Noel A. Obiora v. Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy) Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 10 498757
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Obiora, Noel A., Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Does 5 To 10, Defendant
No Logo Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy), Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Iowa Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen W. Yiu +1 415 703 5385 +1 415 703 5480 karen.yiu@doj.ca.gov
Cause of Action Other Non Exempt Complaints
  Entries (113) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (10) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: 3/14/2012 Remittitur
Remittitur Dismissed (a133936 Div 5)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: 1/10/2012 Order
    Order Dismissing Appeal Filed 12/2/11 A133936 #5
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: 1/3/2012 Notice Of Default On Appeal Sent To Appellant
      Notice Of Default On Appeal Sent To Appellant
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: 1/3/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
        Clerk's Notice Of Filing Of Notice Of Appeal
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/16/2011 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
          Case Management Conference Of Dec-30-2011 Is Off Calendar, Judgment On File. Notice Sent By Court.
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/14/2011, Entered: 12/14/2011 Remittitur
            Remittitur Dismissed (a133069 Div 5)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: 12/2/2011 Notice Of Appeal/request For Transcript
              Notice Of Appeal/request For Transcript (appeal Only) Filed By Plaintiff Obiora, Noel A.
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: 11/30/2011 Case Management Statement
                Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: 11/9/2011 Notice of Entry of Judgment
                  Notice Of Entry Of Judgment
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: 11/7/2011 Judgment For Defendant
                    The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff Obiora, Noel A. Take Nothing From Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy) See Scanned Document
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: 10/17/2011 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                      Case Management Conference Of Oct-28-2011 Continued To Dec-30-2011 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610 For Filing Of The Judgment Following Order Granting Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment. Notice Sent By Court.
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 102 Filed: 10/13/2011, Entered: 10/13/2011
                        Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: 10/11/2011 Order
                          Order Dismissing Appeal As Premature (a133069 Div 5)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 100 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: 10/3/2011
                            Clerk's Estimate Of Cost Of Appeal Record
                              Blank 99 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: 9/19/2011
                              Clerk's Notice To Counsel Re Missing Documents-respondent
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: 9/16/2011 Respondents Request For Additions To Clerks/reporters Transcript
                                Respondent's Request For Additions To Clerk's Transcript
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 97 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: 9/16/2011
                                  Clerk's Notice To Counsel Re Missing Documents
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: 9/8/2011 Request For Clerks/reporter Transcript
                                    Request For Clerk's/reporter's Transcript Filed (no Rt)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: 9/7/2011 Notice Of Default On Appeal Sent To Appellant
                                      Notice Of Default On Appeal Sent To Appellant
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 94 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: 8/31/2011
                                        Clerk's Notice Of Filing Of Notice Of Appeal
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: 8/25/2011 Order Setting Case Management Conference
                                          Removed From Master Short Cause Calendar On Aug-29-2011. Assigned To Case Management Department 610 On Oct-28-2011 At 9:00 Am For Case Management Conference For Filing Of The Judgment. Notice Sent By Court. (206)
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: 8/25/2011 Notice Of Appeal/request For Transcript
                                            Notice Of Appeal/request For Transcript (ntc Of Appeal Only) Filed By Plaintiff Obiora, Noel A.
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Blank 91 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011
                                              Mini-minutes For Jul-26-2011 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                Blank 90 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011
                                                Mini-minutes For Jul-26-2011 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011
                                                  Mini-minutes For Jul-26-2011 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011
                                                    Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Granting Deft's Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011
                                                      Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Denying Pltf's Motion For Summary Judgment And Motion For Summary Adjudication Of The Issues Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011
                                                        Mini-minutes For Jul-26-2011 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011
                                                          Mini-minutes For Jul-26-2011 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011 Court Filing
                                                            Law And Motion 301, Defendant Franchise Tax Board's (a California State Agenecy) Motion For Sanctions, Matter To Be Heard In Department 302 At The Same Time And On The Same Date Per Peremptory Challenge To Judge Busch. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter, Carol A. Karen, Csr # 8189
                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011 Court Filing
                                                              Law And Motion 301, Plaintiff Noel Obiora's Motion For Summary Judgment, Matter To Be Heard In Department 302 At The Same Time And On The Same Date Per Peremptory Challenge To Judge Busch. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter, Carol A. Karen, Csr # 8189
                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011 Court Filing
                                                                Law And Motion 302, Defendant Franchise Tax Board's Motion For Sanctions Under Code Of Civil Procedure Section 128.7. The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling - Defendant's Motion For Sanctions Is Denied. Judge: Loretta M. Giorgi, Reporter: Karla Ellis-davis, Csr #12998
                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011 Court Filing
                                                                  Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff Noel Obiora's Motion For Summary Judgment And For Summary Adjudication Of The Issues. The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling - Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment Is Denied. Plaintiff Fails To Put Forth Evidence That, If True, Would Entitle Him To Prevail On The Cause Of Action For A Tax Refund. Order On Plaintiff's Motion Signed In Open Court. Judge: Loretta M. Giorgi, Reporter: Karla Ellis-davis, Csr #12998
                                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011 Court Filing
                                                                    Law And Motion 302, Defendant Franchise Tax Board's Motion For Summary Judgment. The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling - Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment Is Granted. Defendant Shifted The Burden To Plaintiff To Show That A Triable Issue Of Fact Existed As To Plaintiff's Cause Of Action For A Tax Refund. Plaintiff Failed To Meet That Burden. Order On Defendant's Motion Signed In Open Court. Judge: Loretta M. Giorgi, Reporter: Karla Ellis-davis, Csr #12998
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011 Order
                                                                      Order Granting Defendant Franchise Tax Board's Motion For Summary Judgment
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/26/2011, Entered: 7/26/2011 Order
                                                                        Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment And Motion For Summary Adjudication Of The Issues
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: 7/25/2011 Court Filing
                                                                          Law And Motion 301, Defendant Franchise Tax Board's (a California State Agenecy) Motion For Summary Judgment Is Continued To July 26, 2011 To Be Heard In Department 302 With Plaintiff's Motions For Summary Judgment And For Sanctions, Per Peremptory Challenge To Judge Busch. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Carol A. Karen, Csr #8189
                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: 7/25/2011
                                                                            Mini-minutes For Jul-25-2011 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: 7/21/2011
                                                                              Added To Calendar For Defendant Franchise Tax Board's (a California State Agenecy) Motion For Sanctions Hearing Set For Jul-26-2011 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: 7/21/2011
                                                                                Added To Calendar For Plaintiff Noel Obiora's Motion For Summary Judgment Hearing Set For Jul-26-2011 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: 7/21/2011
                                                                                  Added To Calendar For Defendant Franchise Tax Board's (a California State Agenecy) Motion For Summary Judgment Hearing Set For Jul-26-2011 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011
                                                                                    Obejctions To Pltf's Evidence Filed In Oppos To Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011
                                                                                      Supplemental Index Of Non-california Authorities In Support Of Motion For Usmmary Jdugment; Pos Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: 7/20/2011
                                                                                        Reply Brief In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011
                                                                                          Declaration (supplemental )_ Of Karen W. Yiu In Support Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: 7/19/2011
                                                                                            Reply Brief In Support Of Motion For Sanctions Under Ccp Sec 128.7 Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: 7/18/2011
                                                                                              Pos Of Opposition To De'ts Motion For Summary Judgment; Declaration In Opposition; Response To Deft's Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts; Opposition To Motion For Sanctions; Declaration In Opposition Filed By Plaintiff Obiora, Noel A.
                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: 7/12/2011
                                                                                                Pos Of Memo Of P & A In Oppos. To Pltf's Mtn For Summary Judgment/adjudication; Sep. Statement; Req. For Judicial Ntc; Index Of Non-california; Etc Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: 7/12/2011
                                                                                                  Objections To Pltf's Evidence Filed In Support Of Mtn For Summary Judgment/adjudication Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: 7/12/2011
                                                                                                    Index Of Non-california Authority In Oppos. To Pltf's Mtn For Summary Judgment/adjudication Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: 7/12/2011
                                                                                                      Req. For Judicial Ntc In Oppos. To Pltf's Mtn For Summary Judgment/adjudication Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: 7/12/2011
                                                                                                        Sep. Statement Of Undisputed And Disputed Material Facts In Oppos. To Pltf's Mtn For Summary Judgment/adjudication Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: 7/12/2011
                                                                                                          Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Oppos. To Pltf's Mtn For Summary Judgment/adjudication Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011
                                                                                                            Declaration Of Noel A. Obiora In Oppos To Defts Motion For Sanctions Filed By Plaintiff Obiora, Noel A.
                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011
                                                                                                              Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Response To Defts Motion For Sanctions Filed By Plaintiff Obiora, Noel A.
                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011
                                                                                                                Certificate Of Proof Of Service Of Motion For Summary Judgment/papers Filed By Plaintiff Obiora, Noel A.
                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011
                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Noel A. Obiora In Oppos To Deft's Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Plaintiff Obiora, Noel A.
                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011
                                                                                                                    Statement Of Undisputed Facts In Oppos To Motion For Summary Judgment/adjudication Of The Issues Filed By Plaintiff Obiora, Noel A.
                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011
                                                                                                                      Opposition To Deft's Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Plaintiff Obiora, Noel A.
                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011
                                                                                                                        Ntc Of Motion And Motion For Sanctions Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy) Hearing Set For Jul-26-2011 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/12/2011
                                                                                                                          Peremptory Challenge Of Honorable Peter J. Busch Filed By Plaintiff Obiora, Noel A.
                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/12/2011
                                                                                                                            Motion For Summary Judgment Index Of Non-california Authority An Evidence In Support Filed By Plaintiff Obiora, Noel A. Hearing Set For Jul-26-2011 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011
                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service By Mail (u.s. Mail And E-mail) Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011
                                                                                                                                Index Of Non-california Authority In Support Of Mo For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011
                                                                                                                                  Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Mo For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board
                                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011
                                                                                                                                    Evidence In Support Of Mo For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011
                                                                                                                                      Separate Statement Of Facts (undisputed Material Facts) In Support Of Mo For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011
                                                                                                                                        Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Mo For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: 5/6/2011
                                                                                                                                          Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy) Hearing Set For Jul-25-2011 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: 2/14/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            Discovery 301, A R G U E D; The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling As Follows: Defendant Franchise Tax Board's Motion To Compel Further Responses And Verification Of Plaintiff's Responses To Discovery And For Monetary Sanctions Is Granted. Plaintiff Must Amend Or Clarify His Responses, Update His Responses To Form Interrogatory 17.1 If Necessary, Provide A Verification For The Responses To Request For Admission, And Pay Defendant Sanctions In The Amount Of $400.00 Within 15 Days From Notice Of Entry Of Order. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Not Reported.
                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: 2/14/2011
                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Granting Defts Motion To Compel Fruther Responses And Vericication Of Pltfs' Responses Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: 2/14/2011 Order
                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Defendant Franchise Tax Board's Motion To Compel Further Responses And Verification Of Plaintiff's Responses To Discovery
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: 2/14/2011
                                                                                                                                                  Mini-minutes For Feb-14-2011 9:00 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: 1/28/2011
                                                                                                                                                    Mini-minutes For Jan-28-2011 9:00 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: 1/28/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Discovery 301, Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agency)'s Motion To Compel Further Responses And Verification Of Plaintiff's Responses To Discovery And For Monetary Sanctions Is Continued From Jan-28-2011 To Discovery At Feb-14-2011, 9:00 Am In Dept. 301. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Not Reported
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: 1/21/2011
                                                                                                                                                        Reply Brief In Support Of Motion To Compel Further Responses And Verification Of Pltfs' Responses Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011
                                                                                                                                                          Declaration In Support Of Response To Deft's Motion To Compel Further Responses And Verification Of Pltf's Responses To Discovery And For Monetary Sanctions Filed By Plaintiff Obiora, Noel A.
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: 1/18/2011
                                                                                                                                                            Response To Defts Motion To Compel Further Responses And Verification Of Pltfs Responses To Discovery And For Monetary Sanctions Filed By Plaintiff Obiora, Noel A.
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: 12/27/2010
                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Further Responses And Verification Of Pltf's Responses To Discovery And For Monetary Sanctions Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy) Hearing Set For Jan-28-2011 At 09:00 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: 12/22/2010 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Short Cause Trial Set For Aug-29-2011 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: 12/13/2010
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Objection To Trial Date By Deft Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Short Cause Trial Set For Mar-21-2011 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Dec-17-2010 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: 12/2/2010
                                                                                                                                                                      Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy) Estimated Time For Trial: 1.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: 11/19/2010
                                                                                                                                                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Obiora, Noel A. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 2.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010
                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Unavailability Of Yiu, Karen W On Nov-11-2010 Through Nov-29-2010 Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Order Setting Case Management Conference From Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                            Case Management Conference Set For Dec-17-2010 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212 For The Submission Of Case Management Statements. The Nov-17-2010 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/29/2010, Entered: 10/29/2010 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                Reclassification Of Case - Fees Paid Filed By Plaintiff Obiora, Noel A. Case Reclassified As Unlimited Case
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: 10/15/2010 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                  1st Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Obiora, Noel A. As To Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy) Does 5 To 10
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Granting Mtn To Reclassify Limited To Unlimited Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Sustaining Deft's Demurrer Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                        Mini-minutes For Oct-08-2010 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                          Mini-minutes For Oct-08-2010 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Order Granting Defendant Franchise Tax Board's Motion To Reclassify
                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Defendant Franchise Tax Board's Motion To Reclassify Limited Civil Case To Unlimited Civil Case
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Order Sustaining Defendant Franchise Tax Board's Demurrer To Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Sustaining Defendant Franchise Tax Board's Demurrer To Complaint With Ten Days Leave To Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Law And Motion 301, Defendant Franchise Tax Board's (a California State Agenecy) Demurrer To Complaint Is Sustained With 10 Days Leave To Amend If Plaintiff Can State A Statutory Claim For Refund. Defendant's Counsel Is Directed To Read And Comply With Local Rule 2.6(b). Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Carol Karen Csr # 8189 =(301/pjb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 10/8/2010, Entered: 10/8/2010 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Law And Motion 301, Defendant Franchise Tax Board's Motion To Reclassify Action From Limited To Unlimited Civil Case Is Granted. No Opposition Filed. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Carol Karen Csr # 8189 =(301/pjb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: 10/1/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply Brief In Support Of Demurrer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 9/28/2010, Entered: 9/28/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition To Demurrer To Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Obiora, Noel A.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 9/17/2010, Entered: 9/17/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Obiora, Noel A. Estimated Time For Trial: 1.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/15/2010, Entered: 9/15/2010 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order To Show Cause Set For Sep-29-2010 Continued To Nov-17-2010 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s). The Sep-29-2010 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Hearing On Demurrer Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Demurrer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy) Hearing Set For Oct-08-2010 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Motion And Motion To Reclassify Action From Limited To Unlimited Civil Case Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy) Hearing Set For Oct-08-2010 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: 9/3/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Unavailability Of Yiu, Karen W On Sep-20-2010 Through Sep-24-2010 Filed By Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 Summons On Complaint ` Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Obiora, Noel A. Served Jul-16-2010, Personal Service On Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/29/2010, Entered: 7/29/2010 Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order To Show Cause Set For Sep-29-2010 In Department 212 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The Aug-13-2010 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 7/26/2010, Entered: 7/26/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Obiora, Noel A. Estimated Time For Trial: 2.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          After Hearing, Order To Show Cause Is Ordered Off Calendar And Dissolved. (212)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: 7/20/2010
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mini-minutes For Jul-20-2010 9:00 Am For Dept 212
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: 6/21/2010 Order To Show Cause Re: Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Added To Proof Of Service Order To Show Cause Calendar Hearing Set For Jul-20-2010 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: 4/15/2010 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Other Non Exempt Complaints, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Obiora, Noel A. As To Defendant Franchise Tax Board (a California State Agenecy) Does 5 To 10 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Aug-13-2010 Proof Of Service Due On Jun-14-2010 Case Management Statement Due On Jul-29-2010

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?