Nicholas Snell v. Sj Amoroso, Co. Inc. Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 07 464657
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Snell, Nicholas, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Arns Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Stephen Arns +1 415 495 7800 +1 415 495 7888 ddl@arnslaw.com
v.
No Logo Does 1-100, Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Rosendin Electric, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Boornazian Jensen & Garthe

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph Costella & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Bruce Waterman +1 510 934 3600
No Logo S.j. Amoroso Construction Co., Inc., Defendant

Represented by Boornazian Jensen & Garthe

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph Costella & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Bruce Waterman +1 510 934 3600

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Sj Amoroso, Co. Inc., Defendant
No Logo Roes 1 To 20, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Rosendin Electric, Inc., Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph Costella & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Bruce Waterman +1 510 934 3600
State Compensation Insurance Fund State Compensation Insurance Fund, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fil, Jonathan Michael

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fil, Jonathan Michael +1 415 777 3114
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (8) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009 Case Ordered Off Calendar
Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Jan-20-2009 Is Off Calendar, Dismissal On File. Notice Sent By Court.
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/9/2009 Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Of Rosendin Electric, Inc
    Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Rosendin Electric, Inc. Of Rosendin Electric, Inc Filed On Aug 1, 2007
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: 12/1/2008 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
      Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Dec-09-2008 Continued To Jan-20-2009 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: 11/12/2008 Dismissal
        Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 52 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008
          Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Nov-06-2008 - By Court.
            Blank 51 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008
            Removed From Master Jury Calendar Set For Nov-24-2008 - By Court.
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
              Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal Pursuant To Crc 3.1385 Set For Dec-09-2008 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Oct-22-2008 Mediation Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 49 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: 10/9/2008
                Mini-minutes For Oct-09-2008 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                  Blank 48 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: 10/9/2008 Court Filing
                  Law And Motion 301, No Appearances On This Matter. The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling As Follows: Defendant Rosendin Electric, Incorporated's Motion For Summary Judgment Is Granted. No Opposition Filed. Prevailing Party Is To Prepare A Form Of Order. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Carol Karen Csr # 8189 301/pjb
                    Blank 47 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: 10/2/2008
                    Law And Motion, 301, Defendant S.j. Amoroso Construction Co., Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment (date: Oct-09-2008), Off Calendar Per Request Of The Moving Party.
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: 9/30/2008 Notice of Settlement
                      Notice Of Settlement Filed By Plaintiff Snell, Nicholas
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: 9/24/2008 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
                        Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Sep-24-2008 Continued To Oct-22-2008 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 44 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008 Court Filing
                          Law And Motion 301, Defendant S.j. Amoroso Construction Co., Inc.'s Motion For Leave To File Cross-complaint Is Granted On The Condition That Should Cross-defendant Seek Continuance Of A Trial It Should Not Be Opposed By The Cross Complainant In Order For The Cross-defendant To Be Able To Bring A Summary Judgment/adjudication Motion. Prevailing Party Is To Prepare A Form Of Order. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Carol Karen Csr # 8189
                            Blank 43 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/19/2008
                            Mini-minutes For Aug-19-2008 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                              Blank 42 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008
                              Mini-minutes For Aug-15-2008 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                Blank 41 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008 Court Filing
                                Law And Motion 301, Defendant Rosendin Electric, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Is Continued To Oct-09-2008 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 301 Per Agreement Of Parties. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Carol Karen Csr# 8189
                                  Blank 40 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008
                                  Law And Motion 301, Motion For Summary Judgment Continued From Aug-18-2008 To Law And Motion At Oct-09-2008, 9:30 Am In Dept. 301 Per Agreement Of The Parties.
                                    Blank 39 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008
                                    Request For Judicial Notice Filed By Deft. Rosendin Electric, Inc
                                      Blank 38 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008
                                      Opposition To Mtn For Leave To File Cross Complaint Filed By Defendant Rosendin Electric, Inc.
                                        Blank 37 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008
                                        Objections To Evidence Offered By S.j. Amoroso On Mtn For Leave To File Cross Complaint Filed By Defendant Rosendin Electric, Inc.
                                          Blank 36 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008
                                          Ntc Of Mtn For Leave To File X-comp, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant S.j. Amoroso Construction Co., Inc. Hearing Set For Aug-19-2008 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
                                            Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Jul-23-2008 Continued To Sep-24-2008 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Blank 34 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008
                                              First Amended Notice Of Lien Filed By Claimant State Compensation Insurance Fund
                                                Blank 33 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008
                                                Order To Show Cause To Defendant's Counsel William Waterman For Failure To Comply With San Francisco Superior Court Early Settlement Program Policies And Procedures No. 4. (administrative Fee) Is Ordered Off Calendar/case Removed From The Early Settlement Program. Proceedings Reported By: Karen Farnsworth, Csr#5162. (212)
                                                  Blank 32 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008
                                                  Mini-minutes For Jul-10-2008 10:30 Am For Dept 212
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Notice Of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                    Settlement Conference Set For Aug-29-2008 Continued To Nov-06-2008 At 3:30 Pm In 608
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008
                                                      Master Jury Calendar Set For Sep-15-2008 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Nov-24-2008 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 Per Ex Parte Order Dated 7/3/08. (206)
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Order
                                                        Order Granting Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial Date
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008
                                                          Stipulation To Continue Trial Filed By Rosendin Electric, Inc. S.j. Amoroso Construction Co., Inc. Snell, Nicholas
                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008
                                                            Ex Parte Application For Order To Continue Trial Date, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Rosendin Electric, Inc.
                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008
                                                              Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Rosendin Electric, Inc. Hearing Set For Aug-15-2008 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008
                                                                Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Request For Judicial Notice, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant S.j. Amoroso Construction Co., Inc. Hearing Set For Aug-18-2008 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Notice Of Removal From The Early Settlement Program
                                                                  Notice Of Removal From The Early Settlement Program
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
                                                                    Order To Show Cause Re Mediation Set For Jul-23-2008 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008
                                                                      Stipulation To Alternative Dispute Resolution -private Mediation Filed By Snell, Nicholas Sj Amoroso, Co. Inc. Rosendin Electric, Inc.
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Order to Show Cause
                                                                        Order To Show Cause To William B. Waterman Set For Jul-10-2008 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212 For Failure To Comply With San Francisco Superior Court Early Settlement Program Policies And Procedures No 4. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008 Notice Of Early Settlement Conference--early Settlement Prgm
                                                                          Notice Of Early Settlement Conference - Early Settlement Program
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007
                                                                            Jury Fees, Tran # R0907c07j002, Tag # 019764 Trust Tag#19764 Deposited By Plaintiff Snell, Nicholas
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                              Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Sep-15-2008 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Aug-29-2008 At 3:30 Pm In Department 608. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007
                                                                                Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For May-12-2008 - By Court.
                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                  Objection To Hearing By Commissioner/pro Tem Acting As Judge Filed By Plaintiff Snell, Nicholas
                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007
                                                                                    Notice Of Objection To Trial Date Filed By Defendant Rosendin Electric, Inc.
                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007
                                                                                      Notice Of Objection To Trial Date Filed By Defendant Rosendin Electric, Inc.
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                        Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On May-12-2008 At 3:30 Pm In Department 303. Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For May-27-2008 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Nov-30-2007 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007
                                                                                          Proof Of Service Of Substitute Of Attorney Filed By Defendant S.j. Amoroso Construction Co., Inc.
                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007
                                                                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant S.j. Amoroso Construction Co., Inc. Jury Demanded
                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007
                                                                                              Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Snell, Nicholas Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007
                                                                                                Substitution Of Attorney: Deane, George I. Substituted For Takahashi, Irene As Attorney For S.j. Amoroso Construction Co., Inc.
                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                  Ntc Of Lien Pursuant To Labor Code 3850-3865; Request To Be Placed On Pos List For All Pleadings And Discovery Filed By Claimant State Compensation Insurance Fund
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Answer
                                                                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant S.j. Amoroso Construction Co., Inc.
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007 Summons Issued To Cross Complainant
                                                                                                      Summons Issued To Cross Complainant Rosendin Electric, Inc.
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007 Cross Complaint
                                                                                                        Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Rosendin Electric, Inc. As To Cross Defendant Roes 1 To 20
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007 Answer
                                                                                                          Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Rosendin Electric, Inc.
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007
                                                                                                            Summons On Complaint Person Served: Dana Mcmanus, Chief Executive Officer, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Snell, Nicholas Served Jul-09-2007, Personal Service On Defendant Sj Amoroso, Co. Inc.
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                              Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Snell, Nicholas As To Defendant Sj Amoroso, Co. Inc. Rosendin Electric, Inc. Does 1-100, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Nov-30-2007 Proof Of Service Due On Aug-27-2007 Case Management Statement Due On Nov-15-2007
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 64 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?