Yelena Berdichevsky v. Shawman Group Llc, Dba Fluid Bar And Lounge, A Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 08 471945
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Berdichevsky, Yelena An Individual, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Strange, Paul P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Strange, Paul P. +1 415 542 2789
v.
No Logo Does 1-100, Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Reed, David An Individual, Defendant
No Logo Shawman Group Llc, Dba Fluid Bar And Lounge, A California Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Shawman Group, Llc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dave Neville +1 415 487 2601
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (6) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: 5/18/2010 Order Dismissing Entire Action
There Was No Appearance, Nor Objection Filed. Case Dismissed As To Entire Action By Court At Order To Show Cause Hearing May-17-2010 At 1:30pm. Notice Sent By Court.
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 37 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: 5/17/2010
    Mini-minutes For May-17-2010 1:30 Pm For Dept 212
      Blank 36 Filed: 4/1/2010, Entered: 4/1/2010
      Sanction Payment Deposited By Plaintiff Berdichevsky, Yelena An Individual
        Legal Document 35 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 3/15/2010 Continued Order To Show Cause
        Order To Show Cause Set For Mar-15-2010 Continued To May-17-2010 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) David Reed. Notice Sent By Court.
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 3/15/2010 Sanction Order
          Sanctions Ordered In The Amount Of $350.00 Against Paul P. Strange, Esq. For Failure To Appear At The Order To Show Cause Hearing On: Mar-15-2010, Payable On Or Before Mar-30-2010. Notice Sent By Court.
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 33 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 3/15/2010
            Mini-minutes For Mar-15-2010 1:30 Pm For Dept 212
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010 Continued Order To Show Cause
              Order To Show Cause Set For Jan-25-2010 Continued To Mar-15-2010 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) David Reed. The Jan-25-2010 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: 12/4/2009 Order For Publication Of Summons
                Order For Publication Of Summons (no Sase; Copy In Dept 206)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: 11/23/2009 Continued Order To Show Cause
                  Order To Show Cause Set For Nov-23-2009 Continued To Jan-25-2010 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) David Reed. Notice Sent By Court.
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 29 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: 11/23/2009
                    Mini-minutes For Nov-23-2009 1:30 Pm For Dept 212
                      Blank 28 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: 11/23/2009
                      Ex Parte Application For Order For Publication Of Summons, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Berdichevsky, Yelena An Individual
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/21/2009 Continued Order To Show Cause
                        Order To Show Cause Set For Sep-21-2009 Continued To Nov-23-2009 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) David Reed. The Sep-21-2009 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: 7/28/2009 Continued Order To Show Cause
                          Order To Show Cause Set For Aug-10-2009 Continued To Sep-21-2009 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) David Reed. The Aug-10-2009 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 Continued Order To Show Cause
                            Order To Show Cause Set For Jun-29-2009 Continued To Aug-10-2009 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) David Reed. The Jun-29-2009 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 24 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009
                              Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Attorney's Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel: Pro Per Substituted For Neville, Dave As Attorney For Shawman Group, Llc
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: 4/23/2009 Order
                                Order Granting Attorney's Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel-civil
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 22 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: 4/23/2009
                                  Mini-minutes For Apr-23-2009 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                    Blank 21 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: 4/23/2009 Court Filing
                                    Law And Motion 301, Dave L. Neville's Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel For Defendant Shawman Group, Llc Is Granted. Order Was Signed In Open Court. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Carol Karen, Csr# 8189
                                      Blank 20 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009
                                      Request To Withdraw Application For Service By Publication And Notice Of Service, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Berdichevsky, Yelena An Individual
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Summons On Complaint ` Filed By Plaintiff
                                        Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Berdichevsky, Yelena An Individual Served Apr-07-2009, Personal Service On Defendant Reed, David An Individual
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Order
                                          Order For Service By Publication Pursuant To Ccp Section 415.50
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: 3/30/2009 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                            Order To Show Cause Set For Mar-30-2009 Continued To Jun-29-2009 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service And Obtain Answer(s) Or Enter Default(s) Against Defendant(s) David Reed. Notice Sent By Court.
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Blank 16 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: 3/30/2009
                                              Mini-minutes For Mar-30-2009 1:30 Pm For Dept 212
                                                Blank 15 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: 3/30/2009
                                                Ex Parte Application For Order For Publication Of Summons Filed By Plaintiff Berdichevsky, Yelena An Individual
                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009
                                                  Motion For Withdrawal Of Attorney Of Record, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Shawman Group, Llc Hearing Set For Apr-23-2009 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: 1/26/2009 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                    Order To Show Cause Set For Jan-26-2009 Continued To Mar-30-2009 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service And Obtain Answer(s) Or Enter Default(s) Against Defendant(s) David Reed. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: 1/26/2009
                                                      Mini-minutes For Jan-26-2009 1:30 Pm For Dept 212
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: 10/27/2008 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                        Order To Show Cause Set For Oct-27-2008 Continued To Jan-26-2009 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The Oct-27-2008 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: 10/22/2008
                                                          Declaration Of Paul P. Strange In Response To Osc And Request For Continuance Pending Motion To Serve By Publication Filed By Plaintiff Berdichevsky, Yelena An Individual
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                            Order To Show Cause Set For Aug-25-2008 Continued To Oct-27-2008 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service And Obtain Answer(s) Or Enter Default(s) Against Defendant(s) David Reed. The Aug-25-2008 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008
                                                              Declaration Of Paul P. Strange In Response To Osc Filed By Plaintiff Berdichevsky, Yelena An Individual
                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008
                                                                Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Shawman Group, Llc Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008
                                                                  Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Strange, Paul P.
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Order to Show Cause
                                                                    Order To Show Cause Set For Aug-25-2008 In Department 212 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To File Proof Of Service And Obtain Answer(s) Or Enter Default(s) Against Defendant(s) David Reed. The Jul-11-2008 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008 Answer
                                                                      Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Shawman Group, Llc
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                                        Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Berdichevsky, Yelena An Individual Served Apr-22-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Shawman Group Llc, Dba Fluid Bar And Lounge, A California Corporation
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                          Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008 Complaint
                                                                            Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Berdichevsky, Yelena An Individual As To Defendant Shawman Group Llc, Dba Fluid Bar And Lounge, A California Corporation Reed, David An Individual Does 1-100, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jul-11-2008 Proof Of Service Due On Apr-07-2008 Case Management Statement Due On Jun-26-2008
                                                                              Request RequestSpace

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 55 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?