Edward Carey Construction Company v. State Compensation Insurance Fund, An Enterprise Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 09 491849
Superior Court Judge Peter J. Busch, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Edward Carey Construction Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Eric M. Safire

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Mitchell Safire +1 415 292 1940 +1 415 292 1946 eric@safirelaw.com
v.
No Logo Does 1 Through 25, Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo State Compensation Insurance Fund An Agency Of The State Of California, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sapper, Judith Debra

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sapper, Judith Debra +1 323 526 2134
No Logo State Compensation Insurance Fund, An Enterprise Fund Of The State Of California, Defendant
Cause of Action Contract/warranty
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (6) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 37 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: 11/7/2013 Order Setting Case Management Conference
Order Setting Case Management Conference Sent By Court
    Blank 36 Filed: 11/7/2013, Entered: 11/7/2013
    Added To Calendar For Case Management Conference ***note: The Court Never Received A Copy Of The Remittitur.*** Hearing Set For Dec-18-2013 At 10:30 Am In Dept 610
      Blank 35 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: 11/6/2013
      Memo Of Case At Issue; Req For Cmc Filed By Plaintiff Edward Carey Construction Company
        Blank 34 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: 9/30/2011 Court Filing
        Law And Motion 301, Plaintiff Edward Carey Construction Company's Motion For Order Determining Entitlement To And Fixing Amount Of Award Of Attorney's Fees On Appeal Is Granted. No Opposition Was Filed. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Ernest H. Goldsmith, Reporter: Gordon Aiavao Csr #11216
          Blank 33 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: 9/30/2011
          Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Sapper, Judith Debra
            Blank 32 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: 9/30/2011
            Mini-minutes For Sep-30-2011 9:30 Am For Dept 301
              Legal Document 31 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: 9/30/2011 Order Awarding Attorney's Fees And Costs On Appeal
              Order Awarding Attorney's Fees And Costs On Appeal
                Blank 30 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: 8/24/2011
                Notice Of Motion For Order Determining Entitlement To And Fixing Amount Of Award Of Attorney's Fees On Appeal, Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Edward Carey Construction Company Hearing Set For Sep-30-2011 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                  Blank 29 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: 8/24/2011
                  Memorandum Of Costs And Disbursements, $12,499.00 Total Costs, Mature Date Aug-24-2011, Filed By Plaintiff Edward Carey Construction Company
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: 7/25/2011 Answer
                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund An Agency Of The State Of California
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: 4/20/2011 Order
                      Order Certifying Opinion For Publication (no Change In Judgment) (a128047, Div. 1)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 26 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: 5/21/2010
                        Certification Notice Issued
                          Blank 25 Filed: 5/21/2010, Entered: 5/21/2010
                          Appeal Record Certified To The Court Of Appeal A128047 #1 (1 Vol Ct/1 Vol Rt)
                            Blank 24 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010
                            Costs Of Preparation On Appeal Deposited - By Respondent
                              Blank 23 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010
                              Costs Of Preparation On Appeal Deposited - By Appellant
                                Blank 22 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010
                                Clerk's Estimate Of Cost Of Appeal Record-respondent
                                  Blank 21 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010
                                  Clerk's Estimate Of Cost Of Appeal Record
                                    Blank 20 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: 4/28/2010
                                    Clerk's Notice To Counsel Re Missing Documents By Respondent
                                      Blank 19 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: 4/28/2010
                                      Directory Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript - Karen
                                        Blank 18 Filed: 4/27/2010, Entered: 4/27/2010
                                        Declaration Of Eric M. Safire In Support Of Designating Record On Appeal Filed By Plaintiff Edward Carey Construction Company
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 Respondents Request For Additions To Clerks/reporters Transcript
                                          Respondent's Request For Additions To Clerk's Transcript
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 Notice Re Default Issued
                                            Notice Re Default Issued
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: 4/5/2010 Request For Clerks/reporter Transcript
                                              Request For Clerk's/reporter's Transcript
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/24/2010, Entered: 3/24/2010 Notice Of Appeal/request For Transcript
                                                Notice Of Appeal/request For Transcript (notice Of Appeal Only) Filed By Plaintiff Edward Carey Construction Company
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: 2/24/2010 Order
                                                  Order Of Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: 1/26/2010
                                                    Notice Of Ruling On State Compensation Insurance Fund's Demurrer To Pltf's Complaint Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund An Agency Of The State Of California
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: 1/8/2010 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
                                                      Case Management Conference Of Jan-22-2010 Is Off Calendar. Demurrer Sustained Without Leave To Amend. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: 1/4/2010 Order
                                                        Order --- Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund's Order Sustaining Demurrer To Plaintiff Edward Carey Construction's Company's Complaint
                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: 12/9/2009
                                                          Mini-minutes For Dec-09-2009 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: 12/9/2009 Court Filing
                                                            Law And Motion 301, Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund's Demurrer To Complaint Is Sustained As To Both Causes Of Action Without Leave To Amend. Prevailing Party Is To Submit A Proposed Form Of Order. Judge: Paul H. Alvarado, Reporter: Carol Karen Csr # 8189
                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: 12/2/2009
                                                              Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Opposition To Demurrer To Complaint For Damages For Breach Of Contract And Breach Of Duty Of Good Faith And Fair Dealing Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund An Agency Of The State Of California
                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: 12/2/2009
                                                                Reply To Edward Carey Construction Company's Opposition To Demurrer Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund An Agency Of The State Of California
                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: 11/23/2009
                                                                  Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Deft's Demurrer To Complt Filed By Plaintiff Edward Carey Construction Company
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: 10/30/2009
                                                                    Demurrer To Complaint, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund An Agency Of The State Of California Hearing Set For Dec-09-2009 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: 10/26/2009 Summons On Complaint ` Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                      Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Edward Carey Construction Company Served Sep-29-2009, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund, An Enterprise Fund Of The State Of California
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: 8/25/2009 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                        Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/25/2009, Entered: 8/25/2009 Complaint
                                                                          Contract/warranty, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Edward Carey Construction Company As To Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund, An Enterprise Fund Of The State Of California Does 1 Through 25, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jan-22-2010 Proof Of Service Due On Oct-26-2009 Case Management Statement Due On Jan-07-2010
                                                                            Request RequestSpace

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 177 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?