Malcolm Dunlevie v. Daniel J Frischmann Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 11 514123
Superior Court Judge Katherine Feinstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Dunlevie, Malcolm, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Barry, Nelson Clyde

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry, Nelson Clyde +1 415 587 0550
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 100, Defendant
No Logo Frischmann, Daniel J, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ota, Paul J.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ota, Paul J. +1 925 977 1400
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: 12/4/2012
Master Jury Calendar Set For Jan-07-2013 Vacated. Dismissal Filed On 11/1/12. (206)
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: 11/1/2012 Dismissal Of Entire Action
    Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/10/2012, Entered: 7/10/2012 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
      Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Jan-07-2013 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Is Removed From Arbitration. Notice Sent By Court.
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: 6/25/2012 Stipulation
        Stipulation To Adr - Private Mediation; Filed By Dunlevie, Malcolm Frischmann, Daniel J
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: 6/11/2012 Order To Arbitration
          Assigned To Arbitration For Jul-16-2012. Jun-22-2012 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Case Management Statement
            Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Dunlevie, Malcolm Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: 6/7/2012 Case Management Statement
              Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Frischmann, Daniel J Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: 5/8/2012 Order Setting Case Management Conference
                Case Management Conference Set For Jun-22-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610 For The Submission Of Case Management Statements. The May-21-2012 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/2/2012, Entered: 5/2/2012 Response to Order to Show Cause
                  Response To Order To Show Cause Re: Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Dunlevie, Malcolm
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/28/2012, Entered: 3/28/2012 Answer
                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Frischmann, Daniel J
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: 3/20/2012 Continued Order To Show Cause
                      Order To Show Cause Set For Mar-26-2012 Continued To May-21-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The Mar-26-2012 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: 3/12/2012 Response to Order to Show Cause
                        Response To Order To Show Cause Re Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Dunlevie, Malcolm
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: 1/27/2012 Order to Show Cause
                          Order To Show Cause Set For Mar-26-2012 In Department 610 At 2:00 Pm For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The Feb-10-2012 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: 9/12/2011 Notice To Plaintiff
                            Notice To Plaintiff
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: 9/12/2011 Complaint
                              Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Dunlevie, Malcolm As To Defendant Frischmann, Daniel J Does 1 To 100 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Feb-10-2012 Proof Of Service Due On Nov-14-2011 Case Management Statement Due On Jan-26-2012

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 260 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?