Sumita Ray v. 300 Spear Realty Venture Llc, Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 10 498533
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ray, Sumita, Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Pharmacyclics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Calithera Biosciences Inc.

Represented by Berding and Weil

v.
No Logo 300 Spear Realty Ventures, Llc (sued As 300 Spear Street, Llc), Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Luce Forward Hamilton & Scripps, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shanagher, Denis Francis +1 510 273 2590
No Logo 300 Spear Street Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, Defendant
No Logo Does 1 Thru 70, Incl., Defendant
No Logo Four Star Cleaning And Restoration, Inc., A California Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Tishman Speyer Properties, Lp A New York Limited Partnership, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Luce Forward Hamilton & Scripps, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shanagher, Denis Francis +1 510 273 2590
No Logo Wang, Ping, Defendant
Officer/Director, Thompson Designs Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Valerian & Holmberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space +1 510 521 0612
No Logo 300 Spear Street Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Har-bro Of Northern California, Inc., Cross-Defendant
No Logo Moes 1 To 20, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Roes 1-20, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Tishman Speyer Properties, Lp A New York Limited Partnership, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Four Star Cleaning And Restoration, Inc., A California Corporation, Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Wang, Ping, Cross-Complainant
Officer/Director, Thompson Designs Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Valerian & Holmberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space +1 510 521 0612
Cause of Action Contract/warranty
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (6) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 50 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/26/2013 Order Dismissing Case Pursuant To Crc 3.1385
Case Dismissed By Court At Order To Show Cause Hearing Jun-25-2013 At 10:30 Am Pursuant To Crc 3.1385. Notice Sent By Court.
    Blank 49 Filed: 6/25/2013, Entered: 6/25/2013
    Mini Minutes For Jun-25-2013 10:30 Am For Dept 610
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: 12/14/2012 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
      Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Dec-18-2012 Continued To Jun-25-2013 At 10:30 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: 12/13/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
        Statement Re Osc Filed By Plaintiff Ray, Sumita
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document 46 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: 9/13/2012 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
          Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Sep-18-2012 Continued To Dec-18-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: 9/4/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
            Statement Re: Osc Filed By Plaintiff Ray, Sumita
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document 44 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: 6/15/2012 Notice Of Change Of Firm Name
              Notice Of Change Of Firm Name Filed By Attorney Berding Tyler P
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: 5/14/2012 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
                Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of May-17-2012 Continued To Sep-18-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: 5/10/2012 Notice
                  Notice And Req For Addl Time To Complete Settlement Filed By Plaintiff Ray, Sumita
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/15/2012, Entered: 2/15/2012 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
                    Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Feb-16-2012 Continued To May-17-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                      Osc Statement Filed By Plaintiff Ray, Sumita
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/16/2011 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
                        Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Dec-15-2011 Continued To Feb-16-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 38 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/16/2011
                          Mini-minutes For Dec-15-2011 2:00 Pm For Dept 610
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/2/2011, Entered: 11/2/2011 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
                            Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Nov-08-2011 Continued To Dec-15-2011 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: 8/30/2011 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
                              Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Sep-06-2011 Continued To Nov-08-2011 At 10:00 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 35 Filed: 8/29/2011, Entered: 8/29/2011
                                Osc Statement Filed By Plaintiff Ray, Sumita
                                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: 6/6/2011 Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Four Star Cleaning And
                                  Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Four Star Cleaning And Restoration, Inc., A Four Star Cleaning And Restoration,inc. On March 16, 2011
                                    Blank 33 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: 6/2/2011
                                    Master Jury Calendar Set For Jun-06-2011 Vacated. Matter Set For Osc Re Dismissal Pursuant To Crc 3.1385. (206)
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: 5/20/2011 Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
                                      Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For May-20-2011 - Case Settled. Ntc Of Conditional Settlement Of Cross-complaint By Four Star Cleaning & Restoration Inc Sent To The Court On 5/16/11 For Filing Per Sharon Greene/lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, Llp. Assigned To Dept. 610 On Sep-06-2011 At 10:00 Am For Dismissal Per Crc 3.1385.
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: 5/18/2011 Notice Of Conditional Settlement Of X-complaint Filed By Cross
                                        Notice Of Conditional Settlement Of X-complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Four Star Cleaning And Restoration, Inc., A California Corporation
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 30 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: 4/11/2011 Court Filing
                                          Discovery 301, Plaintiff Sumita Ray's (amended) Motion To Quash, Modify Or Limit Subpoena For Production Of Medcal Records And/or For A Protective Order; Request For Monetary Sanctions Is Off Calendar Per Plaintiff's Notice Of Conditional Settlement Filed On April 4, 2011. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Not Reported
                                            Blank 29 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: 4/11/2011
                                            Mini-minutes For Apr-11-2011 9:00 Am For Dept 301
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: 4/6/2011 Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross-complaint
                                              Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Wang, Ping As To Cross Defendant 300 Spear Street Llc, A California Limited Liability Company Tishman Speyer Properties, Lp A New York Limited Partnership Four Star Cleaning And Restoration, Inc., A California Corporation
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Blank 27 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: 4/4/2011
                                                Notice Of Conditional Settlement Filed By Plaintiff Ray, Sumita
                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: 3/18/2011
                                                  Opposition 's Motion To Quash Or Modify Of Limit Subpoena For Production Of Medical Records Or Request For Protective Order And For Sanctions; Request For Sanctions Against Pltf's Counsel; Decl. Of David E. Hunter Filed By Defendant Wang, Ping
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: 3/16/2011 Summons Issued
                                                    Summons Issued To Cross Complainant Four Star Cleaning And Restoration, Inc., A California Corporation
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: 3/16/2011 Cross Complaint
                                                      Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Four Star Cleaning And Restoration, Inc., A California Corporation As To Cross Defendant Har-bro Of Northern California, Inc. Moes 1 To 20
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: 3/16/2011
                                                        Notice Of Entry Of Order Granting Deft's Motion For Leave To File A X-complaint Filed By Defendant Four Star Cleaning And Restoration, Inc., A California Corporation
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: 3/11/2011 Order
                                                          Order Re Ex Parte Application For Leave To File A Cross-complaint
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: 3/11/2011
                                                            Ex Parte Application For Order For Leave To File A X-comp, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Four Star Cleaning And Restoration, Inc., A California Corporation
                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 3/8/2011, Entered: 3/8/2011
                                                              (amended) Notice Of Motion And Motion To Quash, Modify Or Limit Subpoena For Production Of Medcal Records And/or For A Protective Order; Request For Monetary Sanctions, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Plaintiff Ray, Sumita Hearing Set For Apr-11-2011 At 09:00 Am In Dept 301
                                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010 Notice Of Early Settlement Conference--early Settlement Prgm
                                                                Notice Of Early Settlement Conference - Early Settlement Program
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: 9/14/2010 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                  Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Jun-06-2011 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On May-20-2011 At 2:30 Pm In Department 604. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: 9/14/2010
                                                                    Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Mar-18-2011 - By Court.
                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: 9/2/2010
                                                                      Objection To Time And Place Of Trial Filed By Defendant Four Star Cleaning And Restoration, Inc., A California Corporation
                                                                        Blank 15 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010
                                                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Four Star Cleaning And Restoration, Inc., A California Corporation Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: 8/27/2010 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                          Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Mar-18-2011 At 9:00 Am In Department 611. Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Apr-04-2011 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Sep-10-2010 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010
                                                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Tishman Speyer Properties, Lp A New York Limited Partnership 300 Spear Realty Ventures, Llc (sued As 300 Spear Street, Llc) Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: 8/24/2010
                                                                              Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Ray, Sumita Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 Summons Issued
                                                                                Summons Issued To Cross Complainant Wang, Ping
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 Cross Complaint
                                                                                  Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Wang, Ping As To Cross Defendant 300 Spear Street Llc, A California Limited Liability Company Tishman Speyer Properties, Lp A New York Limited Partnership Four Star Cleaning And Restoration, Inc., A California Corporation Roes 1-20
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/12/2010, Entered: 7/12/2010 Answer
                                                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Wang, Ping
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/8/2010, Entered: 7/8/2010 Answer
                                                                                      Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Tishman Speyer Properties, Lp A New York Limited Partnership 300 Spear Realty Ventures, Llc (sued As 300 Spear Street, Llc)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/23/2010 Answer
                                                                                        Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Four Star Cleaning And Restoration, Inc., A California Corporation
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: 6/9/2010 Summons On Complaint ` Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                          Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Ray, Sumita Served Jun-08-2010, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Wang, Ping
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/9/2010, Entered: 6/9/2010 Summons On Complaint ` Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                            Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Ray, Sumita Served May-18-2010, Mail And Acknowledgement, Acknowledgment Date Jun-07-2010 On Defendant 300 Spear Street Llc, A California Limited Liability Company
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: 5/14/2010 Summons On Complaint ` Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                              Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Ray, Sumita Served Apr-27-2010, Personal Service On Defendant Tishman Speyer Properties, Lp A New York Limited Partnership
                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: 5/12/2010 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Ray, Sumita Served Apr-30-2010, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Four Star Cleaning And Restoration, Inc., A California Corporation
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                  Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: 4/12/2010 Complaint
                                                                                                    Contract/warranty, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Ray, Sumita As To Defendant 300 Spear Street Llc, A California Limited Liability Company Tishman Speyer Properties, Lp A New York Limited Partnership Wang, Ping Four Star Cleaning And Restoration, Inc., A California Corporation Does 1 Thru 70, Incl. Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Sep-10-2010 Proof Of Service Due On Jun-11-2010 Case Management Statement Due On Aug-26-2010

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 294 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?