It Brix Llc v. Michael Engmann Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 11 508649
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Athannassov, George, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mannion & Lowe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Gerard Mannion +1 415 733 1050 +1 415 434 4810 gmannion@sbcglobal.net
No Logo It Brix Llc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mannion & Lowe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Gerard Mannion +1 415 733 1050 +1 415 434 4810 gmannion@sbcglobal.net
v.
No Logo Blogtronix Llc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Neville, Dave

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dave Neville +1 415 487 2601
No Logo Does 1 Thru 100, Incl., Defendant
No Logo Engmann Options Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Neville, Dave

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dave Neville +1 415 487 2601
No Logo Engmann, Michael, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Neville, Dave

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dave Neville +1 415 487 2601
No Logo Kendu Partners, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Neville, Dave

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dave Neville +1 415 487 2601
No Logo Athannassov, George, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mannion & Lowe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Gerard Mannion +1 415 733 1050 +1 415 434 4810 gmannion@sbcglobal.net
No Logo Does 1-50, Inclusive, Cross-Defendant
No Logo It Brix Llc, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mannion & Lowe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Gerard Mannion +1 415 733 1050 +1 415 434 4810 gmannion@sbcglobal.net
No Logo Blogtronix Llc, Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Neville, Dave

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dave Neville +1 415 487 2601
Cause of Action Fraud
  Entries (102) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (13) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 102 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013
Review For Mandatory Settlement Conference
    Legal Document 101 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 Case Ordered Off Calendar
    Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Nov-18-2013 - Not Held And Removed By Court.
      Blank 100 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013
      Law And Motion 302, The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling With The Exception Carved Out For The Attorney's Fees And Costs Not Adjudicated Here: Plaintiffs It Brix Llc And George Athannassov's Motion For Summary Adjudication As To The Parties' Cross Motions For Summary Adjudication Under Ccp Section 437c(s), The Court Finds As Follows: As To Issue One, Summary Adjudication Is Granted In Favor Of Plaintiff Itbrix. The Undisputed Facts Show That Plaintiff Timely Requested A List Of Current Owners Under Section 18 Of The Termination Agreement, And Defendant Blogtronix Did Not Provide An Accurate List Of Current Owners In Accordance With Section 18. As To Issue Two, Summary Adjudication Is Granted In Favor Of Itbrix. Blogtronix Has Failed To Produce Sufficient Evidence That The Liquidated Damages Clause Was Unreasonable At The Time The Termination Agreement Was Made. Blogtronix Shall Pay $150,000 In Accordance With The Section 21 Of The Termination Agreement. As To Issue Three, Summary Adjudication Is Granted In Favor Of Blogtronix. The Plain Language Of Section 11c Of The Termination Agreement States That All Claims Are Released Except For Claims Arising Form The Termination Agreement, The License Agreement, And The Software Development Agreement. Each Of Blogtronix's Proposed Cross-claims Arise From These Agreements.as To Issue Four, A Triable Issue Of Fact Exists As To Whether Kendu Partners Is An "outside Investor" Under The Terms Of Section 17 Of The Termination Agreement. Kendu Has Produced A Document Showing That Ownership Interest Was Transferred From Blogtronix To Kendu Partners In December 2006, Which Is Outside The Investment Restriction Period In The Termination Agreement. (see Blogtronix's Evidence In Support Of Opposition To Itbrix's Motion For Summary Adjudication, Exh. D.) As To Issue Five, A Triable Issue Of Fact Exists As To What Damages Are Payable To Itbrix As The Result Of The Transfer Of Ownership. (see Minutes For Full Ruling)
        Blank 99 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013
        Mini Minutes For Sep-27-2013 09:30 Am For Dept 302
          Legal Document 98 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 Order
          Order Re Summary Adjudication Granted In Favor Of Plaintiff Itbrix.
            Legal Document 97 Filed: 9/27/2013, Entered: 9/27/2013 Notice Of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference
            Mandatory Settlement Conference Set For Sep-27-2013 Is Rescheduled To Nov-18-2013 At 01:00 Pm In 212 With Settlement Conference Officer Joseph Addiego.
              Blank 96 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: 9/26/2013
              Master Jury Calendar Set For Oct-07-2013 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Jan-27-2014 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206
                Blank 95 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: 9/26/2013 Court Filing
                Master Motion Calendar On Sep-26-2013 In 206, Defendant Michael Engmann, Engmann Options Inc., Kendu Partners And Blogtronix Llc's Motion To Continue Jury Trial Is Granted. The Trial Date Of 10/7/13 Is Continued To 1/27/14 In Dept. 206 At 9:30 Am. The New Trial Date Will Be Deemed To Be The Original Trial Date For Statutory Cut-off Purposes. Order Signed. Judge: Cynthia M. Lee; Clerk: Jiroque; Matter Not Reported. (206)
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: 9/26/2013 Order
                  Order Continuing Trial
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 93 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: 9/26/2013
                    Pos Of Order Shortening Time Filed By Defendant Blogtronix Llc
                      Blank 92 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: 9/23/2013
                      Non-oppos To Motion To Continue Trial Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc Athannassov, George
                        Blank 91 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: 9/20/2013 Court Filing
                        Law And Motion 302, Plaintiffs It Brix Llc And George Athannassov's Motion For Summary Adjudication Is Continued On The Court's Own Motion To September 27, 2013 At 9:30 A.m. Judge: Marla J. Miller, Clerk: Cynthia Herbert; Court Reporter: Anthony C. Vaughn, Csr # 6185 =302/mjm
                          Blank 90 Filed: 9/20/2013, Entered: 9/20/2013
                          Mini Minutes For Sep-20-2013 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                            Blank 89 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: 9/19/2013
                            Declaration In Support Of Motion To Continue Jury Trial And/or Settlement Conference Filed By Defendant Engmann, Michael Engmann Options Inc. Kendu Partners Blogtronix Llc
                              Blank 88 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: 9/19/2013
                              Motion To Continue Jury Trial And/or Settlement Conference Filed By Defendant Engmann, Michael Engmann Options Inc. Kendu Partners Blogtronix Llc Hearing Set For Sep-26-2013 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                Blank 87 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: 9/19/2013
                                Stipulation To Continue Trial Filed By Engmann, Michael Engmann Options Inc. Kendu Partners Blogtronix Llc It Brix Llc Athannassov, George
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: 9/19/2013 Order
                                  Order Shortening Time Re: Motion To Continue The Trial Date
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 85 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: 9/19/2013
                                    Declaration In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Order Filed By Defendant Kendu Partners
                                      Blank 84 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: 9/19/2013
                                      Ex Parte Application For Order Shortneing Time;, Points And Authorities Filed By Defendant Kendu Partners
                                        Blank 83 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: 9/17/2013 Court Filing
                                        Law And Motion 302, Plaintiffs It Brix Llc And George Athannassov's Motion For Summary Adjudication Is Continued To September 20, 2013 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 302 Per Ex Parte Order Filed 9/11/13. Judge: Marla J. Miller; Clerk: Gina Gonzales; Court Reporter: Anthony C. Vaughn, Csr # 6185
                                          Blank 82 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: 9/17/2013
                                          Added To Calendar For Plaintiffs It Brix Llc And George Athannassov's Motion For Summary Adjudication Hearing Set For Sep-20-2013 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                            Blank 81 Filed: 9/17/2013, Entered: 9/17/2013
                                            Mini Minutes For Sep-17-2013 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: 9/11/2013 Order
                                              Order Granting Joint Request To Continue Hearing On Motion For Summary Adjudication From 9/17/13 To 9/20/13
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Notice Of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                Mandatory Settlement Conference Set For Sep-18-2013 Is Rescheduled To Sep-27-2013 At 01:00 Pm In 612 With Conference Officer Joseph Addiego.
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 78 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013
                                                  Mini Minutes For Sep-06-2013 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                    Blank 77 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: 9/6/2013 Court Filing
                                                    Plaintiffs It Brix Llc And George Athannassov's Motion For Summary Adjudication Is Continued On The CourtÂ’s Own Motion To September 17, 2013. Judge: Leslie C. Nichols, Clerk: Cynthia Herbert; Court Reporter: Anthony C. Vaughn, Csr # 6185
                                                      Blank 76 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013
                                                      Proof Of Service Of Memo Of Pts And Auth In Reply To Defs' Opposition To Pltf's Mtn For Summary Adjudication, Response To Separate Stmt Of Undisputed Facts In Support Of Opposition To Def/x-complainant's Mtn For Summary Adjudication, Dec Of E. Gerard Mannion Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc Served Aug-30-2013, Mail On Defendant Engmann, Michael Engmann Options Inc. Kendu Partners Blogtronix Llc
                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013
                                                        Declaration Of E. Gerard Mannion In Response To Def/x-comp's Supplemental Evidence Re: Mtn For Summary Adjudication Of Issues Under C.c.p. 437c, Subdivision(s) Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc Athannassov, George
                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013
                                                          Response Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc Athannassov, George
                                                            Blank 73 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013
                                                            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc Athannassov, George
                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013
                                                              Reply To Memo Of P&a In Oppos To Defts Motion For Summary Adjudicaiton Of Issues Filed By Cross Complainant Blogtronix Llc
                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013
                                                                Declaration Of Dave L. Neville Filed By Cross Complainant Blogtronix Llc
                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: 8/23/2013
                                                                  Evidence In Support Of Oppos To Pltf's Motion For Summary Adjuidication Filed By Defendant Engmann, Michael Engmann Options Inc. Kendu Partners Blogtronix Llc
                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: 8/23/2013
                                                                    Declaration Of Dave L. Neville Filed By Defendant Engmann Options Inc. Blogtronix Llc
                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: 8/23/2013
                                                                      Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Engmann, Michael Engmann Options Inc. Kendu Partners Blogtronix Llc
                                                                        Blank 67 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: 8/23/2013
                                                                        Declaration Of Konstantina Chilingirova Filed By Defendant Engmann, Michael Engmann Options Inc. Kendu Partners Blogtronix Llc
                                                                          Blank 66 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: 8/23/2013
                                                                          Declaration Of Michael W. Engmann Filed By Defendant Engmann, Michael Engmann Options Inc. Kendu Partners Blogtronix Llc
                                                                            Blank 65 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: 8/23/2013
                                                                            Separate Statement Of Facts In Support Of Oppos Opt Pltf's Motion For Summary Adjudication Filed By Defendant Engmann, Michael Engmann Options Inc. Kendu Partners Blogtronix Llc
                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: 8/23/2013
                                                                              Memo In Oppos To Pltf's Motion For Summary Adjudication Df Filed By Defendant Engmann, Michael Engmann Options Inc. Kendu Partners Blogtronix Llc
                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: 8/23/2013
                                                                                Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Oppos To Mtn For Summ Adj Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc Athannassov, George
                                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: 8/23/2013
                                                                                  Response To Sep Statement In Oppos To Mtn For Summ Adj Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc Athannassov, George
                                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: 8/23/2013
                                                                                    Declaration Of E. Gerard Mannion; Pos Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc Athannassov, George
                                                                                      Blank 60 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: 8/23/2013
                                                                                      Objeciton To Length Of Memo Of P&a Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc Athannassov, George
                                                                                        Blank 59 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013
                                                                                        Memorandum In Support Of Mtn For Summary Adjudication Of Issues (ccp 437c, Subd.(s)) Filed By Defendant Engmann, Michael Engmann Options Inc. Kendu Partners Blogtronix Llc
                                                                                          Blank 58 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013
                                                                                          Stipulated Joint Statement Of Facts And Exhibits Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc Athannassov, George
                                                                                            Blank 57 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013
                                                                                            Separate Statement Of Undisputed Facts In Support Of Def And Cross Complainant's Mtn For Summary Adjudication Of Issues Under Ccp 437s Subd(s) Filed By Defendant Engmann, Michael Engmann Options Inc. Kendu Partners Blogtronix Llc
                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013
                                                                                              Declaration Of Konstantina Chilingirova In Support Of Def And Cross Complainant's Mtn For Summary Adjudication Of Issues Under Ccp 437s Subd(s) Filed By Defendant Engmann, Michael Engmann Options Inc. Kendu Partners Blogtronix Llc
                                                                                                Blank 55 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013
                                                                                                Declaration Of Dave L. Neville In Support Of Def And Cross Complainant's Mtn For Summary Adjudication Of Issues Under Ccp 437s Subd(s) Filed By Defendant Engmann, Michael Engmann Options Inc. Kendu Partners Blogtronix Llc
                                                                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013
                                                                                                  Declaration Of Michael W. Engmann In Support Of Def And Cross Complainant's Mtn For Summary Adjudication Of Issues Under Ccp 437s Subd(s) Filed By Defendant Engmann, Michael Engmann Options Inc. Kendu Partners Blogtronix Llc
                                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013
                                                                                                    Evidence In Support Of Mtn For Summary Adjudication Of Issues Under Ccp 437c Subd. (s) Filed By Defendant Engmann, Michael Engmann Options Inc. Kendu Partners Blogtronix Llc
                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013
                                                                                                      Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc Athannassov, George
                                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013
                                                                                                        Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Summary Adjudication Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc Athannassov, George
                                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013
                                                                                                          Proof Of Service Of Motion For Summary Adjudication Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc Athannassov, George
                                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013
                                                                                                            Motion For Summary Adjudication (joint Ntc Of Motion Under Ccp 437c(s) With Def Blogtronix, Llc) Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc Athannassov, George Hearing Set For Sep-06-2013 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013
                                                                                                              Stipulation Shortening The Notice Period For Filing Motions For Summary Adjudication Filed By It Brix Llc Athannassov, George Engmann, Michael Engmann Options Inc. Kendu Partners Blogtronix Llc
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/15/2013, Entered: 8/15/2013 Order Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                Notice Of Settlement Conference Set For Sep-18-2013 At 1:00 Pm In Dept. 210 With Conference Officer Joe Addiego.
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: 6/13/2013 Order
                                                                                                                  Order After Informal Conference Re: Filing Of Motion For Summary Adjudication Of Issues
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: 5/1/2013 Court Filing
                                                                                                                    Law And Motion 302, Pursuant To The Court's Order Of April 23, 2013, The Court Held An Informal Conference Regarding Whether Certain Issues Are Appropriately Presented To The Court For Determination Pursuant To Ccp Section 437c(s). Counsel Stipulated And The Court Agreed That All Of The Topics Set Forth In The April 23, 2013 Order May Be Presented In A Ccp Section 437c(s) Motion. Counsel To Prepare A Written Proposed Order And Submit To The Court For Signature. Judge: Marla J. Miller, Clerk: Lesley Fiscella, Not Reported.
                                                                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: 5/1/2013
                                                                                                                      Mini Minutes For May-01-2013 03:00 Pm For Dept 302
                                                                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: 4/23/2013
                                                                                                                        Added To Calendar For Informal Conference Re: Further Evaluation Of The Stipulation For Order To Permit Filing Of Motion For Summary Adjudication Of Issues Hearing Set For May-01-2013 At 03:00 Pm In Dept 302
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: 4/23/2013 Order
                                                                                                                          Order To Permit Filing Of Motion For Summary Adjudication Of Issues [ccp 437c Subd.(s)]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: 4/23/2013
                                                                                                                            Ex Parte Application For Order For Ruling On Whether Motion For Summary Adjudication Of Issues Will Be Allowed, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Cross Complainant Blogtronix Llc
                                                                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: 3/14/2013
                                                                                                                              Review For Mandatory Settlement Conference Rescheduling.
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 39 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: 3/14/2013 Case Ordered Off Calendar
                                                                                                                                Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Mar-19-2013 - By The Court, Not Held.
                                                                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013
                                                                                                                                  Master Jury Calendar Set For Mar-25-2013 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Oct-07-2013 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 Per Stipulated Ex Parte Order Filed 3/13/13. Any Further Continuance Of The Trial Date Shall Be By Noticed Motion. (206)
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 Order
                                                                                                                                    Order Continuing Trial Date Pursuant To Stipulation
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 Declaration
                                                                                                                                      Declaration In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Order Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 Ex Parte Application for Order
                                                                                                                                        Ex Parte Application For Order To Continue Trial Date And Stipulation, Points And Authorities Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: 3/7/2013
                                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Dave L Niville Filed By Defendant Engmann, Michael Kendu Partners Blogtronix Llc
                                                                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: 3/7/2013
                                                                                                                                            Declaration Of E Gerard Mannion Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc
                                                                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 3/7/2013, Entered: 3/7/2013
                                                                                                                                              Stipulation For Order To Permit Filing Of Motion For Summary Adjudication; Mempo Of P And A Filed By Engmann, Michael Engmann Options Inc. Kendu Partners Blogtronix Llc
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 31 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: 2/25/2013 Order Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Settlement Conference; Settlement Conference Set For Mar-19-2013 At 8:30 Am In Dept. 212 With Settlement Conference Officer Paul Dubow.
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: 2/21/2013 Case Ordered Off Calendar
                                                                                                                                                  Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Feb-25-2013 - By Court.
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: 2/8/2013 Order Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Settlement Conference; Settlement Conference Set For Feb-25-2013 At 1:00 Pm In Dept. 212 With Settlement Conference Officer Martin Eber.
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: 9/25/2012
                                                                                                                                                      Master Jury Calendar Set For Oct-01-2012 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Mar-25-2013 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 Pursuant To Ex Parte Order Filed On 9/25/12. (206)
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: 9/25/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                        Order Continuing Trial Pursuant To Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: 9/25/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                          Declaration In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Order Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: 9/25/2012 Ex Parte Application for Order
                                                                                                                                                            Ex Parte Application For Order To Continue Trial Date; Memo Of P&a Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: 8/17/2012
                                                                                                                                                              Jury Fees Deposited By Plaintiff It Brix Llc
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: 9/8/2011 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Oct-01-2012 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Sep-23-2011 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: 9/8/2011
                                                                                                                                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc Also Filed By Cross Defendant It Brix Llc Athannassov, George Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 20.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: 9/8/2011
                                                                                                                                                                    Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Engmann, Michael Engmann Options Inc. Kendu Partners Blogtronix Llc Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 20.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: 8/15/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To 1st Amended Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant It Brix Llc Athannassov, George
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: 8/10/2011 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Law And Motion 301, Plaintiff/cross-defendant It Brix Llc And Cross-defendant George Athannassov's Demurrer To The Sixth Cause Of Action Of The Cross Complaint Is Sustained With 10 Days Leave To Amend. No Opposition Was Filed. Moving Party Is To Submit A Proposed Form Of Order. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Carol Karen, Csr #8189
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: 8/10/2011
                                                                                                                                                                          Mini-minutes For Aug-10-2011 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011 Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                            1st Amended Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Blogtronix Llc As To Cross Defendant It Brix Llc Athannassov, George Does 1-50, Inclusive
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: 7/18/2011 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                              Case Management Conference Of Jul-29-2011 Continued To Sep-23-2011 At 9:00 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                Demurrer To Cross Complaint, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities Filed By Cross Defendant It Brix Llc Athannassov, George Hearing Set For Aug-10-2011 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: 5/23/2011 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued To Cross Complainant Blogtronix Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: 5/23/2011 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
                                                                                                                                                                                    Order To Show Cause Re Proof Of Service On Jun-07-2011 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: 5/20/2011 Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                      Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Blogtronix Llc As To Cross Defendant It Brix Llc Athannassov, George Does 1-50, Inclusive
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: 5/20/2011 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Engmann, Michael Engmann Options Inc. Kendu Partners Blogtronix Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: 5/10/2011 Order To Show Cause Re: Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                          Added To Proof Of Service Order To Show Cause Calendar Hearing Set For Jun-07-2011 At 09:00 Am In Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: 4/7/2011 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued To Plaintiff It Brix Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/7/2011, Entered: 4/7/2011 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                              1st Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc As To Defendant Engmann, Michael Engmann Options Inc. Kendu Partners Does 1 Thru 100, Incl. Blogtronix Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: 3/2/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Related Case : Cgc-09-485842 Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: 3/2/2011
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Related Case Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: 3/2/2011 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc Served Mar-02-2011, Fax Or Facsimile On Defendant Kendu Partners
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: 3/2/2011 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc Served Mar-02-2011, Fax Or Facsimile On Defendant Engmann, Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: 3/2/2011 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc Served Mar-02-2011, Fax Or Facsimile On Defendant Engmann Options Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: 3/1/2011 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Fraud, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff It Brix Llc As To Defendant Engmann, Michael Engmann Options Inc. Kendu Partners Does 1 Thru 100, Incl. Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jul-29-2011 Proof Of Service Due On May-02-2011 Case Management Statement Due On Jul-14-2011

                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 2,050 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?