Glen Gallot v. California Drywall Co., Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 09 488337
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Gallot, Glen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Butler, James Gerard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Butler, James Gerard +1 415 673 4800 +1 415 771 5845

Toggle Switch Represented by Veen, William Louis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William L. Veen +1 415 552 9200
v.
No Logo California Drywall Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605

Toggle Switch Represented by O'sullivan & Hudson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space +1 415 397 6700

Toggle Switch Represented by Quadros & Johnson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin A Johnson +1 650 377 4300
No Logo Does 1-50,inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Dpr Construction, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by De La Housaye & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marden, Steven Michael

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropers Majeski Kohn & Bentley, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James C Hyde +1 408 287 6262 +1 408 918 4501 jhyde@rmkb.com
No Logo California Drywall Co., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'sullivan & Hudson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space +1 415 397 6700
No Logo Dpr Construction, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Pribuss Engineering, Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo ROES 1-50, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Contractor's Access Program, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Finnegan, Marks, Hampton & Theopel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chris J. Lee +1 415 931 9284
No Logo Dpr Construction, Inc., Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by De La Housaye & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marden, Steven Michael

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropers Majeski Kohn & Bentley, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James C Hyde +1 408 287 6262 +1 408 918 4501 jhyde@rmkb.com
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (105) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (14) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 105 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012
Jury Fees Of 150.00 For Transaction R0911509j011 Forfeited
    Blank 104 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012
    Jury Fees Of 150.00 For Transaction R0911321j021 Forfeited
      Blank 103 Filed: 9/14/2011, Entered: 9/14/2011
      Master Jury Calendar Set For Sep-26-2011 Vacated. Dismissal Of Entire Action Filed 8/1/11. (206)
        Legal Document 102 Filed: 9/9/2011, Entered: 9/9/2011 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint In Intervention
        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint In Intervention
          Legal Document 101 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: 8/1/2011 Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action
          Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
            Legal Document 100 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011 Notice of Settlement
            Notice Of Settlement Of Entire Case Filed By Plaintiff Gallot, Glen
              Blank 99 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011
              Notice Of Entry Of Order Continuing Trial Date Filed By Plaintiff Gallot, Glen
                Legal Document 98 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: 6/30/2011 Order
                Order Continuing Trial Date
                  Blank 97 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: 6/8/2011 Court Filing
                  Master Jury Calendar Set For Jun-08-2011 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Sep-26-2011 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. The Court Granted Plaintiff's Request To Continue The Trial Date Due To The Incarceration Of The Plaintiff. Discovery Is Reopened For Limited Purposes, To Further Explore Plaintiff's Psychiatric Claims, Percipient Witnesses, Depositions Of Plaintiff, And Psychiatric Exams. Discovery Closes Two Weeks Before Trial. Plaintiff Is To Prepare An Order. Judge: Katherine Feinstein; Clerk: E. Bura; Matter Not Reported. (206)
                    Blank 96 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: 6/6/2011
                    Master Jury Calendar Set For Jun-06-2011 Continued To Master Calendar Jury (continued) On Jun-08-2011 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 For Plaintiff's Counsel To Report The Status Of His Client. No Objection By Defendant. (206)
                      Blank 95 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: 6/6/2011 Court Filing
                      Settlement Conference Held, Case Not Settled. Judge Ronald E. Quidachay, Not Reported, Clerk: Lesley Fiscella (501).
                        Legal Document 94 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: 6/6/2011 Minutes
                        Minutes For Jun-06-2011 10:00 Am For Dept 501
                          Blank 93 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: 6/6/2011 Court Filing
                          Settlement Conference Set For Jun-06-2011 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 501. Judge: Katherine Feinstein; Clerk: E. Bura; Matter Not Reported. (206)
                            Blank 92 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: 6/1/2011
                            7 Motions In Limine Filed By Plaintiff Gallot, Glen
                              Legal Document 91 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: 5/23/2011 Case Ordered Off Calendar
                              Mediation Order To Show Cause Of May-25-2011 Is Off Calendar - Good Cause. Notice Sent By Court.
                                Blank 90 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: 5/20/2011 Court Filing
                                Settlement Conference Held, Case Not Settled Judge Curtis E.a.karnow, Clerk Dennis D. Vegas,, Not Reported 608
                                  Blank 89 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: 5/19/2011
                                  Response To Order To Show Cause --mediation Filed By Defendant California Drywall Co.,
                                    Blank 88 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/13/2011
                                    Response To Order To Show Cause --mediation Filed By Plaintiff Gallot, Glen
                                      Blank 87 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: 5/9/2011
                                      Jury Fees, Tran # R0911509j011, Tag # 028440 Deposited By Plaintiff Gallot, Glen
                                        Blank 86 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: 4/22/2011
                                        Pos Of Ntc Of Entry Of Order Continuing Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference Dates Filed By Plaintiff Gallot, Glen
                                          Legal Document 85 Filed: 4/18/2011, Entered: 4/18/2011 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
                                          Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Apr-27-2011 Continued To May-25-2011 At 10:00 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                            Blank 84 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: 4/4/2011
                                            Notice Of Entry Of Order Continuing Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference Date Filed By Plaintiff Gallot, Glen
                                              Legal Document 83 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 Notice Of Continued Settlement Conference
                                              Settlement Conference Set For Apr-08-2011 Continued To May-20-2011 At 9:00 Am In 608. (206)
                                                Blank 82 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011
                                                Master Jury Calendar Set For Apr-25-2011 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Jun-06-2011 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 Pursuant To Exparte Order Filed On 3/30/11. (206)
                                                  Legal Document 81 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: 3/30/2011 Order
                                                  Order Continuing Trial Date
                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: 3/29/2011
                                                    Ex Parte Application For Order To Continue Trial And Msc Cdates, Or In The Altenrative, For An Order Shorteing Time Filed By Plaintiff Gallot, Glen
                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: 3/25/2011 Court Filing
                                                      Law And Motion 301, No Appearances On This Matter. The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling As Follows: Defendant California Drywall Company's Motion To Bifurcate Liability From Damages Is Denied Without Prejudice To Renewing Before The Judge Assigned For Trial. Opposing Party Is To Submit A Proposed Form Of Order. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Maria Viscio, Csr # 12353 301/pjb
                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: 3/25/2011
                                                        Mini-minutes For Mar-25-2011 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                          Legal Document 77 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: 3/23/2011 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
                                                          Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Mar-23-2011 Continued To Apr-27-2011 At 10:00 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: 3/23/2011
                                                            Mini-minutes For Mar-23-2011 10:00 Am For Dept 610
                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: 3/21/2011
                                                              Jury Fees, Tran # R0911321j021, Tag # 028141 Deposited By Defendant California Drywall Co.,
                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011
                                                                Reply To Opposition To Deft's Motion To Bifurcate Liability From Damages Filed By Defendant California Drywall Co.,
                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011
                                                                  Declaration Of Irene Takahashi In Support Of Reply To Opposition To Deft's Motion To Bifurcate Liability From Damages Filed By Defendant California Drywall Co.,
                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 3/14/2011, Entered: 3/14/2011
                                                                    Opposition To Deft's Motion To Bifurcate Liability From Damages Filed By Plaintiff Gallot, Glen
                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: 3/9/2011
                                                                      Declaration Of Irene Takahashi In Response To Order To Show Cause Re Mediation Filed By Defendant California Drywall Co.,
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/7/2011, Entered: 3/7/2011 Notice Of Continued Settlement Conference
                                                                        Settlement Conference Set For Apr-05-2011 Continued To Apr-08-2011 At 10:30 Am In 608
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: 3/2/2011
                                                                          Notice Of Motion To Bifurcate Liability From Damages Filed By Defendant California Drywall Co., Hearing Set For Mar-25-2011 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                            Legal Document 68 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
                                                                            Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Jan-12-2011 Continued To Mar-23-2011 At 10:00 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: 12/28/2010
                                                                              Response To Order To Show Cause - Mediation Filed By Defendant California Drywall Co.,
                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: 12/27/2010
                                                                                Response To Order To Show Cause --mediation Filed By Plaintiff Gallot, Glen
                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: 12/8/2010
                                                                                  Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Pos Filed By Defendant Dpr Construction Inc
                                                                                    Legal Document 64 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: 12/6/2010 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint
                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Dpr Construction Inc
                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: 11/12/2010
                                                                                      Response To Order To Show Cause -mediation Filed By Intervenor Contractor's Access Program
                                                                                        Legal Document 62 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
                                                                                        Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Nov-10-2010 Continued To Jan-12-2011 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: 10/27/2010
                                                                                          Response To Order To Show Cause --mediation Filed By Plaintiff Gallot, Glen
                                                                                            Legal Document 60 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint By California Drywall
                                                                                            Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By California Drywall Co., By California Drywall Company On July, 14, 2009
                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: 10/21/2010
                                                                                              Declaration Of James C. Hyde In Response To Osc Re Mediation Filed By Defendant Dpr Construction Inc
                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: 10/7/2010
                                                                                                Law And Motion, 301, Motion For Summary Adjudication, Off Calendar For October 15, 2010 Per Request Of Moving Party, Defendant Dpr Construction.
                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010
                                                                                                  Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Pos Filed By Cross Complainant Dpr Construction Inc
                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010
                                                                                                    Declaration Of Michael S Remeo In Response To Osc Re: Mediation Filed By Defendant California Drywall Co.,
                                                                                                      Legal Document 55 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: 9/17/2010 Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint In Intervention
                                                                                                      Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint In Intervention As To Defendant Dpr Construction Inc
                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: 9/17/2010
                                                                                                        Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Granting To Continue Trial Date Filed By Defendant California Drywall Co.,
                                                                                                          Legal Document 53 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: 9/16/2010 Notice Of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                          Settlement Conference Set For Nov-22-2010 Continued To Apr-05-2011 At 3:30 Pm In 608
                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: 9/16/2010
                                                                                                            Master Jury Calendar Set For Dec-06-2010 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Apr-25-2011 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 Per Ex Parte Order Filed On 9/16/10. (206)
                                                                                                              Legal Document 51 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: 9/16/2010 Order
                                                                                                              Order - Stipulation And Order To Continue Trial
                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 9/16/2010, Entered: 9/16/2010
                                                                                                                Ex Parte Application For Order Cont. Tr. Date And Pre Trial Dead Lines By Stip Filed By Defendant California Drywall Co.,
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 49 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: 9/14/2010 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
                                                                                                                  Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Sep-22-2010 Continued To Nov-10-2010 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: 9/7/2010
                                                                                                                    Declaration Of Irene Takahashi In Response To Orde To Show Cause Re Mediation Filed By Defendant California Drywall Co.,
                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: 9/2/2010
                                                                                                                      Declaration Of James C. Hyde In Resp To Osc Re Mediation Filed By Defendant Dpr Construction Inc
                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: 9/2/2010
                                                                                                                        Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Dpr Construction Inc
                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 9/1/2010, Entered: 9/1/2010
                                                                                                                          Response To Order To Show Cause --mediation Filed By Plaintiff Gallot, Glen
                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: 8/30/2010
                                                                                                                            Substitution Of Attorney: Takahashi, Irene Substituted For Horsey, Jr., William F. As Attorney For California Drywall Co.,
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 43 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint
                                                                                                                              Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Dpr Construction Inc
                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: 7/28/2010
                                                                                                                                Motion For Summary Adjudication ; Request For Judicial Notice Filed By Defendant Dpr Construction Inc Hearing Set For Oct-15-2010 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 41 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
                                                                                                                                  Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Jun-09-2010 Continued To Sep-22-2010 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: 5/21/2010
                                                                                                                                    Response To Order To Show Cause --mediation Filed By Plaintiff Gallot, Glen
                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: 5/17/2010
                                                                                                                                      Association Of Attorneys: Johnson Benjamin A Added As Attorney For California Drywall Co.,
                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: 3/18/2010
                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Entry Of Order Filed By Defendant Dpr Construction Inc
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 37 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: 3/18/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                          Amended Answer To Cross Complaint (first) Filed By Cross Defendant Dpr Construction Inc
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 36 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 Stipulation
                                                                                                                                            Stipulation And Order Granting Leave To Defendant Dpr Construction, Inc. To File First Amended Answer To Plaintiff's Complaint Filed By Dpr Construction Inc
                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 2/18/2010, Entered: 2/18/2010
                                                                                                                                              Fee Paid Stip For Order To File First Amended Answer Filed By Defendant Dpr Construction Inc
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 34 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: 1/25/2010 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Dec-06-2010 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Nov-22-2010 At 3:30 Pm In Department 608. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: 1/22/2010
                                                                                                                                                  Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Aug-27-2010 - By Court.
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: 1/6/2010
                                                                                                                                                    Objection To Trial Date Filed By Plaintiff Gallot, Glen
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: 1/5/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                                      Answer To Complaint In Intervention Filed By Defendant California Drywall Co.,
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: 12/31/2009 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Aug-27-2010 At 3:30 Pm In Department 503. Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Sep-13-2010 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Order To Show Cause On Jan-04-2010 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: 12/31/2009 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
                                                                                                                                                          Order To Show Cause Re Mediation Set For Jun-09-2010 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009
                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Dpr Construction Inc
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: 12/29/2009 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                              Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By California Drywall Co., As To Cross Defendant Pribuss Engineering, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: 12/29/2009
                                                                                                                                                                Response To Order To Show Cause Filed By Defendant California Drywall Co.,
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: 12/21/2009 Complaint In Intervention
                                                                                                                                                                  Complaint In Intervention Filed By Intervenor Contractor's Access Program As To Defendant Does 1-50,inclusive
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009
                                                                                                                                                                    Response To Order To Show Cause Filed By Cross Complainant Dpr Construction Inc
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Of Dpr Construction,
                                                                                                                                                                      Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Dpr Construction Inc Of Dpr Construction, Inc Filed On Jul 14, 09 As To Cross Defendant Pribuss Engineering, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: 12/11/2009
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Butler James G
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 21 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: 12/7/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Dpr Construction Inc
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: 11/10/2009
                                                                                                                                                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Cross Defendant California Drywall Co., Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: 11/9/2009 Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                              Order To Show Cause Set For Jan-04-2010 In Department 212 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Cross Defendant(s) Pribuss Engineering, Inc.. The Nov-20-2009 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Dpr Construction Inc Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Gallot, Glen Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 21.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: 9/28/2009 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                    Case Management Conference Of Oct-09-2009 Continued To Nov-20-2009 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212, To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Cross Defendant(s) Pribuss Engineering, Inc. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                      Association Of Attorneys: Hyde, James Charles Added As Attorney For Dpr Construction Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 9/17/2009, Entered: 9/17/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant California Drywall Co., Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 8.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: 9/15/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Dpr Construction Inc Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 8.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: 8/26/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant California Drywall Co.,
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/12/2009 Proof Of Service Of (generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service Of X-complaint; [declaration Of Diligence Attached Thereto] Filed By Cross Complainant Dpr Construction Inc Served Jul-15-2009, Personal Service On Cross Defendant California Drywall Co.,
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: 8/12/2009 Proof Of Service Of (generic)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service Of X-complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Dpr Construction Inc Served Jul-16-2009, Substitute Service On Corporation On Cross Defendant Pribuss Engineering, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued To Cross Complainant Dpr Construction Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Dpr Construction Inc As To Cross Defendant California Drywall Co., Pribuss Engineering, Inc. Roes 1-50
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued To Cross Complainant California Drywall Co.,
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant California Drywall Co., As To Cross Defendant Pribuss Engineering, Inc. Dpr Construction Roes 1-50
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: 7/14/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant California Drywall Co.,
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Dpr Construction Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: 6/17/2009
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Substitution Of Attorney: Butler James G Substituted For Veen, William Louis As Attorney For Gallot, Glen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: 5/12/2009 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Gallot, Glen As To Defendant California Drywall Co., Dpr Construction Inc Does 1-50,inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Oct-09-2009 Proof Of Service Due On Jul-13-2009 Case Management Statement Due On Sep-24-2009

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 708 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?