Charles Go v. Nizar Awadalla Dba Nizario's Pizza Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 11 513781
Superior Court Judge Katherine Feinstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Go, Charles, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Roseann Torres

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roseann Torres +1 510 835 2484
v.
No Logo Awadalla, Nizario Dba Nizario's Pizza, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Does 1 To 100, Defendant
No Logo Nizar Awadalla Dba Nizario's Pizza, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: 8/31/2012 Notice of Entry of Judgment
Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Following Granting Of Mtn For Summary Judgment Filed By Deft Nizar Awadalla Dba Nizario's Pizza
    Blank 32 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: 8/27/2012
    Master Jury Calendar Set For Sep-10-2012 Vacated. Judgment On File. (206)
      Legal Document 31 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: 8/27/2012 Judgment For Defendant
      The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff Go, Charles Take Nothing From Defendant Nizar Awadalla Dba Nizario's Pizza (see Scanned Document)
        Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: 8/13/2012 Notice of Settlement
        Notice Of Settlement Filed By Plaintiff Go, Charles
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: 8/6/2012 Notice of Settlement
          Notice Of Settlement Filed By Plaintiff Go, Charles
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: 6/27/2012 Memorandum Of Costs And Disbursements
            Memorandum Of Costs And Disbursements, $4,153.20 Total Costs, Mature Date Jul-17-2012, Filed By Defendant Awadalla, Nizario Dba Nizario's Pizza
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: 6/13/2012 Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed
              Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Granting Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Nizar Awadalla Dba Nizario's Pizza
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 26 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: 6/13/2012
                Mini Minutes For Jun-13-2012 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                  Blank 25 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: 6/13/2012 Court Filing
                  Law And Motion 302, Defendant Nizard Awadalla Dba Nizario's Pizza's Motion For Summary Judgment Is Granted. Defendant Satisfied Its Summary Judgment Burden And Plaintiff Did Not Present Any Facts Showing That Defendant Owed Plaintiff A Duty To Protect Him Against Third Party Criminal Conduct. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Harold E. Kahn; Court Reporter: Lavena Ward Csr #7077
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: 6/13/2012 Order
                    Order Granting Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: 6/11/2012 Case Ordered Off Calendar
                      Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Jun-13-2012 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                        Response To Pltffs Seperate Statement Of Disputed And Undisputed Facts In Opposition To Defts Motion For Summary Judgment Or, Alternatively Summary Adjudication Filed By Defendant Nizar Awadalla Dba Nizario's Pizza
                          Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                          Opposition And Objections To Evidence Presented By Pltff In Support Of Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment Or In The Alternative Summary Adjudication Filed By Defendant Nizar Awadalla Dba Nizario's Pizza
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                            Reply To Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Nizar Awadalla Dba Nizario's Pizza
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 19 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: 5/30/2012
                              Declaration Of Seven Ayala Filed By Plaintiff Go, Charles
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: 5/30/2012 Separate Statement Of Facts
                                Separate Statement Of Facts In Opposition To Defts Summ Judgment Filed By Plaintiff Go, Charles
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: 5/30/2012 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                                  Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Defts Summ Judgment Filed By Plaintiff Go, Charles
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: 5/29/2012 Declaration
                                    Declaration Of 1 Filed By Plaintiff Go, Charles
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/7/2012, Entered: 5/7/2012 Proof of Service of Summons
                                      Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Go, Charles Served Oct-25-2011, Personal Service On Defendant Nizar Awadalla Dba Nizario's Pizza
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: 3/22/2012 Separate Statement Of Facts
                                        Separate Statement Of Facts In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Awadalla, Nizario Dba Nizario's Pizza
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: 3/22/2012 Request For Judicial Notice
                                          Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: 3/22/2012 Declaration
                                            Declaration In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Awadalla, Nizario Dba Nizario's Pizza
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: 3/22/2012 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                                              Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Awadalla, Nizario Dba Nizario's Pizza
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: 3/22/2012 Proof of Service
                                                Proof Of Service Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Awadalla, Nizario Dba Nizario's Pizza
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: 3/22/2012 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                  Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Awadalla, Nizario Dba Nizario's Pizza Hearing Set For Jun-13-2012 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: 1/12/2012 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                                                    Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Sep-10-2012 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Jan-27-2012 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/12/2012, Entered: 1/12/2012 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
                                                      Order To Show Cause Re Mediation Set For Jun-13-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: 1/10/2012 Case Management Statement
                                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Go, Charles Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/6/2012, Entered: 1/6/2012 Case Management Statement
                                                          Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Awadalla, Nizario Dba Nizario's Pizza Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: 12/19/2011 Answer
                                                            Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Awadalla, Nizario Dba Nizario's Pizza
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: 12/16/2011
                                                              1st Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Go, Charles As To Defendant Nizar Awadalla Dba Nizario's Pizza Does 1 To 100
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: 8/26/2011 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: 8/26/2011 Complaint
                                                                  Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Go, Charles As To Defendant Nizar Awadalla Dba Nizario's Pizza Does 1 To 100 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jan-27-2012 Proof Of Service Due On Oct-25-2011 Case Management Statement Due On Jan-12-2012

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 175 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?