Vincenta Mulato v. Wmc Mortgage Corp. Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 09 485722
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mulato, Vincenta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Terbeek, Marc L. +1 415 421 8556
v.
No Logo All Other Persons Currently Unknown Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Interest In The Trust Property, Defendant
No Logo Alvarez, Enrique, Defendant
No Logo California Combo Mortgage, Defendant
No Logo CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC, Defendant

Represented by Adorno Yoss Alvarado and Smith, PC

No Logo Chase Home Finance Llp, Defendant
No Logo Dmw Realty, Defendant
No Logo Does One Through One Hundred Inclusive, Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant

Represented by Adorno Yoss Alvarado and Smith, PC

No Logo Litton Loan Servicing LP, Defendant
No Logo Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Adorno Yoss Alvarado and Smith, PC

No Logo Resurgent Capital Services, Defendant
No Logo Wmc Mortgage Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Wmc Mortgage Corp."
Cause of Action Quiet Title - Real Property
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (5) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: 9/9/2009 Case Ordered Off Calendar
Order To Show Cause Of Sep-21-2009 Is Off Calendar Notice Of Removal. Notice Sent By Court.
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 15 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: 8/21/2009
    Notice To Adverse Party Of Removal To Federal Court Filed By Defendant Jp Morgan Chase Bank,n.a. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems,inc Chase Home Finance Llc
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: 7/27/2009 Order to Show Cause
      Order To Show Cause Set For Sep-21-2009 In Department 212 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The Aug-07-2009 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 13 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: 7/7/2009
        After Hearing, Order To Show Cause Is Ordered Off Calendar. (212) Proceedings Reported By: Janet Pond Csr#5292. (212)
          Blank 12 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: 7/7/2009
          Mini-minutes For Jul-07-2009 9:00 Am For Dept 212
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: 5/27/2009 Order To Show Cause Re: Proof Of Service
            Added To Proof Of Service Order To Show Cause Calendar Hearing Set For Jul-07-2009 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 10 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009
              Copying Fees Paid By Plaintiff Mulato, Vincenta
                Blank 9 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009
                Amended Notice Of Pendency Of Action And Lis Pendens (ccp 405.20) Filed By Plaintiff Mulato, Vincenta
                  Blank 8 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009
                  Notice Of Representation Filed By Pltf's Attorney.
                    Blank 7 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009
                    Substitution Of Attorney: Terbeek, Marc L. Substituted For Pro Per As Attorney For Mulato, Vincenta
                      Blank 6 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009
                      Application For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To G.c. 68511.3 (confidential) Filed By Plaintiff Mulato, Vincenta Order Granting Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To Crc 3.50 - 3.63
                        Blank 5 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: 3/27/2009
                        Fee For Amended Notice Of Pendency Of Action And Lis Pendens Filed By Plaintiff Mulato, Vincenta
                          Blank 4 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009
                          Copying Fees Paid By Plaintiff Mulato, Vincenta
                            Blank 3 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009
                            Notice Of Pending Action Filed By Plaintiff Mulato, Vincenta As To Defendant Wmc Mortgage Corp. Litton Loan Servicing Lp Jp Morgan Chase Bank,n.a.
                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009 Notice To Plaintiff
                              Notice To Plaintiff
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: 3/4/2009 Complaint
                                Quiet Title - Real Property, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Mulato, Vincenta As To Defendant Wmc Mortgage Corp. Litton Loan Servicing Lp Jp Morgan Chase Bank,n.a. Chase Home Finance Llp California Combo Mortgage Dmw Realty Alvarez, Enrique Resurgent Capital Services Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems,inc All Other Persons Currently Unknown Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Interest In The Trust Property Does One Through One Hundred Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Aug-07-2009 Proof Of Service Due On May-04-2009 Case Management Statement Due On Jul-23-2009
                                  Request RequestSpace

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 42 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?