Patricia Valdez v. Continental Airlines Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 12 518596
Superior Court Judge Katherine Feinstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Valdez, Patricia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by H. Nelson Meeks

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space H. Nelson Meeks +1 415 989 9915 nelsonmeeks@cs.com
v.
No Logo Continental Airlines, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kramer, Deboer & Keane, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosaline S. Ayoub +1 818 657 0255

Toggle Switch Represented by Meadows, David W.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geronimo Perez +1 310 943 4755 gperez@dfis-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WONG FLEMING PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cochran, Deborah S. +1 619 595 4804
No Logo Does 1 To 50, Defendant
No Logo Primeflight Aviation Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kramer, Deboer & Keane, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rosaline S. Ayoub +1 818 657 0255

Toggle Switch Represented by WONG FLEMING PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cochran, Deborah S. +1 619 595 4804
Space Geronimo Perez +1 310 943 4755 gperez@dfis-law.com
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (6) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 32 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013
Master Jury Calendar Set For Dec-09-2013 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Mar-10-2014 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 Per Stipulated Ex Parte Order Filed 10/16/13. All Further Continuances Must Be Sought By Noticed Motion Only. (206)
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013 Order
    Order Granting Defendants' Ex Parte Application To Continue Trial, Discovery Cut-off And All Other Trial Related Dates Pursuant To Stipulation
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 30 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013
      Declaration In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Order Filed By Defendant Continental Airlines
        Blank 29 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: 10/16/2013
        Ex Parte Application For Order To Cont Trial; Stip Filed By Defendant Continental Airlines
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: 7/1/2013 Substitution of Attorney
          Substitution Of Attorney: Ayoub, Rosaline S. Substituted For Cochran, Deborah S. As Attorney For Continental Airlines
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: 7/1/2013 Substitution of Attorney
            Substitution Of Attorney: Ayoub, Rosaline S. Substituted For Cochran, Deborah S. As Attorney For Primeflight Aviation Services
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 26 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: 5/8/2013
              Notice Of Merger Filed By Defendant Continental Airlines Primeflight Aviation Services
                Blank 25 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: 5/8/2013
                Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Continental Airlines Primeflight Aviation Services
                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: 5/7/2013 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                  Pos Of Ntc Of Ruling On Exparte Application Based On Joint Stipulation Fro An Order To Continue Trial And Trial Related Dates Filed By Defendant Continental Airlines Primeflight Aviation Services
                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: 5/7/2013 Notice
                    Notice Of Ruling On Exparte Application Based On Joint Stipulation Fro An Order To Continue Trial And Trial Related Dates Filed By Defendant Continental Airlines Primeflight Aviation Services
                      Blank 22 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013
                      Master Jury Calendar Set For Sep-09-2013 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Dec-09-2013 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 Pursuant To Ex Parte Order Filed On 5/3/13. (206)
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 Order
                        Order Continuing Trial And All Trial-related Dates Pursuant To Stipulation
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 20 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: 4/30/2013
                          Declaration In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Order Filed By Defendant Continental Airlines Primeflight Aviation Services
                            Blank 19 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: 4/30/2013
                            Ex Parte Application For Order On Joint Stip For An Order To Continue Trial; Pos Filed By Defendant Continental Airlines Primeflight Aviation Services
                              Blank 18 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: 4/17/2013
                              Declaration In Support Of Ex Parte Application For Order Filed By Defendant Continental Airlines Primeflight Aviation Services
                                Blank 17 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: 4/17/2013
                                Ex Parte Application For Order Joint Stip And Proposed Order To Continue And All Trial Related Dates; Pos Filed By Defendant Continental Airlines Primeflight Aviation Services
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: 4/2/2013 Substitution of Attorney
                                  Substitution Of Attorney, (changing Attorney Within Same Law Firm): Cochran, Deborah S. Substituted For Perez, Geronimo As Attorney For Continental Airlines Primeflight Aviation Services
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 15 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: 3/6/2013
                                    Objection Hearing Of Mar-06-2013 Off Calendar - No Appearance By Objecting Party (610)
                                      Blank 14 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: 3/5/2013
                                      Added To Calendar For Objection Hearing Hearing Set For Mar-06-2013 At 10:30 Am In Dept 610
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013
                                        Objection To Trial Date Filed By Plaintiff Valdez, Patricia
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: 2/19/2013 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                                          Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Sep-09-2013 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Mar-06-2013 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/11/2013 Case Management Statement
                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Valdez, Patricia Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013 Case Management Statement
                                              Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Continental Airlines Primeflight Aviation Services Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/11/2013, Entered: 1/11/2013 Order Setting Case Management Conference From Order To Show Cause
                                                Case Management Conference Set For Mar-06-2013 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For The Submission Of Case Management Statements. The Jan-29-2013 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: 11/16/2012 Answer
                                                  Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Continental Airlines Primeflight Aviation Services
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: 10/26/2012 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                    Order To Show Cause Set For Oct-23-2012 Continued To Jan-29-2013 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). Notice Sent By Court.
                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: 10/26/2012
                                                      Mini Minutes For Oct-23-2012 02:00 Pm For Dept 610
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Case Management Statement
                                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Valdez, Patricia Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/29/2012, Entered: 8/29/2012 Order to Show Cause
                                                          Order To Show Cause Set For Oct-23-2012 In Department 610 At 2:00 Pm For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The Sep-12-2012 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/18/2012, Entered: 7/18/2012 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                            Case Management Conference Of Aug-01-2012 Continued To Sep-12-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: 2/27/2012 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                              Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: 2/27/2012 Complaint
                                                                Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Valdez, Patricia As To Defendant Continental Airlines Primeflight Aviation Services Does 1 To 50 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Aug-01-2012 Proof Of Service Due On Apr-27-2012 Case Management Statement Due On Jul-17-2012

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 21 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?