Richard F Sowinski Dr v. Amerigas Propane Lp Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 08 480871
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Sowinski Dr, Richard F In The Public Interest, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Graham & Martin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony George Graham +1 949 474 1022
v.
No Logo Allstar Gas Corporation Formerly Empire Gas Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Amerigas Propane, LP, Defendant
No Logo Campora Wholesale Propane, Inc, Defendant
No Logo Cornerstone Propane, LP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Cornerstone Propane Lp Formerly Coast Gas"
No Logo Does 1-500, Defendant
No Logo Ferrellgas, LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Offices Of Fletcher, White & Adair

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Fletcher +1 310 457 4100
No Logo Ferrellgas Partners, LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Offices Of Fletcher, White & Adair

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Fletcher +1 310 457 4100
No Logo Heritage Propane/northern Energy, Defendant
No Logo Kamps Propane, Inc, Defendant
No Logo Proflame Inc, Defendant
No Logo Southern California Edison Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Southern California Edison"
No Logo Suburban Propane Gas Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Suburban Propane, L.p. Sued As Suburban Propane Ga Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Offices Of Fletcher, White & Adair

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Fletcher +1 310 457 4100
No Logo U-haul Co.of California, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rothman, R Raymond +1 213 680 5400

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Offices Of Fletcher, White & Adair

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John R. Fletcher +1 310 457 4100
Cause of Action Business Tort
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (6) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/18/2009, Entered: 8/18/2009 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
Case Management Conference Of Aug-28-2009 Is Off Calendar, Coordinated Under Jccp 4564. Notice Sent By Court.
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 19 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: 7/22/2009 Court Filing
    Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Appointing Coordination Judge Filed By Plaintiff Sowinski Dr, Richard F In The Public Interest
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: 6/10/2009 Order Setting Case Management Conference
      Case Management Conference Set For Aug-28-2009 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212 For Status Of Judicial Council Coordination Motion. The Jun-15-2009 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: 4/15/2009 Order to Show Cause
        Order To Show Cause Set For Jun-15-2009 In Department 212 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The May-01-2009 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 16 Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: 3/25/2009
          Substitution Of Attorney: Fletcher, John R. Substituted For Rothman, R Raymond As Attorney For U-haul Co.of California
            Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/3/2009, Entered: 3/3/2009 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
            Case Management Conference Of Mar-20-2009 Continued To May-01-2009 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: 2/26/2009 Order
              Order Extending Time To Respond To Complaint To March 25, 2009; Stipulation
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 13 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: 2/24/2009 Court Filing
                Notice Of Order Appointing Coordination Judge And Setting Hearing Filed By Plaintiff Sowinski Dr, Richard F In The Public Interest
                  Blank 12 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009
                  Fee Paid On Stip And [proposed] Order Extending Time To Respond To Complaint Filed By Defendant U-haul Co.of California
                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009 Order
                    Order Extending Time To Respond To Complaint To February 23, 2009; Stipulation
                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: 1/12/2009 Dismissal
                      Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant Southern California Edison
                        Blank 9 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: 1/7/2009
                        Fee Paid For Stip And Order Filed By Defendant U-haul Co.of California
                          Blank 8 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: 1/7/2009
                          First Appearance Fee Paid Filed By Defendant U-haul Co.of California
                            Blank 7 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009
                            Pltf's Notice Of Submission Of Petition For Coordination. Filed By Plaintiff Sowinski Dr, Richard F In The Public Interest
                              Blank 6 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: 1/5/2009
                              Notice Of Filing And Courtesy Copy Of Petition For Coordination And Memorandum Of P/a And Declaration Of Anthony G. Graham In Support Thereof.
                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008 Answer
                                Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Ferrellgas Lp Ferrellgas Partners Lp
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: 12/16/2008 Answer
                                  Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Suburban Propane, L.p. Sued As Suburban Propane Ga Corporation
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: 10/15/2008
                                    Application For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To G.c. 68511.3 (confidential) Filed By Plaintiff Sowinski Dr, Richard F In The Public Interest Order Granting Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To Crc 3.50 - 3.63
                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: 10/15/2008 Notice To Plaintiff
                                      Notice To Plaintiff
                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: 10/15/2008 Complaint
                                        Business Tort, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Sowinski Dr, Richard F In The Public Interest As To Defendant Amerigas Propane Lp Allstar Gas Corporation Formerly Empire Gas Corporation Campora Wholesale Propane, Inc Cornerstone Propane Lp Formerly Coast Gas Ferrellgas Lp Ferrellgas Partners Lp Heritage Propane/northern Energy Kamps Propane, Inc Proflame Inc Southern California Edison Suburban Propane Gas Corporation U-haul Co.of California Does 1-500 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Mar-20-2009 Proof Of Service Due On Dec-15-2008 Case Management Statement Due On Mar-05-2009

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 184 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?