Magan Kasper v. Oakwood Worldwide A Corporation Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 07 469346
Superior Court Judge Patrick J. Mahoney, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Kasper, Magan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Dolan Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher B. Dolan +1 415 421 2800 +1 415 412 2830 chris@cbdlaw.com
v.
No Logo Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Geary Courtyard Associates, A California Limited Partnership, Sued As Doe 1, Defendant

Represented by Prindle Decker & Amaro LLP

No Logo Geary Courtyard Associates, Dba Geary Courtyard, Defendant
No Logo Huston, Reginald Brandon An Individual, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Vucinich, Jeffery Michael

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vucinich, Jeffery Michael +1 650 327 3707
No Logo Jamieson, James An Individual, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Jamieson, Kelly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Last Name Unknown, Cedric , An Individual, Defendant
No Logo Oakwood Corporate Housing, A Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Oakwood Geary Courtyard, A Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Oakwood Worldwide A Corporation, Defendant
No Logo R&b Realty Group, Defendant
Officially listed as "R & B Realty Group , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Worldwide"

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Scott, Marvin An Individual, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Worldwide Corporate Housing, LP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Worldwide Corporate Housing, Lp , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Corporate Housing"

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Geary Courtyard Associates, A California Limited Partnership, Sued As Doe 1, Cross-Complainant

Represented by Prindle Decker & Amaro LLP

No Logo Huston, Reginald Brandon An Individual, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Vucinich, Jeffery Michael

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vucinich, Jeffery Michael +1 650 327 3707
No Logo Jamieson, Kelly, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Oakwood Corporate Housing, A Corporation, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Oakwood Worldwide A Corporation, Cross-Defendant
No Logo R&b Realty Group, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "R & B Realty Group , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Worldwide"

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Roes 1-20, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Scott, Marvin An Individual, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Worldwide Corporate Housing, LP, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Worldwide Corporate Housing, Lp , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Corporate Housing"

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (87) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (10) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 87 Filed: 11/19/2009, Entered: 11/19/2009 Order Dismissing Case Pursuant To Crc 3.1385
Case Dismissed By Court At Order To Show Cause Hearing Nov-17-2009 At 10:00am Pursuant To Crc 3.1385. This Dismissal Pertains To The Remaining Cross Complaint(s). Notice Sent By Court.
    Blank 86 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: 11/17/2009
    Mini-minutes For Nov-17-2009 10:00 Am For Dept 212
      Blank 85 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: 11/10/2009
      Mini-minutes For Nov-10-2009 9:30 Am For Dept 302
        Blank 84 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: 11/10/2009 Court Filing
        Law And Motion, 302, Defendants Marvin Scott, Kelly Jamieson, R & B Realty Group, And, Worldwide Corporate Housing, Lp Motion For Summary Adjudication. No Appearances On This Matter. The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling As Follows: Off Calendar, Per Moving Party. Judge: Charlotte Walter Woolard, Reporter: Kent Gubbine, Csr #5797
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Dismissal With Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint
          Dismissal With Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document 82 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009 Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
            Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal Pursuant To Crc 3.1385 Set For Nov-17-2009 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Sep-21-2009 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: 9/9/2009 Notice of Settlement
              Notice Of Settlement Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 80 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: 8/19/2009
                Motion For Summary Adjudication, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Scott, Marvin An Individual Jamieson, Kelly R & B Realty Group , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Worldwide Worldwide Corporate Housing, Lp , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Corporate Housing Hearing Set For Nov-10-2009 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                  Legal Document 79 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Continued Order To Show Cause
                  Order To Show Cause Set For Aug-10-2009 Continued To Sep-21-2009 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s), Or File Dismissal Against Defendant(s) Cedric Last Name Unknown, And Oakwood Geary Courtyard, A Corporation. The Aug-10-2009 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                    Legal Document 78 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009 Continued Order To Show Cause
                    Order To Show Cause Set For Jun-08-2009 Continued To Aug-10-2009 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s) Against, Or Dismiss Defendant(s) Cedric Last Name Unknown And Oakwood Geary Courtyard, A Corporation. The Jun-08-2009 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                      Blank 77 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: 3/25/2009
                      Mini-minutes For Mar-25-2009 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                        Blank 76 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: 3/25/2009 Court Filing
                        Law And Motion 302, Defendant Geary Courtyard Associates's, Motion For Undertaking; Request For Sanctions. Argued And The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling As Follows: Motion Denied. Insufficient Evidence Presented That Defendant Has A Reasonable Possibility Of Prevailing. Counsel Waive Notice. Judge: Charlotte Walter Woolard, Reporter: Kent Gubbine, Csr #5797
                          Blank 75 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009
                          Reply To Pltf's Oppos To Deft Geary Courtyard Associates;' Motion For Undertaking; Declaration Of Jack C. Nick Filed By Defendant Geary Courtyard Associates, A California Limited Partnership, Sued As Doe 1
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: 3/13/2009 Answer
                            Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Scott, Marvin An Individual Jamieson, James An Individual R & B Realty Group , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Worldwide Worldwide Corporate Housing, Lp , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Corporate Housing
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 73 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: 3/12/2009
                              Declaration Of Vanessa A Siino Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan
                                Blank 72 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: 3/12/2009
                                Declaration Of Megan Kasper Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan
                                  Blank 71 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: 3/12/2009
                                  Opposition To Derft Geary Courtyard Associates Mtn For Undertaking Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan
                                    Legal Document 70 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                    Order To Show Cause Set For Mar-09-2009 Continued To Jun-08-2009 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service And Obtain Answer(s) Or Enter Default(s) Against Defendant(s) Cedric Last Name Unknown, Marvin Scott, Oakwood Geary Courtyard, A Corporation, And Reginald Brandon Huston On First Amended Complaint. The Mar-09-2009 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                      Blank 69 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: 3/6/2009
                                      Declaration Of Vanessa A Siino In Response To Osc Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan
                                        Blank 68 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009
                                        Discovery, 610, Defendant Marvin Scott, Kelly Jamieson, R & B Realty Group And Worldwide Corporate Housing, Lp's Joinder In Defendant Geary Courtyard Associates' Motion To Compel Plaintiff To Authorize Release Of Psychological/psychotherapy Records, Is Off Calendar As Underlying Motion Was Taken Off Calendar.
                                          Blank 67 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009
                                          Discovery, 610, Defendant Geary Courtyard Associates' Motion To Compel Plaintiff To Authorize Release Of Her Psychological/psychotherapy Records And Request For Sanctions, Off Calendar, At The Request Of The Moving Party.
                                            Blank 66 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009
                                            Notice Of Motion For Undertaking; Request For Sanctions, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Geary Courtyard Associates, A California Limited Partnership, Sued As Doe 1 Hearing Set For Mar-25-2009 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                              Blank 65 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009
                                              Joinder In Motion To Compel Plaintiff To Authorize Release Of Psychological/psychotherapy Records, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Scott, Marvin An Individual Jamieson, Kelly R & B Realty Group , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Worldwide Worldwide Corporate Housing, Lp , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Corporate Housing Hearing Set For Mar-06-2009 At 10:30 Am In Dept 610
                                                Blank 64 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: 2/4/2009
                                                Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Pltf To Authorize Release Of Her Psychological/psychotherapy Records; Memorandum Of P/a; Request For Sanctions; Declaration Of Cynthia A. Palin In Support Thereof; (propsoed) Order, Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Geary Courtyard Associates, A California Limited Partnership, Sued As Doe 1 Hearing Set For Mar-06-2009 At 10:30 Am In Dept 610
                                                  Legal Document 63 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: 12/8/2008 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                  Order To Show Cause Set For Dec-08-2008 Continued To Mar-09-2009 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s) On The First Amended Complaint. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: 12/8/2008 Sanction Order
                                                    Sanctions Ordered In The Amount Of $350.00 Against Christopher B. Dolan, Esq. For Failure To Appear At The Order To Show Cause Hearing On: Dec-08-2008, Payable On Or Before Dec-23-2008. Proceedings Reported By: Patrick Heard, Csr# 11055. (212) Notice Sent By Court.
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: 12/8/2008
                                                      Mini-minutes For Dec-08-2008 1:30 Pm For Dept 212
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: 9/30/2008 Answer
                                                        Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Scott, Marvin An Individual Jamieson, Kelly R & B Realty Group , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Worldwide Worldwide Corporate Housing, Lp , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Corporate Housing
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/30/2008, Entered: 9/30/2008 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                          Order To Show Cause Set For Oct-06-2008 Continued To Dec-08-2008 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s) As To First Amended Complaint. The Oct-06-2008 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document 58 Filed: 9/24/2008, Entered: 9/24/2008 Answer
                                                            Answer To Cross Complaint Geary Courtyard Associates X-complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Huston, Reginald Brandon An Individual
                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: 9/19/2008
                                                              Pos By Mail: Summons And X-complaint For Equitable And Implied Indemnity, Express Indemnity; Contribution And Declaratory Relief Filed By Defendant Geary Courtyard Associates, A California Limited Partnership, Sued As Doe 1
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008 Answer
                                                                Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Huston, Reginald Brandon An Individual
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document 55 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Order to Show Cause
                                                                  Order To Show Cause Set For Oct-06-2008 In Department 212 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s). The Aug-22-2008 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                    Legal Document 54 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Order
                                                                    Order Granting Defendants' Motion To Compel Further Responses To Written Discovery, Request For Sanctions
                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008
                                                                      Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant R & B Realty Group , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Worldwide Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008
                                                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Huston, Reginald Brandon An Individual Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008
                                                                          Discovery 610, Defendant Marvin Scott, Kelly Jamieson, R & B Realty Group And Worldwide Corporation Housing, Lp.'s Motion To Compel Further Responses To Special Interrogatories Is Granted. The Court Has Read And Considered The Late-filed Opposition. The Motion Is Moot As Amended Responses Have Been Served. Monetary Sanctions In The Amount Of $720 Shall Be Paid Within 30 Days Of Notice Of This Order. Commissioner: Bruce Chan. Not Reported.
                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008
                                                                            Mini-minutes For Jul-11-2008 10:30 Am For Dept 610
                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008
                                                                              Opposition To Defts R&b Realty Group And Worldwide Corporate Housing, Lp, Marvin Scott And Kelly Jamieson's Motion To Compel Pltf To Provide Further Responses To Written Discovery, Production Of Documents And Request For Sanctions; ; Pos Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan
                                                                                Legal Document 48 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                Case Management Conference Of Jul-11-2008 Continued To Aug-22-2008 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008
                                                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Scott, Marvin An Individual Jamieson, James An Individual R & B Realty Group , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Worldwide Worldwide Corporate Housing, Lp , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Corporate Housing Jury Demanded
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Summons Issued
                                                                                    Summons Issued To Cross Complainant Geary Courtyard Associates, A California Limited Partnership, Sued As Doe 1
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Legal Document 45 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Cross Complaint
                                                                                      Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Geary Courtyard Associates, A California Limited Partnership, Sued As Doe 1 As To Cross Defendant Oakwood Worldwide A Corporation Oakwood Corporate Housing, A Corporation Scott, Marvin An Individual Huston, Reginald Brandon An Individual Jamieson, Kelly Roes 1-20
                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008
                                                                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Geary Courtyard Associates, A California Limited Partnership, Sued As Doe 1 Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 6.0 Days
                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008
                                                                                          Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008
                                                                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Huston, Reginald Brandon An Individual Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008 Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant
                                                                                              Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Geary Courtyard Associates, A California Limited Partnership, Sued As Doe 1
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008
                                                                                                Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To Compel Plntf To Provide Further Responses To Written Discovery, Production Of Documents And Req. For Sanctions, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Scott, Marvin An Individual Jamieson, Kelly R & B Realty Group , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Worldwide Worldwide Corporate Housing, Lp , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Corporate Housing Hearing Set For Jul-11-2008 At 10:30 Am In Dept 610
                                                                                                  Legal Document 39 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                  Case Management Conference Of May-30-2008 Continued To Jul-11-2008 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212, For Answer(s). Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008
                                                                                                    Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Huston, Reginald Brandon An Individual Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008
                                                                                                      Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
                                                                                                        Legal Document 36 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Order
                                                                                                        Order (re Defendants' Renewed Motion To Strike Claims For Punitive Damages, Denied)
                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008
                                                                                                          Mini-minutes For May-14-2008 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                            Law And Motion 302, Defendants Marvin Scott, Kelly Jamieson, R & B Realty Group And Worldwide Corporate Housing, L.p.'s (renewed) Motion To Strike Claims For Punitive Damages. Argued And The Court Adopts Its Tentative Ruling: Denied. The Amended Complaint Pleads Sufficient Facts To Support Plaintiff's Claim For Punitive Damages On Alternative Theories. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Patrick J. Mahoney, Reporter: Maria Torreano, Csr #8600
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Summons On Complaint ` Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                              Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan Served May-05-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Geary Courtyard Associates, Dba Geary Courtyard
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008
                                                                                                                Pos: P&a In Reply To Opposition To Renewed Mtn To Strike Claims For Puntitive Damages Filed By Defendant Scott, Marvin An Individual Jamieson, Kelly R & B Realty Group , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Worldwide Worldwide Corporate Housing, Lp , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Corporate Housing
                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008
                                                                                                                  Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Reply To Opposition To Renewed Mtn To Strike Claims For Punitive Damages Filed By Defendant Scott, Marvin An Individual Jamieson, Kelly R & B Realty Group , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Worldwide Worldwide Corporate Housing, Lp , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Corporate Housing
                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008
                                                                                                                    Declaration Of D.j. Streza In Reply To Opposition To Renewed Mtn To Strike Claims For Punitive Damages Filed By Defendant Scott, Marvin An Individual Jamieson, Kelly R & B Realty Group , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Worldwide Worldwide Corporate Housing, Lp , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Corporate Housing
                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008
                                                                                                                      Pos: Opposition To Df's Renewed Mtn To Strike Claims Of Punitive Damages; Declaration Of F.j. Shehadeh In Support Thereof Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan
                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008
                                                                                                                        Opposition To Deft R&b Realty Group And Worldwide Corp.'s Renewed Motion To Strike Claims, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Answr To Complaint Filed By Defendant
                                                                                                                          Answr To Complaint Filed By Defendant Huston, Reginald Brandon An Individual
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Unknown document
                                                                                                                            Request For Default Rejected, Notice Mailed, As To Defendant Huston, Reginald Brandon An Individual
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008
                                                                                                                              Pos: Declaration Of D.j. Sterza In Support Of Renewed Mtn To Strike Claims For Punitive Damages And Supporting Documents Filed By Defendant Scott, Marvin An Individual Jamieson, James An Individual Jamieson, Kelly R & B Realty Group , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Worldwide Worldwide Corporate Housing, Lp , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Corporate Housing
                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008
                                                                                                                                Notice Of Motion And Renewed Motion To Strike Claims For Punitive Damages, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Scott, Marvin An Individual Jamieson, Kelly R & B Realty Group , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Worldwide Worldwide Corporate Housing, Lp , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Corporate Housing Hearing Set For May-14-2008 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                  Case Management Conference Of Apr-18-2008 Continued To May-30-2008 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212, For Answer(s). Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008
                                                                                                                                    Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Defendants' Motion To Strike Claims For Punitive Damages
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008
                                                                                                                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Scott, Marvin An Individual Jamieson, James An Individual Jamieson, Kelly R & B Realty Group , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Worldwide Worldwide Corporate Housing, Lp , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Corporate Housing Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008
                                                                                                                                          Pos On First Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                            1st Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan As To Defendant Oakwood Worldwide A Corporation Oakwood Corporate Housing, A Corporation Oakwood Geary Courtyard, A Corporation Scott, Marvin An Individual Huston, Reginald Brandon An Individual Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive Jamieson, Kelly Last Name Unknown, Cedric , An Individual
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008
                                                                                                                                              Mini-minutes For Mar-06-2008 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                Law And Motion 302, Defendants Marvin Scott, Kelly Jamieson, R & B Realty Group And Worldwide Corporate Housing, L.p.'s Motion To Strike Claims For Punitive Damages. Argued And The Court Adopts And Modifies Its Tentative Ruling: Granted With Ten Days Leave To Amend As To All Causes Of Action Pled. Judge: Patrick J. Mahoney, Reporter: Maria Torreano, Csr #8600
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008
                                                                                                                                                  Pos Of P/a In Reply To Opposition Filed By Defendant Scott, Marvin An Individual Jamieson, James An Individual R & B Realty Group , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Worldwide Worldwide Corporate Housing, Lp , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Corporate Housing
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008
                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Reply To Opposition To Motion To Strike Claims For Punitive Damages Filed By Defendant Scott, Marvin An Individual Jamieson, Kelly R & B Realty Group , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Worldwide Worldwide Corporate Housing, Lp , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Corporate Housing
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 2/28/2008
                                                                                                                                                      Declaration Of David J Streza In Reply To Opposition To Motino To Strike Claims For Punitive Damages Filed By Defendant Scott, Marvin An Individual Jamieson, Kelly R & B Realty Group , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Worldwide Worldwide Corporate Housing, Lp , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Corporate Housing
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008
                                                                                                                                                        Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008
                                                                                                                                                          Opposition To R & B Realty Group And Worldwide Corporate Housing's Lp.'s Mtn To Strike And Dec. Of Francis Shehadeh Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008
                                                                                                                                                            Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan Served Feb-06-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Geary Courtyard Associates, Dba Geary Courtyard
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008
                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Motion To Strike Claims For Punitive Damages, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Scott, Marvin An Individual Jamieson, Kelly R & B Realty Group , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Worldwide Worldwide Corporate Housing, Lp , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Corporate Housing Hearing Set For Mar-06-2008 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008
                                                                                                                                                                Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan Served Jan-15-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Huston, Reginald Brandon An Individual
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                  Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1 To Be Geary Courtyard Associates, Dba Geary Courtyard
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                    Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan Served Dec-21-2007, Mail And Acknowledgement, Acknowledgment Date Jan-03-2008 On Defendant Oakwood Worldwide A Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                      Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan Served Dec-21-2007, Mail And Acknowledgement, Acknowledgment Date Jan-03-2008 On Defendant Scott, Marvin An Individual
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                        Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan Served Dec-21-2007, Mail And Acknowledgement, Acknowledgment Date Jan-03-2008 On Defendant Oakwood Corporate Housing, A Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                          Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan Served Dec-21-2007, Mail And Acknowledgement, Acknowledgment Date Jan-03-2008 On Defendant Jamieson, Kelly
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                            Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                              Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Kasper, Magan As To Defendant Oakwood Worldwide A Corporation Oakwood Corporate Housing, A Corporation Oakwood Geary Courtyard, A Corporation Scott, Marvin An Individual Huston, Reginald Brandon An Individual Jamieson, James An Individual Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive Jamieson, Kelly Geary Courtyard Associates, Dba Geary Courtyard R & B Realty Group , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Worldwide Worldwide Corporate Housing, Lp , Erroneously Sued As Oakwood Corporate Housing Last Name Unknown, Cedric , An Individual Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Apr-18-2008 Proof Of Service Due On Jan-18-2008 Case Management Statement Due On Apr-03-2008

                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 266 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?