Joseph Alvardo v. Joseph Mcgovern Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 08 482060
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alvardo, Joseph, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald D. Foreman +1 415 433 3475 +1 415 781 8030 rdf@foremanandbrasso.com
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 10, Defendant
No Logo Mcgovern, Joseph, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Macmorris & Carbone

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Merritt Sanford +1 415 565 2811
No Logo Mcgovern, Lisa, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Macmorris & Carbone

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Merritt Sanford +1 415 565 2811
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (93) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (12) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 93 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013
Statement Of Undisputed And Disputed Facts Filed By Defendant Mcgovern, Joseph Mcgovern, Lisa
    Blank 92 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013
    Declaration Of Eric E. Williams In Support Of Motioan For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Mcgovern, Joseph Mcgovern, Lisa
      Blank 91 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013
      Objection To Evidence Attached To Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Mcgovern, Joseph Mcgovern, Lisa
        Blank 90 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013
        Objection To Unpleaded Claims By Plaintiff Filed By Defendant Mcgovern, Joseph Mcgovern, Lisa
          Blank 89 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013
          Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment ; Points And Authorities In Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Mcgovern, Joseph Mcgovern, Lisa
            Blank 88 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013
            Declaration Of Eric E. Williams In Support Of Opposition To Motion To Amend The Complaint Filed By Defendant Mcgovern, Joseph Mcgovern, Lisa
              Blank 87 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013
              Opposition To Motion To Amend The Complaint Filed By Defendant Mcgovern, Joseph Mcgovern, Lisa
                Blank 86 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013
                Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Defendant Mcgovern, Joseph Mcgovern, Lisa
                  Blank 85 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013
                  Notice Of Motion For Mandatory Dismissal For Delay In Bringing Action To Trial Filed By Defendant Mcgovern, Joseph Mcgovern, Lisa Hearing Set For Dec-02-2013 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Order Setting Case Management Conference
                    Case Management Conference Set For Dec-18-2013 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For The Submission Of Case Management Statements And Trial Setting. The Nov-05-2013 Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 83 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013
                      Law And Motion, 302, Plaintiff Joseph Alvardo's Motion For Supplemental Complaint - Off Calendar From Nov-13-2013 Per Withdrawal Filed By Moving Party On Oct-23-2013 (302)
                        Blank 82 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013
                        Motion For Summary Judgment, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph Hearing Set For Nov-18-2013 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                          Blank 81 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013
                          Motion For Supplemental Complaint;, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph Hearing Set For Nov-18-2013 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                            Blank 80 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013
                            Withdrawal Of Pltf's Motion For Supplemental Complaint On Nov-13-2013 Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph
                              Blank 79 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/21/2013
                              Notice Of Motion And Motion For Supplementla Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph Hearing Set For Nov-13-2013 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                Blank 78 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/21/2013
                                Application For Waiver Of Reporter Fee Pursuant To G.c. 68633, Crc 3.51, 8.26, And 8.818 (confidential) Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph Order For Waiver Of Reporter Fee Granted For Cases Reported By A Court Employed Reporter Only, Pursuant To G.c. 68634 (e), Crc 3.52
                                  Blank 77 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/21/2013
                                  Application For Waiver Of Jury Fee And Expenses Pursuant To G.c. 68633, Crc 3.51, 8.26, And 8.818 (confidential) Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph Order For Waiver Of Jury Fee And Expenses Granted Pursuant To G.c. 68634 (e), Crc 3.52
                                    Blank 76 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/21/2013
                                    Application For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To G.c. 68633, Crc 3.51, 8.26, And 8.818 (confidential) Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph Order For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Granted Pursuant To G.c. 68634 (e), Crc 3.52
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: 10/15/2013 Demand For Jury
                                      Demand For Jury Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: 10/15/2013 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                        Request For Case Mangement Conference Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
                                          Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Jul-02-2013 Continued To Nov-05-2013 At 10:30 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/24/2013, Entered: 6/24/2013 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                            Order To Show Cause Petition For Continuance Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: 3/1/2013 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
                                              Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Mar-05-2013 Continued To Jul-02-2013 At 10:30 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: 2/26/2013 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                Osc Petition For Continuance Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: 10/24/2012 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
                                                  Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Oct-30-2012 Continued To Mar-05-2013 At 10:30 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/22/2012, Entered: 10/22/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                    Order To Show Cause Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: 6/18/2012 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
                                                      Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Jun-21-2012 Continued To Oct-30-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: 6/15/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                        Petition For Continuance Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: 5/2/2012 Case Management Statement
                                                          Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: 5/1/2012 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
                                                            Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of May-03-2012 Continued To Jun-21-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document 63 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Order
                                                              Order Denying Dfendants' Motion For Entry Of Judgment Pursuant To Terms Of Stipulated Settlement
                                                                Blank 62 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012
                                                                Mini Minutes For Apr-26-2012 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                  Legal Document 61 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Opposition
                                                                  Opposition Of Motion For Entry Of Judgment (4documents) Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph
                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Court Filing
                                                                    Law And Motion 302, Defendants Joseph Mcgovern, Lisa Mcgovern's Motion For Entry Of Judgment Pursuant To Terms Of Stipulated Settlement. Discussed And The Court Vacated Its Tentative Ruling And Denied The Motion. Order Signed After Hearing. Judge: Harold Kahn; Court Reporter: Sherry Sawyer, Csr #5976
                                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: 3/15/2012
                                                                      Proof Of Service Of Motion Filed By Defendant Mcgovern, Joseph Mcgovern, Lisa
                                                                        Legal Document 58 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: 3/15/2012 Motion (civil Generic)Court Filing
                                                                        Notice Of Motion And Motion For Entry Of Judgemnt Pursuant To Terms Of Stip Settlement Filed By Defendant Mcgovern, Joseph Mcgovern, Lisa Hearing Set For Apr-26-2012 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: 2/3/2012 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
                                                                          Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Feb-02-2012 Continued To May-03-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Blank 56 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: 2/2/2012
                                                                            Mini Minutes For Feb-02-2012 02:00 Pm For Dept 610
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: 2/1/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                              Order To Show Casue - Petition For Continuance Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Legal Document 54 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: 11/1/2011 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
                                                                                Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Nov-01-2011 Continued To Feb-02-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                  Blank 53 Filed: 11/1/2011, Entered: 11/1/2011
                                                                                  Mini-minutes For Nov-01-2011 10:00 Am For Dept 610
                                                                                    Blank 52 Filed: 10/31/2011, Entered: 10/31/2011
                                                                                    Response To Case Management Statment Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph
                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: 9/15/2011
                                                                                      Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Mcgovern, Joseph Mcgovern, Lisa
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: 9/8/2011 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
                                                                                        Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Sep-20-2011 Continued To Nov-01-2011 At 10:00 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Blank 49 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: 8/18/2011
                                                                                          Order To Show Cause To Plaintiff's Counsel For Failure To File Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Motion To Withdraw Is Ordered Off Calendar And Dissolved. Compliante. Proof Of Service On File. Proceedings Not Reported. (610)
                                                                                            Blank 48 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: 8/18/2011
                                                                                            Mini-minutes For Aug-18-2011 10:30 Am For Dept 610
                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: 7/28/2011
                                                                                              Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Attorney's Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel: Pro Per Substituted For Foreman, Ronald Douglas As Attorney For Alvardo, Joseph
                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: 7/27/2011
                                                                                                Order Geanting Attorney's Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel Of Record Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: 7/27/2011 Order
                                                                                                  Order Granting Ronald D. Foreman's Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel For Joseph Alvarado
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Blank 44 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: 7/6/2011
                                                                                                    Declaration Of Eric E. Williams Re: Appearance Filed By Defendant Mcgovern, Joseph Mcgovern, Lisa
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: 7/6/2011 Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                      Order To Show Cause To Plaintiff's Counsel Set For Aug-18-2011 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For Failure To File Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Motion To Withdraw. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: 7/6/2011 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
                                                                                                        Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Jul-12-2011 Continued To Sep-20-2011 At 10:00 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                          Blank 41 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: 5/4/2011
                                                                                                          Mini-minutes For May-04-2011 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                            Blank 40 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: 5/4/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                            Law And Motion 302, Ronald D. Foreman, Esq. Of Foreman And Brasso's Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel (for Plaintiff Joseph Alvardo) Is Granted. (prevailing Party To Prepare Order.) Judge: Loretta M. Giorgi, Reporter: Karla Ellis-davis, Csr #12998
                                                                                                              Blank 39 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: 4/29/2011
                                                                                                              Reply Declaration Of Ronald D. Foreman In Support Of Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel Of Record In Civil Action Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph
                                                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: 4/25/2011
                                                                                                                Opposition To Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel Filed By Pltf Joseph Alvarado
                                                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 4/21/2011, Entered: 4/21/2011
                                                                                                                  Amended Ntc Of Attorney's Lien And Charging Lien Pursuant To Contract Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph
                                                                                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: 4/19/2011
                                                                                                                    Mini-minutes For Apr-19-2011 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 4/19/2011, Entered: 4/19/2011
                                                                                                                      Law And Motion, Ronald D. Foreman, Esq. Of Foreman And Brasso's Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel (for Plaintiff Joseph Alvardo). The Court Vacated Its Tentative Ruling And Continued The Matter To 05/04/11 At 9:30am For Plaintiff To File An Opposition By 04/25/11. Any Reply Due By 04/29/11. Plaintiff To Give Notice. (302)
                                                                                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 4/13/2011, Entered: 4/13/2011
                                                                                                                        Ntc Of Non-oppos. To Mtn To Be Relieved As Counsel Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: 3/25/2011 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
                                                                                                                          Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Apr-05-2011 Continued To Jul-12-2011 At 10:00 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: 3/23/2011
                                                                                                                            Declaration Of Attorney Ronald D Foreman Re: Status Of The Case An Din Opposition To The Osc Hearing For Dismissal With Request For Continue The Dismissal Hearing Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph
                                                                                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: 3/23/2011
                                                                                                                              Motion For Withdrawal Of Attorney Of Record, Proof Of Service, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph Hearing Set For Apr-19-2011 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
                                                                                                                                Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Feb-01-2011 Continued To Apr-05-2011 At 10:00 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: 1/20/2011
                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Eric E. Williams Re Status Of Matter Filed By Defendant Mcgovern, Joseph Mcgovern, Lisa
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                    Order To Vacate The November 4, 2010 Order Dismissing The Case Pursuant To Crc 3.1385 And Restoring The Case To The Civil Active List And Order Thereon; Stipulation
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 27 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010 Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
                                                                                                                                      Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (crc 3.1385) Sent By Court
                                                                                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010
                                                                                                                                        Added To Calendar For Order To Show Cause Re Dimissal (crc 3.1385) Hearing Set For Feb-01-2011 At 10:00 Am In Dept 610
                                                                                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010
                                                                                                                                          Fee Pd For Stipulation And Order To Vacate The Nov 4, 2010 Order Dismissing The Case Pursuant To Crc 3.1385 And Restoring The Case To The Civil Active List Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Order Dismissing Case Pursuant To Crc 3.1385
                                                                                                                                            Case Dismissed By Court At Order To Show Cause Hearing Nov-02-2010 At 10:00am Pursuant To Crc 3.1385. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: 11/2/2010
                                                                                                                                              Mini-minutes For Nov-02-2010 10:00 Am For Dept 212
                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: 10/15/2009
                                                                                                                                                Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Oct-15-2009 - Case Settled Per Notice By Plaintiff's Counsel; Notice Of Settlement Filed Sep-11-2009. Not Reported. (613)
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: 10/15/2009
                                                                                                                                                  Order To Show Cause To Plaintiff's Counsel For Failure To Comply With San Francisco Superior Court Early Settlement Program Policies And Procedures No. 4. (administrative Fee) Is Ordered Off Calendar And Dissolved/fee Paid. Proceedings Not Reported. (212)
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: 10/15/2009
                                                                                                                                                    Mini-minutes For Oct-15-2009 10:30 Am For Dept 212
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: 10/13/2009 Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
                                                                                                                                                      Removed From Master Jury Calendar Set For Nov-02-2009 - Case Settled. Notice Of Conditional Settlement Filed 9/11/09. Assigned To Pretrial Dept. 212 On Nov-02-2010 At 10:00 Am For Dismissal Per Crc 3.1385. (206)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009 Notice Of Removal From The Early Settlement Program
                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Removal From The Early Settlement Program
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009
                                                                                                                                                          Sanction Payment Deposited By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009 Notice of Settlement
                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Settlement Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009 Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                              Order To Show Cause To Plaintiff's Counsel Set For Aug-27-2009 Continued To Oct-15-2009 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212 For Failure To Comply With San Francisco Superior Court Early Settlement Program Policies And Procedures No 4 (administrative Fee). Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: 8/27/2009 Sanction Order
                                                                                                                                                                Sanctions Ordered In The Amount Of $100.00 Against Ronald D. Foreman, Esq., For Failure To Appear At The Order To Show Cause Hearing On: Aug-27-2009, Payable On Or Before Sep-11-2009. Proceedings Reported By: Carl Sauceda, Csr#2031. (212) Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: 8/27/2009
                                                                                                                                                                  Mini-minutes For Aug-27-2009 10:30 Am For Dept 212
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/20/2009, Entered: 7/20/2009 Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                    Order To Show Cause To Ronald D. Foreman Set For Aug-27-2009 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212 For Failure To Comply With San Francisco Superior Court Early Settlement Program Policies And Procedures No. 4 (administrative Fee). Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: 5/5/2009 Notice Of Early Settlement Conference--early Settlement Prgm
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Early Settlement Conference - Early Settlement Program
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: 4/14/2009
                                                                                                                                                                        Jury Fees, Tran # W2209414j011, Tag # 023244 Deposited By Defendant Mcgovern, Joseph Mcgovern, Lisa
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/8/2009, Entered: 4/8/2009 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Oct-15-2009 At 3:30 Pm In Department 613. Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Nov-02-2009 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Apr-24-2009 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: 4/1/2009
                                                                                                                                                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Mcgovern, Joseph Mcgovern, Lisa Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 8.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Mcgovern, Joseph Mcgovern, Lisa
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
                                                                                                                                                                                Order To Show Cause Re Proof Of Service On Mar-17-2009 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: 3/2/2009 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph Served Feb-26-2009, Personal Service On Defendant Mcgovern, Joseph
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: 3/2/2009 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph Served Feb-26-2009, Personal Service On Defendant Mcgovern, Lisa
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/11/2009, Entered: 2/11/2009 Order To Show Cause Re: Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                      Added To Proof Of Service Order To Show Cause Calendar Hearing Set For Mar-17-2009 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: 11/19/2008 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: 11/19/2008 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                          Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Alvardo, Joseph As To Defendant Mcgovern, Joseph Mcgovern, Lisa Does 1 To 10 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Apr-24-2009 Proof Of Service Due On Jan-20-2009 Case Management Statement Due On Apr-09-2009

                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 2,105 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?