Jonathan Mcgraw v. Willis Group Holdings, Ltd., A United Kingdom Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 08 472838
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Mcgraw, Jonathan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Neil Jon Bloomfield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wright, Sarah P +1 415 454 2294
v.
No Logo Does 1 Trhough 50, Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Willis Group Holdings, Ltd., A United Kingdom Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Willis Insurance Services Of California, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
No Logo Willis North America Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
No Logo Willis North America Inc., A Delware Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Wills Insurance Services Of California, Inc., A California Corporation, Defendant
Cause of Action Wrongful Discharge
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: 3/26/2009
Removed From Master Jury Calendar Set For Apr-06-2009. Dismissal On File. (206)
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 28 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: 2/27/2009
    Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Mar-20-2009 - Dismissal On File.
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 27 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: 12/18/2008
      Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Willis Insurance Services Of California, Inc. Willis North America Inc.
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: 12/15/2008 Case Ordered Off Calendar
        Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Dec-24-2008 Is Off Calendar, Dismissal On File. Notice Sent By Court.
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: 12/5/2008 Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action
          Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 24 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: 12/4/2008
            Response To Order To Show Cause Re Mediation Filed By Defendant Willis Insurance Services Of California, Inc. Willis North America Inc.
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 23 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: 11/13/2008
              Discovery, 610, Plaintiff Jonathan Mcgraw's Motion To Quash Deposition Subpoenas For Business Records Of Portal Insurance Agency, Inc., Craford Bennett Consultants, Gallagher Heffernan Insurance Brokers, Itt Hartford Group Sales And Mcgraw & Sparks And For Sanctions. Off Calendar, At The Request Of The Moving Party.
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
                Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Nov-12-2008 Continued To Dec-24-2008 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 21 Filed: 10/21/2008, Entered: 10/21/2008
                  Response To Order To Show Cause Re Mediation Filed By Defendant Willis Insurance Services Of California, Inc. Willis North America Inc.
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 20 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: 10/20/2008
                    Response To Order To Show Cause -mediation Filed By Plaintiff Mcgraw, Jonathan
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 19 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: 10/17/2008
                      Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To Quash Deposition Subpoenas For Business Records Of Portal Insurance Agency, Inc., Craford Bennett Consultants, Gallagher Heffernan Insurance Brokers, Itt Hartford Group Sales And Mcgraw & Sparks And For Sanctions And Req. For Judicial Ntc, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Mcgraw, Jonathan Hearing Set For Nov-20-2008 At 09:00 Am In Dept 610
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                        Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Apr-06-2009 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Mar-20-2009 At 3:30 Pm In Department 608. Notice Sent By Court.
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 17 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008
                          Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Jan-12-2009 - By Court.
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 16 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 7/29/2008
                            Response To Defts' Objection To Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial; Declaration Of Sarah S Wright In Support Thereof Filed By Plaintiff Mcgraw, Jonathan
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 15 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008
                              Objection To Ntc Of Time And Place Of Trial Filed By Defendant Willis Insurance Services Of California, Inc. Willis North America Inc.
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Jan-12-2009 At 3:30 Pm In Department 608. Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Jan-26-2009 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Aug-01-2008 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
                                  Order To Show Cause Re Mediation Set For Nov-12-2008 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008
                                    Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Willis Insurance Services Of California, Inc. Willis North America Inc. Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008
                                      Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Taylor, Julie L
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint
                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Willis Group Holdings, Ltd., A United Kingdom Corporation
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 9 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008
                                          Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Mcgraw, Jonathan Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 15.0 Days
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Answer
                                            Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Willis North America Inc.
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Answer
                                              Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Willis Insurance Services Of California, Inc.
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Mcgraw, Jonathan Served Jun-02-2008, Mail And Acknowledgement, Acknowledgment Date Jun-03-2008 On Defendant Willis North America Inc., A Delware Corporation
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
                                                  Order To Show Cause Re Proof Of Service On Jun-17-2008 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                                    Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Mcgraw, Jonathan Served Apr-18-2008, Mail On Defendant Wills Insurance Services Of California, Inc., A California Corporation
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Order To Show Cause Re: Proof Of Service
                                                      Added To Proof Of Service Order To Show Cause Calendar Hearing Set For Jun-17-2008 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                        Notice To Plaintiff
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Complaint
                                                          Wrongful Discharge, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Mcgraw, Jonathan As To Defendant Willis Group Holdings, Ltd., A United Kingdom Corporation Willis North America Inc., A Delware Corporation Wills Insurance Services Of California, Inc., A California Corporation Does 1 Trhough 50, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Aug-01-2008 Proof Of Service Due On May-02-2008 Case Management Statement Due On Jul-17-2008
                                                            Request RequestSpace

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 58 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?