Foreman & Brasso, Attorneys At Law v. Joseph Alvarado Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 11 513037
Superior Court Judge Tomar Mason, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Foreman & Brasso, Attorneys At Law, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Foreman & Brasso

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald D. Foreman +1 415 433 3475 +1 415 781 8030 rdf@foremanandbrasso.com
v.
No Logo Alvarado, Joseph An Individual, Defendant
No Logo Blue Cross Of California By And Through Meridian Resource Company, Llc, A California Limited Liability Company, Defendant
No Logo Does 1 To 10, Defendant
No Logo Meridian Resource Company, Llc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ronald L Melluish

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melluish, Ronald L +1 916 683 1599
Cause of Action Other Non Exempt Complaints (complaint In Interpleader For Competing Claims Made On Funds)
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (8) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 50 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: 9/19/2013
Paid Interest Earned Of $39.94 Payable To Joseph Alvarado, Doc #1905553905, Trust Tag #28932, Warrant No. 38202958 (total Check Amount Is $14,811.46 - Includes Remaining Balance Of $14,771.52)
    Blank 49 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: 9/19/2013
    Refund/reimbursement Of $14,771.52 Re 28932 For Transaction W1611803d013 (other Trust Deposit), Payable To Joseph Alvarado, Doc #1905553905, Warrant #38202958, Dated Sep-19-2013
      Blank 48 Filed: 12/24/2012, Entered: 12/24/2012
      Paid Interest Earned Of $26.99 Payable To Meridian Resource Co Llc, Doc #1904984964, Trust Tag #28932, Warrant #38202508 (total Check Amount Is $14,798.51 Includes Principal Amount Of $14,771.52)
        Blank 47 Filed: 12/24/2012, Entered: 12/24/2012
        Refund/reimbursement Of $14,771.52 Re 28932 For Transaction W1611803d013 (other Trust Deposit), Payable To Meridian Resource Co Llc, Doc #1904984964, Warrant #38202508, Dated Dec-24-2012
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: 10/30/2012 Text Judgment
          The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: 1/2 Of Interpleador Deposit With The Court To Defendant Meridian Resource Company Llc In The Amount Of $14771.52, And 1/2 To Defendant Joseph Alvarado In The Amount Of $14771.52 (see Scanned Doc) Notice Of Entry Of Judgment And Affidavit Of Mailing Filed
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: 10/30/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
            Proof Of Service Of Proposed Judgment, By Mail On Defendant Joseph Alvarado Filed By Defendant Meridian Resource Company, Llc
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 44 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: 9/27/2012
              Refund/reimbursement Of $2,750.00 Re 28932 For Transaction W1611803d013 (other Trust Deposit), Payable To Foreman & Brasso, Doc #1904788812, Warrant #38202321, Dated Sep-27-2012
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Trial Brief
                Trial Brief Defendant - Meridian Resource Company
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document 42 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                  Exhibit List And Witness List Of Defendant Filed By Defendant Meridian Resource Company, Llc
                    Legal Document 41 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Statement Of Decision
                    Statement Of Decision
                      Blank 40 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Court Filing
                      Court Trial Calendar On Sep-24-2012 In Dept. 608, Court Trial Conducted, Matter Submitted, Statement Of Decision Is Issued - Judge Curtis E.a. Karnow, Clerk Danial Lemire, Not Reported.
                        Legal Document 39 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Minutes
                        Minutes For Sep-24-2012 10:00 Am
                          Blank 38 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Court Filing
                          Master Short Cause Calendar Of Sep-24-2012 Assigned To Court Trial Calendar On Sep-24-2012 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 608, Curtis Karnow. Time Estimate: 1 Day. Judge: Katherine Feinstein; Clerk: J.i. Roque/e. Bura; Matter Not Reported. (206)
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: 9/19/2012 Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed
                            Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Directing The Clerk Of The Court To Pay $2750 Forthwith Filed By Plaintiff Foreman & Brasso, Attorneys At Law
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document 36 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: 9/13/2012 Order
                              Order Directing The Clerk Of The Court To Pay $2750 Forthwith To Plaintiff-in-interpleader Foreman & Brasso
                                Legal Document 35 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: 8/16/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                Non-oppos. To Mtn For Discharge Filed By Defendant Meridian Resource Company, Llc
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: 7/30/2012 Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed
                                  Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Granting Foreman & Brasso's Motion For Discharge From Liability As A Mere Stakeholder With No Interest In The Interpleader Funds; And Request For Attorney's Fees And Costs Filed By Plaintiff Foreman & Brasso, Attorneys At Law
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: 7/30/2012 Order
                                    Order Granting Foreman & Brasso's Motion For Discharge From Liability As A Mere Stakeholder With No Interest In The Interpleader Funds; And Request For Attorney's Fees And Costs
                                      Blank 32 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: 7/30/2012
                                      Mini Minutes For Jul-30-2012 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                                        Blank 31 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: 7/30/2012 Court Filing
                                        Law And Motion 302, Ruling - A R G U E D; The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling. Plaintiff Foreman & Brasso's Motion For Discharge From Liability As A Mere Stakeholder With No Interest In The Interpleader Funds; Request For Attornney's Fees And Costs - Motion Is Granted. Plaintiff Has Established That It Has No Interest In The Money Deposited With The Court And Dismissal Is Proper Under Ccp § 386.5. Plaintiff Is Awarded $2,750.00 In Attorney's Fees Pursuant To Ccp § 386.6, Which Sum Is Payable Out Of The Funds On Deposit With The Court. The Request For Costs Is Denied Without Prejudice. Plaintiff Failed To File A Memorandum Of Costs Or Sufficiently Explain What Costs It Seeks To Recover. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Curtis Karnow, Clerk: Cynthia Herbert; Court Reporter: Sherry Sawyer Csr # 5976
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: 7/25/2012 Reply
                                          Reply In Support Of Motion For Discharge From Laibility As A Mere Staekholder Filed By Plaintiff Foreman & Brasso, Attorneys At Law
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/25/2012, Entered: 7/25/2012 Declaration
                                            Declaration Of Michael A. Schrieber In Support Of Motion For Discharge Filed By Plaintiff Foreman & Brasso, Attorneys At Law
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: 7/20/2012 Opposition
                                              Opposition To Motion For Discharge From Liability As A Mere Stakeholder With No Interest In The Interpleader Funds And Request For Attorney's Fees And Costs Filed By Defendant Alvarado, Joseph An Individual
                                                Blank 27 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012
                                                Objection Hearing Jul-18-2012 - Trial Date Remains (610)
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: 7/13/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                  Objection To Short Trial Filed By Defendant Alvarado, Joseph An Individual
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/13/2012, Entered: 7/13/2012 Answer
                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Alvarado, Joseph An Individual
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: 6/28/2012 Declaration
                                                      Declaration In Support Of Motion Filed By Plaintiff Foreman & Brasso, Attorneys At Law
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: 6/28/2012 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                                                        Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion Filed By Plaintiff Foreman & Brasso, Attorneys At Law
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: 6/28/2012 Motion (civil Generic)
                                                          Notice Of Motion And Motion For Discharge From Liability As A Mere Stakeholder Filed By Plaintiff Foreman & Brasso, Attorneys At Law Hearing Set For Jul-30-2012 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: 6/26/2012 Order Rescheduling Hearing
                                                            The Jun-22-2012 Objection Hearing Is Rescheduled To Jul-18-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610.
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012
                                                              Added To Calendar For Objection Hearing Hearing Set For Jun-22-2012 At 02:00 Pm In Dept 610
                                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: 6/21/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                Objection To Short Trial Filed By Defendant Alvarado, Joseph An Individual
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                                                                  Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Short Cause Trial Set For Sep-24-2012 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. The Order To Show Cause On Jun-18-2012 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/9/2012, Entered: 4/9/2012 Order to Show Cause
                                                                    Order To Show Cause Set For Jun-18-2012 In Department 610 At 2:00 Pm For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) Joseph Alvarado. The Apr-20-2012 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: 4/6/2012 Case Management Statement
                                                                      Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Meridian Resource Company, Llc Estimated Time For Trial: 1.0 Days
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: 4/6/2012 Case Management Statement
                                                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Foreman & Brasso, Attorneys At Law
                                                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/6/2012, Entered: 4/6/2012 General Denial
                                                                          General Denial Filed By Defendant Alvarado, Joseph An Individual
                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: 4/5/2012
                                                                            Application For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Pursuant To G.c. 68633, Crc 3.51, 8.26, And 8.818 (confidential) Filed By Defendant Alvarado, Joseph An Individual Order For Waiver Of Court Fees And Costs Granted Pursuant To G.c. 68634 (e), Crc 3.52
                                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: 4/5/2012 Case Management Statement
                                                                              Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Alvarado, Joseph An Individual
                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: 2/27/2012
                                                                                Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Filed By Plaintiff Foreman & Brasso, Attorneys At Law
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: 2/6/2012 Case Management Statement
                                                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Foreman & Brasso, Attorneys At Law
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: 2/6/2012 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                    Case Management Conference Of Feb-17-2012 Continued To Apr-20-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610 To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) Joseph Alvarado. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: 12/23/2011 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                      Case Management Conference Of Jan-06-2012 Continued To Feb-17-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610 To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) Joseph Alvarado. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: 12/22/2011 Case Management Statement
                                                                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Foreman & Brasso, Attorneys At Law
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/7/2011, Entered: 11/7/2011 General Denial
                                                                                          General Denial Filed By Defendant Meridian Resource Company, Llc
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: 8/11/2011 Proof of Service of Summons & Com
                                                                                            Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Foreman & Brasso, Attorneys At Law Served Aug-09-2011, Personal Service On Defendant Alvarado, Joseph An Individual
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011
                                                                                              Notice Of Deposit Of $32,293.04 With The Clerk Of The Court Filed By Plaintiff Foreman & Brasso, Attorneys At Law
                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011
                                                                                                Deposit Of Monies On Interpleader, Tran # W1611803d013, Tag # 028932 Deposited By Plaintiff Foreman & Brasso, Attorneys At Law
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                  Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/3/2011, Entered: 8/3/2011 Complaint
                                                                                                    Other Non Exempt Complaints, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Foreman & Brasso, Attorneys At Law As To Defendant Alvarado, Joseph An Individual Blue Cross Of California By And Through Meridian Resource Company, Llc, A California Limited Liability Company Does 1 To 10 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jan-06-2012 Proof Of Service Due On Oct-03-2011 Case Management Statement Due On Dec-22-2011

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 2,644 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?