Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking v. Sepehr Mashhoud, An Individual Doing Business As Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 12 520143
Superior Court Judge Katherine Feinstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association"

Toggle Switch Represented by WONG FLEMING PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cochran, Deborah S. +1 619 595 4804
Space Geronimo Perez +1 310 943 4755 gperez@dfis-law.com
Space Steven Sandler +1 818 710 7277 +1 818 475 5114 stevensandler@stevensandler.com
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 100, Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Sepehr Mashhoud, An Individual Doing Business As All American Appraiser, Defendant
Cause of Action Common Counts/open Book Account/collections
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 38 Filed: 3/21/2014, Entered: 3/21/2014 Case Ordered Off Calendar
Order To Show Cause Of Apr-15-2014 Is Off Calendar. Dismissal On File. Notice Sent By Court.
    Blank 37 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: 3/6/2014
    Uncontested Calendar Of Mar-06-2014 Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn For Prove Up Hearing And Entry Of Default Judgment Off Calendar. Dismissal On File. Proceedings Reported By: Mitch Lyon , Csr#6840. (514)
      Legal Document 36 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: 2/19/2014 Dismissal Of Entire Action
      Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action Without Prejudice
        Legal Document 35 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 Continued Order To Show Cause
        Order To Show Cause Set For Feb-11-2014 Continued To Apr-15-2014 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For Failure To Enter Default Judgment. The Feb-11-2014 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
          Blank 34 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: 1/2/2014
          Uncontested Calendar Of Jan-09-2014 Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn For Prove Up Hearing And Entry Of Default Judgment Continued To Mar-06-2014 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 514, At The Request Of The Moving Party. (514)
            Legal Document 33 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: 12/17/2013 Continued Order To Show Cause
            Order To Show Cause Set For Jan-07-2014 Continued To Feb-11-2014 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For Failure To Enter Default Judgment. The Jan-07-2014 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
              Legal Document 32 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: 11/6/2013 Notice of Change of Address
              Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Cochran, Deborah S.
                Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Substitution of Attorney
                Substitution Of Attorney: Cochran, Deborah S. Substituted For Perez, Geronimo As Attorney For Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association
                  Blank 30 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013
                  Court Reporting Services Less Than 1 Hour Filed By Plaintiff Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association
                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Motion (civil Generic)
                    Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn For Prove Up Hearing And Entry Of Default Judgment Filed By Plaintiff Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association Hearing Set For Jan-09-2014 At 09:00 Am In Dept 514
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 Association Of Attorneys
                      Association Of Attorneys: Cochran, Deborah S. Added As Attorney For Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 28 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013
                        Pos Of Order Continuing Case Management Conference Dated July 23, 2013 Filed By Plaintiff Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association
                          Legal Document 27 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013 Case Management Statement
                          Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association
                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: 10/23/2013 Order to Show Cause
                            Order To Show Cause Set For Jan-07-2014 In Department 610 At 10:30 Am For Failure To Enter Default Judgment; For Plaintiff's Counsel To File Substitution Of Attorney. The Nov-06-2013 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                              Blank 25 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: 8/13/2013
                              Of Order Cont Cmc Filed By Plaintiff Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association
                                Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: 7/23/2013 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                Case Management Conference Of Aug-07-2013 Continued To Nov-06-2013 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For Plaintiff To Obtain Default Judgment Against Defendant(s). Note: Default Judgment Rejected May-17-2013. Notice Sent By Court.
                                  Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: 7/23/2013 Case Management Statement
                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association
                                    Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 Default Judgment Reject
                                    Default Judgment Rejected, Placed In Pickup Box, Submitted By Plaintiff Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association As To Defendant Sepehr Mashhoud, An Individual Doing Business As All American Appraiser
                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 Declaration
                                      Declaration Of Raymond Diamond In Support Of Default Judgment Filed By Plaintiff Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association
                                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 Request To Enter Default Filed/default Entered
                                        Request For Court Judgment By Default, Declaration Of Non-military Status, Cost Bill $657.50 Filed, Credit Acknowledged $.00 As To Defendant Sepehr Mashhoud, An Individual Doing Business As All American Appraiser
                                          Blank 19 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: 4/17/2013
                                          Received Request For Court Judgment Filed By Plaintiff Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association As To Defendant Sepehr Mashhoud, An Individual Doing Business As All American Appraiser
                                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: 3/20/2013 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                            Case Management Conference Of Apr-03-2013 Continued To Aug-07-2013 At 10:30 Am In Department 610 For Plaintiff To Obtain Default Judgment Against Defendant(s). Notice Sent By Court.
                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: 3/14/2013 Request To Enter Default Filed/default Entered
                                              Request For Entry Of Default/default Entered As To Defendant Sepehr Mashhoud, An Individual Doing Business As All American Appraiser
                                                Blank 16 Filed: 3/12/2013, Entered: 3/12/2013
                                                Received Request For Entry Of Default Filed By Plaintiff Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association As To Defendant Sepehr Mashhoud, An Individual Doing Business As All American Appraiser
                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 Proof of Service of Summons
                                                  Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association Served Jan-23-2013, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Sepehr Mashhoud, An Individual Doing Business As All American Appraiser
                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: 12/27/2012
                                                    Notice Of Court Order Continuing Case Management Conference Filed By Plaintiff Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association
                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/20/2012 Minute Order Re:
                                                      Minute Order Re: Denying Without Prejudice Plaintiff's Application For Publication Of Summons
                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/18/2012 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                        Case Management Conference Of Jan-02-2013 Continued To Apr-03-2013 At 10:30 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: 12/13/2012 Case Management Statement
                                                          Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: 10/26/2012 Ex Parte Application for Order
                                                            Ex Parte Application For Order For Publication Of Summons ; Memo ; Declarations Filed By Plaintiff Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association
                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: 10/19/2012 Notice
                                                              Notice Of Court Order Continuing Cas Managment Conference Filed By Plaintiff Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association
                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: 10/17/2012 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                Case Management Conference Of Oct-31-2012 Continued To Jan-02-2013 At 10:30 Am In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: 10/12/2012 Case Management Statement
                                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: 10/1/2012 Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed
                                                                    Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Continuing Case Management Conference Filed By Plaintiff Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association
                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: 10/1/2012
                                                                      Disassociation Of Attorney: Sandler, Steven Removed As Attorney For Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association
                                                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/14/2012, Entered: 9/14/2012 Notice
                                                                        Notice Of Appearance And Request For Service Of Papers Filed By Plaintiff Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association
                                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: 9/5/2012 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                          Case Management Conference Of Sep-19-2012 Continued To Oct-31-2012 At 2:00 Pm In Department 610. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: 4/19/2012 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                            Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: 4/19/2012 Complaint
                                                                              Common Counts/open Book Account/collections, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Jp Morgan Chase Bank, Na, A National Banking Association As To Defendant Sepehr Mashhoud, An Individual Doing Business As All American Appraiser Does 1 To 100, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Sep-19-2012 Proof Of Service Due On Jun-18-2012 Case Management Statement Due On Sep-04-2012

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 208 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?