Elizabeth Peregrino v. Charles L Moore Jr Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 11 516426
Superior Court Judge Katherine Feinstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Peregrino, Elizabeth, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrus Anderson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennie Lee Anderson +1 415 896 1000 +1 415 896 2249 jennie@andrusanderson.com
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 20, Defendant
No Logo Moore Jr, Charles L, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ota, Paul J.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ota, Paul J. +1 925 977 1400
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (5) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 36 Filed: 8/12/2013, Entered: 8/12/2013
Order For Mtn To Intervene
    Blank 35 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012
    Master Jury Calendar Set For Dec-10-2012 Vacated. Dismissal On File. (206)
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: 8/31/2012 Proof Of Service By Mail
      Proof Of Service By Mail Of Request For Dismissal Filed By Plaintiff Peregrino, Elizabeth
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: 8/31/2012 Dismissal
        Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: 8/15/2012 Notice of Settlement
          Notice Of Settlement Filed By Plaintiff Peregrino, Elizabeth
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 31 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012
            Mini Minutes For Jun-22-2012 09:30 Am For Dept 302
              Blank 30 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012
              Mini Minutes For Jun-22-2012 09:30 Am For Dept 302
                Legal Document 29 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012 Order
                Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion To Compel Defendant Charles L. Moore, Jr.'s Further Responses To Plaintiff's First Request For Production Of Documents And Sanctions
                  Blank 28 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012 Court Filing
                  Law And Motion 302, A R G U E D; The Court Ruled As Follows: Defendant Charles Moore's Motion For Relief From Waiver Of Objections Due To Late Responses To Plaintiff's Request For Production Of Documents Is Denied. (prevailing Party To Prepare A Form Of Order.) Judge: Harold Kahn; Court Reporter: Joanne Bryce, Csr # 3321
                    Blank 27 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: 6/22/2012 Court Filing
                    Law And Motion 302, A R G U E D; The Court Ruled As Follows: Plaintiff Elizabeth Peregrino's Motion To Compel Further Responses To Plaintiff's First Request For Production Of Documents And For An Order Imposing Monetary Sanctions Is Granted In Part. Motion To Compel Is Granted. Recorded Statement And All Documents To Be Provided By Noon On Monday, June 25, 2012. Sanction In The Amount Of $1,125.00 To Be Paid By July 13, 2012. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Harold Kahn; Court Reporter: Joanne Bryce, Csr # 3321
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: 6/21/2012 Reply
                      Reply To Pltf's Oppos To Motion For Relief From Waiver Of Objections Due To Late Responses Filed By Defendant Moore Jr, Charles L
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: 6/21/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                        Pos Of Reply In Support Of Mtn To Compel Further Responses To Pltf's First Req. For Production Of Documents And For An Order Imposing Monetary Sanctions Filed By Plaintiff Peregrino, Elizabeth
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: 6/21/2012 Reply
                          Reply In Support Of Mtn To Compel Further Responses To Pltf's First Req. For Production Of Documents And For An Order Imposing Monetary Sanctions Filed By Plaintiff Peregrino, Elizabeth
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: 6/20/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                            Pos Of Notice Of Motion To Compel Further Responses To Pltf's First Request For Production Of Documents And For An Order Imposing Monetary Sanctions; Memo P/a; Separate Statement; Declaration Of Jennie Lee Filed By Plaintiff Peregrino, Elizabeth
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: 6/20/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                              Pos Of Opposition To Deft's Motion For Relief From Waiver Of Objections Due To Late Responses To Pltf's Request For Production Of Documents Filed By Plaintiff Peregrino, Elizabeth
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: 6/20/2012 Opposition
                                Opposition To Deft's Motion For Relief From Waiver Of Objections Due To Late Responses To Pltf's Request For Production Of Documents Filed By Plaintiff Peregrino, Elizabeth
                                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: 6/20/2012 Opposition
                                  Opposition To Pltfs Motion To Compel Filed By Defendant Moore Jr, Charles L
                                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: 6/20/2012 Motion (civil Generic)
                                    Mtn For Relief From Waiver Of Objections Due To Late Responses To Pltf's Req For Production Of Docs Filed By Defendant Moore Jr, Charles L Hearing Set For Jun-22-2012 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: 6/19/2012 Separate Statement Of Facts
                                      Separate Statement Of Facts In Support Of Motion Filed By Plaintiff Peregrino, Elizabeth
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: 6/19/2012 Declaration
                                        Declaration In Support Of Motion Filed By Plaintiff Peregrino, Elizabeth
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: 6/19/2012 Motion (civil Generic)
                                          Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Further Responses To Pltf's First Request For Production Of Documents And For An Order Imposing Monetary Sanctions; Memo Of P&a Filed By Plaintiff Peregrino, Elizabeth Hearing Set For Jun-22-2012 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: 6/19/2012 Order
                                            Order Re Stipulation For Order Shotening Time To Hear Plaintiffs' Motion To Compel Further Responses To Plaintiffs' First Request For Production Of Documents And Defendant's Motion For Relief From Waiver (hearing Set For 6/22/12; Opposition By 4pm On 6/20; Reply By 4pm On 6/21, No Tentative Ruling Will Be Issued)
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Blank 14 Filed: 6/19/2012, Entered: 6/19/2012
                                              Fee Paid On Stip And [proposed] Order Shortening Time To Hear Pltf's Motion To Compel Further Responses Filed By Plaintiff Peregrino, Elizabeth
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: 5/25/2012 Notice Of Early Settlement Conference--early Settlement Prgm
                                                Notice Of Early Settlement Conference - Early Settlement Program
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: 5/16/2012 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                                                  Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Dec-10-2012 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: 5/11/2012
                                                    Objection Hearing May-11-2012 (610)
                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 5/10/2012, Entered: 5/10/2012
                                                      Added To Calendar For Objection Hearing Hearing Set For May-11-2012 At 02:00 Pm In Dept 610
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: 5/9/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                        Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Peregrino, Elizabeth
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: 5/9/2012 Declaration
                                                          Declaration Of Jennie Lee Anderson Filed By Plaintiff Peregrino, Elizabeth
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: 5/9/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                            Objection To Order To Arbitration Filed By Plaintiff Peregrino, Elizabeth
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: 4/27/2012 Case Management Statement
                                                              Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Moore Jr, Charles L Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: 4/26/2012 Order To Arbitration
                                                                Assigned To Arbitration For Jul-09-2012. May-11-2012 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/17/2012, Entered: 2/17/2012 Answer
                                                                  Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Moore Jr, Charles L
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/27/2011, Entered: 12/27/2011 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                                    Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Peregrino, Elizabeth Served Dec-20-2011, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Moore Jr, Charles L
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: 12/8/2011 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                      Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/8/2011, Entered: 12/8/2011 Complaint
                                                                        Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Peregrino, Elizabeth As To Defendant Moore Jr, Charles L Does 1 To 20 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For May-11-2012 Proof Of Service Due On Feb-06-2012 Case Management Statement Due On Apr-26-2012

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 305 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?