Paulo Aranda v. Tri Wire Communications Inc. Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 09 493738
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aranda, Paulo N Behalf Of Himself And All Others Similarly Situated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berko, Daniel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Berko, Daniel +1 415 621 4500
No Logo Toy, Jason On Behalf Of Himself And All Others Similarly Situated, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berko, Daniel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Berko, Daniel +1 415 621 4500
v.
No Logo Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC, Defendant
Comcast Corporation Comcast Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Does 1 Thru 60, Incl., Defendant
No Logo Tri Wire Communications Inc., Defendant
No Logo Triwire Engineering Solutions, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Peters, Ronald A

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald A Peters +1 415 973 3182
Cause of Action Other Non Exempt Complaints
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/28/2010, Entered: 6/28/2010 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
Case Management Conference Of Jul-09-2010 Is Off Calendar Notice Of Removal. Notice Sent By Court.
    Blank 17 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010
    Notice To Adverse Party Of Removal Of Lawsuit To Federal Court Under 28 Usc 1441(b) Filed By Defendant Triwire Engineering Solutions, Inc.
      Blank 16 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: 5/4/2010
      Declaration Of Morgan M Mack In Support Of Dismissal Of Class Claims Filed By Plaintiff Aranda, Paulo N Behalf Of Himself And All Others Similarly Situated Toy, Jason On Behalf Of Himself And All Others Similarly Situated
        Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: 5/4/2010 Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant
        Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Triwire Engineering Solutions, Inc.
          Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
          Case Management Conference Of May-14-2010 Continued To Jul-09-2010 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
            Blank 13 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: 4/7/2010 Court Filing
            Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff Paulo Aranda Motion For Leave To File First Amended Complaint For Restitution And Damages. The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling As Follows: Granted. No Opposition Filed. Order Signed In Open Court. (302/cww) Judge: Charlotte Walter Woolard; Court Reporter: Kent Gubbine, Csr #5797
              Blank 12 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: 4/7/2010
              Mini-minutes For Apr-07-2010 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: 4/7/2010 Summons Issued
                Summons Issued To Plaintiff Toy, Jason On Behalf Of Himself And All Others Similarly Situated
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: 4/7/2010 Complaint
                  1st Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Toy, Jason On Behalf Of Himself And All Others Similarly Situated As To Defendant Comcast Cable Communications Management, Llc Does 1 Thru 60, Incl. Triwire Engineering Solutions, Inc. Comcast Corporation
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: 4/7/2010 Order Granting Motion To Amend
                    Order Granting Motion To Amend
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 8 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 3/30/2010
                      Mini-minutes For Mar-30-2010 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                        Blank 7 Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: 3/30/2010 Court Filing
                        Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff Paulo Aranda Motion For Leave To File First Amended Complaint For Restitution And Damages. The Court Vacates Its Tentative Ruling After Receiving A Courtesy Copy Of Plaintiff's Moving Papers And Rules As Follows: Motion Is Continued From Mar-30-2010 To Apr-07-2010. Mr. Berko's Office To Give Notice Regarding Continuance Of Hearing Date. (carlos Jato Of Mr. Berko's Office Present In Court In The Audience.) Judge: Charlotte Walter Woolard; Court Reporter: Kent Gubbine, Csr #5797
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                          Case Management Conference Of Mar-26-2010 Continued To May-14-2010 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 5 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: 3/3/2010
                            Notice Of Motion And Motion For Leave To File First Amended Complaint For Restitution And Damages; Memorandum Of P/a; And Declaration Of Daniel Berko In Support Thereof, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Aranda, Paulo N Behalf Of Himself And All Others Similarly Situated Hearing Set For Mar-30-2010 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
                              Order To Show Cause Re Proof Of Service On Feb-16-2010 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/12/2010, Entered: 1/12/2010 Order To Show Cause Re: Proof Of Service
                                Added To Proof Of Service Order To Show Cause Calendar Hearing Set For Feb-16-2010 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: 10/23/2009 Notice To Plaintiff
                                  Notice To Plaintiff
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: 10/23/2009 Complaint
                                    Other Non Exempt Complaints, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Aranda, Paulo N Behalf Of Himself And All Others Similarly Situated As To Defendant Tri Wire Communications Inc. Comcast Cable Communications Management, Llc Does 1 Thru 60, Incl. Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Mar-26-2010 Proof Of Service Due On Dec-22-2009 Case Management Statement Due On Mar-11-2010 Complex Litigation Assignment Requested By Filing Parties; Fee Included In Filing Fee
                                      Request RequestSpace

                                      Space Space

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 328 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?