Dino Belluomini Et Al v. Citigroup Inc. Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 11 509006
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Belluomini, Dino, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jason Lundberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lundberg, Jason +1 415 296 8844

Toggle Switch Represented by Shoker, Palvir K

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shoker, Palvir K +1 415 956 1874
No Logo Flaherty, Susan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jason Lundberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lundberg, Jason +1 415 296 8844

Toggle Switch Represented by Shoker, Palvir K

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shoker, Palvir K +1 415 956 1874
No Logo Stella Pastry Cafe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jason Lundberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lundberg, Jason +1 415 296 8844

Toggle Switch Represented by Shoker, Palvir K

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shoker, Palvir K +1 415 956 1874
No Logo Victoria Pastry Co. Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jason Lundberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lundberg, Jason +1 415 296 8844

Toggle Switch Represented by Shoker, Palvir K

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shoker, Palvir K +1 415 956 1874
v.
Citigroup, Inc. Citigroup, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Court Square Capital Ltd.
Officer/Director, Chippac, Inc.
Officer/Director, Amis Holdings, Inc.
Citibank, NA Officer/Director, Citibank, NA
Officer/Director, Keane, Inc.
Officer/Director, Macdermid Inc.
Officer/Director, Travelers Insurance Co
Officer/Director, CITICORP
Officer/Director, Imc Mortgage Co
Officer/Director, Fashion Dynamics Corp
Officer/Director, Pfs Services Inc
Officer/Director, Citicorp Banking Corp
Officer/Director, Intersil Holding Co
Officer/Director, Citigroup Holdings Co
Officer/Director, Cvc Partners LLC
Officer/Director, Ness Technologies Inc
Officer/Director, Primerica, Inc.
Officer/Director, Student Loan Corp
Officer/Director, Mfs Municipal Income Trust
Officer/Director, Pilgrim Prime Rate Trust
Officer/Director, Pimco Corporate Income Fund
Officer/Director, Pimco High Income Fund
Officer/Director, Pacholder Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Pennsylvania Fund
Officer/Director, Municipal Partners Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Michigan Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Gabelli Equity Trust Inc
Officer/Director, Nuveen Senior Income Fund
Officer/Director, Muniyield Insured Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Florida Fund
Officer/Director, Salomon Inc
Officer/Director, Jones Energy, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cryomedical Sciences, Inc.
Officer/Director, S Y Bancorp Inc
Officer/Director, Scholastic Corp
Officer/Director, Corvel Corp
Officer/Director, Buckle, Inc.,
Officer/Director, Avid Technology, Inc.
Officer/Director, O'reilly Automotive, Inc.
Officer/Director, Healthrite, Inc.
Officer/Director, Smith Midland Corp
Officer/Director, Mitcham Industries Inc
Officer/Director, Tc Group L.l.c.
Darden Restaurants, Inc. Officer/Director, Darden Restaurants, Inc.
Officer/Director, American Tire Corp
Officer/Director, Synalloy Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
No Logo Does 1 Through 100, Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Wells Fargo & Company"
Officer/Director, NORWEST CORP
Officer/Director, Day Runner, Inc.
Officer/Director, Yucca Uranium Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Cause of Action Contract/warranty
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 30 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Case Ordered Off Calendar
Order To Show Cause Of May-21-2013 Is Off Calendar. Notice Of Removal Filed. Notice Sent By Court.
    Blank 29 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: 4/17/2013
    Notice To The Clerk Of The Superior Court Of The Filing Of Removal And Removal Of Action To Federal Court Filed By Defendant Citigroup Inc.
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 28 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: 4/17/2013
      Notice Of Removal Filed By Defendant Citigroup Inc.
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: 3/29/2013 Proof of Service of Summons
        Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Belluomini, Dino Flaherty, Susan Stella Pastry Cafe Served Mar-18-2013, Personal Service On Defendant Citigroup Inc.
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: 3/21/2013 Continued Order To Show Cause
          Order To Show Cause Set For Mar-19-2013 Continued To May-21-2013 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). Notice Sent By Court.
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 25 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: 3/19/2013
            Mini Minutes For Mar-19-2013 10:30 Am For Dept 610
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 24 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: 3/19/2013
              Sanction Payment Deposited By Plaintiff Belluomini, Dino
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document 23 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: 1/17/2013 Continued Order To Show Cause
                Order To Show Cause Set For Jan-15-2013 Continued To Mar-19-2013 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s), And Pay Outstanding Sanctions. Outstanding Sanctions Are To Be Paid By Jan-31-2013. Notice Sent By Court.
                  Blank 22 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: 1/15/2013
                  Mini Minutes For Jan-15-2013 10:30 Am For Dept 610
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: 11/14/2012 Continued Order To Show Cause
                    Order To Show Cause Set For Nov-13-2012 Continued To Jan-15-2013 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). Notice Sent By Court.
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: 11/14/2012 Sanction Order
                      Sanctions Ordered In The Amount Of $350.00 Against Jason Lundberg, Esq. For Failure To Appear At The Order To Show Cause Hearing On: Nov-13-2012, Payable On Or Before Nov-29-2012. Notice Sent By Court.
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 19 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: 11/13/2012
                        Mini Minutes For Nov-13-2012 02:00 Pm For Dept 610
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: 8/15/2012 Continued Order To Show Cause
                          Order To Show Cause Set For Aug-14-2012 Continued To Nov-13-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). Notice Sent By Court.
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 17 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: 8/14/2012
                            Mini Minutes For Aug-14-2012 02:00 Pm For Dept 610
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: 5/11/2012 Continued Order To Show Cause
                              Order To Show Cause Set For May-14-2012 Continued To Aug-14-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The May-14-2012 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: 5/10/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                Order To Show Cause Filed By Plaintiff Belluomini, Dino Flaherty, Susan Stella Pastry Cafe Victoria Pastry Co. Inc.
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: 5/10/2012 Substitution of Attorney
                                  Substitution Of Attorney: Lundberg, Jason Substituted For Shoker, Palvir K As Attorney For Stella Pastry Cafe
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: 5/10/2012 Substitution of Attorney
                                    Substitution Of Attorney: Lundberg, Jason Substituted For Shoker, Palvir K As Attorney For Victoria Pastry Co. Inc.
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: 5/10/2012 Substitution of Attorney
                                      Substitution Of Attorney: Lundberg, Jason Substituted For Shoker, Palvir K As Attorney For Flaherty, Susan
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: 5/10/2012 Substitution of Attorney
                                        Substitution Of Attorney: Lundberg, Jason Substituted For Shoker, Palvir K As Attorney For Belluomini, Dino
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: 1/31/2012 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                          Order To Show Cause Set For Jan-30-2012 Continued To May-14-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). Notice Sent By Court.
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 1/30/2012, Entered: 1/30/2012
                                            Mini Minutes For Jan-30-2012 02:00 Pm For Dept 610
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: 11/9/2011 Order to Show Cause
                                              Order To Show Cause Set For Jan-30-2012 In Department 610 At 2:00 Pm For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The Nov-23-2011 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: 9/23/2011 Order Setting Case Management Conference From Order To Show Cause
                                                Case Management Conference Set For Nov-23-2011 At 9:00 Am In Department 610. The Sep-26-2011 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: 7/29/2011 Order to Show Cause
                                                  Order To Show Cause Set For Sep-26-2011 In Department 610 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The Aug-12-2011 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: 6/10/2011 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
                                                    Order To Show Cause Re Proof Of Service On Jun-21-2011 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 6/9/2011, Entered: 6/9/2011
                                                      Statement Regarding Osc Filed By Plaintiff Belluomini, Dino Flaherty, Susan Stella Pastry Cafe Victoria Pastry Co. Inc.
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/25/2011, Entered: 5/25/2011 Order To Show Cause Re: Proof Of Service
                                                        Added To Proof Of Service Order To Show Cause Calendar Hearing Set For Jun-21-2011 At 09:00 Am In Dept 610
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: 3/9/2011 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                          Notice To Plaintiff
                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/9/2011, Entered: 3/9/2011 Complaint
                                                            Contract/warranty, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Belluomini, Dino Flaherty, Susan Stella Pastry Cafe Victoria Pastry Co. Inc. As To Defendant Citigroup Inc. Wells Fargo & Company Does 1 Through 100 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Aug-12-2011 Proof Of Service Due On May-09-2011 Case Management Statement Due On Jul-28-2011

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 667 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?