has Not Proven That Antonio Buitrago Is A Gang Member". Counsel Stipulate That Said Exhibits May Be Returned To Mr. Adachi At The Conclusion Of The Hearing. Judge: Patrick J. Mahoney, Reporter: Helen Sorep-matley, Csr #9225
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Sep-14-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Garcia, Antonio Joseph
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Sep-14-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Reynoso-jimenez, Ruben
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of (amended) Antonio Buitrago Filed By Intervenor Buitrago, Antonio
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time On Motions For Continuance And Discovery Filed By Intervenor Barrera, Hector
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Defendant-intervinor's Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed By Intervenor Barrera, Hector
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service Of Declaration Of Sfpd Officers Re: Posting Notice Of Hearing On Prelim Injunction; Declarations Showing Four Consecutive Publications Of Notice Of Sep-18-07 Hearing On Prelim Injunction In The S.f. Chronicle And S.f. Examiner Newspapers; 17 Proofs Of Personal Service Of Summons; Complaint And Paper In Support; Decalrations To Reply Brief Iso Prelim Gang Injunction; Pos Of Pltf's Reply Brief In Support Of Its Application; [proposed] Order Granting Prelim Injunction; Supplemental Decalration Of Gang Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Sep-12-2007, Personal Service On Intervenor Barrera, Hector
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proof Of Service Of Declaration Of Sfpd Officers Re: Posting Notice Of Hearing On Prelim Injunction; Declarations Showing Four Consecutive Publications Of Notice Of Sep-18-07 Hearing On Prelim Injunction In The S.f. Chronicle And S.f. Examiner Newspapers; 17 Proofs Of Personal Service Of Summons; Complaint And Paper In Support; Decalrations To Reply Brief Iso Prelim Gang Injunction; Pos Of Pltf's Reply Brief In Support Of Its Application; [proposed] Order Granting Prelim Injunction; Supplemental Decalration Of Gang Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Sep-12-2007, Personal Service On Intervenor Buitrago, Antonio
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service Of Declaration Of Sfpd Officers Re: Posting Notice Of Hearing On Prelim Injunction; Declarations Showing Four Consecutive Publications Of Notice Of Sep-18-07 Hearing On Prelim Injunction In The S.f. Chronicle And S.f. Examiner Newspapers; 17 Proofs Of Personal Service Of Summons; Complaint And Paper In Support; Decalrations To Reply Brief Iso Prelim Gang Injunction; Pos Of Pltf's Reply Brief In Support Of Its Application; [proposed] Order Granting Prelim Injunction; Supplemental Decalration Of Gang Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Sep-12-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Garcia, Antonio Joseph Reynoso-jimenez, Ruben
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service Of Declaration Of Sfpd Officers Re: Posting Notice Of Hearing On Prelim Injunction; Declarations Showing Four Consecutive Publications Of Notice Of Sep-18-07 Hearing On Prelim Injunction In The S.f. Chronicle And S.f. Examiner Newspapers; 17 Proofs Of Personal Service Of Summons; Complaint And Paper In Support; Decalrations To Reply Brief Iso Prelim Gang Injunction; Pos Of Pltf's Reply Brief In Support Of Its Application; [proposed] Order Granting Prelim Injunction; Supplemental Decalration Of Gang Expert Mario Molina To Reply Brief In Support Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco Served Sep-12-2007, Personal Service On Intervenor Guerrero, Jesus Chavez, Kevin Hernandez, Henry Arroyo, Ernesto
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service Of Pl's Reply Brief In Support Of Its Application Re Preliminary Gang Injunction Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply Brief In Support Of Its Application Re: Preliminary Gang Injunction Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  17 Proofs Of Personal Service Of Summons, Complaint And Papers In Support Of Preliminary Injunction Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Declaration Of Gang Expert Mario Molina To Reply Brief In Support Of Preliminary Gang Injunction Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration Of Sfpd Officers Re: Posting Ntc Of Hearing On Preliminary Injunction Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration To Reply Breif Iso Preliminary Gang Injunction Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration Showing 4 Consecutive Pubs Of Ntc Of Sep 18, 2007 Hearing On Preliminary Injunction In The Sf Chronicle And The Sf Examiner Papers Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Pltf's Ex Parte Application For Order To Show Cause Re: Preliminary Gang Injunction And Notice Of Motion And Points And Authorities In Support Of Judicial Notice And Discovery Filed By Intervenor Barrera, Hector
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 35 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Granting Leave To File Complaint In Intervention (intervenors Antonio Joseph Garcia And Ruben Reynoso-jimenez)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service Of Proposed Ex Parte Application And Motion For Leave To File Complaint In Intervention; Proposed Order Granting Leave To File Complaint In Intervention; Proposed Complaint In Intervention Filed By Intervenor Garcia, Antonio Joseph Reynoso-jimenez, Ruben Served Sep-06-2007, Personal Service On Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof Of Service Of Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Plaintiff's Ex-parte Application For Order To Show Cause Re Preliminary Gang Injunction; Declaration In Support Filed By Intervenor Garcia, Antonio Joseph Reynoso-jimenez, Ruben Served Sep-04-2007, Personal Service On Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Plaintiff's Ex-parte Application For Order To Show Cause Re Preliminary Gang Injunction Filed By Intervenor Garcia, Antonio Joseph Reynoso-jimenez, Ruben
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 31 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Complaint In Intervention
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Complaint In Intervention Filed By Intervenor Garcia, Antonio Joseph Reynoso-jimenez, Ruben As To Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Ex Parte Application For Order And Motion For Leave To File Complaint In Intervention, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Intervenor Garcia, Antonio Joseph Reynoso-jimenez, Ruben
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Copies Of Non-california Authority Filed By Intervenor Barrera, Hector
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Motion And Motion For Intervenor To File Brief One Day Late, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Intervenor Barrera, Hector Hearing Set For Sep-18-2007 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 27 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Complaint In Intervention
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Complaint In Intervention Filed By Intervenor Barrera, Hector As To Defendant Doe One Through Doe Five Hundred Inclusive
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Complaint In Intervention
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Complaint In Intervention Filed By Intervenor Guerrero, Jesus Chavez, Kevin Hernandez, Henry Arroyo, Ernesto As To Defendant Doe One Through Doe Five Hundred Inclusive
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Ex-parte Application For Osc Re: Prelim. Gang Injunction Filed By Intervenor Guerrero, Jesus Chavez, Kevin Hernandez, Henry Arroyo, Ernesto
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Oppos. To Plntf's Ex-parte Application For Osc Re; Preliminary Gang Injunction Filed By Intervenor Buitrago, Antonio
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Leave To Intervene And Denying Intervenor's Request To File Brief In Excess Of 15 Page Limit (intervenor Hector Barrera)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Granting Leave To File A Complaint In Intervention (intervenor Antonio Buitrago)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Permitting Points And Authorities To Exceed Fifteen Pages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007 Complaint In Intervention
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Complaint In Intervention Filed By Intervenor Buitrago, Antonio As To Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Ex Parte Application For Order On Intervention Filed By Intervenor Buitrago, Antonio
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To G.c. 68511.3 (confidential) Filed By Intervenor Buitrago, Antonio Order Granting Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To Crc 3.50 - 3.63
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To G.c. 68511.3 (confidential) Filed By Intervenor Reynoso-jimenez, Ruben Order Granting Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To Crc 3.50 - 3.63
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time On Hearing On Motion For Leave To Intervene; Proof Of Service Filed By Intervenor Garcia, Antonio Joseph Reynoso-jimenez, Ruben
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/5/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time On Hearing On Motion For Leave To Intervene And On Motion For Permission To File Brief In Excess Of 15 Pages, Points And Authorities Filed By Intervenor Barrera, Hector
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Table On Non-california Authorities Filed By Other The American Civil Liberties Union Of Northern California Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights Of The San Francisco Bay Area
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application Of American Civil Liberties Union Of Norther California And The The Lawyers Committee For Civil Rights Of The S.f. Bay Area To File A Brief As Amici Curiae Filed By Other The American Civil Liberties Union Of Northern California Lawyers' Committee For Civil Rights Of The San Francisco Bay Area
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Leave To File Complaint In Intervention
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration Of In Support Of Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Plaintiff's Ex-parte Application For Order To Show Cause Re Preliminary Gang Injunction Filed By Intervenor Garcia, Antonio Joseph Reynoso-jimenez, Ruben
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time On Hearing On Motion For Leave To Intervine; Points And Authorities And Declaration In Support Filed By Intervenor Guerrero, Jesus Chavez, Kevin Hernandez, Henry Arroyo, Ernesto
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To G.c. 68511.3 (confidential) Filed By Intervenor Arroyo, Ernesto Order Granting Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To Crc 3.50 - 3.63
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To G.c. 68511.3 (confidential) Filed By Intervenor Hernandez, Henry Order Granting Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To Crc 3.50 - 3.63
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To G.c. 68511.3 (confidential) Filed By Intervenor Chavez, Kevin Order Granting Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To Crc 3.50 - 3.63
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To G.c. 68511.3 (confidential) Filed By Intervenor Guerrero, Jesus Order Granting Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To Crc 3.50 - 3.63
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Added To Calendar For Plaintiff People Of The State Of California's Order To Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction (per Ex Parte Order Of 07/12/07) Hearing Set For Sep-18-2007 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order To Show Cause Re: Preliminary Gang Injunction (osc Set For 09/18/07)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Ex Parte Application For Order To Show Cause Re: Preliminary Gang Injunction And Preliminary Injunction, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: 6/21/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Injunctive Relief, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff People Of The State Of California By And Through Dennis J. Herrera City Attorney For The City And County Of San Francisco As To Defendant Norteno A Criminal Street Gang Sued As An Unincorporated Association Doe One Through Doe Five Hundred Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Nov-21-2007 Proof Of Service Due On Aug-20-2007 Case Management Statement Due On Nov-06-2007

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 436 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?