Deane v. Keane, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-02374-WDM-BNB
District Judge Walker D. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 4, 2017 at 10:39 PM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Wyrick G. Deane, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Welborn Sullivan Meck & Tooley, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathryn Haight +1 303 830 2500 +8322 832 832 2366 khaight@wsmtlaw.com
Space Stephen J. Sullivan +1 303 830 2500 +1 303 832 2366 ssullivan@wsmtlaw.com
v.
No Logo C. A. Miller, Defendant
No Logo C. F. Drake, Defendant
No Logo Eli Kearns, Defendant
No Logo Eugene Zimmerman, Defendant
No Logo H. J. Tissington, Defendant
No Logo James Keet, Defendant
No Logo John R. Williams, Defendant
No Logo John Revulious, Defendant
No Logo N. M. Rountrie, Defendant
No Logo Paystone Mining & Milling Company, Defendant
No Logo R. S. Waddill, Defendant
No Logo S. W. Keane, Defendant
No Logo S. W. Keene, Defendant
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roxane J. Perruso +1 303 454 0127 +1 303 454 0404 Roxane.Perruso@usdoj.gov
Office Denver
Filed 11/30/2000
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 290 - Real Property: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2409(a) Quiet Title Action
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Pitkin
Terminated 1/30/2008
Origin 4
Reopened 2/8/2007
Lead Case
100-cv-02361-WDM-BNB None
Related Case
Other Court Case 00WM 2355[USDC CO]
Def Custody Status
Flags CONSOL, TERMED
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 32 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
NOTICE (ORDER) OF DISMISSAL: the parties have filed a Stipulation forDismissal With Prejudice on 1/28/08 in lead case 00-cv-02261, the complaints are dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay his or its own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Judge Walker D. Miller on 1/30/2008. (sah, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 31 Filed: 2/8/2007, Entered: 2/8/2007 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION and the following actions are reopened and consolidated for all purposes into Civil Action No. 00-cv-02361-WDM-MEH. [Lead Case No. 00-cv-02361-WDM-MEH. Member Case Nos. 00-cv-02362-WDM-MEH; 00-cv-02363-WDM-MEH; 00-cv-02364-WDM-MEH; 00-cv-02365-WDM-MEH; 00-cv-02366-WDM-MEH; 00-cv-02367-WDM-MEH; 00-cv-02368-WDM-MEH; 00-cv-02369-WDM-MEH; 00-cv-02370-WDM-MEH; 00-cv-02371-WDM-MEH; 00-cv-02372-WDM-MEH; 00-cv-02373-WDM-MEH; 00-cv-02374-WDM-MEH and 00-cv-02394-WDM-MEH. Signed by Judge Walker D. Miller on 2/8/07. (dln, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 30 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/21/2006 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [28] Joint MOTION to Continue Administrative Closure [filed in case number 00-cv-02361-WDM-OES] to 6/1/07 in case numbers 00-cv-02361-WDM-OES (and related Civil Action Nos. 00-cv-02362-WDM-OES; 00-cv-02363-WDM-OES; and 00-cv-02365-WDM-OES through 00-cv-02374-WDM-OES). Signed by Judge Walker D. Miller on 11/20/06.(dln, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 29 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 5/25/2006 OrderCourt Filing
        ORDER granting to 12/1/06 Joint MOTION to Continue Administrative Closure in Thirteen Related Cases Case Nos 00-cv-02361 through 02363-WDM-MEH and Case Nos. 00-cv-02365 through 00023740WDM-MEH by Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Walker D. Miller on 5/25/06.(dln, )
          LREF
          Blank 28 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006, Terminated: 11/21/2006 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
          ORDER granting [26] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, [27] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael E. Hegarty terminated, by Judge Walker D. Miller on 4/21/06. Text only entry - no document attached (gms, )
            LREF
            Legal Document 27 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006, Terminated: 4/21/2006 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant USA. (Attachments: # (1))(Perruso, Roxane)
              LREF
              Legal Document 26 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006, Terminated: 4/21/2006 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant USA. (Attachments: # (1))(Perruso, Roxane)
                LREF
                Legal Document 25 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: 4/19/2006 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Roxane J. Perruso on behalf of USA (Perruso, Roxane)
                  LREF
                  Blank 24 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: 4/11/2006 Docket AnnotationCourt Filing
                  Docket Annotation re: [23] Order. The NEF for this document to Michael Hegarty was returned as undeliverable. Mr. Hegarty is now a Magistrate Judge. Text only entry - no document attached. (gms, )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: 4/10/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting [21] Joint MOTION to Continue Administrative Closures by Plaintiff . Signed by Judge Walker D. Miller on 4/7/06. (dlb, )
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                      MINUTE ORDER granting [21] Joint MOTION to Continue Administrative Closures by Plaintiff Wyrick G. Deane to 12/30/05 by Judge Walker D. Miller on 7/26/05.. (dlb, )
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/26/2005, Entered: 7/26/2005, Terminated: 7/26/2005 Motion to Continue
                        Joint MOTION to Continue Administrative Closures by Plaintiff Wyrick G. Deane. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Granting the Parties' Joint Motion to Continue Administrative Closure)(Haight, Kathryn)
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/20/2004 Description not availableCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting [18] Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Kathryn Haight for Wyrick G. Deane, Stephen J. Sullivan for Wyrick G. Deane. Attorney Peter R. Bornstein and Gary A. Wright terminated . Signed by Magistrate Judge O. Edward Schlatter on 12/16/04. (dlb, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 19 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004 MemorandumCourt Filing
                          MEMORANDUM referring to Magistrate Schlatter [18] MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Judge Walker D. Miller on 12/14/04. (dlb, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 12/14/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004, Terminated: 12/16/2004 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                            Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Gary A Wright and Peter R. Bornstein and Substitute Attorney Kathryn Haight and Stephen J. Sullivan by Plaintiff (dlb, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 17 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                              MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller denying w/out prej motion to compel and request for limited ext of discovery ddl if the case is reopened [16-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/25/03 (dlb)
                                LREF
                                Blank 16 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003, Terminated: 2/24/2003 Motion to Compel
                                MOTION by plaintiff to compel and request for limited ext of discovery ddl (dlb)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 3/26/2002, Entered: 3/26/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                  ORDER FOR ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSURE by Judge Walker D. Miller terminating case (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 3/26/02 (dlb)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: 6/14/2001 Service by Publication
                                    SERVICE by publication of notice in The Aspen Times from 03/03/01 to 3/31/01 (dlb)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller ; status conf held 5/31/01, stlmt stmt due by 7/31/01 and sched order by 8/15/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/5/01 (dlb)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER stlmt Case referred to Magistrate Judge O. E. Schlatter by Judge Walker D. Miller (cc: to counsel) (dlb)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 13 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                          COURTROOM MINUTES by Judge Walker D. Miller ; entry date : 6/6/01 Court Reporter: Janet Morrissey (dlb)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001 Status Report
                                            Joint STATUS REPORT by plaintiff, defendants (dlb)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 Answer
                                              ANSWER by defendant USA to complaint [1-1]; jury demand (gms)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Mail Returned
                                                MAIL Returned addressed to defendant C. F. Drake in 1:00-cv-02374 re: summons by publication (former empl)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/6/2001 Mail Returned
                                                  MAIL Returned addressed to defendant C. A. Miller in 1:00-cv-02374 Re: Summons by Publication (former empl)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/6/2001 Mail Returned
                                                    MAIL Returned addressed to defendant John Revulious in 1:00-cv-02374, defendant John R. Williams in 1:00-cv-02374, defendant Eli Kearns in 1:00-cv-02374, defendant Paystone Mining Mill in 1:00-cv-02374, defendant H. J. Tissington in 1:00-cv-02374 Re: Summons by Publication (former empl)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller ; status conf set for 10:00 5/31/01 . Cases 00-WM-2355 through 00-WM-2405 are consolidated for pretrial proceedings only. Cases 00-WM-2408 and 00-WM-2409 are consolidated for pretrial proceedings only. (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 5/23/01 (gms)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 3/30/2001 Mail Returned
                                                        MAIL Returned addresssed to Mary C. Rogers re: summons by publication (former empl)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 3/27/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                          COURTROOM MINUTES by Judge Walker D. Miller ; status conf held 3/27/01 Cases 00-WM-2355 through 00-WM-2405 are consolidated. Cases 00-WM-2408 and 00-WM-2409 are consolidated, but not with the other cases ; entry date : 5/23/01 Court Reporter: Janet Morrissey (gms)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001 Mail Returned
                                                            MAIL Returned addressed to defendant N. M. Rountrie re: Summons by Publication (former empl)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank -- Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001 Mail Returned
                                                              MAIL Returned addressed to defendant R. S. Waddill re: Summons by Publication (former empl)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 Mail Returned
                                                                MAIL Returned addressed to defendant Eugene Zimmerman re: summons by publication (former empl)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001 Mail Returned
                                                                  MAIL Returned addressed to defendant S. W. Keane re: summons by publication (former empl)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/5/2001 Mail Returned
                                                                    MAIL Returned addressed to defendant S. W. Keane Re: Summons by Publication (former empl)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER by Judge Walker D. Miller granting pla's motion for order permitting service by publication and mailing [5-1] in The Aspen Times (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/28/01 (pap)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001, Terminated: 2/26/2001 Motion for Order
                                                                        Verified MOTION by plaintiff Wyrick G. Deane for order permitting service by publication and mailing (former empl)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 1/9/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller ; status conf reset for 10:00 3/27/01 status report due by 3/23/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/9/01 (former empl)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                            ATTORNEY APPEARANCE as co-counsel for plaintiff Wyrick G. Deane by Peter R. Bornstein (former empl)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 12/4/2000, Entered: 12/5/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller ; status report ddl set for 1/5/01 ; status conf set for 11:00 1/17/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/5/00 (former empl)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Complaint
                                                                                COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued) (former empl)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000 Filing Fee Received
                                                                                  FILING FEE PAID: on 11/30/00 in the amount of $ 150, receipt # 221628. (former empl)
                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 76 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?