George Ballard Company v. Town Taxi, Inc., A Corporation Aka S.f. Town Taxi Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 09 484296
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo George Ballard Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glassberg, Pollak & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Burton Glassberg +1 415 291 8320
v.
No Logo Does 1 Thru 51, Incl., Defendant
No Logo Machkovsky, Rafael, Defendant
No Logo Town Taxi, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Parmenter, Ligia M.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Parmenter, Ligia M. +1 415 682 8821
No Logo Town Taxi, Inc., A Corporation Aka S.f. Town Taxi Inc., Defendant
No Logo George Ballard Company, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Roes 1 Through 50, Inclusive, Cross-Defendant
State Compensation Insurance Fund State Compensation Insurance Fund, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sapper, Judith Debra

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sapper, Judith Debra +1 323 526 2134
No Logo Town Taxi, Inc., Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Parmenter, Ligia M.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Parmenter, Ligia M. +1 415 682 8821
Cause of Action Common Counts/open Book Account/collections
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 39 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: 10/6/2010 Case Ordered Off Calendar
Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Oct-19-2010 Is Off Calendar, Dismissal On File. Notice Sent By Court.
    Blank 38 Filed: 9/24/2010, Entered: 9/24/2010
    Master Jury Calendar Set For Oct-04-2010 Vacated. Matter Set On 3.1385 Crc Dismissal Calendar. (206)
      Blank 37 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010
      Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff George Ballard Company
        Legal Document 36 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: 8/16/2010 Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint
        Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint
          Legal Document 35 Filed: 8/4/2010, Entered: 8/4/2010 Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint By Town Taxi, Inc. On
          Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Town Taxi, Inc. By Town Taxi, Inc. On April 03, 2009
            Blank 34 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: 7/19/2010
            Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Sep-20-2010 - By Court.
              Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: 7/19/2010 Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
              Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal Pursuant To Crc 3.1385 Set For Oct-19-2010 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Jul-28-2010 Mediation Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/14/2010, Entered: 7/14/2010 Notice of Settlement
                Notice Of Settlement Of Entire Case (conditional Sep-20-2010) Filed By Plaintiff George Ballard Company
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
                  Mediation Order To Show Cause Of May-12-2010 Continued To Jul-28-2010 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 30 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: 2/2/2010
                    Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Parmenter, Ligia M.
                      Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: 12/29/2009 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                      Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Oct-04-2010 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Sep-20-2010 At 3:30 Pm In Department 606. Notice Sent By Court.
                        Blank 28 Filed: 12/28/2009, Entered: 12/28/2009
                        Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Jul-16-2010 - By Court.
                          Blank 27 Filed: 12/18/2009, Entered: 12/18/2009
                          Notice Of Objection To Pretria Dept 212 Case Managment Order Re: Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference And Supporting Declaration Filed By Cross Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund
                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: 12/11/2009 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                            Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Jul-16-2010 At 10:00 Am In Department 611. Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Aug-02-2010 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Dec-24-2009 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                              Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: 12/11/2009 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
                              Order To Show Cause Re Mediation Set For May-12-2010 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court
                                Blank 24 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: 12/9/2009
                                Case Management Statement Filed By Cross Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund Estimated Time For Trial: 1.0 Days
                                  Blank 23 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: 12/2/2009
                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff George Ballard Company Estimated Time For Trial: 2.0 Days
                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: 11/9/2009 Order Setting Case Management Conference From Order To Show Cause
                                    Case Management Conference Set For Dec-24-2009 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212 For The Submission Of Case Management Statements. The Nov-23-2009 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/15/2009, Entered: 10/15/2009 Answer
                                      Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                        Order To Show Cause Set For Sep-21-2009 Continued To Nov-23-2009 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Cross Defendant(s) State Compensation Insurance Fund. The Sep-21-2009 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                          Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Cross
                                          Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Cross Complainant Town Taxi, Inc. Served Sep-15-2009, Personal Service On Cross Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund
                                            Blank 18 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009
                                            Response To Order To Show Cause Filed By Plaintiff George Ballard Company
                                              Blank 17 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009
                                              Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Town Taxi, Inc. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 4.0 Days
                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: 7/29/2009 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                Order To Show Cause Set For Aug-10-2009 Continued To Sep-21-2009 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Bring Cross Complaint(s) At Issue. The Aug-10-2009 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009
                                                  Response To Order To Show Cause Filed By Plaintiff George Ballard Company
                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: 7/1/2009
                                                    Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff George Ballard Company
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/25/2009, Entered: 6/25/2009 Dismissal Without Prejudice.
                                                      Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant Machkovsky, Rafael
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 Order to Show Cause
                                                        Order To Show Cause Set For Aug-10-2009 In Department 212 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) Rafael Machkovsky. The Jun-26-2009 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: 6/1/2009
                                                          Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff George Ballard Company Estimated Time For Trial: 2.0 Days
                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: 5/6/2009 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint
                                                            Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Town Taxi, Inc. As To Cross Defendant George Ballard Company
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: 4/16/2009 Summons Issued
                                                              Summons Issued To Cross Complainant Town Taxi, Inc.
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: 4/16/2009
                                                                Demand For Jury Filed By Cross Complainant Town Taxi, Inc.
                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Cross Complaint
                                                                  Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Town Taxi, Inc. As To Cross Defendant George Ballard Company State Compensation Insurance Fund Roes 1 Through 50, Inclusive
                                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Answer
                                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Town Taxi, Inc.
                                                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: 2/26/2009 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                      Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff George Ballard Company Served Feb-23-2009, Personal Service On Defendant Machkovsky, Rafael
                                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: 2/26/2009 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                        Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff George Ballard Company Served Feb-23-2009, Personal Service On Defendant Town Taxi, Inc., A Corporation Aka S.f. Town Taxi Inc.
                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: 1/29/2009 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                          Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 2 To Be Machkovsky, Rafael
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: 1/22/2009 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                            Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: 1/22/2009 Complaint
                                                                              Common Counts/open Book Account/collections, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff George Ballard Company As To Defendant Town Taxi, Inc., A Corporation Aka S.f. Town Taxi Inc. Does 1 Thru 51, Incl. Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jun-26-2009 Proof Of Service Due On Mar-23-2009 Case Management Statement Due On Jun-11-2009

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 42 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?