Tycho Suter v. Corzac Inc., Dba Blondie's Bar & No Grill, A Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 09 495716
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Suter, Tycho, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bernard Reynold Suter +1 415 398 6000 +1 415 981 0136 ben.suter@kyl.com
v.
No Logo Corzac Inc., Dba Blondie's Bar & No Grill, A California Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Daniels, Fine, Israel, Schonbuch & Lebovits, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael N Schonbuch +1 310 556 7900

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Dewald, Nicole , An Individual, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Daniels, Fine, Israel, Schonbuch & Lebovits, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael N Schonbuch +1 310 556 7900

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo James Jr., Rodney E., Defendant
No Logo James, Rodney E , An Individual, Defendant
No Logo Corzac Inc. Dba Blondie's Bar & No Grill, Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Dewald, Nicole , An Individual, Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo James Jr., Rodney E., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Roes 1 Through 10, Inclusive, Cross-Defendant
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (40) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (7) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 40 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: 1/11/2011
Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Feb-23-2011 In Dept. 212 Is Off Calendar Dismissal On File. M. Manzella, Clerk (d-504).
    Legal Document 39 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011 Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
    Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Jan-07-2011 - Case Settled. Assigned To Dept. 212 On Feb-23-2011 At 10:00 Am For Dismissal Per Crc 3.1385.
      Blank 38 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: 1/7/2011
      Removed From Master Jury Calendar Set For Jan-24-2011 - Dismissal On File.
        Blank 37 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: 12/21/2010
        Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant James Jr., Rodney E. Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
          Blank 36 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: 12/21/2010
          Copying Fees (4 Page) Paid By Cross Defendant James Jr., Rodney E.
            Legal Document 35 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: 12/20/2010 Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action
            Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
              Blank 34 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010
              Mini-minutes For Nov-17-2010 9:00 Am For Dept 302
                Blank 33 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: 11/17/2010 Court Filing
                Discovery 302, Defendants Corzac Inc, Nicole Dewald's Motion To Quash Subpoenas To Crusader Insruance Company, Plut Insurance Agency, Inc. And J.h. Askins, Co., Or In The Alternative For Protective Order Is Off Calendar. Notice Of Settlement Filed And Parties Failed To Comply With This Court's Nov-02-2010 Order To File Separate Statements. Judge: Paul H. Alvarado; Not Reported
                  Legal Document 32 Filed: 11/12/2010, Entered: 11/12/2010 Notice Of Settlement Filed By Plaintiff
                  Notice Of Settlement Filed By Plaintiff Suter, Tycho
                    Blank 31 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: 11/2/2010
                    Mini-minutes For Nov-02-2010 9:00 Am For Dept 302
                      Blank 30 Filed: 11/2/2010, Entered: 11/2/2010 Court Filing
                      Discovery 302, Defendants Corzac Inc., Dba Blondie's Bar & No Grill, Nicole Dewald Motion To Quash Subpoenas To Crusader Insurance Company, Plut Insurance Agency, Inc. And J.h. Askins, Co., Or In The Alternative For Protective Order Is Continued To November 17, 2010. Both Parties To File Separate Statements With The Clerk's Office By November 12, With Courtesy Copies To Department 302. Crc 3.1345. (302/cww) Judge: Charlotte Walter Woolard; Not Reported
                        Blank 29 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010
                        Declaration Of Ben Suter In Support Of Pltf's Memo Of P&a Filed By Plaintiff Suter, Tycho
                          Blank 28 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/20/2010
                          Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Oppos To Deft's Motion Filed By Plaintiff Suter, Tycho
                            Blank 27 Filed: 10/19/2010, Entered: 10/19/2010
                            Association Of Attorneys: Schonbuch, Michael N Added As Attorney For Corzac Inc., Dba Blondie's Bar & No Grill, A California Corporation Dewald, Nicole , An Individual
                              Blank 26 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010
                              Notice Of Entry Of Order Granting Conditional Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Deft Nicole Dewald Filed By Plaintiff Suter, Tycho
                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: 10/6/2010 Order
                                Order And Stipulation Re Conditional Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Defendant Nicole Dewald
                                  Blank 24 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: 9/29/2010
                                  Discovery 302, Notcie Of Motion And Motion To Quash Subpoenas To Crusader Insruance Compnay, Plut Insurance Agency, Inc. And J.h. Askins, Co., Or In The Alternative For Protective Order Continued From Oct-06-2010 To Nov-02-2010, Discover At 9:00 Am In Dept. 302 Per Request Of Moving Party. (302).
                                    Blank 23 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: 8/30/2010
                                    Proof Of Service ; Of Motionto Quash Filed By Defendant Corzac Inc., Dba Blondie's Bar & No Grill, A California Corporation Dewald, Nicole , An Individual
                                      Blank 22 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010
                                      Notcie Of Motion And Motion To Quash Subpoenas To Crusader Insruance Compnay, Plut Insurance Agency, Inc. And J.h. Askins, Co., Or In The Alternative For Protective Order, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Corzac Inc., Dba Blondie's Bar & No Grill, A California Corporation Dewald, Nicole , An Individual Hearing Set For Oct-06-2010 At 09:00 Am In Dept 302
                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/13/2010, Entered: 8/13/2010 Notice Of Early Settlement Conference--early Settlement Prgm
                                        Notice Of Rescheduled Early Settlement Conference - Early Settlement Program
                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/21/2010, Entered: 7/21/2010 Notice Of Early Settlement Conference--early Settlement Prgm
                                          Notice Of Early Settlement Conference - Early Settlement Program
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/2/2010, Entered: 7/2/2010 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                            Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Jan-07-2011 At 8:30 Am In Department 504. Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Jan-24-2011 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Jul-16-2010 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Blank 18 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: 6/17/2010
                                              Fee Paid Stip For Order Re Conditional Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Deft Nicole Dewald Filed By Plaintiff Suter, Tycho
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: 5/24/2010 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                Case Management Conference Of Jun-04-2010 Continued To Jul-16-2010 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212, For Plaintiff To File Case Management Statement. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: 5/20/2010
                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Suter, Tycho Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: 5/17/2010
                                                    Proof Of Service On Defendant Blondies Bar & Grill Of Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant James Jr., Rodney E.
                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: 5/17/2010
                                                      Proof Of Service Of Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant James Jr., Rodney E. Served May-14-2010, Mail On Plaintiff Suter, Tycho
                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: 5/17/2010
                                                        Copying Fees (8 Page) Obtain Copy Of Cms 5/14/10 (8 Pages). Paid By Defendant James Jr., Rodney E.
                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010
                                                          Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant James Jr., Rodney E. Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: 5/5/2010
                                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Corzac Inc., Dba Blondie's Bar & No Grill, A California Corporation Dewald, Nicole , An Individual Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: 4/26/2010 Answer
                                                              Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant James Jr., Rodney E.
                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: 3/19/2010 Cross Complaint
                                                                Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Dewald, Nicole , An Individual Corzac Inc. Dba Blondie's Bar & No Grill As To Cross Defendant James Jr., Rodney E. Roes 1 Through 10, Inclusive
                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: 3/18/2010
                                                                  Proof Of Service Of Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Plaintiff Suter, Tycho As To Defendant Corzac Inc., Dba Blondie's Bar & No Grill, A California Corporation James, Rodney E , An Individual
                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010
                                                                    Application For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To G.c. 68633, Crc 3.51, 8.26, And 8.818 (confidential) Filed By Defendant James Jr., Rodney E. Order For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Granted Pursuant To G.c. 68634 (e), Crc 3.52
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: 3/12/2010 Answer
                                                                      Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant James Jr., Rodney E.
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: 2/24/2010 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                                        Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Suter, Tycho Served Feb-22-2010, Personal Service On Defendant James, Rodney E , An Individual
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Answer
                                                                          Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Corzac Inc., Dba Blondie's Bar & No Grill, A California Corporation Dewald, Nicole , An Individual
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: 1/6/2010
                                                                            Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Suter Bernard R
                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: 12/31/2009 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                              Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/31/2009, Entered: 12/31/2009 Complaint
                                                                                Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Suter, Tycho As To Defendant Corzac Inc., Dba Blondie's Bar & No Grill, A California Corporation Dewald, Nicole , An Individual James, Rodney E , An Individual Does 1 To 10, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jun-04-2010 Proof Of Service Due On Mar-01-2010 Case Management Statement Due On May-20-2010

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 815 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?