James Guay Et Al v. Donna H Reid Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 12 517305
Superior Court Judge Katherine Feinstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Guay, James, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by M C Hall & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hall, Michael C +1 415 512 9865
No Logo Hurtado, Raul, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by M C Hall & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hall, Michael C +1 415 512 9865
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 20, Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Reid, Donna H An Individual, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Reid, Ethel A Individually And As Trustee Of The Ethel A Reid And William B Reid Revocable Trust, Defendant
No Logo Reid, William B Individually And As Trustee Of The Ethel A Reid And William B Reid Revocavle Trust, Defendant
Cause of Action Wrongful Eviction
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: 1/3/2013
Master Jury Calendar Set For Jan-07-2013 Vacated. Dismissal Filed On 8/27/12. (206)
    Blank 9 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: 8/27/2012
    Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: 5/31/2012 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
      Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Jan-07-2013 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Jun-15-2012 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: 5/23/2012 Notice Ofentry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service
        Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Guay, James Hurtado, Raul
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: 5/18/2012 Case Management Statement
          Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Guay, James Hurtado, Raul Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/17/2012, Entered: 5/17/2012 Dismissal
            Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Reid, William B Individually And As Trustee Of The Ethel A Reid And William B Reid Revocavle Trust Reid, Ethel A Individually And As Trustee Of The Ethel A Reid And William B Reid Revocable Trust
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: 4/18/2012 Answer
              Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Reid, Donna H An Individual
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012 Proof of Service of Summons
                Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Guay, James Hurtado, Raul Served Mar-13-2012, Personal Service On Defendant Reid, Donna H An Individual
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012 Notice To Plaintiff
                  Notice To Plaintiff
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: 1/13/2012 Complaint
                    Wrongful Eviction, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Guay, James Hurtado, Raul As To Defendant Reid, Donna H An Individual Reid, William B Individually And As Trustee Of The Ethel A Reid And William B Reid Revocavle Trust Reid, Ethel A Individually And As Trustee Of The Ethel A Reid And William B Reid Revocable Trust Does 1 To 20, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jun-15-2012 Proof Of Service Due On Mar-13-2012 Case Management Statement Due On May-31-2012

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 53 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?