Robert Kehoe Et Al v. Patrick Hennessy Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 09 483984
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kehoe, Lorena, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael Brooks Carroll

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Brooks Carroll +1 415 788 7600 +1 415 421 7379 carroll_law@sbcglobal.net
No Logo Kehoe, Robert, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael Brooks Carroll

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Brooks Carroll +1 415 788 7600 +1 415 421 7379 carroll_law@sbcglobal.net
v.
No Logo Does 1 Thru 30, Defendant
No Logo Hegarty, Conor Individually And Dba Hegarty Plumbing, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kidd, George Noel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kidd, George Noel +1 510 268 8600
No Logo Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Duncan, Dana L.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Duncan, Dana L. +1 925 930 6600

Represented by Matheny, Sears, Linkert And Long

No Logo Surety Company Of The Pacific, Defendant

Represented by McKague & Tong, LLP

No Logo United Cabinet Outlet, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Bradley and Gmelich

No Logo Zhang, Raymond Xiankai, Defendant

Represented by Bradley and Gmelich

No Logo Adt Alarm Co., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Adt Security Services, Inc (improperly Named As Adt Alarm Co.), Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Hardy & Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ingrid L. Peterson +1 415 544 1900
No Logo Begic, Nino, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Callanan Plastering Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Danielle Designs, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Dowling Electric, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Dowling, John, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Dowling, Patrick John Dba Dowling Electric Sued As John Dowling, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Long, Joseph Antonio

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Long, Joseph Antonio +1 925 941 0090
No Logo Gallagher Construction Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Gallagher, Conal, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Hai Roofing Co., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Hegarty Plumbing, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Hegarty, Conor Individually And Dba Hegarty Plumbing, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kidd, George Noel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kidd, George Noel +1 510 268 8600
No Logo Lau, Harry, Cross-Defendant
No Logo London Tile, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Farbstein & Blackman, APC

No Logo Moes 1 Through 25, Inclusive, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Nguyen, Hai, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Nino's Hardwood Flooring Inc., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph Costella & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Demordaunt, David James +1 925 945 4491
No Logo Rockit Drywall, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Roes 1 Through 50, Inclusive, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Roes 1-100, Inclusive, Cross-Defendant
No Logo S L Mechanical Contractors Co., Cross-Defendant
No Logo United Cabinet Outlet Inc., Cross-Defendant

Represented by Bradley and Gmelich

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon-Creed Kelley Holl & Sugerman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin J. Holl +1 415 421 3100 +1 415 421 3150 holl@gkhs.com
No Logo Valdes, Dave, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Velasquez Hauling, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Velasquez, Carlos, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Danielle Designs Llc Sued Erroneously As Danielle Designs, Cross-Complainant

Represented by Burke, Williams & Sorenson

Toggle Switch Represented by Kidd, George Noel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kidd, George Noel +1 510 268 8600

Represented by Matheny, Sears, Linkert And Long

No Logo Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction, Cross-Complainant

Represented by Burke, Williams & Sorenson

Toggle Switch Represented by Kidd, George Noel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kidd, George Noel +1 510 268 8600

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael Brooks Carroll

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Brooks Carroll +1 415 788 7600 +1 415 421 7379 carroll_law@sbcglobal.net

Represented by Matheny, Sears, Linkert And Long

State Compensation Insurance Fund State Compensation Insurance Fund, Third Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Sapper, Judith Debra

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sapper, Judith Debra +1 323 526 2134
Cause of Action Contract/warranty
  Entries (181) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (26) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 181 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: 9/7/2011 Order Dismissing Case Pursuant To Crc 3.1385
Case Dismissed By Court At Order To Show Cause Hearing Sep-06-2011 At 10:00am Pursuant To Crc 3.1385. Notice Sent By Court.
    Legal Document 180 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: 9/6/2011 Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint
    Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint
      Blank 179 Filed: 9/6/2011, Entered: 9/6/2011
      Mini-minutes For Sep-06-2011 10:00 Am For Dept 610
        Blank 178 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: 8/15/2011
        Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Pos Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
          Legal Document 177 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: 8/10/2011 Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Of Patrick Hennessy Dba
          Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Hennessy, Patrick Of Patrick Hennessy Dba Hennessy Construction Filed On Apr 6, 2009
            Legal Document 176 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: 7/13/2011 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
            Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Jul-19-2011 Continued To Sep-06-2011 At 10:00 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
              Legal Document 175 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: 5/23/2011 Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Conor Hegarty Dba Hegarty
              Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Hegarty, Conor Conor Hegarty Dba Hegarty Plumbing On June 29, 2010
                Blank 174 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: 5/20/2011
                Notice Of Entry Of Order Re Good Faith Stip Among The Parties Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                  Legal Document 173 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: 5/17/2011 Order
                  Order And Good Faith Stipulation Among The Parties Pursuant To Ccp §§ 877 And 877.6
                    Legal Document 172 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 Order Determining Good Faith Settlement Of Conor Hegarty, Ind/dba
                    Order Determining Good Faith Settlement Of Conor Hegarty, Ind/dba Hegarty Plumbing And Dismissing And Barring All Cross-complaints
                      Legal Document 171 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
                      Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of May-17-2011 Continued To Jul-19-2011 At 10:00 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                        Legal Document 170 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: 4/22/2011 Order
                        Order For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement (between Plaintiffs Robert Kehoe, Lorena Kehoe And Cross Defendant London Tile (michael Griffin Dba London Tile)) (no Sase, Copy In 302 Outbox)
                          Blank 169 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: 4/6/2011
                          Fee Paid For Good Faith Stipulation Among The Parties Per Ccp Sections 877 And 877.6 Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                            Blank 168 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: 3/7/2011
                            Mini-minutes For Mar-07-2011 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                              Blank 167 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: 3/7/2011 Court Filing
                              Law And Motion 302, Plaintiffs Robert Kehoe And Lorena Kehoe's Motion To Compel Compliance And Further Responses To Document Production Requests, Or Alternatively, Motion In Limine Re: Defendants United Cabinet Outlet, Inc. And Raymond Zhang's Bad Faith Discovery Responses Is Off Calendar. Case Settled. Judge: Loretta M. Giorgi, Reporter: Denise L. Doucette, Csr #5963
                                Legal Document 166 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: 2/18/2011 Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
                                Removed From Master Jury Calendar Set For Feb-22-2011 - Case Settled Per Plaintiff's Faxed Letter Dated 2/18/11. Assigned To Dept. 610 On May-17-2011 At 10:00 Am For Dismissal Per Crc 3.1385. (206)
                                  Legal Document 165 Filed: 2/18/2011, Entered: 2/18/2011 Notice Of Settlement \ Filed By Defendant
                                  Notice Of Settlement Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                    Blank 164 Filed: 2/15/2011, Entered: 2/15/2011 Court Filing
                                    Master Motion Calendar On Feb-15-2011 In 206, Defendant United Cabinet Outlet Inc And Raymond Zhang's Motion To Continue Trial Is Off Calendar. No Appearances. Judge: Marla Miller; Clerk: E. Bura; Matter Not Reported. (206)
                                      Blank 163 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011
                                      Declaration Of Michael Brooks Carroll In Support Of Oppos. To Mtn To Continue Trial And Related Dates Filed By Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena
                                        Blank 162 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011
                                        Opposition To Mtn To Continue Trial And All Realted Dates (unpon Shortened Time) By Deft's Filed By Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena
                                          Blank 161 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011
                                          Jury Fees, Tran # R0911208j017, Tag # 027835 # 027835 Deposited By Defendant United Cabinet Outlet, Inc. Zhang, Raymond Xiankai
                                            Blank 160 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011
                                            Mtn To Compel Compliance And Further Responses To Doc Production Requests Filed By Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena Hearing Set For Mar-07-2011 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                              Blank 159 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011
                                              Notice Of Motion And Motion To Cont. Tr. Filed By Defendant United Cabinet Outlet, Inc. Zhang, Raymond Xiankai Hearing Set For Feb-15-2011 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                Legal Document 158 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011 Order
                                                Order Shortening Time Re: Motion To Continue Trial
                                                  Blank 157 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011
                                                  Ex Parte Application For Order To Continue Trial; To File Firest Amended Answer Filed By Defendant United Cabinet Outlet, Inc. Zhang, Raymond Xiankai
                                                    Blank 156 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011
                                                    Application For Good Faith Settlement Determination; Declaration Of Abigail E. Lighthart; Proof Of Service Filed By Cross Defendant Hegarty, Conor Individually And Dba Hegarty Plumbing
                                                      Blank 155 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: 1/26/2011
                                                      Notice Of Settlement With Pltf Filed By Defendant Hegarty, Conor Individually And Dba Hegarty Plumbing
                                                        Blank 154 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: 1/21/2011
                                                        Settlement Conference Held, Case Not Settled, Trial Date Remains. (sullivan-d318)
                                                          Legal Document 153 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: 1/21/2011 Minutes
                                                          Minutes For Jan-21-2011 3:00 Pm For Dept 318
                                                            Blank 152 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: 1/13/2011
                                                            Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Tong, Daron Dale
                                                              Blank 151 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: 1/10/2011
                                                              Application For Good Faith Determination; Declaration Of Michael A. Farbstein; Proof Of Service Filed By Cross Defendant London Tile
                                                                Blank 150 Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: 1/10/2011
                                                                Notice Of Settlement Filed By Cross Defendant London Tile
                                                                  Legal Document 149 Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: 12/30/2010 Notice Of Rescheduled Settlement Conference
                                                                  Mandatory Settlement Conference, Advanced From Feb-02-2011 To Mandatory Settlement Conference At Jan-21-2011 3:00 Pm In Dept. 318.
                                                                    Blank 148 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: 10/27/2010
                                                                    Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Continuing Trial Date And Stay On Discovery Pursuant To Stipulation Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                      Blank 147 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: 10/25/2010 Court Filing
                                                                      Discovery 302, Third Party State Compensation Insurance Fund's Motion To Conditionally File Records Under Seal Is Denied. No Motion For Protective Order. Parties Stipulate That Documents "scif" Provided To The Court May Be Taken From The Court And Given To Counsel, To Only Be Used In Mediation Matter. Court Released Records (two Copies Of Documents) In Open Court To Mr. Carroll. Judge: Charlotte Walter Woolard; Not Reported
                                                                        Blank 146 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: 10/25/2010 Court Filing
                                                                        Discovery 302, Third Party State Compensation Insurance Fund's Motion For Clarification Re Production Of Documents Pursuant To Subpoena Is Off Calendar As It Is Not A Proper Motion. Judge: Charlotte Walter Woolard; Not Reported
                                                                          Blank 145 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: 10/25/2010
                                                                          Mini-minutes For Oct-25-2010 9:00 Am For Dept 302
                                                                            Blank 144 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: 10/25/2010
                                                                            Mini-minutes For Oct-25-2010 9:00 Am For Dept 302
                                                                              Blank 143 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: 10/21/2010
                                                                              Added To Calendar For State Compensation Insurance Fund's Motion To Conditionally File Records Under Seal Hearing Set For Oct-25-2010 At 09:00 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                Legal Document 142 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: 10/21/2010 Notice Of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                Settlement Conference Set For Oct-29-2010 In Department 210 Continued To Feb-02-2011 At 3:30 Pm In Department 318. (206)
                                                                                  Blank 141 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: 10/21/2010
                                                                                  Master Jury Calendar Set For Nov-15-2010 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Feb-22-2011 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 Pursuant To Ex Parte Order Filed On 10/21/10. (206)
                                                                                    Legal Document 140 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: 10/21/2010 Order
                                                                                    Order Continuing Trial Date And Msc And Stay On Discovery Pursuant To Stipulation
                                                                                      Blank 139 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: 10/21/2010
                                                                                      Stipulation To Continue Trial Date To Feb 21, 2010 Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                        Blank 138 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010
                                                                                        Mini-minutes For Oct-15-2010 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                          Blank 137 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                          Law And Motion 302, Cross-defendant Adt Security Services, Inc's Motion For Summary Judgment Or In The Alternative Summary Adjudication Is Off Calendar Per August 9, 2010 Dismissal. Judge: Charlotte Walter Woolard; Reporter: Candace Yount, Csr #2737
                                                                                            Blank 136 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: 10/14/2010
                                                                                            Req That Court Adopt Its Tentative Ruling Pursuant To Local Rules 8.3d And 8.3e Filed By Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena
                                                                                              Blank 135 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010
                                                                                              Notice Of Continuance Re Hearing Of State Compensation Insurance Fund's Motion For Clarification Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                Blank 134 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: 10/12/2010
                                                                                                Request That Court Adopt The Tentative Ruling Pursuant To Local Rule 8.3 E Filed By Third Party State Compensation Insurance Fund
                                                                                                  Blank 133 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010
                                                                                                  Mini-minutes For Oct-07-2010 9:00 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                    Blank 132 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                    Discovery 302, Third Party State Compensation Insurance Fund's Motion For Clarification Re Production Of Documents Pursuant To Subpoena. The Court Vacated Its Tentative Ruling And Continued The Matter To 10/25/10 For Hearing. Mr. Klauschie To Give Notice To All Parties Of The Continuance And That A Hearing Will Be Required. (mr. Klauschie Indicated That A Motion To Seal Was Also On Calendar, However The Court Did Not Have That Motion Before It On The Calendar. Motion Needs To Be Filed With The Clerk's Office.) Judge: Charlotte Walter Woolard; Not Reported. (302)
                                                                                                      Blank 131 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: 9/30/2010
                                                                                                      Ex Parte Application For Order To Cont. Tr. And Msc Date And Stay Discovery Per Stipulation Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                        Blank 130 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: 9/24/2010
                                                                                                        Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Production Of Documents Per Subpoena To State Compensation Insurance Fund Filed By Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena
                                                                                                          Blank 129 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: 9/16/2010
                                                                                                          Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Pos Filed By Cross Defendant Nino's Hardwood Flooring Inc.
                                                                                                            Blank 128 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: 9/2/2010
                                                                                                            Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Pos Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                              Blank 127 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: 9/2/2010
                                                                                                              Notice Of Motion For Clarification Re: Production Of Documents Per Subpoena Filed By Third Party State Compensation Insurance Fund Hearing Set For Oct-07-2010 At 09:00 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                Legal Document 126 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: 8/31/2010 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Of Patrick Hennessy Dba
                                                                                                                Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Hennessy, Patrick Of Patrick Hennessy Dba Hennessy Construction Filed On Apr 6, 2009 As To Cross Defendant Adt Alarm Co.
                                                                                                                  Blank 125 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010
                                                                                                                  Association Of Attorneys: Duncan, Dana L. Added As Attorney For Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 124 Filed: 8/9/2010, Entered: 8/9/2010 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint By Patrick Hennessy Dba
                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Hennessy, Patrick By Patrick Hennessy Dba Hennessy Construction On April 6, 2009 As To Cross Defendant Nino's Hardwood Flooring Inc.
                                                                                                                      Blank 123 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: 7/26/2010
                                                                                                                      Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Cross Defendant Adt Security Services, Inc (improperly Named As Adt Alarm Co.) Hearing Set For Oct-15-2010 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                        Blank 122 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: 7/15/2010
                                                                                                                        Order To Show Cause To Plaintiff's Counsel And Cross-defendants' Counsel David J. Demoraunt, Douglas Dalcielo, Jospeh A. Long And Robert Crook For Failure To Comply With San Francisco Superior Court Early Settlement Program Policies And Procedures No. 4. (administrative Fee) Is Ordered Off Calendar And Dissolved/fees Paid. Proceedings Not Reported. (212)
                                                                                                                          Blank 121 Filed: 7/15/2010, Entered: 7/15/2010
                                                                                                                          Mini-minutes For Jul-15-2010 10:30 Am For Dept 212
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 120 Filed: 7/9/2010, Entered: 7/9/2010 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Danielle Designs,llc On
                                                                                                                            Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Danielle Designs Llc Danielle Designs,llc On July 8, 2009
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 119 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Order To Set Aside Default/judgment/leave To Defend
                                                                                                                              Order To Set Aside Default/judgment/leave To Defend ("order Setting Aside Default & Default Judgment") Default Of Mar-27-2009 Set Aside, Default Of Jun-15-2009 Set Aside, Judgment Of Jun-16-2009 Set Aside
                                                                                                                                Blank 118 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010
                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Robert A. Crook Filed By Defendant United Cabinet Outlet, Inc. Zhang, Raymond Xiankai
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 117 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                  Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant United Cabinet Outlet, Inc. Zhang, Raymond Xiankai
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 116 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: 6/9/2010 Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                    Order To Show Cause To David J. Demordaunt, And Douglas W. Dalcielo, And Joseph A. Long, And Michael B. Carroll, And Robert A. Crook Set For Jul-15-2010 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212 For Failure To Comply With San Francisco Superior Court Early Settlement Program Policies And Procedures No. 4 (administrative Fee). Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 115 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010 Notice Of Early Settlement Conference--early Settlement Prgm
                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Early Settlement Conference - Early Settlement Program
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 114 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Nov-15-2010 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Oct-29-2010 At 1:30 Pm In Department 210. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                          Blank 113 Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: 4/20/2010
                                                                                                                                          Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Sep-08-2010 - By Court.
                                                                                                                                            Blank 112 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: 4/14/2010
                                                                                                                                            Response Of Plaintiffs To Objections To Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference Filed By Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena
                                                                                                                                              Blank 111 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010
                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Objection To Time And Place Of Trial Filed By Defendant Surety Company Of The Pacific
                                                                                                                                                Blank 110 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: 4/6/2010
                                                                                                                                                Objection To Unilateral Setting By Court Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference Dates; Decl. Of Robert A. Crook Filed By Defendant United Cabinet Outlet, Inc. Zhang, Raymond Xiankai
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 109 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: 4/6/2010
                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 108 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: 4/5/2010
                                                                                                                                                    Demand For Jury Filed By Cross Defendant Dowling, Patrick John Dba Dowling Electric Sued As John Dowling
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 107 Filed: 4/2/2010, Entered: 4/2/2010
                                                                                                                                                      Objection To Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 106 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 3/30/2010 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Sep-08-2010 At 2:30 Pm In Department 318. Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Court Trial Set For Oct-04-2010 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Order To Show Cause On Apr-05-2010 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 105 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: 3/29/2010
                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Pos (as To X-deft Nino Begic) Filed By Cross Complainant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 104 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: 3/29/2010
                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Pos (as To X-deft Conal Gallagher) Filed By Cross Complainant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 103 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: 3/29/2010
                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Pos (as To X-deft Gallagher Construction,inc.) Filed By Cross Complainant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 102 Filed: 3/25/2010, Entered: 3/25/2010 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint By Hennessy
                                                                                                                                                                Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Hennessy, Patrick By Hennessy Construction On April 6, 2009 As To Cross Defendant Nguyen, Hai
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 101 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/19/2010 Entry Of Default Reject
                                                                                                                                                                  Request For Default Rejected, Notice Mailed, Submitted By Cross Complainant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction As To Cross Defendant Nguyen, Hai Hai Roofing Co.
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 100 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Of Patrick Hennessy Dba
                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Hennessy, Patrick Of Patrick Hennessy Dba Hennessy Construction Filed On Apr 6, 10 As To Cross Defendant Gallagher, Conal
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 99 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Of Patrick Hennessy Dba
                                                                                                                                                                      Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Hennessy, Patrick Of Patrick Hennessy Dba Hennessy Construction Filed On Apr 6, 09 As To Cross Defendant Gallagher Construction Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 98 Filed: 3/11/2010, Entered: 3/11/2010 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Of Patrick Hennessy Dba
                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Hennessy, Patrick Of Patrick Hennessy Dba Hennessy Constructino As To Cross Defendant Begic, Nino
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 97 Filed: 3/9/2010, Entered: 3/9/2010
                                                                                                                                                                          Response To Order To Show Cause Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 96 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010 Entry Of Default Reject
                                                                                                                                                                            Request For Default Rejected, Notice Mailed, Submitted By Cross Complainant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction As To Cross Defendant Nguyen, Hai
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 95 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: 3/1/2010
                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Pos Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 94 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                Order To Show Cause Set For Feb-22-2010 Continued To Apr-05-2010 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Bring Hennessy Cross Complaint At Issue. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 93 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Entry Of Default Against Defendant Hai Roofing Co. On January 29, 2010 Filed By Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena As To Cross Defendant Hai Roofing Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 92 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                    Mini-minutes For Feb-22-2010 1:30 Pm For Dept 212
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 91 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Hennessey
                                                                                                                                                                                      Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Hennessy, Patrick Filed By Hennessey Construction On Apr 06, 2009 As To Cross Defendant Lau, Harry
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 90 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Hennessey
                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Hennessy, Patrick Filed By Hennessey Construction On Apr 06, 2009 As To Cross Defendant Velasquez, Carlos
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 89 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Hennessey
                                                                                                                                                                                          Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Hennessy, Patrick Filed By Hennessey Construction On Apr 06, 2009 As To Cross Defendant Valdes, Dave
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 88 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: 2/19/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration Of Robert A. Crook Re: Osc Hearing And Objection To Setting Of Any Trial In This Matter Filed By Defendant United Cabinet Outlet, Inc. Zhang, Raymond Xiankai
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 87 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: 2/10/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                              Mini-minutes For Feb-10-2010 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 86 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: 2/10/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                Substitution Of Attorney: Crook, Robert A Substituted For Holl, Kevin John As Attorney For United Cabinet Outlet Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 85 Filed: 2/10/2010, Entered: 2/10/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Law And Motion 302, Defendants United Cabinet Outlet, Inc., Raymond Xiankai Zhang Motion To Set Aside Default And Default Judgment. No Appearances On This Matter. The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling As Follows: Motion Granted. Defendants To Pay Plaintiffs' Attorney Fees And Costs In Obtaining The Defaults. (ccp Section 473.) Fees And Costs Will Be The Subject Of A Separately Filed Motion If The Parties Do Not Stipulate To The Amount. Request For Additional Sanctions Denied. (prevailing Party To Prepare A Form Of Order.) Judge: Charlotte Walter Woolard; Court Reporter: Kent Gubbine Csr #5797
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 84 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Law And Motion 302, Defendants United Cabinet Outlet, Inc And Raymond Zhang's Motion To Set Aside Default/default Judgment/leave To Defend Continued From Feb-04-2010 To Law And Motion At Feb-10-2010, 9:30 Am In Dept. 302. No Appearances On This Matter. Continued To February 10, 2010 To Be Heard By Judge Woolard. Judge: Ernest H. Goldsmith, Reporter: Melanie Gheno, Csr #7489
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 83 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mini-minutes For Feb-04-2010 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 82 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: 1/29/2010 Entry Of Default Reject
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request For Default Rejected, Notice Mailed, Submitted By Cross Complainant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction As To Cross Defendant Nino's Hardwood Flooring Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 81 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: 1/29/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request For Entry Of Default/default Entered, Declaration Of Non-military Status As To Cross Complaint Of April 6, 2009. As To Cross Defendant Hai Roofing Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 80 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: 1/29/2010 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Hennessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Hennessy, Patrick Hennessy Construction On April 6, 2009 As To Cross Defendant Rockit Drywall
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 79 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Nino's Hardwood Flooring Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 78 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: 1/26/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response To Osc And Request For Trail Setting Of Pltfs Filed By Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 77 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: 1/25/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Adt Security Services, Inc (improperly Named As Adt Alarm Co.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 76 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: 1/25/2010 Entry Of Default Reject
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request For Default Rejected, Notice Mailed, Submitted By Cross Complainant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction As To Cross Defendant Hai Roofing Co. Nino's Hardwood Flooring Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 75 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: 1/21/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response To Order To Show Cause Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 74 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: 1/14/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mini-minutes For Jan-14-2010 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 73 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: 1/14/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Law And Motion 302, Defendants United Cabinet Outlet, Inc., And, Raymond Zhang Motion To Set Aside Default And Default Judgment Continued From Jan-14-2010 To Law And Motion At Feb-04-2010, 9:30 Am In Dept. 302. Argued And The Court Rules That The Motion Is Continued To February 4, 2010 At 9:30 Am For Further Hearing. Tentative Ruling Will Be Issued. Judge: Charlotte Walter Woolard, Reporter: Kent Gubbine, Csr #5797
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 72 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: 1/7/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objections To Decl. Of Verben Lee Filed By Pltfs In Opposition To Motion To Set Aside Default Filed By Defendant United Cabinet Outlet, Inc. Zhang, Raymond Xiankai
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 71 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: 1/7/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objections To Decl. Of Robert Kehoe Filed By Pltfs In Opposition To Motion To Set Aside Default Filed By Defendant United Cabinet Outlet, Inc. Zhang, Raymond Xiankai
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 70 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: 1/7/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objections To Decl. Of Michael Brooks Carroll Filed By Pltfs In Opposition To Motion To Set Aside Default Filed By Defendant United Cabinet Outlet, Inc. Zhang, Raymond Xiankai
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 69 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: 1/7/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply To Pltfs' Opposition To Defts' Motion To Set Aside Default And Judgment Filed By Defendant United Cabinet Outlet, Inc. Zhang, Raymond Xiankai
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 68 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: 1/5/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Decl. Of Robert A. Crook Filed By Defendant United Cabinet Outlet, Inc. Zhang, Raymond Xiankai
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 67 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: 12/31/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration Of Robert Kehoe In Supp Of Memo Of P&a In Opposition To Mtn By Defts To Set Aside Default And Permit Filing Of Answer To Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 66 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: 12/31/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration Of Verben Lee In Supp Of Memo Of P&a In Opposition To Mtn To Set Aside Default Filed By Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 65 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: 12/31/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Melanie A. Rekieta In Supp Of Memo Of P&a In Opposition To Mtn To Set Aside Default Filed By Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 64 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: 12/31/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Mtn To Set Aside Default Filed By Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 63 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: 12/31/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objections To Mtn To Strike Purported Evidence In Supp Of Mtn To Set Aside Default Filed By Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 62 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: 12/31/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Brooks In Supp Of Memo Of P&a In Opposition To Mtn To Set Aside Default Filed By Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 61 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: 12/29/2009 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order To Show Cause Set For Jan-11-2010 Continued To Feb-22-2010 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Bring Hennessy Cross Complaint(s) At Issue. The Jan-11-2010 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service Of Cross Complaint And Summons To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction Served Dec-14-2009, Substitute Service On Corporation On Cross Defendant Adt Alarm Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: 12/14/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion To Set Aside Default/default Judgment/leave To Defend Filed By Defendant United Cabinet Outlet, Inc. Zhang, Raymond Xiankai Hearing Set For Jan-14-2010 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: 12/9/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Response To Osc Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 57 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: 11/10/2009 Declaration Of Non Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Non Service Filed By Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 56 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: 11/6/2009 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order To Show Cause Set For Nov-09-2009 Continued To Jan-11-2010 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Bring Patrick Hennessy Cross Complaint(s) At Issue. The Nov-09-2009 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: 10/29/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Response To Order To Show Cause Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 54 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: 10/22/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant London Tile
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 53 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: 9/17/2009 Amended Pos Of X-complaint As To Nino's Hardwood Floors, Inc Filed By
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Pos Of X-complaint As To Nino's Hardwood Floors, Inc Filed By Cross Complainant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction Hegarty, Conor Individually And Dba Hegarty Plumbing Danielle Designs Llc Sued Erroneously As Danielle Designs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 52 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: 9/17/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Pos Of X-complaint As To London Tile Filed By Cross Complainant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction Hegarty, Conor Individually And Dba Hegarty Plumbing Danielle Designs Llc Sued Erroneously As Danielle Designs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: 9/17/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Pos Of X-complaint As To Hai Roofing, Co Filed By Cross Complainant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 50 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: 9/11/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Substitution Of Attorney: Dalcielo Douglas W Substituted For Dalcielo Douglas W As Attorney For Danielle Designs Llc Sued Erroneously As Danielle Designs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 49 Filed: 9/3/2009, Entered: 9/3/2009 Summons On Complaint Declaration Of Diligence., Proof Of Service Only,
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons On Complaint Declaration Of Diligence, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Cross Complainant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction Served Jun-23-2009, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Cross Defendant Danielle Designs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 48 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: 9/2/2009 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order To Show Cause Set For Sep-14-2009 Continued To Nov-09-2009 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Bring Patrick Hennessy Cross Complaint(s) At Issue. The Sep-14-2009 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 47 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: 8/28/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Resonse To Osc Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: 8/27/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Cross Complaint Filed By Patrick Hennessy Dba Hennessy Construction As To Cross Defendant Danielle Designs Only Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: 8/27/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Cross Complaint Filed By Patrick Hennessy Dba Hennessy Construction As To Velazquez Hauling Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 44 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: 8/24/2009 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Patrick
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Hennessy, Patrick Filed By Patrick Henessy, Dba Hennessy Construction Apr 06, 2009 As To Cross Defendant Danielle Designs Llc Sued Erroneously As Danielle Designs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 43 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: 8/24/2009 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Patrick
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Hennessy, Patrick Filed By Patrick Henessydba Henessy Construction On Apr 06, 2009 As To Cross Defendant Velasquez Hauling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 42 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: 8/10/2009 Proof Of Service Of Summons To X-complaint Filed By Cross Complainant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proof Of Service Of Summons To X-complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction Served Jun-02-2009, Personal Service On Cross Defendant United Cabinet Outlet Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: 8/10/2009 Proof Of Service Of Summons To X-complaint Filed By Cross Complainant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service Of Summons To X-complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction Served May-27-2009, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Cross Defendant Hegarty Plumbing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 40 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: 8/10/2009 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service Of Summons On X-complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction Served May-25-2009, Personal Service On Cross Defendant Dowling Electric
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 39 Filed: 8/6/2009, Entered: 8/6/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant United Cabinet Outlet Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 38 Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: 8/5/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Pos Filed By Cross Complainant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Pos: Answer Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 36 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: 7/22/2009 Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Hennessy, Patrick Each Party To Bear Its Own Fee And Costs. As To Cross Defendant S L Mechanical Contractors Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: 7/21/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 34 Filed: 7/21/2009, Entered: 7/21/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: 7/16/2009 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order To Show Cause Set For Jul-27-2009 Continued To Sep-14-2009 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Bring Patrick Hennessy Cross Complaint(s) At Issue. The Jul-27-2009 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 32 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: 7/10/2009 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Of Patrick Hennessy Dba
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Hennessy, Patrick Of Patrick Hennessy Dba Hennessy Construction On April 6,2009 As To Cross Defendant Callanan Plastering Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: 7/9/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: 7/8/2009 Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Danielle Designs Llc Sued Erroneously As Danielle Designs As To Cross Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction Roes 1 Through 50, Inclusive
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: 7/8/2009 Answer To Cross-complaint Filed By Cross Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Danielle Designs Llc Sued Erroneously As Danielle Designs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: 7/7/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Balance Of Fee Paid For Transaction R0909701f005 By Cross Defendant Dowling, Patrick John Dba Dowling Electric Sued As John Dowling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 27 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: 7/1/2009 Notice Of Partial Payment Of Filing Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Payer Notifed Of Partial Payment Of Fee
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Dowling, Patrick John Dba Dowling Electric Sued As John Dowling
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/29/2009 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued To Cross Complainant Hegarty, Conor Individually And Dba Hegarty Plumbing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/29/2009 Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Hegarty, Conor Individually And Dba Hegarty Plumbing As To Cross Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction Moes 1 Through 25, Inclusive
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: 6/29/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Hegarty, Conor Individually And Dba Hegarty Plumbing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: 6/22/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Abstract Of Judgment Issued To Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: 6/22/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Abstract Of Judgment Issued To Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: 6/19/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Abstract Of Judgment Issued To Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: 6/16/2009 Default Court Judgment - General
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena Recover From Defendant United Cabinet Outlet, Inc. Zhang, Raymond Xiankai $15,519.30 Principal, $8,000.00 Attorney Fees, $3,685.60 Interest, $335.00 Costs, $67,791.00 For Consequential Moneytary Damages., Total Judgment $95,330.90, See Scanned Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: 6/16/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Uncontested Calendar Of Jun-16-2009, Default Prove-up Hearing. Granted Per Written Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: 6/16/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mini-minutes For Jun-16-2009 9:00 Am For Dept 218
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: 6/15/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request For Entry Of Default/default Entered, Court Judgment Requested, Declaration Of Non-military Status, Cost Bill $335.00 Filed, Credit Acknowledged $.00 As To Defendant United Cabinet Outlet, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: 6/12/2009 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena Served Feb-20-2009, Personal Service On Defendant United Cabinet Outlet, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: 5/22/2009 Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order To Show Cause Set For Jul-27-2009 In Department 212 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To File Proof Of Service And Obtain Answer(s) Or Enter Default(s) Against Defendant(s) United Cabinet Outlet, Inc. The Jun-12-2009 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 5/18/2009, Entered: 5/18/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 20.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: 4/6/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: 4/6/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Added To Calendar For Default Prove-up Hearing. Hearing Set For Jun-16-2009 At 09:00 Am In Dept 218
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: 4/6/2009 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued To Cross Complainant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: 4/6/2009 Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction As To Cross Defendant Velasquez, Carlos Velasquez Hauling Lau, Harry S L Mechanical Contractors Co. Hegarty, Conor Hegarty Plumbing Dowling, John Dowling Electric Nguyen, Hai Hai Roofing Co. Gallagher, Conal Gallagher Construction Inc. Valdes, Dave Rockit Drywall Begic, Nino Nino's Hardwood Flooring Inc. United Cabinet Outlet Inc. Callanan Plastering Inc. London Tile Adt Alarm Co. Danielle Designs Roes 1-100, Inclusive
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request To Enter Default Filed/default Entered, Declaration Of Non-military Status As To Defendant Zhang, Raymond Xiankai
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Surety Company Of The Pacific
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: 2/26/2009 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena Served Feb-18-2009, Personal Service On Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: 2/26/2009 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena Served Feb-20-2009, Personal Service On Defendant Zhang, Raymond Xiankai
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service By Mail Filed By Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/9/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit Declaration Of Venue Pursuant To California Civil Code 1780 (c) Filed By Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: 1/8/2009 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: 1/8/2009 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Contract/warranty, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Kehoe, Robert Kehoe, Lorena As To Defendant Hennessy, Patrick An Individual Dba Henessy Construction United Cabinet Outlet, Inc. Zhang, Raymond Xiankai Surety Company Of The Pacific Does 1 Thru 30 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jun-12-2009 Proof Of Service Due On Mar-09-2009 Case Management Statement Due On May-28-2009

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 188 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?