Nicodemus Plumbing & Mechanical, A California v. Jamestown Equity Partners, Llc Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 08 478200
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Nicodemus Plumbing & Mechanical, A California Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Weinberg, Robert A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Weinberg, Robert A +1 818 705 3254
v.
No Logo Citi Bank Corp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bernard Reynold Suter +1 415 398 6000 +1 415 981 0136 ben.suter@kyl.com
No Logo Does 1-50, Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Jamestown Equity Partners, Llc, Defendant

Represented by Katzoff and Riggs

No Logo Thompson Pacific Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

No Logo Jamestown Equity Partners, Llc, Cross-Complainant

Represented by Katzoff and Riggs

No Logo Roes 1 Through 100, Inclusive, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Thompson Pacific Corporation, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Cause of Action Quiet Title - Real Property
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (5) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: 12/1/2009 Order Dismissing Case Pursuant To Crc 3.1385
Case Dismissed By Court As To The Remaining Does 1-50 At Order To Show Cause Hearing Dec-01-2009 At 10:00am Pursuant To Crc 3.1385. Notice Sent By Court.
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 43 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: 12/1/2009
    Mini-minutes For Dec-01-2009 10:00 Am For Dept 212
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint
      Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Jamestown Equity Partners, Llc Citi Bank Corp
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/25/2009, Entered: 9/25/2009 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint
        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Thompson Pacific Corporation
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 40 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/24/2009
          Removed From Master Jury Calendar Set For Oct-13-2009 - Case Settled.
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/24/2009 Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
            Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Sep-29-2009 - Case Settled. Assigned To Dept. 212 On Dec-01-2009 At 10:00 Am For Dismissal Per Crc 3.1385.
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009 Notice of Settlement
              Notice Of Settlement Filed By Defendant Jamestown Equity Partners, Llc
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint
                Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Jamestown Equity Partners, Llc
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/21/2009 Notice Of Rescheduled Settlement Conference
                  Settlement Conference Set For Sep-28-2009 Continued To Sep-29-2009 At 3:30 Pm In 303. Continued To Department 303 To Hear With Lead Case #474888. (502)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 35 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: 7/9/2009
                    Order To Show Cause To Defendant's Counsel Scott E. Hennigh For Failure To Comply With San Francisco Superior Court Early Settlement Program Policies And Procedures No. 4. (administrative Fee) Is Ordered Off Calendar And Dissolved/case Removed From Early Settlement Program. Proceedings Reported By: Kent Gubbine, Csr#5797. (212)
                      Blank 34 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: 7/9/2009
                      Mini-minutes For Jul-09-2009 10:30 Am For Dept 212
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: 6/9/2009 Notice Of Removal From The Early Settlement Program
                        Notice Of Removal From The Early Settlement Program
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Order
                          Order Granting Defendant's Motion To Consolidate Actions (for Purposes Of Trial)(filed Order With Original Signature Is In Lead #474888)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 31 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009
                            Ntc Of Entry Of Order Granting Deft's Mtn To Consolidate Actions Filed By Defendant Jamestown Equity Partners, Llc
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: 4/30/2009 Order to Show Cause
                              Order To Show Cause To Scott E. Hennigh Set For Jul-09-2009 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212 For Failure To Comply With San Francisco Superior Court Early Settlement Program Policies And Procedures No. 4 (administrative Fee). Notice Sent By Court.
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 29 Filed: 4/28/2009, Entered: 4/28/2009
                                Motion To Consolidate Actions, Proof Of Service
                                  Blank 28 Filed: 3/19/2009, Entered: 3/19/2009
                                  Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Suter Bernard R
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009 Notice Of Early Settlement Conference--early Settlement Prgm
                                    Notice Of Early Settlement Conference - Early Settlement Program
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                      Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Oct-13-2009 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Sep-28-2009 At 3:30 Pm In Department 502. Notice Sent By Court.
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 25 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009
                                        Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Aug-10-2009 - By Court.
                                          Blank 24 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009
                                          Notice Of Objeciton To Notice Setting Trial Date And Mandatory Settlement Agreement Filed By Defendant Jamestown Equity Partners, Llc
                                            Blank 23 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009
                                            Notice Of Related Case Filed By Defendant Jamestown Equity Partners, Llc
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009 Answer
                                              Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Thompson Pacific Corporation
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Blank 21 Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: 1/30/2009
                                                Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Thompson Pacific Corporation Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: 1/28/2009 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                  Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Aug-10-2009 At 3:30 Pm In Department 606. Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Aug-24-2009 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Feb-13-2009 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: 1/27/2009
                                                    Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Nicodemus Plumbing & Mechanical, A California Corporation Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009
                                                      Summons Issued On Cross Complaint To Cross Complainant Jamestown Equity Partners, Llc
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009 Cross Complaint
                                                        Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Jamestown Equity Partners, Llc As To Cross Defendant Thompson Pacific Corporation Roes 1 Through 100, Inclusive
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: 1/6/2009 Answer
                                                          Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Jamestown Equity Partners, Llc
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: 12/29/2008
                                                            Notice Of Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008
                                                              Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Thompson Pacific Corporation Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 Answer
                                                                Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Citi Bank Corp
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: 12/17/2008 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                  Case Management Conference Of Jan-02-2009 Continued To Feb-13-2009 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 12/11/2008, Entered: 12/11/2008
                                                                    Proof Of Service Of Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Thompson Pacific Corporation Served Dec-08-2008, Mail On Plaintiff Nicodemus Plumbing & Mechanical, A California Corporation
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: 12/8/2008 Answer
                                                                      Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Thompson Pacific Corporation
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: 12/4/2008
                                                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Nicodemus Plumbing & Mechanical, A California Corporation Estimated Time For Trial: 1.0 Days
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/1/2008, Entered: 12/1/2008 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                          Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Nicodemus Plumbing & Mechanical, A California Corporation Served Oct-27-2008, Mail And Acknowledgement, Acknowledgment Date Nov-10-2008 On Defendant Thompson Pacific Corporation
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: 11/20/2008 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
                                                                            Order To Show Cause Re Proof Of Service On Dec-02-2008 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: 11/10/2008 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                                              Summons On Complaint And Complaint; [declaration Of Diligence Attached Thereto], Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Nicodemus Plumbing & Mechanical, A California Corporation Served Nov-04-2008, Substitute Service On Corporation On Defendant Citi Bank Corp
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: 11/10/2008 Summons On Complaint And Complaint; [declaration Of Diligence Attached
                                                                                Summons On Complaint And Complaint; [declaration Of Diligence Attached Thereto], Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Nicodemus Plumbing & Mechanical, A California Corporation Served Nov-04-2008, Substitute Service On Corporation On Defendant Jamestown Equity Partners, Llc
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: 10/30/2008
                                                                                  Declaration Of Robert A. Weinberg In Opposition To Order To Show Cause Re: Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Nicodemus Plumbing & Mechanical, A California Corporation
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: 10/22/2008 Order To Show Cause Re: Proof Of Service
                                                                                    Added To Proof Of Service Order To Show Cause Calendar Hearing Set For Dec-02-2008 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                      Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Complaint
                                                                                        Quiet Title - Real Property, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Nicodemus Plumbing & Mechanical, A California Corporation As To Defendant Jamestown Equity Partners, Llc Thompson Pacific Corporation Citi Bank Corp Does 1-50, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jan-02-2009 Proof Of Service Due On Oct-03-2008 Case Management Statement Due On Dec-18-2008
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 21 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?