Gary Lalley v. Pershing Llc, A Delaware Corporation Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 11 511628
Superior Court Judge Tomar Mason, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Lalley, Gary Individually, Plaintiff

Represented by Horowitz & Clayton

v.
No Logo Does 1 To 20, Defendant
No Logo Pershing LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
No Logo Pershing Llc, A Delaware Corporation, Defendant
Cause of Action Wrongful Discharge
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: 10/27/2011 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
Case Management Conference Of Nov-10-2011 Is Off Calendar. Notice Of Removal On File. Notice Sent By Court.
    Blank 6 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011
    Notice To Adverse Party Of Removal To Federal Court Filed By Defendant Pershing Llc
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 5 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011
      Notice Of Removal Removal Of Action To Federal Court Filed By Defendant Pershing Llc
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: 7/14/2011 Answer
        Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Pershing Llc
          Blank 3 Filed: 6/20/2011, Entered: 6/20/2011
          Notice Of Proof Of Service On Deft Pershing Llc Filed By Plaintiff Lalley, Gary Individually
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document 2 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: 6/10/2011 Notice To Plaintiff
            Notice To Plaintiff
              Legal Document 1 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: 6/10/2011 Complaint
              Wrongful Discharge, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Lalley, Gary Individually As To Defendant Pershing Llc, A Delaware Corporation Does 1 To 20 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Nov-10-2011 Proof Of Service Due On Aug-09-2011 Case Management Statement Due On Oct-26-2011

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 99 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?