Frank Romero v. Citibank, N.a. Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 11 508056
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Romero, Frank ,an Individual, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Entity EB

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Agtagma, Andrew M +1 650 589 5700
v.
Citibank, NA Citibank, NA, Defendant
Officer/Director, Kemet Corporation
Officer/Director, STRATOS LIGHTWAVE, INC.
Officer/Director, Chippac, Inc.
Officer/Director, Citicorp Holdings, Inc.
Citigroup, Inc. Officer/Director, Citigroup, Inc.
Officer/Director, CITICORP
Officer/Director, Intersil Holding Co
Officer/Director, Citigroup Holdings Co

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
No Logo Demopoulos, Nick ,an Individual, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
No Logo Does 1 To 10, Inclusive, Defendant
Cause of Action Other Non Exempt Complaints (for Employment Discrimination)
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: 10/17/2012 Order Dismissing Case Pursuant To Crc 3.1385
Case Dismissed By Court At Order To Show Cause Hearing Oct-16-2012 At 2:00 Pm Pursuant To Crc 3.1385. Notice Sent By Court.
    Blank 21 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: 10/17/2012
    Mini Minutes For Oct-16-2012 02:00 Pm For Dept 610
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
      Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal Pursuant To Crc 3.1385 Set For Oct-16-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610. Aug-17-2012 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document 19 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: 2/3/2012 Notice of Settlement
        Notice Of Settlement Filed By Plaintiff Romero, Frank ,an Individual
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/16/2011, Entered: 11/16/2011 Dismissal
          Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Demopoulos, Nick ,an Individual
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: 11/4/2011 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
            Case Management Conference Of Nov-18-2011 Continued To Aug-17-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610 For Status Of Binding Arbitration. Notice Sent By Court.
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 16 Filed: 10/28/2011, Entered: 10/28/2011
              Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Romero, Frank ,an Individual Also Filed By Defendant Citibank, N.a. Demopoulos, Nick ,an Individual
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 15 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: 10/19/2011
                Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Filed By Defendant Citibank, N.a. Demopoulos, Nick ,an Individual
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/14/2011, Entered: 10/14/2011 Order
                  Order And Stipulation Staying Case Pending Completion Of Aaa Arbitration
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: 8/9/2011 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                    Case Management Conference Of Aug-19-2011 Continued To Nov-18-2011 At 9:00 Am In Department 610 For Parties To File Order Granting Arbitration And Stay. Notice Sent By Court.
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 12 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: 8/2/2011
                      Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Romero, Frank ,an Individual Also Filed By Defendant Citibank, N.a. Demopoulos, Nick ,an Individual Jury Demanded
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 11 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: 7/7/2011
                        Fee Paid On Stip And [proposed] Order Staying Case Pending Completition Of Aaa Arbitration Filed By Defendant Citibank, N.a. Demopoulos, Nick ,an Individual
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: 6/24/2011 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                          Case Management Conference Of Jul-08-2011 Continued To Aug-19-2011 At 9:00 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 9 Filed: 6/23/2011, Entered: 6/23/2011
                            Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Romero, Frank ,an Individual Also Filed By Defendant Citibank, N.a. Demopoulos, Nick ,an Individual Jury Demanded
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 Order
                              Order Extending Deadline For Defendants To Respond To Complaint To June 30, 2011; Stipulation
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 7 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011
                                Fee Paid On Stip And [proposed] Order Extending Deadline For Defts To Respond To Complaint Filed By Defendant Citibank, N.a. Demopoulos, Nick ,an Individual
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: 5/17/2011
                                  Before Hearing, Order To Show Cause Is Ordered Off Calendar By Court. (610)
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/5/2011, Entered: 5/5/2011 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                    Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Romero, Frank ,an Individual Served May-02-2011, Personal Service On Defendant Citibank, N.a.
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: 4/29/2011 Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff
                                      Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Romero, Frank ,an Individual Served Apr-26-2011, Personal Service On Defendant Demopoulos, Nick ,an Individual
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: 4/20/2011 Order To Show Cause Re: Proof Of Service
                                        Added To Proof Of Service Order To Show Cause Calendar Hearing Set For May-17-2011 At 09:00 Am In Dept 610
                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Notice To Plaintiff
                                          Notice To Plaintiff
                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Complaint
                                            Other Non Exempt Complaints, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Romero, Frank ,an Individual As To Defendant Citibank, N.a. Demopoulos, Nick ,an Individual Does 1 To 10, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jul-08-2011 Proof Of Service Due On Apr-11-2011 Case Management Statement Due On Jun-23-2011

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 312 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?