Burt J. Hamrol Sr. v. Jill Ann Bergmann Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 12 518298
Superior Court Judge Katherine Feinstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Hamrol Sr., Burt J., Plaintiff

Pro Se

v.
No Logo Bergmann, Jill Ann, Defendant

Represented by Ota, Paul J.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ota, Paul J. +1 925 977 1400
No Logo Does 1 To 20, Defendant
No Logo Seiberlich, Mark James, Defendant

Represented by Ota, Paul J.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ota, Paul J. +1 925 977 1400
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (7) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: 9/18/2013 Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
Removed From Master Jury Calendar Set For Sep-23-2013. Notice Of Settlement Was Filed On 9/11/13. Case Is Assigned To Dept. 610 On Feb-25-2014 At 10:30 Am For Dismissal Per Crc 3.1385. (206)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document 35 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: 9/11/2013 Notice of Settlement
    Notice Of Settlement Filed By Plaintiff Hamrol Sr., Burt J.
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: 7/2/2013 Notice Of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference
      Mandatory Settlement Conference Set For Jul-08-2013 Is Rescheduled To Sep-09-2013 At 8:30 Am In 210; Reassigned To Conference Officer Ron Bushner.
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 Stipulation
        Stipulation To Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference Filed By Hamrol Sr., Burt J.
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: 6/28/2013 Ex Parte Application for Order
          Ex Parte Application For Order To Enter Stipulation To Continue Mandatory Settlement Conference, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Hamrol Sr., Burt J.
            Blank 31 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013
            Master Jury Calendar Set For Jul-29-2013 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Sep-23-2013 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 Per Stipulated Ex Parte Order Filed 6/14/13. (206)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document 30 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013 Order
              Order - Stipulation Andorder To Continue Trial And All Related Dates And Deadlines
                Blank 29 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: 6/14/2013
                Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time For Hearing On Def's Mtn To Continue Trial, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Bergmann, Jill Ann Seiberlich, Mark James
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: 5/29/2013 Order Setting Mandatory Settlement Conference
                  Notice Of Settlement Conference Set For Jul-08-2013 At 8:30 Am In Dept. 210 With Conference Officer Jim Lynch.
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 27 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013 Court Filing
                    Discovery, 302, No Appearances. The Court Adopts Its Tentative Ruling: Defendants Jill Bergmann & Mark Seiberlich's Motion For An Order To Compel Responses To Request For Document Production And Answers To Interrogatories Is Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party. Judge Pro Tem Paul Renne, Clerk: Lesley Fiscella, Not Reported.
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 26 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013
                      Mini Minutes For Apr-26-2013 09:00 Am For Dept 302
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 25 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: 3/25/2013
                        Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn For An Order To Compel Responses To Req For Document Production And Answers To Interrogatories, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Bergmann, Jill Ann Seiberlich, Mark James Hearing Set For Apr-26-2013 At 09:00 Am In Dept 302
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 24 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: 3/22/2013
                          Msc Setting Review Continued
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: 11/16/2012 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                            Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Jul-29-2013 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Notice Sent By Court.
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 22 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: 11/14/2012
                              Review For Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 21 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: 11/14/2012
                                Objection Hearing Nov-14-2012 (610)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 20 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: 11/13/2012
                                  Added To Calendar For Objection Hearing Hearing Set For Nov-14-2012 At 02:00 Pm In Dept 610
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 19 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: 11/9/2012
                                    Jury Fees Deposited By Defendant Bergmann, Jill Ann
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: 11/9/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                      Demand For Jury Trial Filed By Defendant Bergmann, Jill Ann Seiberlich, Mark James
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: 11/8/2012 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                        Pltfs Objection To Order Setting Matter For Trial Filed By Plaintiff Hamrol Sr., Burt J.
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: 11/2/2012 Case Management Statement
                                          Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Bergmann, Jill Ann Seiberlich, Mark James Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: 11/1/2012 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                                            Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For May-20-2013 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Nov-14-2012 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: 10/30/2012 Case Management Statement
                                              Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Hamrol Sr., Burt J. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: 9/27/2012 Order Setting Case Management Conference From Order To Show Cause
                                                Case Management Conference Set For Nov-14-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610 For The Submission Of Case Management Statements. The Oct-16-2012 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/24/2012, Entered: 9/24/2012 Declaration
                                                  Declaration Of John R. Meehan Filed By Plaintiff Hamrol Sr., Burt J.
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: 9/7/2012 Answer
                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Bergmann, Jill Ann Seiberlich, Mark James
                                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/16/2012, Entered: 8/16/2012 Order to Show Cause
                                                      Order To Show Cause Set For Oct-16-2012 In Department 610 At 2:00 Pm For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s). The Aug-29-2012 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/14/2012, Entered: 8/14/2012 Case Management Statement
                                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Hamrol Sr., Burt J. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: 7/30/2012
                                                          Jury Fees Deposited By Plaintiff Hamrol Sr., Burt J.
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/6/2012, Entered: 7/6/2012 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                            Case Management Conference Of Jul-20-2012 Continued To Aug-29-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: 6/28/2012 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                              Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Hamrol Sr., Burt J. Served Jun-27-2012, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Seiberlich, Mark James
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: 6/28/2012 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                                Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Hamrol Sr., Burt J. Served Jun-25-2012, Personal Service On Defendant Bergmann, Jill Ann
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 6/25/2012, Entered: 6/25/2012 Case Management Statement
                                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Hamrol Sr., Burt J. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/20/2012, Entered: 6/20/2012 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                    Substitution Of Attorney: Delara Nannette Substituted For Pro Per As Attorney For Hamrol Sr., Burt J.
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                      Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: 2/16/2012 Complaint
                                                                        Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Hamrol Sr., Burt J. As To Defendant Bergmann, Jill Ann Seiberlich, Mark James Does 1 To 20 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jul-20-2012 Proof Of Service Due On Apr-16-2012 Case Management Statement Due On Jul-05-2012

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 127 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?