N & S Neurology Center, A Medical Group, Inc., A v. State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Public Entity Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 11 510086
Superior Court Judge Loretta Giorgi, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo N & S Neurology Center, A Medical Group, Inc., A Medical Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ito, Ronald W.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Wayne Ito , +1 310 917 1025 rwito@msn.com
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 50, Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Public Entity, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sapper, Judith Debra

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sapper, Judith Debra +1 323 526 2134
Cause of Action Business Tort
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (5) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: 1/2/2013 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
Case Management Conference Of Jan-18-2013 Is Off Calendar. Dismissal On File. Notice Sent By Court.
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document 44 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: 8/3/2012 Dismissal Of Entire Action
    Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: 4/24/2012 Order
      Order Denying Petition For Writ Of Mandate (a134741 Div 2)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: 1/25/2012 Order Setting Case Management Conference
        Assigned To Case Management Department 610 On Jan-18-2013 At 2:00 Pm For Case Management Conference. Notice Sent By Court.
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/25/2012, Entered: 1/25/2012 Case Ordered Off Calendar
          Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Mar-14-2012 Is Off Calendar By Court. Notice Sent By Court.
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 40 Filed: 1/20/2012, Entered: 1/20/2012
            Objection Hearing Jan-20-2012 (610)
              Blank 39 Filed: 1/19/2012, Entered: 1/19/2012
              Added To Calendar For Objection Hearing Hearing Set For Jan-20-2012 At 02:00 Pm In Dept 610
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: 1/4/2012 Order
                Order Re Defendant's Motion For Stay (12/31/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 37 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: 1/4/2012
                  Mini Minutes For Jan-04-2012 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                    Blank 36 Filed: 1/4/2012, Entered: 1/4/2012 Court Filing
                    Law And Motion 302, Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund's Motion To Stay - The Court Grants The Motion To Stay To December 31, 2012. This Ruling Is Without Prejudice To Defendant Seeking A Further Stay Based On Then Existing Conditions. The Stay May Terminate Earlier Based On Completion Of The Wcab Proceedings. Order Signed. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Court Reporter: Lavena Ward Csr #7077
                      Legal Document 35 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Reply
                      Reply To Plntf's Opposition To Motion To Stay Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Public Entity
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: 12/20/2011 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                        Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Oppos Filed By Plaintiff N & S Neurology Center, A Medical Group, Inc., A Medical Corporation
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: 12/20/2011 Opposition
                          Opposition Of Pltf's To Defts Motion To Stay; Declaration Filed By Plaintiff N & S Neurology Center, A Medical Group, Inc., A Medical Corporation
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/15/2011, Entered: 12/15/2011 Order Rescheduling Hearing
                            The Objection Hearing Is Set For Jan-20-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: 12/5/2011 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                              Objection To Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mediation Cut Off Date Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Public Entity
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: 12/5/2011 Motion (civil Generic)
                                Notice Of Motion Andm Otion To Stay; Notice For Stay; Request For Judicial Notice, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Public Entity Hearing Set For Jan-04-2012 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                                  Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Jun-18-2012 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Dec-09-2011 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/23/2011, Entered: 11/23/2011 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
                                    Order To Show Cause Re Mediation Set For Mar-14-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: 10/27/2011 Answer
                                      Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Public Entity
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/21/2011, Entered: 10/21/2011 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                        Case Management Conference Of Nov-04-2011 Continued To Dec-09-2011 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610 To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) As To The First Amended Complaint. Notice Sent By Court.
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 25 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: 10/17/2011
                                          Mini-minutes For Oct-17-2011 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: 10/17/2011 Order
                                            Order Overruling Demurrer To First Amended Complaint
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Blank 23 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: 10/17/2011 Court Filing
                                              Law And Motion 302, Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund's Demurrer To 1st Amended Complaint. Argued And The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling - Overruled With Ten Days To Answer. The First Amended Complaint Is Sufficiently Pled. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Harold Kahn, Reporter: Lavena Ward, Csr #7077
                                                Blank 22 Filed: 10/11/2011, Entered: 10/11/2011
                                                Reply To Pltfs Opposition To Demurrer To Pltfs First Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Public Entity
                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: 10/3/2011
                                                  Request For Judicial Notcie In Support Of Oppos To Demurrer Filed By Plaintiff N & S Neurology Center, A Medical Group, Inc., A Medical Corporation
                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: 10/3/2011
                                                    Opposition Of Pltf's Tod Emurrer Of State Compensation Fund To First Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff N & S Neurology Center, A Medical Group, Inc., A Medical Corporation
                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 9/21/2011, Entered: 9/21/2011
                                                      Demurrer To 1st Amended Complaint, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities ; Request For Judicial Notice Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Public Entity Hearing Set For Oct-17-2011 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: 8/26/2011 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                        Case Management Conference Of Sep-09-2011 Continued To Nov-04-2011 At 9:00 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: 8/25/2011 Complaint
                                                          1st Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff N & S Neurology Center, A Medical Group, Inc., A Medical Corporation As To Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Public Entity Does 1 To 50, Inclusive
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/17/2011, Entered: 8/17/2011 Order Granting In Part And Denying In Part Defendant State
                                                            Order Granting In Part And Denying In Part Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund's Demurrer To Plaintiff's Complaint.
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: 8/16/2011
                                                              Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Public Entity Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: 8/15/2011
                                                                Stipulation To Alternative Dispute Resolution
                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: 8/15/2011
                                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff N & S Neurology Center, A Medical Group, Inc., A Medical Corporation Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: 7/18/2011
                                                                    Mini-minutes For Jul-18-2011 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 7/18/2011, Entered: 7/18/2011 Court Filing
                                                                      Law And Motion 302, Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund's Emurrer To Plaintiff's Complaint. Argued And The Court Took The Matter Under Submission. -- After Hearing, The Court Ruled As Follows: Tentative Ruling Adopted As Final - Defendant's Demurrer To The 1st And 2nd Causes Of Action Is Overruled As To The Grounds Of Res Judicata. However The Demurrer To The 1st Cause Of Action Is Sustained With Leave To Amend For Plaintiff To Plead More Facts To Support Its Allegation That It "advocated" For Appropriate Health Care Which Led To Retaliatory Action. However, If This Cannot Be Pled Because The Subject Cases Are Pending With The Wcab, Then This Case Is Not Ripe. Likewise The Demurrer Is Sustained Without Leave To Amend On The 2nd Cause Of Action As That Is Still On Appeal And It Would Be Improper For This Court To Rule On This Matter At This Time. In Addition, The Court Indicated Plaintiff Has 30 Days Leave To Amend. Defendant To Prepare A Proposed Form Of Order. Judge: Loretta M. Giorgi, Reporter: Karla Ellis-davis, Csr #12998
                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011
                                                                        Supplemental Req. To Take Judicial Ntc Pursuant To Evidence Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Public Entity
                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011
                                                                          Reply To Pltf's Oppos. To Demurrer To Pltf's Complaint Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Public Entity
                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: 7/5/2011
                                                                            Opposition Of Pltf N & S Neurology Center, A Medical Group, Inc. To Demurrer Of State Compensation Insurance Fund To Complaint Filed By Plaintiff N & S Neurology Center, A Medical Group, Inc., A Medical Corporation
                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: 7/5/2011
                                                                              Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Opposition To Demurrer Filed By Plaintiff N & S Neurology Center, A Medical Group, Inc., A Medical Corporation
                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: 6/10/2011
                                                                                Demurrer To Complaint, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities ; Request For Judicial Notice Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Public Entity Hearing Set For Jul-18-2011 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: 6/3/2011 Order
                                                                                  Order Extending Time To Serve And File Response To Complaint To June 10, 2011; Stipulation
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: 5/31/2011
                                                                                    Fee Paid On Stip For An Order Extending Time To Serve And File Response To Complaint; And Order Filed By Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Public Entity
                                                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/22/2011, Entered: 4/22/2011 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                                                      Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff N & S Neurology Center, A Medical Group, Inc., A Medical Corporation Served Apr-15-2011, Personal Service On Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Public Entity
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: 4/11/2011 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                        Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: 4/11/2011 Complaint
                                                                                          Business Tort, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff N & S Neurology Center, A Medical Group, Inc., A Medical Corporation As To Defendant State Compensation Insurance Fund, A Public Entity Does 1 To 50, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Sep-09-2011 Proof Of Service Due On Jun-10-2011 Case Management Statement Due On Aug-25-2011

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 71 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?