John Doe 1 Et Al v. Doe 1, A Utah Corporation Et Al*****case Transferred To Santa Clara County*****
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 09 494032
Superior Court Judge Charlotte W. Woolard, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Doe 1, John ,individuals, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Armstrong & Associates, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Sapcoe +1 415 544 2828

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Donnell Clark & Crew LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gilion C. Dumas +1 503 306 0224 +1 503 306 0257 giliond@oandc.com
No Logo Doe 2, John ,individual, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Armstrong & Associates, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Sapcoe +1 415 544 2828

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Donnell Clark & Crew LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gilion C. Dumas +1 503 306 0224 +1 503 306 0257 giliond@oandc.com
No Logo Doe 3, John ,individual, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Armstrong & Associates, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Sapcoe +1 415 544 2828

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Donnell Clark & Crew LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gilion C. Dumas +1 503 306 0224 +1 503 306 0257 giliond@oandc.com
v.
No Logo Boy Scouts Of America National Foundation, Defendant

Represented by Sedgwick LLP

No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter - Day Saints, A Utah Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ruby & Schofield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allen Ruby +1 408 998 8500 ruby@allenrubylaw.com
No Logo Corporation Of The Presiding Bishop Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ruby & Schofield

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allen Ruby +1 408 998 8500 ruby@allenrubylaw.com
No Logo Doe 1, A Utah Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Doe 2, A Utah Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Doe 3, A Congressionally Chartered Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Doe 4, A California Non-profit Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Doe 5, An Individual, Defendant
No Logo Doe 6, An Individual, Defendant
No Logo Does 7 Through 10, Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Dowell, Edna M An Individual, Defendant

Represented by Law Offices of Spradlin and Ferguson

No Logo Knox, William (bill) E An Individual, Defendant
No Logo Knox, William E., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Clarence & Dyer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kate Dyer +1 415 749 1800 +1 415 749 1694 kdyer@clarencedyer.com
No Logo National Boy Scouts Of America Foundation, A Congressionally Charted Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Pacific Skyline Council, Boy Scouts Of America, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Sedgwick LLP

Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (18) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/11/2010, Entered: 6/11/2010 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
Case Management Conference Of Jun-25-2010 Is Off Calendar, Transferred. Notice Sent By Court.
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: 5/28/2010 Transfer Receipt Received From Santa Clara County With New Case Number
    Transfer Receipt Received From Santa Clara County With New Case Number 110-cv-173063
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 57 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010
      Transfer Order; Fees Paid, Transferred To Santa Clara County By Cert. Mail No. 7009 2250 0004 3796 4057 Filed By Defendant Dowell, Edna M An Individual
        Blank 56 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010
        Change Of Venue To Another Court And Transmittal Of Papers Filed By Defendant Dowell, Edna M An Individual
          Legal Document 55 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
          Case Management Conference Of May-14-2010 Continued To Jun-25-2010 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212, For Completion Of Transfer. Notice Sent By Court.
            Blank 54 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/19/2010
            Proof Of Service By Mail, Email Or Facsimile Of Notice Of Entry Of Order Re: Order Granting Motion To Transfer Action (change Of Venue) To Santa Clara County Filed By Defendant Dowell, Edna M An Individual
              Blank 53 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: 4/19/2010
              Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Re: Order Granting Motion To Transfer Action (change Of Venue) To The Superior Court Of The County Of Santa Clara Filed By Defendant Dowell, Edna M An Individual
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: 4/13/2010 Order to Transfer Case
                Order To Transfer Case To Santa Clara County
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 51 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010
                  Mini-minutes For Mar-23-2010 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                    Blank 50 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010
                    Mini-minutes For Mar-23-2010 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                      Blank 49 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010
                      Mini-minutes For Mar-23-2010 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                        Blank 48 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010
                        Mini-minutes For Mar-23-2010 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                          Blank 47 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010
                          Mini-minutes For Mar-23-2010 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                            Blank 46 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010
                            Mini-minutes For Mar-23-2010 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                              Blank 45 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010 Court Filing
                              Law And Motion 302, Plaintiffs John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3 Motion To Admit Kelly W.g. Clark As Counsel Pro Hac Vice. The Court Vacates Its Tentative Rulings And Rules As Follows: Off Calendar, Matter To Be Raised Before The Superior Court In Santa Clara County. Judge: Charlotte Walter Woolard; Court Reporter: Kent Gubbine, Csr #5797
                                Blank 44 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010 Court Filing
                                Law And Motion 302, Defendants Boy Scouts Of America National Foundation And Pacific Skyline Council, Boy Scouts Of America, Inc. Motion To Transfer And Joinder In Defendant Edna Dowell Motion To Transfer (change Of Venue) From San Francisco Superior Court, To Superior Court Of Santa Clara County, State Of California. Argued And The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling As Follows: Motion Granted. (prevailing Party To Prepare A Form Of Order.) Judge: Charlotte Walter Woolard; Court Reporter: Kent Gubbine, Csr #5797
                                  Blank 43 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010 Court Filing
                                  Law And Motion 302, Defendant William Knox Joinder In Defendant's Dowell's Motion To Transfer Action (change Venue) To The Superior Court Of The State Of California County Of Santa Clara. Argued And The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling As Follows: Motion Granted. (prevailing Party To Prepare A Form Of Order.) Judge: Charlotte Walter Woolard; Court Reporter: Kent Gubbine, Csr #5797
                                    Blank 42 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010 Court Filing
                                    Law And Motion 302, Defendant Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints Motion To Transfer (change Of Venue) From San Francisco Superior Court, To Superior Court Of Santa Clara County. Argued And The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling As Follows: Motion Granted. (prevailing Party To Prepare A Form Of Order.) Judge: Charlotte Walter Woolard; Court Reporter: Kent Gubbine, Csr #5797
                                      Blank 41 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010 Court Filing
                                      Law And Motion 302, Defendant Corporation Of The Presiding Bishop Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints Motion To And Joinder In Motion Of Defendant Edna Dowell Transfer (change Of Venue)from San Francisco Superior Court, To Superior Court Of Santa Clara County. Argued And The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling As Follows: Motion Granted. (prevailing Party To Prepare A Form Of Order.) Judge: Charlotte Walter Woolard; Court Reporter: Kent Gubbine, Csr #5797
                                        Blank 40 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: 3/23/2010 Court Filing
                                        Law And Motion 302, Defendant Edna Dowell Motion To Transfer (change Of Venue) From San Francisco Superior Court, To Superior Court Of Santa Clara County. Argued And The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling As Follows: Motion Granted. This Personal Injury Action Is Transitory And Not Local. Defendant Has Right To Have The Case Transferred To The County Of Her Residence. Defendant Has Shown That No Co-defendant Resides In San Francisco. Incident Did Not Occur In San Francisco. Case Is Transferred To Santa Clara County. (prevailing Party To Prepare A Form Of Order.) Judge: Charlotte Walter Woolard; Court Reporter: Kent Gubbine, Csr #5797
                                          Legal Document 39 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/19/2010 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                          Case Management Conference Of Apr-02-2010 Continued To May-14-2010 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                            Blank 38 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: 3/18/2010
                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Boy Scouts Of America National Foundation Pacific Skyline Council, Boy Scouts Of America, Inc. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 15.0 Days
                                              Blank 37 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: 3/18/2010
                                              Joinder Of Deft In Reply Memo Submitted In Support Of The Motion To Transfer Action (change Of Venue) To The Superior Court Of The State Of California, County Of Santa Clara Filed By Defendant Knox, William E.
                                                Blank 36 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: 3/16/2010
                                                Joinder's In The Reply Memorandum Submitted In Support Of The Motion To Transfer Action (change Of Venue) Filed By Defendant Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter Day Saints
                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 3/16/2010, Entered: 3/16/2010
                                                  Joinder's In Reply Memorandum Submitted In Support Of The Motion To Transfer Action (change Of Venue) To The Superior Court Of The County Of Santa Clara Filed By Defendant Corporation Of The Presiding Bishop Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints
                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 3/15/2010
                                                    Pos On Reply Memo In Support Of Mtn To Transfer Action (change Of Venue) To Santa Clara County On Filed By Defendant Dowell, Edna M An Individual
                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: 3/15/2010
                                                      Reply Memo In Support Of Mtn To Transfer Action (change Of Venue) To Santa Clara County Filed By Defendant Dowell, Edna M An Individual
                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 2/22/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010
                                                        Law And Motion 302, Plaintiffs John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3's Motion To Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice Continued From Mar-01-2010 To Mar-23-2010, Per Agreement Of The Parties
                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010
                                                          Law And Motion 302, Defendants Boy Scouts Of America National Foundation, Pacific Skyline Council, Boy Scouts Of America's Motion To Transfer Continued From Feb-23-2010 To Mar-23-2010, Per Agreement Of The Parties
                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010
                                                            Law And Motion 302, Defendant William Knox's Joinder In Defendant Dowell's Motion To Transfer Action (change Venue) To The Superior Court Of The State Of California County Of Santa Clara Continued From Feb-23-2010 To Mar-23-2010, Per Agreement Of The Parties
                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010
                                                              Law And Motion 302, Defendant Corporation Of The President Of The Church's Motion To Transfer Continued From Feb-23-2010 To Mar-23-2010, Per Agreement Of The Parties
                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010
                                                                Law And Motion 302, Defendant Corporation Of The Presiding Bishop Of The Church's Motion To Transfer Continued From Feb-23-2010 To Mar-23-2010, Per Agreement Of The Parties
                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 2/11/2010, Entered: 2/11/2010
                                                                  Law And Motion 302, Defendant Edna Dowell's Motion To Transfer Continued From Feb-23-2010 To Mar-23-2010, Per Agreement Of The Parties
                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010
                                                                    Opposition To Deft Edna M Dowell's Motion To Transfer Action To Santa Clara County Filed By Plaintiff Doe 1, John ,individuals Doe 2, John ,individual Doe 3, John ,individual
                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/27/2010
                                                                      Motion To Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Doe 1, John ,individuals Doe 2, John ,individual Doe 3, John ,individual Hearing Set For Mar-01-2010 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                        Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Doe 1, John ,individuals Doe 2, John ,individual Doe 3, John ,individual Served Dec-01-2009, Personal Service On Defendant Knox, William (bill) E An Individual
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010 Pos Summons And Complaint By Fax Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                          Pos Summons And Complaint By Fax Filed By Plaintiff Doe 1, John ,individuals Doe 2, John ,individual Doe 3, John ,individual As To Defendant Dowell, Edna M An Individual
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Legal Document 22 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                                            Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Doe 1, John ,individuals Doe 2, John ,individual Doe 3, John ,individual Served Nov-30-2009, Personal Service On Defendant Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter - Day Saints, A Utah Corporation
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                              Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Doe 1, John ,individuals Doe 2, John ,individual Doe 3, John ,individual Served Nov-30-2009, Personal Service On Defendant Corporation Of The Presiding Bishop Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter - Day Saints, A Utah Corporation
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Legal Document 20 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                                                Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Doe 1, John ,individuals Doe 2, John ,individual Doe 3, John ,individual Served Nov-30-2009, Personal Service On Defendant National Boy Scouts Of America Foundation, A Congressionally Charted Corporation
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: 1/13/2010 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                  Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Doe 1, John ,individuals Doe 2, John ,individual Doe 3, John ,individual Served Dec-01-2009, Personal Service On Defendant Pacific Skyline Council, Boy Scouts Of America, A California Non-profit Corporation
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: 12/31/2009
                                                                                    Motion To Transfer, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities Filed By Defendant Boy Scouts Of America National Foundation Pacific Skyline Council, Boy Scouts Of America, Inc. Hearing Set For Feb-23-2010 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 12/30/2009, Entered: 12/30/2009
                                                                                      Joinder In Deft's Dowell's Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To Transfer Action (change Venue) To The Superior Court Of The State Of California County Of Santa Clara, Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Knox, William E. Hearing Set For Feb-23-2010 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: 12/29/2009
                                                                                        Motion To Transfer, Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter Day Saints Hearing Set For Feb-23-2010 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: 12/29/2009
                                                                                          Motion To Transfer, Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Corporation Of The Presiding Bishop Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter-day Saints Hearing Set For Feb-23-2010 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: 12/29/2009
                                                                                            Motion To Transfer, Proof Of Service ; Req For Judicial Notice Filed By Defendant Dowell, Edna M An Individual Hearing Set For Feb-23-2010 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: 12/15/2009 Court Filing
                                                                                              Objection To Having Discovery And Pretrial Case Management Matters Heard By Commissioner Acting As Judge Pro Tempore Filed By Plaintiff Doe 1, John ,individuals Doe 2, John ,individual Doe 3, John ,individual
                                                                                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: 11/16/2009 Summons Issued
                                                                                                Summons Issued To Plaintiff Doe 1, John ,individuals Doe 2, John ,individual Doe 3, John ,individual
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: 11/16/2009 Complaint
                                                                                                  1st Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Doe 1, John ,individuals Doe 2, John ,individual Doe 3, John ,individual As To Defendant Corporation Of The Presiding Bishop Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter - Day Saints, A Utah Corporation Corporation Of The President Of The Church Of Jesus Christ Of Latter - Day Saints, A Utah Corporation National Boy Scouts Of America Foundation, A Congressionally Charted Corporation Pacific Skyline Council, Boy Scouts Of America, A California Non-profit Corporation Knox, William (bill) E An Individual Dowell, Edna M An Individual Does 7 Through 10, Inclusive
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: 11/12/2009
                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' Attorney Certificate Of Corroborative Fact, Filed Pursuant To C.c.p., Section 340.1(n), In Support Of Ex Parte Application To Amend Complaint To Substitute True Names Of Defendants Does 1 Through 6 ***[sealed Per Order Of 11/12/09]*** (sealed Document) Filed By Plaintiff Doe 1, John ,individuals Doe 2, John ,individual Doe 3, John ,individual
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: 11/12/2009 Order
                                                                                                      Order Granting Application To Seal Specified Records
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: 11/12/2009 Order
                                                                                                        Order Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application For Permission To Amend Complaint To Substitute The True Names Of Defendants Does 1 Through 6
                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: 11/12/2009
                                                                                                          Ex Parte Application For Order Of Request For Permission To Amend Complaint To Substitute The True Names Of Defts Does 1 Through 6, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Doe 1, John ,individuals Doe 2, John ,individual Doe 3, John ,individual
                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: 11/12/2009
                                                                                                            Ex Parte Application For Order In Support Of Request To Seal Specified Records, Points And Authorities Filed By Plaintiff Doe 1, John ,individuals Doe 2, John ,individual Doe 3, John ,individual
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009 Order
                                                                                                              Order Granting Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application For In Camera Review And Determination Of Certificates Of Merit Filed Pursuant To C.c.p. Section 340.1(j)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 11/3/2009, Entered: 11/3/2009
                                                                                                                Ex Parte Application For Order For In Camera Review And Determination Of Certificates Of Merit Filed Per Ccp 340.1(j), Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Doe 1, John ,individuals Doe 2, John ,individual Doe 3, John ,individual
                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: 11/2/2009
                                                                                                                  Note:- Pro Hac Vice Application In Process Is For Attorney Kelly W.g. Clark, Only.
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: 11/2/2009 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                    Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: 11/2/2009 Complaint
                                                                                                                      Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Doe 1, John ,individuals Doe 2, John ,individual Doe 3, John ,individual As To Defendant Doe 1, A Utah Corporation Doe 2, A Utah Corporation Doe 3, A Congressionally Chartered Corporation Doe 4, A California Non-profit Corporation Doe 5, An Individual Doe 6, An Individual Does 7 Through 10, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Apr-02-2010 Proof Of Service Due On Jan-04-2010 Case Management Statement Due On Mar-18-2010
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 130 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?