David Kneapler Md v. Unum Group Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 09 484975
Superior Court Judge Peter J. Busch, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Kneapler Md, David, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bourhis, Raymond Francis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bourhis, Raymond Francis +1 415 392 4660
v.
No Logo Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Iowa Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen W. Yiu +1 415 703 5385 +1 415 703 5480 karen.yiu@doj.ca.gov
No Logo Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Jaffe, Dennis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown, Robert Joseph

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Joseph Brown +1 415 836 2626 +1 415 836 3104 bob.brown@aig.com
No Logo National Life Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Mortimer Herlihy
No Logo Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Mortimer Herlihy
No Logo Unum Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Mortimer Herlihy
No Logo Unum Group, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Mortimer Herlihy
No Logo Unum Life Insurance Company of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Mortimer Herlihy
No Logo Unumprovident Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Mortimer Herlihy
Cause of Action Subrogation/insurance
  Entries (100) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (14) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 100 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010
Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Filed By Deft
    Blank 99 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010
    Memorandum Of Costs And Disbursements, $6,476.43 Total Costs, Mature Date Oct-18-2010, Filed By Defendant Jaffe, Dennis
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/27/2010, Entered: 9/27/2010 Case Ordered Off Calendar
      Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Oct-12-2010 Is Off Calendar, Dismissal On File. Notice Sent By Court.
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document 97 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: 9/16/2010 The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: It Is Adjudged That
        The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff Kneapler Md, David Take Nothing From Defendant Jaffe, Dennis See Scanned Document
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: 7/26/2010 Order
          Order Granting The Motion For Summary Judgment Of Defendant Dennis Jaffe
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 95 Filed: 7/23/2010, Entered: 7/23/2010
            Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Pos Filed By Defendant Unum Group
              Blank 94 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010
              Refund/reimbursement Of $150.00 Re 25898 For Transaction W3610430j011 (jury Fees), Payable To Raymond Francis Bourhis, Doc #1903009069, Warrant #38004222, Dated Jul-21-2010
                Legal Document 93 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: 7/19/2010 Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action
                Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
                  Blank 92 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010
                  Order To Show Cause To Plaintiff's Counsel For Failure To Mediate Is Ordered Off Calendar And Dissolved/case Settled. Proceedings Not Reported. (212)
                    Blank 91 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010
                    Mini-minutes For Jun-17-2010 10:30 Am
                      Blank 90 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010
                      Master Jury Calendar Set For Jun-21-2010 Vacated. Matter Set On Crc 3.1385 Dismissal Calendar. (206)
                        Blank 89 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010
                        Master Calendar Motion Calendar On Jun-17-2010 In Dept. 206, Defendants Unum Group And Unumprovident Corporation's Motion To Continue Jury Trial And/or Settlement Conference Is Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party. (206)
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: 6/9/2010 Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (crc 3.1385)Court Filing
                          Further Settlement Discussion Conducted By Phone On 6/9/10 - Case Settled. Assigned To Department 212 On October 12, 2010 At 10:00 Am For Dismissal Per Crc 3.1385. Judge Jeffrey Ross, Clerk Karissa Shaw, Not Reported. (611)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 87 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: 6/8/2010
                            Motion To Continue Jury Trial And/or Settlement Conference, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Unum Group Unumprovident Corporation Hearing Set For Jun-17-2010 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: 6/8/2010 Order
                              Order Shortening Time Re: Motion To Continue Trial Date
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 85 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: 6/8/2010
                                Ex Parte Application For Order For Continuance Of Trial For Unavailility Of Pltf, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Unum Group Unumprovident Corporation
                                  Blank 84 Filed: 6/8/2010, Entered: 6/8/2010 Court Filing
                                  Settlement Discussion Conducted Via Phone On 6/8/10. Further Telephone Discussion Will Be Conducted On June 9, 2010 At 9:00 Am In Department 611. Judge Jeffrey Ross, Clerk Karissa Shaw, Not Reported. (611)
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Minutes
                                    Minutes For June 7, 2010 At 10:30 Am
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Blank 82 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/7/2010 Court Filing
                                      Settlement Conference Held 6/7/10. Further Settlement Discussions Will Be Held Via Phone On June 8, 2010 At 9:00 Am In Department 611. Judge Jeffrey Ross, Clerk Karissa Shaw, Not Reported. (611)
                                        Blank 81 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Court Filing
                                        Settlement Conference Held 6/4/10. Further Settlement Conference Set For June 7, 2010 At 10:30 Am In Department 611. Judge Jeffrey Ross, Clerk Karissa Shaw, Not Reported. (611)
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: 6/4/2010 Minutes
                                          Minutes For June 4, 2010 At 10:00 Am
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 79 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 Court Filing
                                            Law And Motion 301, Defendant Dennis Jaffe's Motion For Summary Judgment Is Granted, If Moving Party Provides A Proof Of Service Evidencing Personal Knowledge Of Service By Noon Of May-28-2010 Otherwise It Will Be Taken Off Calendar. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Carol Karen, Csr #8189 * * * Proof Of Service Was Filed On May-28-2010 But Courtesy Copy Was Lodged On Jun-1-2010. Defendant Denis Jaffe's Motion For Summary Judgment Is Granted. A Valid Proof Of Service Was Filed. Moving Party To Prepare Form Of Order. * * *
                                              Blank 78 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 Court Filing
                                              Law And Motion 301, Argued; The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling As Follows: Defendants Unum Group, Unumprovident Corporation, Unum Corporation, National Life Insurance Company, Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company And Unum Life Insurance Company Of America's Motion For Summary Adjudication Is Denied; Plaintiff Has Raised A Triable Issue Of Material Fact As To Cause Of Action 3 As To The Adequacy Of Defendant's Investigation Given Evidence From Which A Trier Of Fact Could Reasonably Conclude That Defendant Had Reason To Know Or At Least To Further Investigate Whether Plaintiff Suffered Limitations In The Opinion Of His Treating Physician. Defendant's Have Not Carried Their Burden With Respect To Cause Of Action 2 Or Punitive Damages. Objections Were Ruled On The Record. Prevailing Party Is To Submit A Proposed Form Of Order Pursuant To Ccp 437 C(g). Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Carol Karen, Csr #8189
                                                Blank 77 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010
                                                Proof Of Service Of Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment Or In The Alternative Summary Adjudication Filed By Defendant Jaffe, Dennis
                                                  Blank 76 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010
                                                  Mini-minutes For May-28-2010 9:30 Am
                                                    Blank 75 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010
                                                    Mini-minutes For May-28-2010 9:30 Am
                                                      Blank 74 Filed: 5/27/2010, Entered: 5/27/2010
                                                      Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Jaffe, Dennis
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: 5/26/2010 Order to Show Cause
                                                        Order To Show Cause Set For Jun-17-2010 In Dept. 212 At 10:30 Am For Failure To Mediate. The May-26-2010 Mediation Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Blank 72 Filed: 5/26/2010, Entered: 5/26/2010
                                                          Mini-minutes For May-26-2010 10:00 Am
                                                            Blank 71 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010
                                                            Response To Order To Show Cause Re Mediation Filed By Plaintiff Kneapler Md, David
                                                              Blank 70 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010
                                                              Declaration Of Counsel In Response To Osc Re: Mediation Filed By Defendant Jaffe, Dennis
                                                                Blank 69 Filed: 5/25/2010, Entered: 5/25/2010
                                                                Response To Order To Show Cause Re Mediation Filed By Defendant Unum Group Unumprovident Corporation Unum Corporation National Life Insurance Company Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company Unum Life Insurance Company Of America
                                                                  Blank 68 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: 5/21/2010
                                                                  Reply Brief In Support Of Motion For Summary Adjudicaiton Of Defts Filed By Defendant Unum Group
                                                                    Blank 67 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: 5/21/2010
                                                                    Request For Judicial Notice And Delaration Of Lawrence J. Rose Ins Upport; Pos
                                                                      Blank 66 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: 5/21/2010
                                                                      Reply To Pltf's Separate Statmenet Of Idsputed And Undisputed Material Facts Filed By Defendant Unum Group
                                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: 5/21/2010
                                                                        Objection To Pltf's Evidence Submitted Insupportof His Oppos To Deft' Smotion For Summary Adjudicaiton; And Motion To Strke; Filed By Defendant Unum Group
                                                                          Blank 64 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010 Court Filing
                                                                          Law And Motion 301, Defendant Dennis Jaffe's Motion For Summary Judgment Is Continued To May 28, 2010 Per May 12, 2010 Ex Parte Order. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Carol Karen, Csr# 8189
                                                                            Blank 63 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010
                                                                            Mini-minutes For May-20-2010 9:30 Am
                                                                              Blank 62 Filed: 5/13/2010, Entered: 5/13/2010
                                                                              Notice Of Entry Of Order On Stip To Continue Hearing And Reply Briefing For Motion For Summary Judgment/adjudication Filed By Defendant Unum Group Unumprovident Corporation National Life Insurance Company Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company Unum Life Insurance Company Of America
                                                                                Blank 61 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010
                                                                                Law And Motion 301, Defendants Unum Group, Unumprovident Corporation, Unum Corporation, National Life Insurance Company, Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company, Unum Life Insurance Company Of America's Motion For Summary Judgment Is Continued From May-21-2010 To Law And Motion At May-28-2010, 9:30 Am In Dept. 301 Pursuant To May 12, 2010 Ex-parte Order.
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Order
                                                                                  Order --- Ex Parte Application Re: Stipulation And Order To Continue Hearing And Reply Briefing For Motion For Summary Adjudication
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Blank 59 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010
                                                                                    Fee Paid For Stipulated Ex Parte Application For Order To Continue Hearing And Reply Briefing For Motion For Summary Adjudication Filed By Plaintiff Kneapler Md, David
                                                                                      Blank 58 Filed: 5/11/2010, Entered: 5/11/2010
                                                                                      Notice Of No Opposition By Pltf To The Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Jaffe, Dennis
                                                                                        Blank 57 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010
                                                                                        Pos Of Memo In Opposition To Defts' Motion For Summary Adjudication; Separate Statement; Declarations Of Lawrence Mann, David Kneapler And Richard Lannon Filed By Plaintiff Kneapler Md, David
                                                                                          Blank 56 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010
                                                                                          Separate Statement Of Disputed And Undisputed Material Facts And Supporting Evidence In Opposition To Defts' Motion For Summary Adjudication Filed By Plaintiff Kneapler Md, David
                                                                                            Blank 55 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010
                                                                                            Declaration Of Lawrence Mann In Support Of Pltf's Opposition To Defts' Motion For Summary Adjudication Filed By Plaintiff Kneapler Md, David
                                                                                              Blank 54 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010
                                                                                              Memo In Opposition To Defts' Motion For Summary Judgment Or For Summary Adjudication Filed By Plaintiff Kneapler Md, David
                                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/7/2010
                                                                                                Declaration Of David Kneapler M.d. In Support Of Pltf's Oppos. To Deft's Mtn For Summary Adjudication Filed By Plaintiff Kneapler Md, David
                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010
                                                                                                  Jury Fees, Tran # W3610430j011, Tag # 025898 Trust Receipt No. 25898 Deposited By Plaintiff Kneapler Md, David
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
                                                                                                    Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Mar-24-2010 Continued To May-26-2010 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 50 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/19/2010
                                                                                                      Response To Order To Show Cause Re Mediation Filed By Defendant Unum Group Unumprovident Corporation Unum Corporation
                                                                                                        Blank 49 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010
                                                                                                        Motion For Summary Judgment And Motion For Summary Adjudication, Points And Authorities, Separate Statements Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Unum Group Unumprovident Corporation Unum Corporation National Life Insurance Company Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company Unum Life Insurance Company Of America Hearing Set For May-21-2010 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                          Blank 48 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010
                                                                                                          Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Jaffe, Dennis Hearing Set For May-20-2010 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                            Blank 47 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010
                                                                                                            Exhibit A To Declaration Of Francis Torrence In Support Of Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Adjudication (part 3 Of 3) Filed By Defendant Unum Group Unumprovident Corporation Unum Corporation National Life Insurance Company Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company Unum Life Insurance Company Of America
                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010
                                                                                                              Exhibit A To Declaration Of Francis Torrence In Support Of Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Adjudication (part 2 Of 3) Filed By Defendant Unum Group Unumprovident Corporation Unum Corporation National Life Insurance Company Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company Unum Life Insurance Company Of America
                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010
                                                                                                                Declaration Of Francis Torrence In Support Of Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Adjudication (part 1 Of 3) Filed By Defendant Unum Group Unumprovident Corporation Unum Corporation National Life Insurance Company Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company Unum Life Insurance Company Of America
                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010
                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Lawrence Rose In Support Of Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Adjudication Filed By Defendant Unum Group Unumprovident Corporation Unum Corporation National Life Insurance Company Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company Unum Life Insurance Company Of America
                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010
                                                                                                                    Declaration Of Debra Eichel In Support Of Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Adjudication Filed By Defendant Unum Group Unumprovident Corporation Unum Corporation National Life Insurance Company Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company Unum Life Insurance Company Of America
                                                                                                                      Blank 42 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/5/2010
                                                                                                                      Declaration Of Dr. Lloyd Price In Support Of Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Adjudication Filed By Defendant Unum Group Unumprovident Corporation Unum Corporation National Life Insurance Company Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company Unum Life Insurance Company Of America
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: 1/5/2010 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
                                                                                                                        Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Jan-13-2010 Continued To Mar-24-2010 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                          Blank 40 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: 12/31/2009
                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Counsel In Response To Osc Re: Mediation Filed By Defendant Jaffe, Dennis
                                                                                                                            Blank 39 Filed: 12/24/2009, Entered: 12/24/2009
                                                                                                                            Response To Order To Show Cause Re Mediation By Defts Unum Group, Unumprovident Corporation, Unum Corporation, National Life Insurance Company, Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company And Unum Life Insurance Company Of America Filed By Defendant Unum Group Unumprovident Corporation Unum Life Insurance Company Of America
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: 12/9/2009 Notice Of Rescheduled Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                              Settlement Conference Set For Jun-04-2010 Continued To Jun-04-2010 At 10:00 Am In 611. (210)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                Blank 37 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: 11/2/2009
                                                                                                                                Notice Of Unavailability Of Bourhis Raymond F On Feb-08-2010 Through Feb-23-2010 Filed By Plaintiff Kneapler Md, David
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Jun-21-2010 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Jun-04-2010 At 3:30 Pm In Department 210. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                    Blank 35 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009
                                                                                                                                    Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Mar-18-2010 - By Court.
                                                                                                                                      Blank 34 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: 9/22/2009
                                                                                                                                      Notice Of No Oppos To Deft Dennis Jaffe's Objection To Trial Date, And Notice Of Pltf's Dates Of Unabvilability Filed By Plaintiff Kneapler Md, David
                                                                                                                                        Blank 33 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: 9/21/2009
                                                                                                                                        Objection To Trial Setting Order Filed By Defendant Unum Group Unumprovident Corporation Unum Corporation National Life Insurance Company Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company Unum Life Insurance Company Of America
                                                                                                                                          Blank 32 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: 9/18/2009
                                                                                                                                          Objection To Trial Date Filed By Defendant Jaffe, Dennis
                                                                                                                                            Blank 31 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009
                                                                                                                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Unum Group Unumprovident Corporation Unum Corporation National Life Insurance Company Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company Unum Life Insurance Company Of America Estimated Time For Trial: 14.0 Days
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Mar-18-2010 At 3:30 Pm In Department 613. Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Apr-05-2010 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Sep-25-2009 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 29 Filed: 9/14/2009, Entered: 9/14/2009 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
                                                                                                                                                Order To Show Cause Re Mediation Set For Jan-13-2010 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 28 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: 9/2/2009
                                                                                                                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Jaffe, Dennis Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 15.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: 8/11/2009 Order Setting Case Management Conference From Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                    Case Management Conference Set For Sep-25-2009 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. The Aug-24-2009 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 26 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: 8/7/2009
                                                                                                                                                      Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Jaffe, Dennis Jury Demanded
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/9/2009, Entered: 7/9/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                        Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Jaffe, Dennis
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: 7/7/2009 Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                          Order To Show Cause Set For Aug-24-2009 In Department 212 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) Dennis Jaffe. The Jul-17-2009 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: 7/1/2009
                                                                                                                                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Unum Group Unumprovident Corporation Unum Corporation National Life Insurance Company Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company Unum Life Insurance Company Of America Estimated Time For Trial: 14.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 22 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: 6/22/2009
                                                                                                                                                              Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Kneapler Md, David Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 14.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 21 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: 5/28/2009
                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Filed By Defendant Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: 5/28/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                  Order Dismissing The Insurance Commsissioner As Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: 5/28/2009
                                                                                                                                                                    Ex Parte Application For Order Dismissing The Insurance Commissioner As Defendant Filed By Defendant Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Sustaining Demurrer Of Deft Commissioner Of The California Departmen Of Insurancen Withou Leave To Amend Filed By Defendant Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009 Order
                                                                                                                                                                        Order Sustaining Demurrer Of Defendant Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance Without Leave To Amend
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009
                                                                                                                                                                          Mini-minutes For May-14-2009 9:30 Am
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: 5/14/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Law And Motion 301, Defendant Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance's Demurrer To Complaint Is Sustained Without Leave To Amend. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Carol Karen, Csr # 8189
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: 5/7/2009
                                                                                                                                                                              Reply To Pltf's Oppos. To Demurrer Filed By Defendant Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: 5/1/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                Opposition To Demurrrer To Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Kneapler Md, David
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: 4/10/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                  Demurrer To Complaint, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities Filed By Defendant Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance Hearing Set For May-14-2009 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Unum Group Unumprovident Corporation Unum Corporation National Life Insurance Company Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company Unum Life Insurance Company Of America
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Kneapler Md, David Served Mar-04-2009, Personal Service On Defendant Unumprovident Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Kneapler Md, David Served Mar-04-2009, Personal Service On Defendant Unum Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Kneapler Md, David Served Feb-25-2009, Personal Service On Defendant Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Kneapler Md, David Served Feb-25-2009, Personal Service On Defendant National Life Insurance Company
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Kneapler Md, David Served Feb-25-2009, Personal Service On Defendant Unum Group
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Kneapler Md, David Served Feb-25-2009, Personal Service On Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company Of America
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: 3/18/2009 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Kneapler Md, David Served Mar-04-2009, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Jaffe, Dennis
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Kneapler Md, David Served Feb-25-2009, Personal Service On Defendant Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Subrogation/insurance, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Kneapler Md, David As To Defendant Unum Group Unumprovident Corporation Unum Corporation National Life Insurance Company Provident Life And Accident Insurance Company Unum Life Insurance Company Of America Jaffe, Dennis Commissioner Of The California Department Of Insurance Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jul-17-2009 Proof Of Service Due On Apr-14-2009 Case Management Statement Due On Jul-02-2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace

                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 201 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?