George Bush,jr Et Al v. Congress Of The United States Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 08 472532
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bush,jr, George, Plaintiff
No Logo Gore, Al, Plaintiff
No Logo Murawski, Michael, Plaintiff
No Logo Murawsku,, Michael, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo ( Does 44,900 To 45,011 Properly Named), Defendant
No Logo (does 30,000 To 30,015 Property Named), Defendant
No Logo (does 44,200 To 44, 211 Properly Named), Defendant
No Logo (does 96,300 To 96, 329 Properly Named), Defendant
No Logo (see Scanned Document), Defendant
No Logo Abramoff, Jack, Defendant
No Logo Addington, David, Defendant
American International Group, Inc. American International Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Aig"
Unknown Role, Ipcs, Inc.
Unknown Role, Perini Corp
Unknown Role, Ipc Holdings Ltd
Unknown Role, Selmer Industries Inc
Unknown Role, Blackstone Group Lp
Unknown Role, AIG BG Holdings LLC
Unknown Role, Tidewater Inc.
Unknown Role, On Minerals Co Inc
No Logo Airgas, Defendant
No Logo Alito, Samuel, Defendant
No Logo Allen, Carole Ward, Defendant
No Logo R.H. CRISS, Defendant
Officially listed as "Allied Signal"
No Logo Altmann, Klaus, Defendant
No Logo Altria Group, Defendant
No Logo Alwan, Rafid Ahmed, Defendant
No Logo Amerail, Defendant
No Logo American Passenger Railcar Co., Defendant
No Logo Americans For Safe Access, Defendant
No Logo Amtrak, Defendant
No Logo A, P L., Defendant
No Logo ARCO, Defendant
No Logo Arnold, Mattie, Defendant
No Logo Arvin-edison, Defendant
No Logo Ashcroft, John, Defendant
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "Barack Obamas Admission That Barack Obama Is Harboring Nazi War Criminals Pursuant To Authority He Claim He Derives From: ____________"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017
Barclays Global Investors, NA Barclays Global Investors, NA, Defendant
No Logo Bart Police Department, Defendant
BASF AG BASF AG, Defendant
Officially listed as "Basf"
No Logo Basf, S.a., Defendant
No Logo Baumann Motor Works, S.a., Defendant
No Logo Benedict, Xvi, Pope, Defendant
No Logo Bin Laden Construction Co, Defendant
No Logo Blair, Tony, Defendant
No Logo Bnsf, Defendant
No Logo Bodman, Samuel, Defendant
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Boeing, Inc"
No Logo Bolten, Joshua, Defendant
No Logo Bristol Meyers Squibb, Defendant
No Logo Bush,sr, George, Defendant
No Logo Callahan, Laura, Defendant
No Logo Card, Andrew, Defendant
No Logo Chalabi, Ahmed, Defendant
No Logo Chao, Elaine, Defendant
No Logo Chapin, Dwight L., Defendant
No Logo Charles Schwab Investment Services, Defendant
No Logo Cheney, Dick, Defendant
No Logo Michael Chertoff, Defendant
Officially listed as "Chertoff, Michael"
No Logo Chimera Investment, Defendant
No Logo Client Of Providence Church Men's Shelter, Defendant
No Logo Coelho, Tony, Defendant
No Logo Combs, Sean, Defendant
No Logo Congress Of The United States, Defendant
No Logo Coulter, Ann, Defendant
No Logo Craig, Larry, Defendant
No Logo Credit Lyonnais, Defendant
Credit Suisse AG Credit Suisse AG, Defendant
Officially listed as "Credit Suisse"
No Logo Crist, Charlie, Defendant
No Logo Daimler Chrysler Co, Defendant
No Logo Daimler-benz, S.a., Defendant
No Logo Dalai Lama, Defendant
No Logo Davenport, 261, J. Officer, Bart Police, Defendant
No Logo Debeers Mining Co., Defendant
No Logo Dekreon, Gail, Defendant
No Logo Delay, Tom, Defendant
Deutsche Bank AG Deutsche Bank AG, Defendant
Officially listed as "Deutsche Bank"
Unknown Role, Nrp, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sherwood Group, Inc.,
Unknown Role, Briazz, Inc.
Unknown Role, Dsl.net, Inc.
Unknown Role, Blockbuster, Inc.
Unknown Role, Korea Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Brazil Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Solv Ex Corp
Unknown Role, Newmark Homes Corp
Unknown Role, Comple Tel Europe Nv
Unknown Role, Doblique Inc
Unknown Role, Mesa Airlines Inc
Unknown Role, Emerson Radio Corp
Unknown Role, Emachines Inc /de/
Unknown Role, Rreef America L.l.c.
Unknown Role, Id Arizona Corp.
No Logo Documentary Evidence Of German Cannibalism, Defendant
No Logo Doe 4, 105 To 4, 122 Properly Named, Defendant
No Logo Doe 4,123 To 4,165 Properly Named, Defendant
No Logo Doe 4000 To 4076 Properly Named, Defendant
No Logo Does 1-360, Defendant
No Logo Does 18, 151 To 18, 335 (properly Named), Defendant
No Logo Does 29,000 To 29, 018 Properly Named, Defendant
No Logo Does 3000 To Properly Sued, Defendant
No Logo Does 39,100 To 39,194 Properly Named, Defendant
No Logo Does 4,077 To 4, 084 Properly Named, Defendant
No Logo Does 45,200 To 45,223 Properly Named, Defendant
No Logo Does 51,500 To 51,528 Properly Named, Defendant
No Logo Does 52,600 To 52,612 Properly Named, Defendant
No Logo Does 62,400 To 62440, Defendant
No Logo Does 82,000 To 82,041, Defendant
No Logo Does 82,100 To 82,113, Defendant
No Logo Does 82,975 To 82,988, Defendant
No Logo Does 90,000 To 90027, Defendant
No Logo Does Properly Named, Defendant
No Logo Draganovic, Krunoslav, Defendant
No Logo Elbourne, Tim, Defendant
No Logo Elford, Howard Howard Erlichmann, Defendant
No Logo Elford, Joseph, Defendant
No Logo Elford, Jude Aka Jude Erlichmann, Defendant
No Logo Elford, Roberta Aka Roberta Erlichmann, Defendant
No Logo Erlichmann, Joseph, Defendant
No Logo Ernst & Young, LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ernst & Young"
No Logo European Central Bank, Defendant
No Logo Evergreen Investment Services, Defendant
No Logo Feith, Douglas, Defendant
No Logo Fermat Capital Management, Defendant
No Logo Fibonacci, Joe Aka Marathon Man Aka Doe 4 + 6 Equals 10 Aka Zero Equals One, Defendant
No Logo Fidelity Brokerage Servces, Defendant
Ford Motor Company Ford Motor Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ford Motor Co."
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.
Unknown Role, Vastera, Inc.
No Logo Gabriel Michel Family Trust, Defendant
No Logo Garcetti, Gil, Defendant
No Logo Garlow, Jim, Defendant
No Logo Gates, Daryl, Defendant
No Logo Gates, Robert, Defendant
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "General Electric"
Unknown Role, Genpact Ltd.
Unknown Role, Gei, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sportstech, Inc.
Unknown Role, Superior Essex Inc.
Unknown Role, Genicom Corp
Unknown Role, Imatron Inc.
Unknown Role, Regal Beloit Corp
Unknown Role, Lockheed Martin Corp
Unknown Role, Lunar Corp
Unknown Role, Mecon Inc
Unknown Role, Positron Corp
Unknown Role, GE India Ventures LLC
Unknown Role, Townsquare Media, LLC
Unknown Role, Antares Capital Corp
Unknown Role, Bear Newco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.
Unknown Role, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Unknown Role, Xoom, Inc.
Unknown Role, Plug Power, Inc.
Unknown Role, Hpsc, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ionics, Inc.
Unknown Role, Idx Systems Corp
Unknown Role, iVillage, Inc.
General Motors Corporation General Motors Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "General Motors Inc."
Unknown Role, General Motors Co
Unknown Role, Panamsat Corp
No Logo Genoud, Fracois, Defendant
No Logo Gilbert, Charles, Defendant
No Logo Gilbert, Mattie, Defendant
No Logo DARYL D. MUENCHAU, Defendant
Officially listed as "Gilead Sciences"
No Logo Emmett Gilman, Defendant
Officially listed as "Gilman, Emmett"
No Logo Glford, Joseph, Defendant
No Logo Govil, Gauri, Defendant
No Logo Griffin, Judy, Defendant
No Logo Griffin, Thomas ("griff"), Defendant
No Logo Gutierrez, Carlos, Defendant
No Logo Halliburton Inc, Defendant
No Logo Hamblett, Esq., Robert, Defendant
No Logo Hayden, Michael, Defendant
No Logo Hill, Jerry, Defendant
No Logo Hitler, Hans, Defendant
HSBC Bank HSBC Bank, Defendant
No Logo Iran, Defendant
No Logo Johnson, Stephen, Defendant
No Logo Kalmbach, Herb, Defendant
No Logo Kashkari, Neel, Defendant
No Logo Kelley Or Kelly, William, Defendant
No Logo Kellogg Brown & Root, Defendant
No Logo Kempf, Rell, Defendant
No Logo Kempthorne, Dirk, Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline PLC GlaxoSmithKline PLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kline, Glaxo Smith"
Unknown Role, Epix Medical, Inc.
Unknown Role, Affymetrix, Inc.
Unknown Role, Maxygen, Inc.
Unknown Role, Robcor Properties Inc
Unknown Role, Chemocentryx, Inc.
Unknown Role, Nupathe, Inc.
Unknown Role, Tp Therapeutics, Inc.
Unknown Role, Morphic Holding, LLC
Unknown Role, Auxogyn, Inc.
Unknown Role, Nkarta, Inc.
Unknown Role, Orchard Rx Ltd
No Logo Kradzic, Radovan, Defendant
No Logo Le Pen, Jean-marie, Defendant
No Logo Leavitt, Michael, Defendant
Lehman Brothers, Inc. Lehman Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Lehman Brothers"
Unknown Role, Lehman Abs Corp
No Logo Libby, I Lewis Scooter, Defendant
No Logo Lilly, Eli, Defendant
No Logo Lockheed, Inc, Defendant
No Logo Lockyer, William, Defendant
No Logo Martin Marietta Inc., Defendant
No Logo Maurer, Amy, Defendant
No Logo Maurer, Sonnet, Defendant
McConnell, Jr., Addison Mitch McConnell, Jr., Addison Mitch, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mcconnell, Mitch"
No Logo Mcdonald, Stephen Adair, Defendant
Mckesson HBOC, Inc. Mckesson HBOC, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Mckesson Hboc"
No Logo Middleton, Patrick, Defendant
No Logo Middleton, Sabrina, Defendant
No Logo Mladic, Ratko, Defendant
No Logo Montgomery, Scott, Defendant
No Logo Moody, James A., Defendant
No Logo Morrison Knudsen Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Morrison Knudsen Corp."
No Logo Mosser Properties, Defendant
No Logo Mosser, Charles, Defendant
No Logo Mosset, Neveo, Defendant
No Logo Mueller Iii, Robert, Defendant
No Logo Mukasey, Michael, Defendant
No Logo Munich Re, Defendant
No Logo Murawski, Robert James, Defendant
No Logo Nathan, Aaron, Defendant
No Logo Nesfield, Jim, Defendant
No Logo Newson, Gavin C, Defendant
No Logo North American Van Lines, Defendant
No Logo Nussle, Jim, Defendant
No Logo Nyk Logistics, Defendant
No Logo Operation Desert Fox, Defendant
No Logo Operation Desert Shield, Defendant
No Logo Operation Northern Front, Defendant
No Logo Operation Southern Front, Defendant
No Logo Orloff, Tom, Defendant
No Logo Ozizmir, Dan, Defendant
No Logo Park-li, Gordon, Defendant
No Logo Patelco Credit Union, Defendant
No Logo Paul, Peter, Defendant
No Logo Paulson, Jr, Henry, Defendant
No Logo Peake,dr, James, Defendant
No Logo Pearlman, Bryan, Defendant
No Logo Perkins Coie LLP, Defendant
No Logo Peters, Mary, Defendant
No Logo Philips, Eva Aka Kepeller And Eva Hitler, Defendant
No Logo Philips, Jonathan, Defendant
No Logo Philips, Max Asher, Defendant
No Logo Philips, Remi, Defendant
No Logo PHILLIP MORRIS, Defendant
No Logo Pittman, Sandy Hill, Defendant
No Logo Porter, Herbert, Defendant
No Logo Powell, Colin, Defendant
Salesforce.com, Inc. Unknown Role, Salesforce.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, Bloom Energy Corp
No Logo Preston, Steve, Defendant
No Logo Putin, Vladimir, Defendant
No Logo Rahm Emanuel, Defendant
No Logo Reiser, Hans, Defendant
No Logo Repubican National Committee, Defendant
Rice, Condoleezza Rice, Condoleezza, Defendant
Officially listed as "Rice, Condoleeza"
Unknown Role, Kior, Inc.
Unknown Role, Evenflow, Inc.
Unknown Role, C3, Inc.
No Logo Rjr Nabisco, Defendant
No Logo Roberts, John, Defendant
No Logo Rockefeller, Jay, Defendant
No Logo Rogers Jr., Thomas N., Defendant
No Logo Rogers, Kathleen, Defendant
No Logo Rossoff, Michael, Defendant
No Logo Rove, Karl, Defendant
No Logo Rudolph, Eric, Defendant
No Logo Rumsfeld, Donald, Defendant
No Logo San Francisco Police Department, Defendant
Officially listed as "San Francisco Police Department Officer Diquisto"
No Logo San Francisco Superior Court, Defendant
No Logo Scalia, Antonin, Defendant
No Logo Schaefer, Jay, Defendant
No Logo Schaefer, Mark (a.k.a. Mark Shaffer), Defendant
No Logo Scherer, Stephanie, Defendant
No Logo Schwab, Susan, Defendant
No Logo Sear Co., Defendant
No Logo See Amendment To Complaint, Defendant
No Logo See Documents, Defendant
No Logo See File For Names, Defendant
No Logo See Filing, Defendant
No Logo See Filing For Details, Defendant
No Logo See Filing For Names, Defendant
No Logo See Filings For Names, Defendant
No Logo See Form, Defendant
No Logo See Scan Documents, Defendant
No Logo See Scan Sheets, Defendant
No Logo See Scanced Documents, Defendant
No Logo See Scaned Document, Defendant
No Logo See Scanned Document, Defendant
No Logo See Submiitted Documents For Names, Defendant
No Logo See Submitted Paper For Names, Defendant
No Logo Segretti, Donald, Defendant
No Logo Segretti, Gordon, Defendant
No Logo Seo, John, Defendant
No Logo Sf Asessor/recorder, Defendant
Siemens AG Siemens AG, Defendant
Officially listed as "Siemens"
Unknown Role, Bentley Systems, Inc.
Siemens SA Siemens SA, Defendant
No Logo Silver Clouds Restaurant, Defendant
No Logo Smith & Wesson, Defendant
No Logo Sonsini, Larry, Defendant
No Logo Sorochinsky, Michael, Defendant
No Logo Souter, David, Defendant
No Logo Spellings, Margaret, Defendant
No Logo Spitzer, Eliot, Defendant
No Logo Starr, Kenneth, Defendant
No Logo Strachan, Gordon C., Defendant
No Logo Sturgeon, Kay, Defendant
No Logo Swiss Re, Defendant
No Logo The Carlye Group, Defendant
No Logo The Identity Of All Bundesrepublik Deutschland Operations, Defendant
No Logo The Islamic Republic Of Saudi Arabia, Defendant
No Logo The Mosser Hotel, Defendant
No Logo The People's Republic Of China, Defendant
Regents of the University of California Regents of the University of California, Defendant
Officially listed as "The Regents Of The University Of California"
Unknown Role, Owl Rock Capital Corp
No Logo The Rose Law Firm, Defendant
No Logo The San Francisco Sheriff's Deputy Who Ejected Michael C. Murawski From Judge Patrick J. Mahoney's Courtroom On Shabbat Shalom, Defendant
No Logo The Superior Court Of California, County Of San Francisco - Civic Center Branch, Defendant
No Logo The Vanguard Group, Defendant
No Logo The Windsor Hotel, Defendant
No Logo Thomas, Clearance, Defendant
No Logo Tolton, Saul, Defendant
No Logo Transcript Of Proceedings Entre Gavin Newsom, Defendant
No Logo Tripp, Linda, Defendant
No Logo Truche, Pierre, Defendant
No Logo Twozey, James, Defendant
No Logo Usairways, Defendant
No Logo Unscom, Defendant
No Logo Verdugo Trustee Service Corp., P.o. Box 9443 (1-800-283-7918) Gaithersburg, Md 20898, Defendant
No Logo Verges, Jacques, Defendant
Walgreen Company Walgreen Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Walgreen's, Inc."
No Logo Walker, Vaughn, Defendant
No Logo Walters, John, Defendant
No Logo Ward, Philip S, Defendant
Werner Enterprises Werner Enterprises, Defendant
No Logo Whittington, Harry, Defendant
No Logo Wiener, Marian Aka Marian Hitler, Defendant
No Logo Wiener, Paul Aka Paul Hitler, Defendant
No Logo Williams, Clayton, Defendant
No Logo Wilson, Sosini, Goodrich & Rosati, Llp, Defendant
No Logo Wolfowitz, Paul, Defendant
No Logo Yoo, John, Defendant
No Logo Yowell, Christopher, Defendant
No Logo Zapata Oil, Defendant
No Logo Ziegler, Ron, Defendant
Cause of Action Fraud
  Entries (191) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 191 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: 5/27/2011
Removed From Denied Fee Waiver Paid Calendar: A Dismissal Was Filed On 12/1/10. Plaintiff Michael C. Muraskwi Must Pay His Copying Fees Before Any Filings Can Be Accepted With The Court. (206)
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: 12/13/2010 Case Ordered Off Calendar
    Order To Show Cause Of Dec-27-2010 Is Off Calendar Dismissal On File. Notice Sent By Court.
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document 189 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: 12/1/2010 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint
      Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint
        Blank 188 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: 11/15/2010
        Declaration Of Michael C. Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
          Blank 187 Filed: 11/1/2010, Entered: 11/1/2010
          Declaration Of Michael C Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
            Blank 186 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010
            Declaration Of Michael C Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: 9/24/2010 Entry Of Default Reject
              Request For Default Rejected, Placed In Pickup Box, Submitted By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael As To Defendant Newson, Gavin C
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document 184 Filed: 9/22/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 Entry Of Default Reject
                Request For Default Rejected, Placed In Pickup Box, Submitted By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael As To Defendant San Francisco Superior Court
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Ruling On Application For Waiver Of Fees
                  Order Denying Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To G.c. 68634 (e), Crc 3.52 As To Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 182 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010 Court Filing
                    Master Calendar Motion On Sep-01-2010 In Dept. 206, Hearing On Applicant/plaintiff Michael Murawski's Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs. No Appearance By Applicant. The Court Denies The Application In Whole. Order Signed, And Endorsed-filed Copy Mailed To Applicant. Judge: A. James Robertson Ii; Clerk: R. Veluz; Matter Not Reported. (206)
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: 8/30/2010 Continued Order To Show Cause
                      Order To Show Cause Set For Aug-30-2010 Continued To Dec-27-2010 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s) On The First Amended Complaint. Notice Of Impending Discretionary Dismissal Pursuant To Ccp §583.410 And Ccp §583.420 (a)(1). Notice Sent By Court.
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 180 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: 8/30/2010
                        Mini-minutes For Aug-30-2010 1:30 Pm
                          Blank 179 Filed: 8/23/2010, Entered: 8/23/2010
                          Declaration Of Michael C Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Bush,jr, George Gore, Al Murawski, Michael
                            Blank 178 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010
                            Declaration Of Micahel C. Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                              Blank 177 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010
                              Copying Fees (5 Page) Paid By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                Blank 176 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010
                                Copying Fees (14 Page)
                                  Legal Document 175 Filed: 7/22/2010, Entered: 7/22/2010 Hearing Ordered For Application Of Waiver Of Court Fees
                                  Hearing Ordered For Application Of Waiver Of Court Fees, Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael Hearing Set For Sep-01-2010 At 09:00 Am In Dept 206
                                    Blank 174 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010
                                    Application Pending For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To G.c. 68633, Crc 3.51, 8.26, And 8.818 (confidential) Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                      Order To Show Cause Set For Jun-01-2010 Continued To Aug-30-2010 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). Notice Of Impending Discretionary Dismissal Pursuant To Ccp §583.410 And Ccp §583.420(a)(1). Notice Sent By Court.
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 172 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010
                                        Mini-minutes For Jun-01-2010 1:30 Pm
                                          Blank 171 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: 3/10/2010
                                          Declaration Of Michael C. Murawski (exhibits Attached Thereto) Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: 2/24/2010 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                            Order To Show Cause Set For Mar-01-2010 Continued To Jun-01-2010 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). Notice: Impending Discretionary Dismissal, Failure To File Proof Of Service On All Defendants Within Two Years, Pursuant To Ccp §583.410/§583.420 (a)(1). The Mar-01-2010 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Blank 169 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/22/2009
                                              Declaration Of Michael C. Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: 11/30/2009 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                Order To Show Cause Set For Nov-30-2009 Continued To Mar-01-2010 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). Notice Sent By Court.
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 167 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: 11/30/2009
                                                  Mini-minutes For Nov-30-2009 1:30 Pm
                                                    Legal Document 166 Filed: 10/5/2009, Entered: 10/5/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                    Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does Incorrectly Sued To Be (does 96,300 To 96, 329 Properly Named)
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: 8/17/2009 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                      Order To Show Cause Set For Aug-31-2009 Continued To Nov-30-2009 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The Aug-31-2009 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/23/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                        Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does Incorrectly Sued To Be Does 82,975 To 82,988
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Blank 163 Filed: 6/23/2009, Entered: 6/23/2009
                                                          Declaration Of Michael C Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: 6/22/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                            Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does Incorrectly Sued To Be Does 82,100 To 82,113
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document 161 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: 6/18/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                              Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does 90,400 To 90,435 To Be See Filing For Details
                                                                Legal Document 160 Filed: 6/18/2009, Entered: 6/18/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does Incorrectly Sued To Be Does 90,000 To 90027
                                                                  Blank 159 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009
                                                                  Amendment To Complaint Does 82,950 To 82,965 Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                    Order To Show Cause Set For Jun-29-2009 Continued To Aug-31-2009 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The Jun-29-2009 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Blank 157 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009
                                                                      Declaration Of Michael C Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                        Blank 156 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009
                                                                        Amendment To Complaint Does 82,900 To 82,913 Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: 6/11/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                          Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does Incorrectly Sued To Be Does 82,000 To 82,041
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Blank 154 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: 6/10/2009
                                                                            Declaration Of Michael C. Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                              Blank 153 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: 6/10/2009
                                                                              Amendment To Complaint [does 79800 To 79806] Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 79800 To Be Client Of Providence Church Men's Shelter
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/9/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does 62,600 To 62, 620 To Be See Filing For Names
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Blank 151 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/9/2009
                                                                                  Declaration Of Michael C. Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                    Legal Document 150 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: 6/5/2009 Amendment To Complaint Does 77,757 To 77,777 Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                    Amendment To Complaint Does 77,757 To 77,777 Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: 6/5/2009 Amendment To Complaitn Does 62,800 To 62,849 Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                      Amendment To Complaint Does 62,800 To 62,849 Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: 6/4/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                        Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does 60,000 To 60,176 To Be See Filing For Names
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: 6/2/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                          Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does Incorrectly Sued As To Be Does 62,400 To 62440
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009 Amendment To Complaint Does 60,000 To 60,031 Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                            Amendment To Complaint Does 60,000 To 60,031 Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Blank 145 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: 5/29/2009
                                                                                              Declaration Of Michael C Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                Legal Document 144 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: 5/21/2009 Amendment To Complaint Does 52,700 To 52,713 Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                Amendment To Complaint Does 52,700 To 52,713 Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                  Blank 143 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: 5/21/2009
                                                                                                  Declaration Of Michael C. Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: 5/21/2009 Amendment To Complaint Does 53,300 To 53,316 Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                    Amendment To Complaint Does 53,300 To 53,316 Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                      Blank 141 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009
                                                                                                      Declaration Of M8ichael C Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: 5/20/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                        Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does Incorrectly Sued To Be Does 52,600 To 52,612 Properly Named
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                          Blank 139 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: 5/19/2009
                                                                                                          Declaration Of Michael C Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                            Legal Document 138 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: 5/19/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                            Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does Incorrectly Sued To Be Does 51,500 To 51,528 Properly Named
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: 5/19/2009 Amendment To Complaint Does Incorrectly Sued Does 51,000 To 51,009
                                                                                                              Amendment To Complaint Does Incorrectly Sued Does 51,000 To 51,009 Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                Legal Document 136 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: 5/15/2009 Amendment to ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Amendment To Complaint [does Incorrectly Sued; Does 49300 To 49337 Properly Named] Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 49300 To Be The San Francisco Sheriff's Deputy Who Ejected Michael C. Murawski From Judge Patrick J. Mahoney's Courtroom On Shabbat Shalom
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 Amendment To Complaint Does Incorrectly Named Does 44,500 To 44,534
                                                                                                                  Amendment To Complaint Does Incorrectly Named Does 44,500 To 44,534 Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: 5/11/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                    Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does 44,600 To 44,645 To Be See Scan Sheets
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: 5/11/2009 Amendment To Complaint ; Exhibit Attached Hereto
                                                                                                                      Amendment To Complaint ; Exhibit Attached Hereto Defendant Sued Herein As Does Incorrectly Sued To Be Does 45,200 To 45,223 Properly Named
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 132 Filed: 5/8/2009, Entered: 5/8/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                        Amendment To Complaint ( See Scanned Document) Defendant Sued Herein As Does Incorrectly Sued To Be ( Does 44,900 To 45,011 Properly Named)
                                                                                                                          Blank 131 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: 5/6/2009
                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Michael C. Murasski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: 5/6/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                            Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does 44,400 To Properly Named To Be See Documents
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: 5/5/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                              Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does Incorrectly Sued: To Be (does 44,200 To 44, 211 Properly Named)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                Blank 128 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: 5/5/2009
                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Michael C. Murawski (exhibits Attached Thereto) Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: 5/1/2009 Amendment To Complaint Does 42,888 To 42,908 Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                  Amendment To Complaint Does 42,888 To 42,908 Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: 4/30/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                    Amendment To Complaint (see Scanned Document) Defendant Sued Herein As Does 42500 To 42527 To Be Does Properly Named
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                      Blank 125 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: 4/30/2009
                                                                                                                                      Declaration Of Michael C Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                        Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As (does Incorrectly Sued ; Does 42,200 To 42,249 To Be (see Scanned Document)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                          Blank 123 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: 4/29/2009
                                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Of Michael C Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: 4/27/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                            Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does 42,000 To 42,068 To Be See Filing For Names
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: 4/23/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                              Amendment To Complaint Filed By Pltf; (see Scanned Document) Defendant Sued Herein As Does Incorrectly Sued To Be Does 39,100 To 39,194 Properly Named
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                Blank 120 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: 4/23/2009
                                                                                                                                                Amendment To Complaint [does Incorrectly Sued 38999 - 39075, Properly Named] Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 38999 To Be Whittington, Harry
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 119 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: 4/21/2009
                                                                                                                                                  Amendment To Complaint [does Incorrectly Sued; Does 38900 To 38925 Properly Named] Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 38900 To Be Barack Obama's Undisclosed Budget
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 118 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: 4/21/2009
                                                                                                                                                    Declaration Of Michael C. Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: 4/17/2009 Amendment To Complaint Does 36,000 To 36, 083 Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                      Amendment To Complaint Does 36,000 To 36, 083 Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/15/2009 Amendment To Complaint (see Document For Additional Defts)
                                                                                                                                                        Amendment To Complaint (see Document For Additional Defts) Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 35100 To Be Documentary Evidence Of German Cannibalism
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                          Order To Show Cause Set For Apr-27-2009 Continued To Jun-29-2009 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The Apr-27-2009 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 114 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: 4/13/2009 Amendment To Complaint Does 34,000 To 34,058 Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                            Amendment To Complaint Does 34,000 To 34,058 Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: 4/9/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                              Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does Incorrectly Sued To Be (does 30,000 To 30,015 Property Named)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                Amendment To Complaint See Scan Documents. Defendant Sued Herein As Does Incorrectly Sued To Be Does 29,000 To 29, 018 Properly Named
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 111 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009
                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Michael C. Murawski ( Exhibit Attached Thereto) Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 110 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009
                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration Of Michael C. Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Amendment To Complaint [see Document For Additional Defts Does 28000 -
                                                                                                                                                                      Amendment To Complaint [see Document For Additional Defts Does 28000 - 28017] Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 28000 To Be Sf Asessor/recorder
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: 4/2/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                        Amendment To Complaint [see Scanned Document For Does Incorrectly Sued Does 27000 To 27042] Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 27000 To Be Ward, Philip S.
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 107 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009
                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Michael C. Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 106 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: 3/30/2009 Amendment To Complaint [see Scanc Document] Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                            Amendment To Complaint [see Scanc Document] Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 105 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                              Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does 25,000 To 25,074 To Be See Scan Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 104 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: 3/26/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                Amendment To Complaint (see Scanned Document) Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 24,000 To Be Barack Obamas Admission That Barack Obama Is Harboring Nazi War Criminals Pursuant To Authority He Claim He Derives From: ____________
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 103 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: 3/26/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Michael C Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: 3/24/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                    Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does 23,500 To 23,580 To Be See Scanced Documents Defendant Sued Herein As Does 23,500 To 23,580 To Be See Scanced Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: 3/23/2009 Amendment To Complaint Does Incorrectly Sued Does 23,000 To 23, 044
                                                                                                                                                                                      Amendment To Complaint Does Incorrectly Sued Does 23,000 To 23, 044 Properly Named Filed By Plaintiff Bush,jr, George Gore, Al Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009 Amendment To Complaint (see Scanned Document)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Amendment To Complaint (see Scanned Document) Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 22500 To Be Verdugo Trustee Service Corp., P.o. Box 9443 (1-800-283-7918) Gaithersburg, Md 20898
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 99 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: 3/20/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Michael C. Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 98 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: 3/19/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                            Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does 22,000 To 22,101 To Be See Scan Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 97 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                              Amendment To Complaint Declaration Defendant Sued Herein As Does 19,500 To 19,529 To Be See File For Names
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 96 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Michael C Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 95 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: 3/17/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Michael C. Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: 3/17/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amendment To Complaint (see Scanned Document) Defendant Sued Herein As 21,000 To Be The Identity Of All Bundesrepublik Deutschland Operations
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amendment To Complaint (see Attached) Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 20,500 To Be Hamblett, Esq., Robert
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 92 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: 3/16/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration Of Michael Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does 19,000 To 19,043 To Be See Filings For Names
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 90 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: 3/5/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amendment To Complaint [see Scanned Document] Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 18500 To Be Transcript Of Proceedings Entre Gavin Newsom
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 89 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration Of Michael Murawski (exhibit Attached Thereto) Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amendment To Complaint See Scanned Amendment Defendant Sued Herein As Does Incorrectly Sued To Be Does 18, 151 To 18, 335 (properly Named)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 87 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Amendment To Complaint ,declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amendment To Complaint ,declaration Defendant Sued Herein As Does 18,000 To 18,150 To Be See Submiitted Documents For Names
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amendment To Complaint (see Attached For Additional Doe Defendants) Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 14,000 To Be Barack Obama's Rejection Of Leviticus 19:18
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 2/25/2009 Unknown document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request For Default Rejected, Placed In Pickup Box, (nosase). As To Defendant The Superior Court Of California, County Of San Francisco - Civic Center Branch
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/25/2009, Entered: 2/25/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amendment To Complaint (see Attached For List Of Doe Defendants 12,000 - 12,068) Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 12000 To Be Montgomery, Scott
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: 2/24/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amendment To Complaint Declaration Of Michael Muraski Defendant Sued Herein As Does 11,000 To 11,086 To Be See Submitted Paper For Names
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 82 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amendment To Complaint Does Incorrectly Sued Doe 10,000 To 10,121 Properly Named Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 81 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amendment To Complaint Does 8, 539 To 9,967 Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 80 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Michael Murawki Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: 2/20/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does 9500 To 9538 To Be See Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 78 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: 2/18/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration Of Michael Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: 2/18/2009 Amendment To Complaint Does Incorrectly Sued Does 8,000 To 8,036
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amendment To Complaint Does Incorrectly Sued Does 8,000 To 8,036 Property Named Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: 2/17/2009 Amendment To Complaint - Does Incorrectly Sued; Doe 7000 To 7105
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amendment To Complaint - Does Incorrectly Sued; Doe 7000 To 7105 Properly Named Filed By Plaintiff Bush,jr, George Gore, Al Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does 6,000 To 6080 To Be See File For Names
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amendment To Complaint [does 5000 To 5082] Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 5000 To Be Rahm Emanuel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: 2/10/2009 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order To Show Cause Set For Feb-23-2009 Continued To Apr-27-2009 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The Feb-23-2009 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 72 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does Incorrectly Sued To Be Doe 4,123 To 4,165 Properly Named
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: 2/5/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amendment To Complaint See Scanned Document Defendant Sued Herein As Does Incorrectly Sued To Be Doe 4, 105 To 4, 122 Properly Named
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 70 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: 2/4/2009 Amendment To Complaint [see Scanned Document] Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amendment To Complaint [see Scanned Document] Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/3/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration Of Michael C. Murawski (exhibit Attached Thereto) Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: 2/3/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does Incorrectly Sued To Be Does 4,077 To 4, 084 Properly Named
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 67 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: 2/2/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe Sued To Be Doe 4000 To 4076 Properly Named
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1157 To Be The Superior Court Of California, County Of San Francisco - Civic Center Branch Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1158 To Be San Francisco Police Department Officer Diquisto Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1159 To Be San Francisco Police Department Officer Diquito Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1160 To Be San Francisco Police Department Officer Lacy Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1161 To Be San Francisco Police Department Officer Lacy Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1162 To Be Kempf, Rell Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1163 To Be Operation Desert Fox Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1164 To Be Operation Northern Front Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1165 To Be Operation Southern Front Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1166 To Be Operation Desert Shield Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1167 To Be Unscom Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1168 To Be Sorochinsky, Michael Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1169 To Be Patelco Credit Union Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1170 To Be Gabriel Michel Family Trust Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1171 To Be Perkins Coie Llp Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1172 To Be Sturgeon, Kay Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1173 To Be Gilman, Emmett Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1174 To Be Pearlman, Bryan Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1175 To Be Pittman, Sandy Hill Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1176 To Be Allen, Carole Ward
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration Of Michael C. Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: 1/16/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Of Michael Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/16/2009, Entered: 1/16/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amendment To Complaint See Scanned Document Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1156 To Be Orloff, Tom
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/9/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does Incorrectly Sued To Be Does 3000 To Properly Sued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/31/2008, Entered: 12/31/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does 888 To 940 To Be See File For Names
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 60 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: 12/26/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1,036 To Be Mueller Iii, Robert
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: 12/26/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does 1,084 To 1,155 To Be See Amendment To Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: 12/24/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Does 796-807 To Be See Form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 57 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: 12/23/2008 Amendment To Complaint Does Incorrectly Sued Doe 1,037 To 1.083 See
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amendment To Complaint Does Incorrectly Sued Doe 1,037 To 1.083 See Scanned Document Filed By Plaintiff Bush,jr, George Gore, Al Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amendment To Complaint Naming Does 1,000 To 1035 Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: 12/22/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Michael Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: 12/10/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amendment Ot Complaint Does Incorrectly Sued, Does 743 To 795; See Submitted Papers Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: 12/10/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration Of Michael Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: 12/9/2008 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order To Show Cause Set For Dec-22-2008 Continued To Feb-23-2009 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The Dec-22-2008 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: 12/1/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amendment To Complaint See Scanned Documents (does Incorrectly Sued; Does 559 To 665 And 735 To 742 Properly Named); Exhibits Are Newspapers, That Were Unable To Scann. But They're On The Case File. Defendant Sued Herein As Does 559 To 665 And 735 To 742 To Be See Scaned Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: 11/26/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration Of Michael C. Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: 11/26/2008 Amendment To Complaint Does 666 To 734, See Scan Document Filed By
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amendment To Complaint Does 666 To 734, See Scan Document Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: 11/21/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Does 537 To 558 Properly Named, See Scan Document Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: 11/21/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amendment To Complaint [does Incorrectly Sued; Does 555 To 707 Properly Named] (see Scanned Document) Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: 11/19/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 533 To Be Park-li, Gordon Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 534 To Be Sonsini, Larry Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 535 To Be Wilson, Sosini, Goodrich & Rosati, Llp Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 536 To Be The Regents Of The University Of California
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/18/2008, Entered: 11/18/2008 Unknown document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request For Default Rejected, Placed In Pickup Box, As To Defendant Dekreon, Gail
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 44 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: 11/17/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 503 To Be Delay, Tom Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 504 To Be Abramoff, Jack Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 505 To Be Kashkari, Neel Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 506 To Be Mcconnell, Mitch Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 508 To Be Garlow, Jim Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 509 To Be Govil, Gauri Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 510 To Be Walgreen's, Inc. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 511 To Be Segretti, Donald Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 512 To Be Yowell, Christopher Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 513 To Be The Windsor Hotel Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 507 To Be Crist, Charlie
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: 11/5/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 501 To Be Bart Police Department Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 502 To Be Davenport, 261, J. Officer, Bart Police
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: 11/5/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration Of Michael C. Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 11/4/2008, Entered: 11/4/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration Of Michael C Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: 10/29/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Michael C Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: 10/24/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Michael C Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: 10/21/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration Of Michael C. Murawski Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: 10/21/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 419 To Be Lockyer, William Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 420 To Be Nyk Logistics Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 421 To Be Werner Enterprises Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 422 To Be Reiser, Hans Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 423 To Be Mladic, Ratko Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 424 To Be Kradzic, Radovan Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 425 To Be Sear Co. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 426 To Be North American Van Lines Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 427 To Be Apl Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 428 To Be U.s. Airways Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 429 To Be Airgas Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 430 To Be Amtrak Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 431 To Be Mosser Properties Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 432 To Be Mosser, Charles Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 433 To Be Mosset, Neveo Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 434 To Be Gilbert, Charles Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 435 To Be Gilbert, Mattie Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 436 To Be Arnold, Mattie Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 437 To Be Elbourne, Tim Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 438 To Be Ziegler, Ron Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 439 To Be Porter, Herbert Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 440 To Be Strachan, Gordon C. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 441 To Be Segretti, Gordon Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 442 To Be Combs, Sean Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 443 To Be Genoud, Fracois Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 444 To Be Le Pen, Jean-marie Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 445 To Be Verges, Jacques Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 446 To Be Truche, Pierre Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 447 To Be Chapin, Dwight L. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 448 To Be Kalmbach, Herb Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 449 To Be Debeers Mining Co. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 450 To Be Rudolph, Eric Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 451 To Be Altmann, Klaus Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 452 To Be Draganovic, Krunoslav Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 453 To Be The Mosser Hotel Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 454 To Be Silver Clouds Restaurant Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 455 To Be Siemens Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 456 To Be Morrison Knudsen Corp. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 457 To Be American Passenger Railcar Co. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 458 To Be Amerail Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 459 To Be Zapata Oil Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 460 To Be Arco Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 461 To Be Arvin-edison Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 462 To Be Aig Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 463 To Be Lehman Brothers Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 464 To Be Bnsf Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 465 To Be Ernst & Young Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 466 To Be Basf Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 467 To Be Walker, Vaughn
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: 10/16/2008 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order To Show Cause Set For Oct-20-2008 Continued To Dec-22-2008 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The Oct-20-2008 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 35 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008 Amendment To Complaint [does Incorrectly Named] [does 361 - 418
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amendment To Complaint [does Incorrectly Named] [does 361 - 418 Properly Identified] See Scanned Document Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: 10/10/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration Of Michael C. Murawski [exhibits Attached Thereto] Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order To Show Cause Set For Oct-20-2008 In Department 212 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The Sep-05-2008 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amendment To Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 31 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Management Conference Of Jul-25-2008 Continued To Sep-05-2008 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008 Unknown document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request For Default Rejected, Placed In Pickup Box, As To Defendant Does 1-360
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 131 To Be Tolton, Saul Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 132 To Be Nathan, Aaron
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amendment To Complaint Doe 47 To 130 See Scanned Document Defendant Sued Herein As Does 47 Through 130 To Be See Scanned Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 117 To Be Walters, John
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 129 To Be Fermat Capital Management Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 130 To Be Allied Signal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 118 To Be Boeing, Inc Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 119 To Be Lockheed, Inc Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 120 To Be Martin Marietta, Inc Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 121 To Be Fidelity Brokerage Servces Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 122 To Be Evergreen Investment Services Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 123 To Be Charles Schwab Investment Services Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 124 To Be Chimera Investment Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 125 To Be Coelho, Tony Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 126 To Be Munich Re Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 127 To Be Ozizmir, Dan Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 128 To Be Seo, John
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 112 To Be Preston, Steve Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 113 To Be Bolten, Joshua Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 114 To Be Nussle, Jim Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 115 To Be Schwab, Susan Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 116 To Be Johnson, Stephen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 100 To Be Mukasey, Michael Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 101 To Be Gates, Robert Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 102 To Be Gates, Daryl Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 103 To Be Garcetti, Gil Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 104 To Be Chao, Elaine Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 105 To Be Spellings, Margaret Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 106 To Be Bodman, Samuel Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 107 To Be Peters, Mary Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 108 To Be Leavitt, Michael Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 109 To Be Paulson, Jr, Henry Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 110 To Be Chertoff, Michael Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 111 To Be Peake,dr, James
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 89 To Be Hsbc Bank Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 90 To Be Mckesson Hboc Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 91 To Be Swiss Re Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 92 To Be Credit Suisse Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 94 To Be Rockefeller, Jay Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 93 To Be Credit Lyonnais Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 95 To Be Rjr Nabisco Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 96 To Be Callahan, Laura Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 97 To Be Schaefer, Jay Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 98 To Be Kempthorne, Dirk Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 99 To Be Gutierrez, Carlos
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 72 To Be Basf, S.a. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 73 To Be Siemens, S.a. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 74 To Be Lilly, Eli Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 75 To Be Alwan, Rafid Ahmed Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 76 To Be Chalabi, Ahmed Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 77 To Be Powell, Colin Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 78 To Be Blair, Tony Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 79 To Be Starr, Kenneth Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 80 To Be Ashcroft, John Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 81 To Be Bristol Meyers Squibb Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 82 To Be Deutsche Bank Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 83 To Be The Islamic Republic Of Saudi Arabia Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 84 To Be European Central Bank Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 85 To Be The Rose Law Firm Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 86 To Be Coulter, Ann Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 87 To Be Tripp, Linda Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 88 To Be Moody, James A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 54 To Be Spitzer, Eliot Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 55 To Be Craig, Larry Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 56 To Be Kline, Glaxo Smith Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 57 To Be Gilead Sciences Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 58 To Be Barclay's Global Investors, N.a. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 59 To Be Allied Signal Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 60 To Be General Electric Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 61 To Be Bin Laden Construction Co Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 62 To Be Halliburton Inc Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 63 To Be Kellogg Brown & Root Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 64 To Be Altria Group Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 65 To Be Phillip Morris Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 66 To Be Smith & Wesson Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 67 To Be Ford Motor Co. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 68 To Be General Motors Inc. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 69 To Be Daimler Chrysler Co Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 70 To Be Daimler-benz, S.a. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 71 To Be Baumann Motor Works, S.a.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 47 To Be Card, Andrew Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 48 To Be Libby, I Lewis Scooter Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 49 To Be Williams, Clayton Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 50 To Be The Carlye Group Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 51 To Be The Vanguard Group Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 52 To Be Paul, Peter Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 53 To Be Nesfield, Jim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Pos Re: Summons And Complaint On John Mccain. Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Pos Re: Summons And Complaint On John Mccain. Filed By Plaintiff Bush,jr, George Gore, Al Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Unknown document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request For Default Rejected, Placed In Pickup Box, As To Defendant Elford, Joseph Middleton, Sabrina Middleton, Patrick
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof Of Service Of S&c Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael Served May-12-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Middleton, Patrick
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service Of Proof Of Service Of S&c On Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael Served May-12-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Elford, Joseph
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service Of S&c Filed By Plaintiff Murawski, Michael Served May-12-2008, Personal Service On Defendant Middleton, Sabrina
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 45 To Be Murawski, Robert James Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 46 To Be Fibonacci, Joe Aka Marathon Man Aka Doe 4 + 6 Equals 10 Aka Zero Equals One
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Unknown document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request For Default Rejected, Placed In Pickup Box, As To Defendant Elford, Joseph Middleton, Sabrina Middleton, Patrick
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 42 To Be Benedict, Xvi, Pope Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 43 To Be Hayden, Michael Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 44 To Be Schaefer, Mark (a.k.a. Mark Shaffer)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 35 To Be Elford, Joseph Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 36 To Be Middleton, Sabrina Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 37 To Be Middleton, Patrick Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 38 To Be Addington, David Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 39 To Be Yoo, John Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 40 To Be Rossoff, Michael Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 41 To Be Mcdonald, Stephen Adair
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Unknown document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request For Default Rejected, Placed In Pickup Box, (nosase/c/opick-upbox) As To Defendant Glford, Joseph
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued To Plaintiff Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 13 To Be Glford, Joseph Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 14 To Be Philips, Jonathan Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 15 To Be Erlichmann, Joseph Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 16 To Be Hitler, Hans Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 17 To Be Philips, Eva Aka Kepeller And Eva Hitler Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 18 To Be Elford, Jude Aka Jude Erlichmann Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 19 To Be Wiener, Marian Aka Marian Hitler Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 20 To Be Wiener, Paul Aka Paul Hitler Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 21 To Be Elford, Howard Howard Erlichmann Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 22 To Be Elford, Roberta Aka Roberta Erlichmann Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 23 To Be Scherer, Stephanie Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 24 To Be Maurer, Amy Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 25 To Be Maurer, Sonnet Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 26 To Be Twozey, James Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 27 To Be Kelley Or Kelly, William Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 28 To Be Hill, Jerry Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 29 To Be Americans For Safe Access Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 30 To Be Dekreon, Gail Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 31 To Be Putin, Vladimir Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 32 To Be Dalai Lama Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 33 To Be Philips, Max Asher Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 34 To Be Philips, Remi
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 11 To Be Iran Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 12 To Be The People's Republic Of China
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/25/2008 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 7 To Be Rogers Jr., Thomas N. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 8 To Be Rogers, Kathleen Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 9 To Be Griffin, Judy Defendant Sued Herein As Doe10 To Be Griffin, Thomas ("griff")
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008 First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          1st Amended Complaint Naming Does 1-4 Indentified Filed By Plaintiff Bush,jr, George Gore, Al Murawski, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Fraud, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Bush,jr, George Gore, Al Murawski, Michael As To Defendant Congress Of The United States Bush,sr, George Cheney, Dick Rumsfeld, Donald Wolfowitz, Paul Rove, Karl Feith, Douglas Rice, Condoleeza Repubican National Committee Roberts, John Alito, Samuel Thomas, Clearance Scalia, Antonin Souter, David Does 1-360 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jul-25-2008 Proof Of Service Due On Apr-25-2008 Case Management Statement Due On Jul-10-2008

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 193 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?