California Pacific Medical Center, A California v. State Compensation Insurance Fund, A California Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 09 486863
Superior Court Judge Peter J. Busch, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo California Pacific Medical Center, A California Non-profit Benefit Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stephenson Acquisto & Colman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melanie Joy Young +1 818 559 4477 +1 818 559 5484 reception@sacfirm.com
v.
No Logo Does 1 Through 25, Inclusive, Defendant
State Compensation Insurance Fund State Compensation Insurance Fund, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sapper, Judith Debra

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sapper, Judith Debra +1 323 526 2134
No Logo State Compensation Insurance Fund, A California Non-profit Corporation, Defendant
No Logo California Pacific Medical Center, Cross-Defendant
No Logo California Pacific Medical Center, A California Non-profit Benefit Corporation, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stephenson Acquisto & Colman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melanie Joy Young +1 818 559 4477 +1 818 559 5484 reception@sacfirm.com
State Compensation Insurance Fund State Compensation Insurance Fund, Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sapper, Judith Debra

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sapper, Judith Debra +1 323 526 2134
Cause of Action Contract/warranty
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 35 Filed: 4/9/2010, Entered: 4/9/2010
Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff California Pacific Medical Center, A California Non-profit Benefit Corporation
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/16/2010 Case Ordered Off Calendar
    Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Feb-24-2010 Is Off Calendar - Dismissal On File. Notice Sent By Court.
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 33 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010
      Master Court Calendar Set For Apr-19-2010 Vacated. Dismissal Filed On 1/19/10. (206)
        Blank 32 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: 1/28/2010
        Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Apr-09-2010. Dismissal Filed. (206)
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: 1/19/2010 Dismissal Of Entire Action
          Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action Without Prejudice
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: 1/8/2010 Notice Of Rescheduled Settlement Conference
            Settlement Conference Set For Apr-09-2010 Continued To Apr-09-2010 At 9:00 Am In 503. (503)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document 29 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: 1/5/2010 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
              Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Jan-13-2010 Continued To Feb-24-2010 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                Blank 28 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: 12/29/2009
                Discovery, 612, Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund's Motion To Compel Further Responses To Defendant's Request To Identify And Produce Documents Is Off Calendar Per Request Of The Moving Party. (612)
                  Blank 27 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: 11/13/2009
                  Ntc Of Mtn To Compel Further Responses To Defts Request To Identify And Produce Documents, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund Hearing Set For Jan-06-2010 At 10:30 Am In Dept 612
                    Blank 26 Filed: 11/5/2009, Entered: 11/5/2009
                    Declaration Of Jamie Jackson In Response To Case Management Order Re Osc For Failure To Mediate Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund
                      Blank 25 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: 10/16/2009
                      Pos Hand Delivery: Deposition Subpoena For Production Of Business Records Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund
                        Blank 24 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: 10/16/2009
                        Pos: Deposition Subpoena For Production Of Records Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund
                          Blank 23 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: 9/30/2009
                          Pos Of Order To Continue Trial Pursuant To Stipulation Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: 9/30/2009 Notice Of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference
                            Settlement Conference Set For Mar-05-2010 Continued To Apr-09-2010 At 8:30 Am In 503. (206)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 21 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: 9/30/2009
                              Master Court Calendar Set For Mar-22-2010 Continued To Master Calendar Court On Apr-19-2010 At 9:30 Am In 206 Pursuant To Ex Parte Order Filed On 9/30/09. (206)
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: 9/30/2009 Order
                                Order To Continue Trial Date Pursuant To Stipulation
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 19 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009
                                  Joint Stipulation To Continue Trial Date Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund
                                    Blank 18 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009
                                    Ex Parte Application For Order Continuing The Trial Date, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: 8/25/2009 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                      Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Mar-05-2010 At 11:00 Am In Department 503. Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Court Trial Set For Mar-22-2010 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Sep-04-2009 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: 8/25/2009 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
                                        Order To Show Cause Re Mediation Set For Jan-13-2010 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 15 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: 8/20/2009
                                          Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff California Pacific Medical Center, A California Non-profit Benefit Corporation Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                                            Blank 14 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: 8/20/2009
                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Cross Complainant State Compensation Insurance Fund Estimated Time For Trial: 1.0 Days
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/14/2009, Entered: 8/14/2009 Answer
                                              Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant California Pacific Medical Center, A California Non-profit Benefit Corporation
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009 Cross Complaint
                                                Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant State Compensation Insurance Fund As To Cross Defendant California Pacific Medical Center
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 7/17/2009, Entered: 7/17/2009
                                                  Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund
                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: 7/8/2009 Court Filing
                                                    Law And Motion 301, Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund's Demurrer To Complaint Overruled Based On Labor Code 5304. 10 Days To Answer. Prevailing Party To Submit Form Of Order. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Carol Karen, Csr # 8189
                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: 7/8/2009
                                                      Mini-minutes For Jul-08-2009 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 6/30/2009, Entered: 6/30/2009
                                                        Reply To California Pacific Medical Center's Oppos To Demurrer Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund
                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: 6/24/2009
                                                          Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Defts' Demurrer, Proof Of Service By Federal Express Filed By Plaintiff California Pacific Medical Center, A California Non-profit Benefit Corporation
                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: 6/24/2009
                                                            Request For Judicial Notice In Supp Of Opposition To Demurrer, Proof Of Service By Federal Express; Filed By Pltf
                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009
                                                              Law And Motion 301, Demurrer To Complaint Continued From Jun-24-2009 To Law And Motion At Jul-08-2009, 9:30 Am In Dept. 301 Per Agreement Of The Parties.
                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: 5/26/2009
                                                                Demurrer To Complaint, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund Hearing Set For Jun-24-2009 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: 4/27/2009 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                                  Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff California Pacific Medical Center, A California Non-profit Benefit Corporation Served Apr-10-2009, Personal Service On Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund, A California Non-profit Corporation
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: 4/2/2009 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                    Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: 4/2/2009 Complaint
                                                                      Contract/warranty, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff California Pacific Medical Center, A California Non-profit Benefit Corporation As To Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund, A California Non-profit Corporation Does 1 Through 25, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Sep-04-2009 Proof Of Service Due On Jun-01-2009 Case Management Statement Due On Aug-20-2009
                                                                        Request RequestSpace

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 69 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?