Toalua Mcmullin Et Al v. Remie Pasion Aranda Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 11 516062
Superior Court Judge Katherine Feinstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Mcmullin, Julia, Plaintiff

Represented by Larsen, Brian L

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian L Larsen +1 415 493 2500
No Logo Mcmullin, Toalua, Plaintiff

Represented by Larsen, Brian L

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian L Larsen +1 415 493 2500
v.
No Logo Aranda, Jaemie, Defendant

Represented by Edward L Hummer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Day, Samantha +1 925 825 9500
No Logo Aranda, Remie Pasion, Defendant
No Logo Aranda-rogan, Remie (erroneously Sued As Remie Pasion Aranda), Defendant

Represented by Edward L Hummer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Day, Samantha +1 925 825 9500
No Logo Does 1 To 10, Defendant
No Logo Kim, Kimberly Hyon, Defendant

Represented by Ota, Paul J.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ota, Paul J. +1 925 977 1400
No Logo Yin, Dominic, Defendant

Represented by Ota, Paul J.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ota, Paul J. +1 925 977 1400
No Logo Aranda-rogan, Remie (erroneously Sued As Remie Pasion Aranda), Cross-Complainant

Represented by Edward L Hummer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Day, Samantha +1 925 825 9500
No Logo Foes 1-100, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Kim, Kimberly Hyon, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Ota, Paul J.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ota, Paul J. +1 925 977 1400
No Logo Roes 1 Through 50, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Yin, Dominic, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Ota, Paul J.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ota, Paul J. +1 925 977 1400
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: 11/5/2012 Dismissal
Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: 11/5/2012 Dismissal
    Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Kim, Kimberly Hyon, Yin, Dominic ; Cross Complaint By Remie Aranda-rogan
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: 7/6/2012 Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator (crc 3.815)
      Arbitrator Newton Lee Ormasa Appointed. Arbitrator's Jurisdiction Jul-06-2012 Through Oct-04-2012.
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: 7/5/2012 Cross Defendant(s) Rejected Proposed Arbitrator Claudia W. Brisson
        Cross Defendant(s) Rejected Proposed Arbitrator Claudia W. Brisson
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Plaintiff(s) Rejected Proposed Arbitrator Peter Ray Gilbert.
          Plaintiff(s) Rejected Proposed Arbitrator Peter Ray Gilbert.
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Defendant(s) Rejected Proposed Arbitrator Claudia W. Brisson.
            Defendant(s) Rejected Proposed Arbitrator Claudia W. Brisson.
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Answer
              Answer To Cross Complaint (of Remie Aranda Rogan) Filed By Cross Defendant Kim, Kimberly Hyon Yin, Dominic
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: 6/25/2012 Notice Of Random Selection From Panel Of Arbitrators
                Panel Of Arbitrators Assigned. Rejection Date Jul-05-2012.
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: 6/1/2012 Cross Complaint
                  Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Aranda-rogan, Remie (erroneously Sued As Remie Pasion Aranda) As To Cross Defendant Kim, Kimberly Hyon Yin, Dominic Foes 1-100
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: 6/1/2012 Answer
                    Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Aranda-rogan, Remie (erroneously Sued As Remie Pasion Aranda)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Response to Order to Show Cause
                      Response To Order To Show Cause Re: Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Mcmullin, Toalua Mcmullin, Julia
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: 4/25/2012 Order To Arbitration
                        Assigned To Arbitration For Jun-25-2012. May-07-2012 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: 3/22/2012 Case Management Statement
                          Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Aranda-rogan, Remie (erroneously Sued As Remie Pasion Aranda) Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 13 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012
                            First Appearance Fee Paid For Defendant Filed By Defendant Aranda, Jaemie
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: 3/9/2012 Case Management Statement
                              Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Kim, Kimberly Hyon Yin, Dominic Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: 3/9/2012 Order to Show Cause
                                Order To Show Cause Set For May-07-2012 In Department 610 At 2:00 Pm For Failure To File Proof Of Service And Obtain Answer(s) Or Enter Default(s) Against Defendant(s) Jaemie Aranda. The Mar-23-2012 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: 3/8/2012 Case Management Statement
                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Mcmullin, Toalua Mcmullin, Julia Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 4.0 Days
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: 3/6/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                    Demand For Jury Trial Filed By Defendant Kim, Kimberly Hyon Yin, Dominic
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: 3/6/2012 Cross Complaint
                                      Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Kim, Kimberly Hyon Yin, Dominic As To Cross Defendant Aranda-rogan, Remie (erroneously Sued As Remie Pasion Aranda) Roes 1 Through 50
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/6/2012, Entered: 3/6/2012 Answer
                                        Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Kim, Kimberly Hyon Yin, Dominic
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: 1/26/2012
                                          Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Aranda, Jaemie Aranda-rogan, Remie (erroneously Sued As Remie Pasion Aranda)
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Proof of Service of Summons
                                            Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Mcmullin, Toalua Mcmullin, Julia Served Jan-04-2012, Personal Service On Defendant Aranda, Remie Pasion
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Proof of Service of Summons
                                              Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Mcmullin, Toalua Mcmullin, Julia Served Jan-04-2012, Personal Service On Defendant Aranda, Jaemie
                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/18/2012, Entered: 1/18/2012 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Mcmullin, Toalua Mcmullin, Julia Served Jan-05-2012, Personal Service On Defendant Kim, Kimberly Hyon
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: 11/22/2011 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                  Notice To Plaintiff
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/22/2011, Entered: 11/22/2011 Complaint
                                                    Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Mcmullin, Toalua Mcmullin, Julia As To Defendant Aranda, Remie Pasion Kim, Kimberly Hyon Yin, Dominic Aranda, Jaemie Does 1 To 10 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Mar-23-2012 Proof Of Service Due On Jan-23-2012 Case Management Statement Due On Mar-08-2012

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 145 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?