Christine Martin v. Cityscape Properties, Llc Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 11 516201
Superior Court Judge Katherine Feinstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Martin, Christine, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Dolan Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher B. Dolan +1 415 421 2800 +1 415 412 2830 chris@cbdlaw.com
v.
No Logo 650 2nd Street Owners' Association (erroneously Sues As 650 Second Street Associates, Lp), Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo 650 Second Street Associates, Lp, Defendant
No Logo City and County of San Francisco, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City and County of San Francisco

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David W. Ammons +1 415 554 3954 +1 415 554 3837 david.ammons@sfgov.org
No Logo Cityscape Properties, Llc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Does 1 To 50, Defendant
No Logo The Citiscape Property Management Group, Llc (erroneously Sued As Cityscape Properties, Llc), Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo 650 2nd Street Owners' Association (erroneously Sues As 650 Second Street Associates, Lp), Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Cityscape Properties, Llc, Cross-Defendant
No Logo ROES 1-50, Cross-Defendant
No Logo The Citiscape Property Management Group, Llc (erroneously Sued As Cityscape Properties, Llc), Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo City and County of San Francisco, Cross-Complainant
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (5) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 31 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: 9/25/2013 Order Dismissing Case Pursuant To Crc 3.1385
Case Dismissed By Court At Order To Show Cause Hearing Sep-24-2013 At 10:30 Am Pursuant To Crc 3.1385. This Dismissal Pertains To The Remaining Cross Complaint(s). Notice Sent By Court.
    Blank 30 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: 9/24/2013
    Mini Minutes For Sep-24-2013 10:30 Am For Dept 610
      Legal Document 29 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: 7/17/2013 Dismissal Of Entire Action
      Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
        Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: 7/11/2013 Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
        Mandatory Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Jul-23-2013 Not Held And Removed. Case Settled Prior To Conference. Assigned To Dept. 610 On Sep-24-2013 At 10:30 Am For Dismissal Per Crc 3.1385. (1.3)
          Blank 27 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: 7/11/2013
          Removed From Master Jury Calendar Set For Jul-29-2013 - Case Settled.
            Blank 26 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013
            Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Cityscape Properties, Llc
              Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/5/2013, Entered: 7/5/2013 Dismissal
              Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By City And County Of San Francisco
                Blank 24 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: 7/2/2013
                Notice Of Settlement Filed By Plaintiff Martin, Christine
                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 Order Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference
                  Notice Of Settlement Conference; Settlement Conference Set For Jul-23-2013 At 1:00 Pm In Dept. 210 With Conference Officer Peter Mallon.
                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: 11/7/2012 Notice of Change of Address
                    Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Takahashi, Irene
                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: 8/17/2012 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                      Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Jul-29-2013 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Notice Sent By Court.
                        Blank 20 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: 8/15/2012
                        Objection Hearing Aug-15-2012 (610)
                          Blank 19 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: 8/14/2012
                          Added To Calendar For Objection Hearing Hearing Set For Aug-15-2012 At 02:00 Pm In Dept 610
                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: 8/10/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                            Objection To Ntc Of Time And Place Of Trial Filed By Defendant The Citiscape Property Management Group, Llc (erroneously Sued As Cityscape Properties, Llc)
                              Blank 17 Filed: 8/1/2012, Entered: 8/1/2012
                              Jury Fees Deposited By Plaintiff Martin, Christine
                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/31/2012, Entered: 7/31/2012 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                                Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Apr-15-2013 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Aug-15-2012 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/24/2012, Entered: 7/24/2012 Case Management Statement
                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant The Citiscape Property Management Group, Llc (erroneously Sued As Cityscape Properties, Llc) Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: 7/23/2012
                                    Jury Fees Deposited By Defendant The Citiscape Property Management Group, Llc (erroneously Sued As Cityscape Properties, Llc) 650 2nd Street Owners' Association (erroneously Sues As 650 Second Street Associates, Lp)
                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: 6/21/2012 Answer
                                      Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant The Citiscape Property Management Group, Llc (erroneously Sued As Cityscape Properties, Llc) 650 2nd Street Owners' Association (erroneously Sues As 650 Second Street Associates, Lp)
                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: 6/21/2012 Answer
                                        Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant The Citiscape Property Management Group, Llc (erroneously Sued As Cityscape Properties, Llc) 650 2nd Street Owners' Association (erroneously Sues As 650 Second Street Associates, Lp)
                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: 6/12/2012 Proof of Service of Summons
                                          Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Martin, Christine Served May-17-2012, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Cityscape Properties, Llc
                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: 6/1/2012 Case Management Statement
                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Martin, Christine Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: 6/1/2012 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                              Case Management Conference Of Jun-15-2012 Continued To Aug-15-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: 4/13/2012 Case Management Statement
                                                Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Martin, Christine Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: 4/13/2012 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                  Case Management Conference Of Apr-27-2012 Continued To Jun-15-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: 4/11/2012 Cross Complaint
                                                    Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant City And County Of San Francisco As To Cross Defendant Cityscape Properties, Llc Roes 1-50
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: 4/11/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                      Objection To Court Commissioner Filed By Defendant City And County Of San Francisco
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: 4/11/2012 Answer
                                                        Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant City And County Of San Francisco
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: 3/13/2012 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                          Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Martin, Christine Served Mar-01-2012, Personal Service On Defendant City And County Of San Francisco
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                            Notice To Plaintiff
                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/29/2011, Entered: 11/29/2011 Complaint
                                                              Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Martin, Christine As To Defendant Cityscape Properties, Llc 650 Second Street Associates, Lp City And County Of San Francisco Does 1 To 50 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Apr-27-2012 Proof Of Service Due On Jan-30-2012 Case Management Statement Due On Apr-12-2012

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 104 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?